Newman v. EADS N v.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-10138
District Judge Mark L. Wolf, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2019 at 11:13 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo City of New Bedford, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Krattenmaker O'Connor & Ingber P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary O. Winstanley +1 617 523 1010 +1 617 523 1009 moconnor@koilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John Scott Hoff, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Scott Hoff +1 312 346 8111 jsh@aviationattorney.com
Lockheed Martin Corporation Lockheed Martin Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Lockheed Martin Services, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by CAMPBELL, CAMPBELL, EDWARDS & CONROY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/25/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Marie Guilfoyle +1 617 241 3109 +1 617 241 5115 kguilfoyle@campbell-trial-lawyers.com
No Logo Midwest ATC Service, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Berberich +1 212 742 8450 +1 212 742 0161 kberberich@dglitigators.com
No Logo New Bedford Airport Commission, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Krattenmaker O'Connor & Ingber P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary O. Winstanley +1 617 523 1010 +1 617 523 1009 moconnor@koilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John Scott Hoff, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Scott Hoff +1 312 346 8111 jsh@aviationattorney.com
No Logo New Bedford Conservation Commission, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Krattenmaker O'Connor & Ingber P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary O. Winstanley +1 617 523 1010 +1 617 523 1009 moconnor@koilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John Scott Hoff, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Scott Hoff +1 312 346 8111 jsh@aviationattorney.com
No Logo New Bedford Regional Airport Commission, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Krattenmaker O'Connor & Ingber P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary O. Winstanley +1 617 523 1010 +1 617 523 1009 moconnor@koilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John Scott Hoff, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Scott Hoff +1 312 346 8111 jsh@aviationattorney.com
No Logo Pratt & Whitney Canada, Counter-Claimant
United States of America United States of America, Counter-Claimant
United Technologies Corporation United Technologies Corporation, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Vanasse Hangen Brustlin, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donovan Hatem, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth B. Walton +1 617 406 4500 +1 617 406 4501 kwalton@donovanhatem.com
No Logo Compagnie Daher S.A., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric C Strain +1 415 984 8200 estrain@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Daher, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric C Strain +1 415 984 8200 estrain@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Eads North America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen C. Johnson +1 415 984 8222 +1 310 551 2301

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian C Dalrymple +1 415 984 8200 bdalrymple@nixonpeabody.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric C Strain +1 415 984 8200 estrain@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Eads Socata, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen C. Johnson +1 415 984 8222 +1 310 551 2301

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian C Dalrymple +1 415 984 8200 bdalrymple@nixonpeabody.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric C Strain +1 415 984 8200 estrain@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo EADS Socata North America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen C. Johnson +1 415 984 8222 +1 310 551 2301

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian C Dalrymple +1 415 984 8200 bdalrymple@nixonpeabody.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric C Strain +1 415 984 8200 estrain@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo European Aeronautic Defence And Space Company Eads N.v., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric C Strain +1 415 984 8200 estrain@nixonpeabody.com
Lockheed Martin Corporation Lockheed Martin Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Lockheed Martin, Information Systems and Global Services"

Toggle Switch Represented by CAMPBELL, CAMPBELL, EDWARDS & CONROY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/25/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Marie Guilfoyle +1 617 241 3109 +1 617 241 5115 kguilfoyle@campbell-trial-lawyers.com
TERMINATED: 06/25/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Marie Guilfoyle +1 617 241 3109 +1 617 241 5115 kguilfoyle@campbell-trial-lawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy & Riley PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline S. Bouscaren +1 617 423 3700 cbouscaren@murphyriley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline S. Bouscaren +1 617 423 3700 cbouscaren@murphyriley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by trial-lawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/08/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard P. Campbell +1 617 241 3000 +1 617 241 5115 rpcampbell@campbell-trial-lawyers.com
TERMINATED: 10/08/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard P. Campbell +1 617 241 3000 +1 617 241 5115 rpcampbell@campbell-trial-lawyers.com
No Logo Pratt & Witney Canada Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Pratt & Witney Canada, Corp."
