Bedi v. Hewlett-Packard Company et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-12318

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 1, 2016 at 10:05 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ranjit Bedi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Boni and Zack LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Boni +1 610 822 0200 +1 610 822 0206 mboni@bonizack.com
Space Joshua D. Snyder - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 610 822 0200 +1 610 822 0206 jsnyder@bonizack.com
Space Joanne Zack +1 610 822 0200 +1 610 822 0206 jzack@bonizack.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoffman & Edelson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARC H. EDELSON +1 215 230 8043 +2308 230 230 8735 medelson@hofedlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kamber Edelson, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ethan Preston +1 312 589 6370 +1 312 202 6364 epreston@kamberedelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mary J. Ciresi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary J. Ciresi +1 401 447 5715 +1 401 455 2380 mjciresi@ciresilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Caldes - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 215 496 0300 +1 215 496 6611 bcaldes@srkw-law.com
v.
Hewlett-Packard Company Hewlett-Packard Company, Defendant
Unknown Role, Navisite, Inc.
Unknown Role, E-cruiter.com Inc.
Unknown Role, Novadigm, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Casner & Edwards, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie Rising Bryan +1 617 426 5900 +1 617 426 8810 bryan@casneredwards.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Choate Hall & Stewart, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert M. Buchanan, Jr. +1 617 248 5000 +1 617 248 4000 rbuchanan@choate.com
Space Robert S. Frank, Jr. +1 617 248 5207 +1 617 248 4000 rfrank@choate.com
Staples, Inc. Staples, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherin & Lodgen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sara Jane Shanahan +1 617 646 2000 +1 617 646 2222 sjshanahan@sherin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin James Arquit +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 karquit@stblaw.com
Space Hillary Cherry Mintz +1 202 220 7738 +1 202 220 7702 hmintz@stblaw.com
Space Arman Y. Oruc +1 212 445 3813 +1 212 445 2502 aoruc@stblaw.com
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 41 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR DEFENDANTS. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
    LREF
    Blank 40 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge Rya W. Zobel: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting 13 Motion to Dismiss (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
      NOTICE by Ranjit Bedi of Change of Firm Name of Spector Roseman & Kodroff, P.C. to Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, P.C. (Corrigan, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Marc H. Edelson Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002006553. by Ranjit Bedi.(Ciresi, Mary) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
          Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William G. Caldes Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002006518. by Ranjit Bedi.(Ciresi, Mary) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2008: # 1 Corrected Document) (Johnson, Jay). (Entered: 06/18/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
            Joint REPLY to Response to 13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Defendants Hewlett-Packard Co. and Staples, Inc. filed by Hewlett-Packard Company, Staples, Inc.. (Rising, Julie) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
              Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered denying 33 Motion for Case Management Order without prejudice.With respect to the motion to dismiss (Docket # 13), defendants may file a replybrief of no more than five pages on or before June 13, 2008. The court will then decidethe motion on the papers. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                Joint Opposition re 33 MOTION for Order to Case Management Order filed by Staples, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Shanahan, Sara) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Order to Case Management Order by Ranjit Bedi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Preston, Ethan) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                    Opposition re 13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Defendants Hewlett-Packard Co. and Staples, Inc. filed by Ranjit Bedi. (Preston, Ethan) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None
                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William G. Caldes by Ranjit Bedi.(Ciresi, Mary) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None
                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mark H. Edelson by Ranjit Bedi.(Ciresi, Mary) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None
                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jeffrey L. Kodroff by Ranjit Bedi.(Ciresi, Mary) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None
                            Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jeffrey J. Corrigan by Ranjit Bedi.(Ciresi, Mary) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None
                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David P. McLafferty by Ranjit Bedi.(Ciresi, Mary) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: None
                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 05/09/2008 to File Response/Reply as to 13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Defendants Hewlett-Packard Co. and Staples, Inc. , Certificate of Service by Ranjit Bedi.(Snyder, Joshua) (Entered: 04/18/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None
                                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 18, 2008 to File Response/Reply by Ranjit Bedi.(Ciresi, Mary) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 24 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
                                    Sealed Document: HP Staples Confidential/Strategic Enterprise Alliance Agreement. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Mary J. Ciresi (Ciresi, Mary) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joanne Zack by Ranjit Bedi.(Ciresi, Mary) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael J. Boni by Ranjit Bedi.(Ciresi, Mary) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joshua D. Snyder by Ranjit Bedi.(Ciresi, Mary) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ethan Preston by Ranjit Bedi.(Ciresi, Mary) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ethan Preston by Ranjit Bedi.(Ciresi, Mary) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Mary J. Ciresi (Ciresi, Mary) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Rising, Julie) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal a Copy of Agreement and for a Protective Order for Such Document by Hewlett-Packard Company, Staples, Inc..(Rising, Julie) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Defendants Hewlett-Packard Co. and Staples, Inc. filed by Hewlett-Packard Company, Staples, Inc.. (Rising, Julie) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Defendants Hewlett-Packard Co. and Staples, Inc. by Hewlett-Packard Company.(Rising, Julie) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Staples, Inc.. (Shanahan, Sara) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kevin Arquit, Arman Oruc and Hillary Mintz by Staples, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kevin Arquit, # 2 Affidavit of Arman Oruc, # 3 Affidavit of Hillary Mintz)(Shanahan, Sara) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Frank, Jr on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (Frank, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Buchanan, Jr on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (Buchanan, Robert) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 5, 2008 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Hewlett-Packard Company.(Rising, Julie) Modified on 1/30/2008 (Johnson, Jay). (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Julie C. Rising on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (Rising, Julie) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 5, 2008 to Answer or Respond to Complaint by Staples, Inc..(Shanahan, Sara) Modified on 1/30/2008 (Johnson, Jay). (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Jane Shanahan on behalf of Staples, Inc. (Shanahan, Sara) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            Summons Issued as to Hewlett-Packard Company, Staples, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Fee Payment by Ranjit Bedi, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING WITH CLERK'S OFFICE The Class Action Complaint by Ranjit Bedi, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Hewlett-Packard Company, Staples, Inc., filed by Ranjit Bedi. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Sheet)(Boyce, Kathy) Modified on 12/17/2007 (Diskes, Sheila). (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 222 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?