Unknown
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-12005
District Judge Richard G. Stearns, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dean F. Hatch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenney & Conley, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Michael Conley +1 781 848 9891 +1 781 843 4216 michael@kenneyconley.com
No Logo Mary L. Hatch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenney & Conley, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Michael Conley +1 781 848 9891 +1 781 843 4216 michael@kenneyconley.com
v.
No Logo Trail King Industries, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sloane & Walsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Myles W. McDonough +1 617 523 6010 +1 617 227 0927 dstevenson@sloanewalsh.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Date to September, 2010 or thereafter by Dean F. Hatch, Mary L. Hatch, Trail King Industries, Inc..(Kenney, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge Richard G. Stearns: PROCEDURAL ORDER entered re pretrial/trial. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2010 at 2:00 PM & Jury Trial set for 7/19/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 35 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 23 Motion for Summary Judgment (Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
        RESPONSE to Motion re 35 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Behalf of the Plaintiffs, Dean F. Hatch and Mary L. Hatch Trail King's Response to Plaintiffs' Undisputed Material Facts filed by Trail King Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM in Support of the Opposition re 35 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Behalf of the Plaintiffs, Dean F. Hatch and Mary L. Hatch filed by Trail King Industries, Inc.. (McDonough, Myles) Modified on 3/23/2010 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 03/22/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
            Opposition re 35 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Behalf of the Plaintiffs, Dean F. Hatch and Mary L. Hatch filed by Trail King Industries, Inc.. (McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM in Support re 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File and For Reconsideration of the Denial of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint MOTION for Reconsideration re 26 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint MOTION for Reconsideration re 26 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Dean F. Hatch, Mary L. Hatch. (Conley, J.) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                MOTION for Extension of Time to File and For Reconsideration of the Denial of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, MOTION for Reconsideration re 26 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint ( Responses due by 4/5/2010) by Dean F. Hatch, Mary L. Hatch.(Conley, J.) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                  Assented to MOTION to Continue Summary Judgment Hearing to April 14, 2010 by Trail King Industries, Inc..(McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                    EXHIBIT re 37 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 by Dean F. Hatch, Mary L. Hatch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(Conley, J.) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                      Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 35 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Behalf of the Plaintiffs, Dean F. Hatch and Mary L. Hatch filed by Dean F. Hatch, Mary L. Hatch. (Conley, J.) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 35 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Behalf of the Plaintiffs, Dean F. Hatch and Mary L. Hatch filed by Dean F. Hatch, Mary L. Hatch. (Conley, J.) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Behalf of the Plaintiffs, Dean F. Hatch and Mary L. Hatch by Dean F. Hatch, Mary L. Hatch.(Conley, J.) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                            Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 32 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment on All Counts filed by Trail King Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 32 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment on All Counts filed by Trail King Industries, Inc.. (McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment on All Counts by Trail King Industries, Inc..(McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                  STATEMENT of facts Additional Material Facts. (Conley, J.) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                    Exhibits to Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment on all Counts filed by Dean F. Hatch, Mary L. Hatch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 #1, # 3 #2, # 4 #3, # 5 #4, # 6 #5, # 7 #6, # 8 #7, # 9 #8, # 10 #9, # 11 #10, # 12 #11, # 13 #12)(Conley, J.) Modified on 5/7/2010 (Flaherty, Elaine). (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                      Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment on all Counts filed by Dean F. Hatch, Mary L. Hatch. (Conley, J.) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                        Opposition re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment on all Counts filed by Dean F. Hatch, Mary L. Hatch. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Conley, J.) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
                                          Opposition re 26 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Request for Oral Argument filed by Trail King Industries, Inc.. (McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Dean F. Hatch, Mary L. Hatch. (Attachments: # 1 Second Amended Complaint, # 2 93A Demand)(Conley, J.) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
                                              Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment on all Counts filed by Trail King Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment on all Counts filed by Trail King Industries, Inc.. (McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment on all Counts by Trail King Industries, Inc..(McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 15, 2010 to Serve Expert Reports by Trail King Industries, Inc..(McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/30/2009 to Plaintiffs' Expert Disclosures by Dean F. Hatch.(Conley, J.) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION to Withdraw 19 Proposed Document(s) submitted, 18 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 17 MOTION for Order to (1) Compelling Workers' Comp. Insurer to Produce Documents and (2) Barring Any Claims for Workers' Comp. Liens by Trail King Industries, Inc..(McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                          Proposed Document(s) submitted by Trail King Industries, Inc.. Document received: Proposed Order. (McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 17 MOTION for Order to (1) Compelling Workers' Comp. Insurer to Produce Documents and (2) Barring Any Claims for Workers' Comp. Liens filed by Trail King Industries, Inc.. (McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Order to (1) Compelling Workers' Comp. Insurer to Produce Documents and (2) Barring Any Claims for Workers' Comp. Liens by Trail King Industries, Inc..(McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 60 days to Complete Discovery and Provisions of Expert Reports by Dean F. Hatch, Mary L. Hatch, Trail King Industries, Inc..(McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support re 14 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for 60 Days filed by Trail King Industries, Inc.. (McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for 60 Days by Trail King Industries, Inc..(McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to May 15, 2009 to Complete depositions by Dean F. Hatch.(Conley, J.) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Trail King Industries, Inc..(McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 02/22/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D) by Dean F. Hatch, Mary L. Hatch, Trail King Industries, Inc..(Conley, J.) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence J. Kenney, Jr on behalf of Trail King Industries, Inc. (Kenney, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Trail King Industries, Inc..(McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 11/21/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Myles W. McDonough on behalf of Trail King Industries, Inc. (McDonough, Myles) (Entered: 11/21/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Dean F. Hatch, Mary L. Hatch (Conley, J.) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against Trail King Industries, Inc., filed by Dean F. Hatch, Mary L. Hatch(York, Steve) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE by Dean F. Hatch, Mary L. Hatch re 1 Complaint Amended (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint)(Conley, J.) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by J. Michael Conley on behalf of Dean F. Hatch, Mary L. Hatch (Conley, J.) (Entered: 10/22/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION to Change Venue to Eastern Division by Dean F. Hatch, Mary L. Hatch.(Conley, J.) (Entered: 10/22/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against all defendants, filed by Dean F. Hatch, Mary L. Hatch.(Conley, J.) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2007 1 Civil Cover Sheet (Patch, Christine). Modified on 12/5/2007 (York, Steve). (Entered: 10/22/2007)
                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 150 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?