Unknown
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-12238

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
Opposition re 40 MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED MEDICAL EXPERT, MICHAEL R. BRITT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXPERT DISCLOSURES filed by Donna M. DiMare. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Santiano, Barbara) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None
    MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED MEDICAL EXPERT, MICHAEL R. BRITT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXPERT DISCLOSURES by Realty Trac, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Briefel, Joshua) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2009: # 5 Exhibit 1 redacted) (Burgos, Sandra). (Entered: 07/30/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
      Opposition re 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to 6/22/09 to File expert witness reports filed by Realty Trac, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 through 4)(Bolotin, Steven) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2009: # 2 Redacted Exhibit 1 through 4) (Burgos, Sandra). (Entered: 06/17/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
        MOTION for Extension of Time to 6/22/09 to File expert witness reports by Donna M. DiMare.(Santiano, Barbara) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
          Opposition re 34 Emergency MOTION to Strike 32 Opposition to Motion,, Regarding Affidavit of Barbara Santiano filed by Donna M. DiMare. (Santiano, Barbara) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 36 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None
            Emailed copy of MDL Order Denying Transfer in MDL Case 1715 received from the mdl panel. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
              LREF
              Blank 35 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None
              REPLY to Response to 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Realty Trac, Inc.. (Briefel, Joshua) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None
                Emergency MOTION to Strike 32 Opposition to Motion,, Regarding Affidavit of Barbara Santiano by Realty Trac, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Briefel, Joshua) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None
                  General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None
                    Opposition re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Donna M. DiMare. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29)(Santiano, Barbara) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2009: # 30 Redacted Exhibit 26) (Burgos, Sandra). (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Realty Trac, Inc.. (Bolotin, Steven) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                        Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Realty Trac, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19)(Bolotin, Steven) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2009: # 20 Redacted Exhibit 1, # 21 Redacted Exhibit 17, # 22 Redacted Exhibit 18, # 23 Redacted Exhibit 19) (Burgos, Sandra). (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by Realty Trac, Inc..(Bolotin, Steven) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                            Opposition re 26 Amended MOTION to 24 MOTION to Compel Answer to Interrogatories and Production of Documents filed by Realty Trac, Inc.. (Briefel, Joshua) Modified docket text on 4/29/2009 (Burgos, Sandra). (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: None
                              Amended MOTION to 24 MOTION to Compel Answer to Interrogatories and Production of Documents by Donna M. DiMare.(Santiano, Barbara) Modified docket text on 4/29/2009 to list Amended Motion to Compel (Burgos, Sandra). (Entered: 04/16/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                Opposition re 22 First MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Realty Trac, Inc.. (Briefel, Joshua) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                  MOTION to Compel Answer to Interrogatories and Production of Documents by Donna M. DiMare. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter from Defendant, # 2 Exhibit 2nd Letter from Defendant)(Santiano, Barbara) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None
                                    First MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Compel Discovery Responses by Realty Trac, Inc..(Briefel, Joshua) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Disclosure of Expert Witnesses by Donna M. DiMare.(Santiano, Barbara) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                                        Second MOTION to Continue Hearing on RealtyTrac, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery Responses to March 24, 2009 by Realty Trac, Inc..(Briefel, Joshua) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/16/2009, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Baker on behalf of David G Baker (Baker, David) (Entered: 02/16/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None
                                            First MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery by Realty Trac, Inc..(Briefel, Joshua) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara J. Santiano on behalf of Donna M. DiMare, c/s. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for plaintiff, with certificate of service, by Donna M. DiMare.(Baker, David) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                  Opposition re 12 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents , with certificate of service (refiled due to clerical error), filed by Donna M. DiMare. (Baker, David) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                    Opposition re 12 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents filed by Donna M. DiMare. (Baker, David) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                      MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents by Realty Trac, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Interrogatories to DiMare, # 2 Exhibit B-b Document Requests to DiMare, # 3 Exhibit C - 11/24/08 Correspondence to Counsel for DiMare)(Bolotin, Steven) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION to Continue Status Conference to Next Available by Donna M. DiMare.(Baker, David) (Entered: 07/19/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Realty Trac, Inc.. (Hayden, Michael) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/24/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. Discovery to be completed by 9/30/2008. Status Conference set for 10/3/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. Motions due by 10/31/2008.(Castles, Martin) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Donna M. DiMare.(Baker, David) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Joseph Bolotin on behalf of Realty Trac, Inc. (Bolotin, Steven) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  Assented to MOTION to Continue Status Conference to Next available by Donna M. DiMare.(Baker, David) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    Objection re 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Donna M. DiMare. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 12/27/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Donna M. DiMare. (Baker, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2007: # 1 Main Document) (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 12/26/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        Bankrupcty record received. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 answer) (Gawlik, Cathy) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Realty Trac, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 bkcy. court docket)(Gawlik, Cathy) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2007 (Gawlik, Cathy). Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2007 (Gawlik, Cathy). Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2007 (Gawlik, Cathy). (Entered: 12/05/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 20 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?