USA v. Trinh et al
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cr-10048

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 497 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: 2/19/2010 Proposed Order(s) submitted
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: 2/19/2010 Proposed Order(s) submitted
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: 2/19/2010 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: 2/19/2010 Affidavit
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 Motion to Continue
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: 1/4/2010 Motion to Continue
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 12/24/2009, Entered: 12/24/2009 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Motion for Release from Custody
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Memorandum (not related to a motion)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 12/13/2009, Entered: 12/13/2009 Memorandum in Support
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: 12/9/2009 Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: 12/8/2009 Motion for Sanctions
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 12/5/2009, Entered: 12/5/2009 Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: 12/2/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: 11/30/2009 Motion for Discovery
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Motion for Protective Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/19/2009 Motion for Discovery
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: 11/18/2009 Motion for Discovery
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: 11/18/2009 Motion for Discovery
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: 11/18/2009 Motion for Discovery
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: 11/17/2009 Motion to Strike
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 11/11/2009, Entered: 11/11/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 11/11/2009, Entered: 11/11/2009 Motion to Suppress
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 11/11/2009, Entered: 11/11/2009 Exhibit/Witness List
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009 Exhibit/Witness List
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/6/2009 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/6/2009 Trial Brief
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/6/2009 Stipulation
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/6/2009 Stipulation
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/6/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 305 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Plea Agreement
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Sealed Motion +
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/24/2009 Pretrial Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: 9/8/2009 Sealed Motion +
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: 9/8/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: 7/15/2009 Response to Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 CJA 20 Appointment
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Response to Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 Information to Establish Prior Conviction
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: 2/11/2009 Motion for Interim Compensation
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Order on Excludable Delay
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 CJA 20 Appointment
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Motion for Excludable Delay
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008 Motion to Unseal Document
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Motion to Unseal Document
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Sealed Order
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Indictment -Sealed
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Indictment
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 14 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?