No Logo Simcom International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William T. Bogaert +1 617 422 5300
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maynard M. Kirpalani +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 maynard.kirpalani@wilsonelser.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Valerie N. Kloecker +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 valerie.kloecker@wilsonelser.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Leighton, Jr. +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 joseph.leighton@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Simcom Training Centers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William T. Bogaert +1 617 422 5300
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maynard M. Kirpalani +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 maynard.kirpalani@wilsonelser.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Valerie N. Kloecker +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 valerie.kloecker@wilsonelser.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Leighton, Jr. +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 joseph.leighton@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Simcom Inc,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William T. Bogaert +1 617 422 5300
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maynard M. Kirpalani +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 maynard.kirpalani@wilsonelser.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Valerie N. Kloecker +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 valerie.kloecker@wilsonelser.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Leighton, Jr. +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 joseph.leighton@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Socata SAS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric C Strain +1 415 984 8200 estrain@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Airport Solutions Group, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donovan Hatem, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth B. Walton +1 617 406 4500 +1 617 406 4501 kwalton@donovanhatem.com
No Logo Harry Newman, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Tarricone , +1 617 424 9100 +1 617 424 9120 Srusso@kreindler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Wolk Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard E. Genter +1 215 545 4220
No Logo John Milot, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Midwest ATC Service, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Berberich +1 212 742 8450 +1 212 742 0161 kberberich@dglitigators.com
No Logo Patricia Milot, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Thomas A Wallitsch, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Tarricone , +1 617 424 9100 +1 617 424 9120 Srusso@kreindler.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 315 - Personal Injury: Airplane Product Liability
  Entries (171) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 269 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Lockheeds motion for summary judgment is GRANTED and Midwests motion for summary judgment is DENIED.(Hourihan, Lisa)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Lockheeds motion for summary judgment is GRANTED and Midwests motion for summary judgment is DENIED.(Hourihan, Lisa)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting defendant Socata's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction(Hourihan, Lisa)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William Katt, Esq. and Corey Wright, Esq. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-2971219 by Lockheed Martin Services, Inc..(Bouscaren, Caroline) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
          DECLARATION re 164 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction of Philippe Valendru by Compagnie Daher S.A., Daher, Inc., European Aeronautic Defence and Space Company EADS N.V.. (Strain, Eric) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
            DECLARATION re 164 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction of Peter Kleinschmidt by Compagnie Daher S.A., Daher, Inc., European Aeronautic Defence and Space Company EADS N.V.. (Strain, Eric) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
              DECLARATION re 164 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Compagnie Daher S.A., Daher, Inc., European Aeronautic Defence and Space Company EADS N.V.. (Strain, Eric) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                MEMORANDUM in Support re 164 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Compagnie Daher S.A., Daher, Inc., European Aeronautic Defence and Space Company EADS N.V.. (Strain, Eric) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for a hearing by Compagnie Daher S.A., Daher, Inc., European Aeronautic Defence and Space Company EADS N.V..(Strain, Eric) Docket text Modified on 7/7/2010 to reflect the request for oral argument. (Boyce, Kathy). (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 162 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Compagnie Daher S.A., Daher, Inc., European Aeronautic Defence and Space Company EADS N.V.. (Strain, Eric) Docket Modified on 7/2/2010 for the docket to reflect that this memorandum was mistakenly e-filed (Boyce, Kathy). (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                      MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Daher, Inc., European Aeronautic Defence and Space Company EADS N.V., Compagnie Daher S.A..(Strain, Eric) Docket Text Modified on 7/2/2010 for the docket to reflect that this motion was mistakenly e-filed and will be terminated. (Boyce, Kathy). (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                        DECLARATION re 158 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction of Eric C. Strain by Socata SAS. (Strain, Eric) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION re 158 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction of Elisabeth Cassagnes by Socata SAS. (Strain, Eric) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 158 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Socata SAS. (Strain, Eric) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Socata SAS.