American Sociological Association et al v. Hillary Rodham Clinton et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-11796
District Judge George A. OToole, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Adam Habib, Plaintiff

Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

No Logo American Association of University Professors, Plaintiff

Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

No Logo American Sociological Association, Plaintiff

Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Of Northern California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurence M. Schwartztol +1 212 519 7849 +1 212 549 2583 lschwartztol@aclu.org
No Logo AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI-DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE, Plaintiff

Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

No Logo Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights, Plaintiff

Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/21/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas H. Dupree, Jr. +1 202 353 8679 +1 202 616 8460 thomas.dupree@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victor M. Lawrence +1 202 305 8788 +1 202 233 0397 victor.lawrence@usdoj.gov
Clinton, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Hillary Rodham, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hillary Rodham Clinton"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victor M. Lawrence +1 202 305 8788 +1 202 233 0397 victor.lawrence@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/21/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas H. Dupree, Jr. +1 202 353 8679 +1 202 616 8460 thomas.dupree@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victor M. Lawrence +1 202 305 8788 +1 202 233 0397 victor.lawrence@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered. STIPULATED DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE(Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Hillary Rodham Clinton, American Sociological Association, American Association of University Professors, American-Arab Antidiscrimination Committee, Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights. (Lawrence, Victor) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
      MOTION to Stay Joint Stipulation to Hold Case in Abeyance Until March 12, 2010 by Hillary Rodham Clinton.(Lawrence, Victor) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None
        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Laurence M. Schwartztol by American Sociological Association, American Association of University Professors, American-Arab Antidiscrimination Committee, Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights.(Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
          Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered re 57 Stipulation filed by Hillary Rodham Clinton (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 57 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None
            STIPULATION Final Joint Stipulation to Hold Case in Abeyance by Hillary Rodham Clinton. (Hollis, Christopher) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
              STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Hold Case in Abeyance for an Additional 30 Days by Hillary Rodham Clinton, American Sociological Association, American Association of University Professors, American-Arab Antidiscrimination Committee, Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights, Adam Habib, Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice. (Lawrence, Victor) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 55 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Hold Case in Abeyance for an Additional 45 Days by Hillary Rodham Clinton. (Hollis, Christopher) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                  LREF
                  Blank 54 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Hold Case in Abeyance for 60 Days by Hillary Rodham Clinton. (Hollis, Christopher) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
                    JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Hillary Rodham Clinton.(Hollis, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                      NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Transcript of Motion Hearing held on May 27, 2009, before Judge O'Toole. Court Reporter: Marcia G. Patrisso at 617/737-8728. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 6/22/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/30/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                          Plaintiffs' Supplemental Sur-Reply Memorandum Regarding Standing re 22 MOTION to Stay Motion to Hold in Abeyance Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgmentfiled by Hillary Rodham Clinton. (Hollis, Christopher) Modified on 3/30/2009 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None
                            STIPULATION and Order Regarding Enlargement of Time for Filing of Defendant's Sur-Reply Memorandum Regarding Standing by Hillary Rodham Clinton. (Hollis, Christopher) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
                              Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Supplemental Reply Memorandum Regarding Standing and in Further Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment filed by American Sociological Association, American Association of University Professors, American-Arab Antidiscrimination Committee, Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights. (Goodman, Melissa) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 22 MOTION to Stay Motion to Hold in Abeyance Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Standing filed by Hillary Rodham Clinton. (Hollis, Christopher) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Laurence M. Schwartztol Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002310667. by American Sociological Association, American Association of University Professors, American-Arab Antidiscrimination Committee, Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Laurence M. Schwartztol in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Goodman, Melissa) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                    Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Standing and in Further Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment filed by American Sociological Association, American Association of University Professors, American-Arab Antidiscrimination Committee, Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Declaration of Sally T. Hillsman)(Goodman, Melissa) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Transcript of Status Conference held on February 2, 2009, before Judge O'Toole. Court Reporter: Helana E. Kline at 508/525-7769. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 2/27/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/9/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE by Condoleezza Rice Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Proposed Agenda (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A--Declaration of Victor M. Lawrence)(Hollis, Christopher) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE by American Sociological Association, American Association of University Professors, American-Arab Antidiscrimination Committee, Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED AGENDA FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON FEBRUARY 2, 2009 (Goodman, Melissa) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Condoleezza Rice.(Dupree, Thomas) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                ANSWER to 11 Amended Complaint, Answer to Second Amended Complaint by Condoleezza Rice.(Hollis, Christopher) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                  STIPULATION and Order Regarding Enlargement of Time for Defendant to Answer the Second Amended Complaint by Condoleezza Rice. (Hollis, Christopher) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Judge George A. OToole, Jr: OPINION AND ORDER entered granting 22 Motion to Stay; denying 16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, except to the extent that Michael Chertoff is dismissed as a defendant. Adam Habib is dismissed as a plaintiff. The plaintiff's motion for summary judgment remains pending. (Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Nasrina Bargzie by American Sociological Association, American Association of University Professors, American-Arab Antidiscrimination Committee, Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights, Adam Habib.(Goodman, Melissa) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Transcript of Motion Hearing held on June 25, 2008, before Judge O'Toole. Court Reporter: Marcia G. Patrisso at 617/737-8728. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 7/25/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/2/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE issued to Attorney Thomas H. Dupree regarding mandatory use of ECF in compliance with Local Rule 5.4. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas H. Dupree, Jr on behalf of Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice (Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                Assented to MOTION to Continue Hearing by Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Continuing Hearing)(Hollis, Christopher) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  REPLY to Response to 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, 22 MOTION to Stay Motion to Hold in Abeyance Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice. (Hollis, Christopher) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    Supplemental MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Hold in Abeyance Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Hold in Abeyance Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment))(Hollis, Christopher) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      REPLY to Response to 22 MOTION to Stay Motion to Hold in Abeyance Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice. (Hollis, Christopher) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        Supplemental MOTION for Leave to File A Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Hold in Abeyance Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice.(Hollis, Christopher) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Hold Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motion in Abeyance by Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Hold Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motion in Abeyance)(Hollis, Christopher) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            REPLY to Response to 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO HOLD PLAINTIFFS SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION IN ABEYANCE filed by American Sociological Association, American Association of University Professors, American-Arab Antidiscrimination Committee, Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights, Adam Habib. (Goodman, Melissa) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              REPLY to Response to 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 22 MOTION to Stay Motion to Hold in Abeyance Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; and Defendants' Memorandum in Support for Holding in Abeyance Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Victor M. Lawrence, # 2 Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Lawrence, Victor) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION to Stay Motion to Hold in Abeyance Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice.(Lawrence, Victor) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  Assented-to Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and STIPULATION Re: Amended Briefing Schedule by Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice. (Hollis, Christopher) Modified on 3/17/2008 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Goodman, Melissa) Modified on 2/14/2008 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 02/13/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by American Sociological Association, American Association of University Professors, American-Arab Antidiscrimination Committee, Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights, Adam Habib. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Adam Habib, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Adam Habib Part 2, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Adam Habib Part 3, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Adam Habib Part 4, # 5 Affidavit Declaration of Sally Hillsman, # 6 Affidavit Declaration of Sherif Fam, # 7 Affidavit Declaration of Merrie Najimy, # 8 Affidavit Declaration of Cary Nelson)(Goodman, Melissa) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by American Sociological Association, American Association of University Professors, American-Arab Antidiscrimination Committee, Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights, Adam Habib.(Goodman, Melissa) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hollis, Christopher) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice.(Hollis, Christopher) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W. Hollis on behalf of Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice (Hollis, Christopher) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice re 13 Stipulation Re. Briefing Schedule and Assented-to Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Hollis, Christopher) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  STIPULATION Re: Briefing Schedule and Assented-to Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice. (Hollis, Christopher) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                    First MOTION for Extension of Time to January 14, 2008 to Answer or respond to Amended Complaint by Condoleezza Rice.(Lawrence, Victor) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                      SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injuntive Relief against Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice, filed by American Sociological Association, American Association of University Professors, American-Arab Antidiscrimination Committee, Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights, Adam Habib. **Leave to file Granted 12/4/2007 **(Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: ORDER entered Granting 8 Motion for Leave to File. Motions terminated: 8 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Adam Habib, Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights, American Sociological Association, American-Arab Antidiscrimination Committee, American Association of University Professors.(Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Proposed Document(s) submitted by American Sociological Association, American Association of University Professors, American-Arab Antidiscrimination Committee, Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights, Adam Habib. Document received: Proposed Order. (Goodman, Melissa) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by American Sociological Association, American Association of University Professors, American-Arab Antidiscrimination Committee, Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights, Adam Habib. (Attachments: # 1 Second Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief)(Goodman, Melissa) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice, filed by American Sociological Association, American Association of University Professors, American-Arab Antidiscrimination Committee, Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights, Adam Habib.(Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                **See notice of correction dated 11/19/07** AMENDED DOCUMENT by American Sociological Association, American Association of University Professors, American-Arab Antidiscrimination Committee, Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights, Adam Habib. Amendment to 1 Complaint, . (Goodman, Melissa) Modified on 11/19/2007 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 11/14/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Victor M. Lawrence on behalf of Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice (Lawrence, Victor) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Sociological Association, American Association of University Professors, American-Arab Antidiscrimination Committee, Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights, Adam Habib. Condoleezza Rice served on 10/2/2007, answer due 12/3/2007. (Wunsch, Sarah) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights, Adam Habib. Michael Chertoff served on 10/2/2007, answer due 12/3/2007. (Wunsch, Sarah) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jameel Jaffer, Melissa Goodman, Judy Rabinovitz, Nasrina Bargzie Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 1678458. by American Sociological Association, American Association of University Professors, American-Arab Antidiscrimination Committee, Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights, Adam Habib. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Jaffer Declaration# 2 Affidavit Goodman Declaration# 3 Affidavit Rabinovitz Declaration# 4 Affidavit Bargzie Declaration)(Wunsch, Sarah) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against all Defendant's Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 1678367, filed by American Sociological Association, American Association of University Professors, American-Arab Antidiscrimination Committee, Boston Coalition for Palestinian Rights, Adam Habib. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Category sheet# 3 Summons Attorney General# 4 Summons Chertoff# 5 Summons Rice# 6 Summons Sullivan)(Wunsch, Sarah) Modified on 9/25/2007 (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 121 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?