(Strain, Eric) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Kathleen M. Guilfoyle (Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline S. Bouscaren on behalf of Lockheed Martin Services, Inc. (Bouscaren, Caroline) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                    Plaintiffs, Patricia and John Milot, Co-Administrators of the Estate of Michael J. Milot ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant United States of America by John Milot, Patricia Milot.(Beasley, James) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                      ANSWER to 128 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by United States of America.(Wilson, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                                        Plaintiffs, Patricia and John Milot, Co-Administrators of the Estate of Michael J. Milot ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant Lockheed Martin Services, Inc. by John Milot, Patricia Milot.(Beasley, James) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                          ANSWER to 128 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against John Milot(Co-Administrators of the Estate of Michael J. Milot, Deceased), Patricia Milot(Co-Administrators of the Estate of Michael J. Milot, Deceased), Thomas A Wallitsch(Administrator Pendente Lite of the Estate of Peter John Karoly, Deceased) by Lockheed Martin Services, Inc..(Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lockheed Martin Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lockheed Martin Corporation for Lockheed Martin Services, Inc... (Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                              ANSWER to the 133 Counterclaim of Deft Airport Solutions Group, LLC Seeking Contribution with Jury Demand by John Milot, Patricia Milot, FILED, C/S.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                ANSWER to 132 Counterclaim of the Deft Midwest Air Traffic Control Service, Inc. with Jury Demand by John Milot, Patricia Milot, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                  ANSWER to Counterclaim of The City of New Bedford by John Milot, Patricia Milot.(Beasley, James) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                    ANSWER to Counterclaim of Vanasse Hangen Brustlin, Inc. by John Milot, Patricia Milot.(Beasley, James) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed EADS Socata served on 4/13/2010, answer due 5/4/2010. (Musacchio, Joseph) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                        ANSWER to Counterclaim of Airport Solutions Group LLC by Thomas A Wallitsch.(Musacchio, Joseph) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                          ANSWER to Counterclaim of Air Traffic Control Services, Inc. by Thomas A Wallitsch.(Musacchio, Joseph) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                            ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant City of New Bedford by Thomas A Wallitsch.(Musacchio, Joseph) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                              ANSWER to Counterclaim by Thomas A Wallitsch.(Musacchio, Joseph) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Harry Newman. Harry Newman served on 4/12/2010, answer due 5/3/2010. Acknowledgement filed by Harry Newman. (Genter, Richard) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2011 03:00 PM before Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf. Status Conference set for 5/10/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10 before Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf. Discovery to be completed by 1/31/2011. Jury Trial set for 8/8/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf. Status Report due by 4/15/2011.(O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against John Milot, Patricia Milot, Thomas A Wallitsch by New Bedford Conservation Commission, New Bedford Airport Commission, City of New Bedford, New Bedford Regional Airport Commission.(Herran, Alex) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Mary O. Winstanley on behalf of City of New Bedford, New Bedford Conservation Commission, New Bedford Regional Airport Commission (Winstanley, Mary) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Herran on behalf of City of New Bedford, New Bedford Conservation Commission, New Bedford Regional Airport Commission (Herran, Alex) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by John Scott Hoff on behalf of City of New Bedford, New Bedford Conservation Commission, New Bedford Regional Airport Commission (Hoff, John) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by William T. Bogaert (Bogaert, William) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against John Milot, Patricia Milot, Thomas A Wallitsch by Vanasse Hangen Brustlin, Inc..(Pasakarnis, Seth) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Jury Demand, and, COUNTERCLAIM against John Milot, Patricia Milot, Thomas A Wallitsch by Airport Solutions Group, LLC.(Pasakarnis, Seth) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against John Milot(Co-Administrators of the Estate of Michael J. Milot, Deceased), Patricia Milot(Co-Administrators of the Estate of Michael J. Milot, Deceased), Thomas A Wallitsch(Administrator Pendente Lite of the Estate of Peter John Karoly, Deceased) by Midwest ATC Service, Inc..(DeProspo, Anthony) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. For the foregoing reasons, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The Motion to Dismiss of Defendants SimCom International, Inc., and SimCom, Inc. (Docket No. 7) is ALLOWED. 2. Defendant Socata North America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Docket No. 51-1) is ALLOWED. 3. The plaintiffs' requests for leave to conduct additional jurisdictional discovery regarding the SimCom defendants and Socata are DENIED.(O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                      Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                        Summons Issued as to City of New Bedford, New Bedford Conservation Commission, New Bedford Regional Airport Commission. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                          Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Harry Newman. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Genter, Richard) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            Recommendations for Scheduling Order. (Genter, Richard) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. STIPULATION AND ORDER(O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered For the reasons stated in court on March 4, 2010, it is herebyORDERED that:1. Defendant EADS North America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss forLack of Personal Jurisdiction (Docket No. 47) is ALLOWED.2. Defendant, City of New Bedford, Acting By and Through theNew Bedford Airport Commission, Improperly Sued as the New BedfordRegional Airport Commission's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FederalRule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6)(Docket No. 45) is DENIED.3. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second AmendedComplaint (Docket No. 88) is ALLOWED.4. By March 12, 2010, the parties shall jointly file aproposed schedule, which shall include the discovery eventsdiscussed in court. (O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: Motion Hearing held on 3/4/2010 re 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Simcom Training Centers, Simcom International, Inc., Simcom, Inc., 51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by EADS Socata North America, Inc., 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by EADS North America, Inc., 45 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by New Bedford Airport Commission. (Court Reporter: Romanow.) (O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by William T. Bogaert on behalf of Simcom International, Inc., Simcom, Inc., Simcom Training Centers (Bogaert, William) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant, United Technologies Corp's Counterclaim by United Technologies Corporation. (Curley, Robert) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 118 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 119 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Airport Solutions Group, LLC, Vanasse Hangen Brustlin, Inc.. (Pasakarnis, Seth) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Thomas A Wallitsch, Patricia Milot, John Milot by Vanasse Hangen Brustlin, Inc..(Pasakarnis, Seth) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Thomas A Wallitsch, Patricia Milot, John Milot by Airport Solutions Group, LLC.(Pasakarnis, Seth) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal Regarding Defendants Pratt & Whitney Canada, Inc. and United Technologies Company by Harry Newman. (Genter, Richard) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re 51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction DEFENDANTS SOCATA NORTH AMERICA, INC.S AND EADS NORTH AMERICA, INC.S ADDITIONAL AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by EADS Socata North America, Inc., EADS North America, Inc.. (Strain, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2010: # 1 Exhibit document obtained through NexisNexis) (Boyce, Kathy). Modified on 2/11/2010 to attach the exhibits as a separate attachment to the main document (Boyce, Kathy). (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. The parties shall be prepared to address at the February 11,2010 hearing whether the intermediate standard, rather than the prima facie standard, should be used to decide defendants' motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and, if so, how the motions should be decided. See, e.g., Boit v. Gar-Tec Products, Inc., 967 F.2d 671 (1st Cir. 1992); Foster-Miller, Inc. v. Babcock & Wilcox Canada, 46 F.3d 138 (1st Cir. 1995). If the parties wish to inform the court of any additional relevant cases, they shall doso by 9:00 a.m. on February 11, 2010. (O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed The Daher Group served on 11/17/2009, answer due 12/8/2009. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 112 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Socata North America, Inc.. (Strain, Eric) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to 51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Socata North America, Inc.. (Strain, Eric) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Thomas A Wallitsch, Patricia Milot, John Milot by Pratt & Whitney Canada.(Curley, Robert) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Harry Newman, Thomas A Wallitsch, Patricia Milot, John Milot re 108 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, Notice of Filing Doucment Under Seal Exhibit B to the Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to the Motion to Dismiss filed by Socata North America, Inc. (Beasley, James) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Leighton, Jr. on behalf of Simcom International, Inc., Simcom, Inc., Simcom Training Centers (Kloecker, Valerie) Docket Text Modified on 12/17/2009 to correct the attorney giving notice of his appearance (Boyce, Kathy). (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Socata North America, Inc. filed by Harry Newman, Thomas A Wallitsch, Patricia Milot, John Milot. (Beasley, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2009: # 1 Exhibit B - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit B - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 3, # 4 Exhibit B - Part 4, # 5 Exhibit - Part 5, # 6 Exhibit B - Part 6) (O'Leary, Dennis). (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Socata North America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Mass.R.Civ.P. 12(b)2 filed by Harry Newman, Thomas A Wallitsch, Patricia Milot, John Milot. (Beasley, James) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp. - Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1(D)(3) (Curley, Robert) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 105 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Alex Herran for the Law Offices of Hoff & Herran (Herran, Alex) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Thomas A Wallitsch. EADS N.V. served on 10/9/2009, answer due 10/29/2009. Acknowledgement filed by Thomas A Wallitsch. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Thomas A Wallitsch. Pratt & Whitney Canada served on 10/19/2009, answer due 11/9/2009. Acknowledgement filed by Thomas A Wallitsch. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Thomas A Wallitsch. Pratt & Whitney Canada, Inc. served on 10/19/2009, answer due 11/9/2009. Acknowledgement filed by Thomas A Wallitsch. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal by Simcom International, Inc., Simcom, Inc..(Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D) by Lockheed Martin Corp., Lockheed Martin, Information Systems and Global Services.(Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT re 97 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Simcom Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Simcom International, Inc., Simcom, Inc.. (Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Simcom Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Simcom International, Inc., Simcom, Inc..(Kloecker, Valerie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2009: # 1 Reply to Pltf's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss) (Boyce, Kathy). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2009: # 1 Reply to Pltf's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6) (Boyce, Kathy). (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Genter, Richard) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Harry Newman for Request for Hearing (Genter, Richard) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 88 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by New Bedford Airport Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Herran, Alex) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: PROTECTIVE ORDER entered.(O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: PROTECTIVE ORDER entered. (O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION [SUPPLEMENTAL] of Pierre Cardin in Support of Defendant EADS North America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by EADS North America, Inc.. (Strain, Eric) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Richard P. Campbell (Campbell, Richard) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 88 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Harry Newman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Standard Form 95, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Letter to City of New Bedford, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Letter to New Bedford Conservation Commission, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Letter to New Bedford Regional Airport Commission)(Genter, Richard) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Harry Newman. (Attachments: # 1 Certification Under L.R. 7.1, # 2 Certification Under L.R. 15.1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Genter, Richard) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION Protective Order by Socata North America, Inc., EADS North America, Inc.. (Strain, Eric) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to 45 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by New Bedford Airport Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Herran, Alex) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Harry Newman, Thomas A Wallitsch, Patricia Milot, John Milot to 84 Response (Beasley, James) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants Simcom International, Inc., and Simcom, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Mass. R. Civ.P.12(b)2 filed by Harry Newman, Thomas A Wallitsch, Patricia Milot, John Milot. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A to E, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit F continued, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit G - J, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit K)(Beasley, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2009 because some sealed exhibits were filed in errorby the filing party and had to be restricted: # 6 Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I) (O'Leary, Dennis). Modified on 9/21/2009 (O'Leary, Dennis). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2009: # 12 Corrected Main Document) (Boyce, Kathy). Modified on 9/24/2009 to attach corrected main document (Boyce, Kathy). (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C Dalrymple on behalf of EADS North America, Inc. (Dalrymple, Brian) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs, Patricia and John Milot's Response to the Counterclaim of Midwest Air Traffic Control Services, Inc. ANSWER to 66 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Patricia Milot, John Milot.(Beasley, James) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C Johnson on behalf of EADS North America, Inc. (Johnson, Stephen) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Eric C Strain on behalf of EADS North America, Inc. (Strain, Eric) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Stephen C. Johnson, Brian C. Dalrymple, and Eric C. Strain Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 01010000000002577476. by EADS Socata North America, Inc., EADS North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Stephen C. Johnson, Esq., # 2 Affidavit of Brian C. Dalrymple, Esq., # 3 Affidavit of Eric C. Strain, Esq.)(Allen, J.) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Simcom International, Inc., Simcom, Inc.. (Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to August 28, 2009 to for the SimCom Defendants to serve their Responses to Plaintiffs' discovery requests on the issues raised in the SimCom Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and the time for Plaintiffs to file an Opposition to the SimCom Defendants' Motion to Dismiss until September 18, 2009 by Simcom International, Inc., Simcom, Inc., Simcom Training Centers.(Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES by Plaintiffs Patricia Milot, John Milot. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002527225. Payment Type : PRO HAC VICE. (Dionyios, Rassias) Note: Text of this docket entry Modified on 8/5/2009 for the docket to reflect that this Notification of the payment of filing fee is a copy of docket no. 74, the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Boyce, Kathy). (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James E. Beasley, Jr. by Patricia Milot, John Milot.(Dionyios, Rassias) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs, Patricia and John Milot's Response to the Counterclaim of United Technologies Corporation ANSWER to 63 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Patricia Milot, John Milot.(Dionyios, Rassias) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Rassias G. Dionyios on behalf of Patricia Milot, John Milot (Dionyios, Rassias) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10 before Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf. (O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Thomas B. Almy Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002521055. by Midwest ATC Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(DeProspo, Anthony) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Karen Berberich Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002520948. by Midwest ATC Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(DeProspo, Anthony) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File REPLY to 64 RESPONSE to Motion re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and Request to Conduct Discovery Purs. to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(d) and 56(f) by New Bedford Airport Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Reply to Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit B- Certified Copy of New Bedford Ordinance)(Herran, Alex) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midwest ATC Service, Inc.. (DeProspo, Anthony) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant Midwest Air Traffic Control Services, Inc's ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Thomas A Wallitsch, Patricia Milot, John Milot by Midwest ATC Service, Inc..(DeProspo, Anthony) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re 51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants EADS North America, Inc. and EADS Socata North America, Inc., filed by Harry Newman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Genter, Richard) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and Request to Conduct Discovery Purs. to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(d) and 56(f) filed by Thomas A Wallitsch. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Joseph Musacchio in Support of Request for Discovery)(Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Thomas A Wallitsch, Patricia Milot, John Milot by United Technologies Corporation.(Curley, Robert) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by John Scott Hoff on behalf of New Bedford Airport Commission (Hoff, John) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Herran on behalf of New Bedford Airport Commission (Herran, Alex) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 12, 2009 to File Response/Reply as to 51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants EADS Socata North America, Inc. by Harry Newman.(Genter, Richard) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 8, 2009 to File Response/Reply as to 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant EADS North America, Inc. by Harry Newman.(Genter, Richard) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 7/8/09 to File Response/Reply as to 45 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) of New Bedford Regional Airport Commission by Thomas A Wallitsch.(Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 17, 2009 to File Response/Reply as to 7 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendants Simcom International, Inc. and Simcom, Inc. Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(2) by Harry Newman.(Genter, Richard) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed Midwest ATC Service, Inc. served on 5/27/2009, answer due 6/16/2009. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Airport Solutions Group, LLC. (Pasakarnis, Seth) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vanasse Hangen Brustlin, Inc.. (Pasakarnis, Seth) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT in Support re 51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by EADS Socata North America, Inc.. (Allen, J.) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by EADS Socata North America, Inc.. (Allen, J.) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by EADS Socata North America, Inc..(Allen, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2009: # 1 Corrected Main Document) (Boyce, Kathy). Modified on 6/25/2009 to attach the correct pdf document to docket entry (the Motion to Dismiss) (Boyce, Kathy). (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EADS North America, Inc.. (Allen, J.) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by EADS North America, Inc.. (Allen, J.) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by EADS North America, Inc.. (Allen, J.) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by EADS North America, Inc..(Allen, J.) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by New Bedford Airport Commission. (Winstanley, Mary) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by New Bedford Airport Commission.(Winstanley, Mary) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John Scott Hoff, Esq. and Alejandro Herran, Esq. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 01010000000002451636. by New Bedford Airport Commission.(Winstanley, Mary) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 6/15/09 to File Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss on the Ground That This Court Lacks Personal Jurisdiction by Thomas A Wallitsch.(Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed EADS Socata North America, Inc. served on 5/19/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed Daher Aerospace, Inc. served on 5/21/2009, answer due 6/10/2009. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed Daher, Inc. served on 5/21/2009, answer due 6/10/2009. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint, by Vanasse Hangen Brustlin, Inc..(Walton, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint, by Airport Solutions Group, LLC.(Walton, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to July 28, 2009 to Complete Service by Thomas A Wallitsch)(Tarricone, Anthony) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2009: # 1 Affidavit of Joseph P. Musaccio) (Boyce, Kathy). Modified on 5/21/2009 to attach correct attachment to docket entry (Boyce, Kathy). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2009: # 3 Affidavit) (Boyce, Kathy). (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Thomas A Wallitsch. Lockheed Martin, Information Systems and Global Services served on 5/15/2009, answer due 6/4/2009. Acknowledgement filed by Thomas A Wallitsch. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Thomas A Wallitsch. Lockheed Martin Corp. served on 5/15/2009, answer due 6/4/2009. Acknowledgement filed by Thomas A Wallitsch. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Thomas A Wallitsch. EADS North America, Inc. served on 5/15/2009, answer due 6/4/2009. Acknowledgement filed by Thomas A Wallitsch. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Thomas A Wallitsch. United Technologies Corporation served on 5/14/2009, answer due 6/3/2009. Acknowledgement filed by Thomas A Wallitsch. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John Scott Hoff, Esq. and Alejandro Herran, Esq. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 01010000000002426462. by New Bedford Airport Commission.(Winstanley, Mary) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 1, 2009 to File Opposition to Defendant Simcom's Motion to Dismiss on the Grounds that this Court Lacks Personal Jurisdiction by Harry Newman.(Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Tarricone on behalf of Harry Newman (Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie N. Kloecker on behalf of Simcom International, Inc., Simcom, Inc., Simcom Training Centers (Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Maynard M. Kirpalani on behalf of Simcom International, Inc., Simcom, Inc., Simcom Training Centers (Kirpalani, Maynard) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint, and Jury Demand by Lockheed Martin Corp., Lockheed Martin, Information Systems and Global Services.(Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline S. Bouscaren on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corp., Lockheed Martin, Information Systems and Global Services (Bouscaren, Caroline) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M. Guilfoyle on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corp., Lockheed Martin, Information Systems and Global Services (Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Richard P. Campbell on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corp., Lockheed Martin, Information Systems and Global Services (Campbell, Richard) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Pratt & Whitney Canada on 3/31/2009 by Thomas A Wallitsch. Waiver of Service due by 4/30/2009. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2009: # 1 Corrected Main Document) (Boyce, Kathy). Modified on 5/11/2009 to attach convert pdf to adobe pdf (Boyce, Kathy). (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to United Technologies Corporation on 3/4/2009 by Thomas A Wallitsch. Waiver of Service due by 4/3/2009. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2009: # 1 Corrected Main Document) (Boyce, Kathy). Modified on 5/11/2009 to convert document to adobe pdf (Boyce, Kathy). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2009: # 2 Corrected Main Document) (Boyce, Kathy). (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Midwest Air Traffic Control Service, Inc. on 3/11/2009 by Thomas A Wallitsch. Waiver of Service due by 5/11/2009. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2009: # 1 Doc. 20) (Boyce, Kathy). Modified on 5/11/2009 to convert document to adobe pdf (Boyce, Kathy). (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Daher Aerospace, Inc. on 3/4/2009 by Daher Aerospace, Inc.. Waiver of Service due by 5/4/2009. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2009: # 1 Corrected Main Document) (Boyce, Kathy). Modified on 5/15/2009 to attach converted document (Boyce, Kathy). (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Lockheed Martin d/b/a Lockheed Global IS &GS on 3/4/2009 by Thomas A Wallitsch. Waiver of Service due by 5/4/2009. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2009: # 1 Corrected Main Document) (Boyce, Kathy). Modified on 5/11/2009 to convert document to adobe pdf (Boyce, Kathy). (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Lockheed Martin Corporation on 3/4/2009 by Thomas A Wallitsch. Waiver of Service due by 5/4/2009. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2009: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Corrected Main Document) (Boyce, Kathy). Modified on 5/11/2009to convert to adobe pdf (Boyce, Kathy). (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Simcom Training Centers. Simcom Training Centers waiver sent on 3/4/2009, answer due 5/4/2009. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Simcom International, Inc.. Simcom International, Inc. waiver sent on 3/4/2009, answer due 5/4/2009. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Vanasse Hangen Brustlin, Inc.. Vanasse Hangen Brustlin, Inc. waiver sent on 3/4/2009, answer due 5/4/2009. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Thomas A Wallitsch. New Bedford Airport Commission waiver sent on 3/5/2009, answer due 5/4/2009. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Thomas A Wallitsch. Airport Solutions Group, LLC waiver sent on 3/4/2009, answer due 5/4/2009. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Simcom, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SimCom Holdings, Inc. for Simcom, Inc... (Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to June 3, 2009 to File Response/Reply by New Bedford Airport Commission.(Winstanley, Mary) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Simcom International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Simcom, Inc. for Simcom International, Inc... (Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Simcom International, Inc., Simcom, Inc., Simcom Training Centers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss by Simcom International, Inc., Simcom, Inc., Simcom Training Centers.(Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie N. Kloecker on behalf of Simcom Training Centers, Simcom International, Inc., Simcom, Inc. (Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 06/04/09 to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Airport Solutions Group, LLC, Vanasse Hangen Brustlin, Inc..(Pasakarnis, Seth) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Harry Newman.(Tarricone, Anthony) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2009: # 1 Corrected Main Document) (Boyce, Kathy). Modified on 3/26/2009 to attach Amended Complaint with the attorneys' electronic signatures (Boyce, Kathy). (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard E. Genter Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002281536. by Harry Newman. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate)(Colbert, Edward) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Daher, Inc., Daher Aerospace, Inc., Simcom International, Inc., Simcom, Inc., United Technologies Corporation, Pratt & Whitney, Pratt & Whitney Canada, Inc., Lockheed Martin Corp., Midwest ATC Service, Inc., Airport Solutions Group, LLC, Vanasse Hangen Brustlin, Inc., New Bedford Airport Commission, EADS N.V., EADS Socata, EADS Socata North America, Inc., EADS North America, Inc., The Daher Group. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against all defendants Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 01010000000002279910, filed by Harry Newman. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form)(Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 441 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?