Bose Corporation v. Lightspeed Aviation, Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-10222
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 11, 2019 at 1:15 PM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Bose Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven A. Bowers +1 202 626 6386 +1 202 783 2331 Bowers@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Juanita R. Brooks +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 brooks@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ruffin B. Cordell +1 262 626 6449 +1 202 783 2331 cordell@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Hieken +1 617 521 7014 +1 617 542 8906 hieken@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Robert Kopsidas +1 202 783 5070 +1 202 783 2331 kopsidas@fr.com
No Logo Lightspeed Aviation, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Brooks Kushman PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gina M. McCreadie +1 617 345 6189 +1 866 812 3848 gmccreadie@nixonpeabody.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Robins +1 617 345 1000 +1 866 382 5886 mrobins@nixonpeabody.com
v.
No Logo Lightspeed Aviation, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Brooks Kushman PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gina M. McCreadie +1 617 345 6189 +1 866 812 3848 gmccreadie@nixonpeabody.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Robins +1 617 345 1000 +1 866 382 5886 mrobins@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Bose Corporation, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven A. Bowers +1 202 626 6386 +1 202 783 2331 Bowers@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ruffin B. Cordell +1 262 626 6449 +1 202 783 2331 cordell@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Hieken +1 617 521 7014 +1 617 542 8906 hieken@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Robert Kopsidas +1 202 783 5070 +1 202 783 2331 kopsidas@fr.com
No Logo Bosch Security Systems, Inc., Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by afureylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander Furey +1 617 573 5114 +1 617 573 5115 alex@afureylaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (141) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 142 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Bose Corporation, Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. 30 DAY SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
      Second Supplemental Exhibit List by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc... (LeRoy, John) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
        EXHIBIT re 117 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Bose from Relying on an Invention Date and Documents Before the Filing Date of the '252 Patent (August 23, 1989) MOTION in Limine to Preclude Bose from Relying on an Invention Date and Documents Before the Filing Date of the '252 Patent (August 23, 1989) Supplemental Exhibits D, E and F by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (LeRoy, John) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/6/2010, Entered: None
          Witness List by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (LeRoy, John) (Entered: 09/06/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/6/2010, Entered: None
            First Supplemental Exhibit List by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc... (Cantor, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/6/2010, Entered: None
              EXHIBIT re 124 MOTION TO EXCLUDE BOSE'S HEADSETS AND DOCUMENTS PRODUCED FOR THE FIRST TIME ONE WEEK BEFORE TRIAL CORRECTED Exhibit 5 - 9-1-09 letter from Lorelli to Kopsidas by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (LeRoy, John) (Entered: 09/06/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 135 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                Proposed Jury Instructions by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (LeRoy, John) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                  LREF
                  Blank 134 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                  Proposed Jury Verdict by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (LeRoy, John) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                    LREF
                    Blank 133 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                    Proposed Jury Instructions by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (LeRoy, John) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                      LREF
                      Blank 132 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                      Proposed Jury Verdict by Bose Corporation. (Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                        LREF
                        Blank 131 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                        Proposed Jury Instructions by Bose Corporation. (Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                          LREF
                          Blank 130 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                          TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Bench Issues by Bose Corporation. (Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                            LREF
                            Blank 129 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                            REPLY to Response to 117 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Bose from Relying on an Invention Date and Documents Before the Filing Date of the '252 Patent (August 23, 1989) MOTION in Limine to Preclude Bose from Relying on an Invention Date and Documents Before the Filing Date of the '252 Patent (August 23, 1989) filed by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (LeRoy, John) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Leave to File REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE BOSE FROM RELYING ON AN INVENTION DATE AND DOCUMENTS BEFORE THE FILING DATE OF THE '252 PATENT (AUGUST 23, 1989) by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc..(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                Proposed Voir Dire by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (LeRoy, John) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 126 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                  REPLY to Response to 118 MOTION in Limine In Support of Its Omnibus Motions In Limine filed by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit J, # 3 Exhibit K)(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Leave to File A Reply In Support of Its Omnibus Motions In Limine by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 124 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                      MOTION TO EXCLUDE BOSE'S HEADSETS AND DOCUMENTS PRODUCED FOR THE FIRST TIME ONE WEEK BEFORE TRIAL by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 1st letter from Kopsidas to LeRoy, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 2nd letter from Kopsidas to LeRoy, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Document Requests 2 and 5, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Document Request 17, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Letter from Lorelli to Kopsidas, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpt of Dep Trans of Gauger, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpt of Dep Trans of Breen, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpt of Dep Trans of Sapiejewski, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Email from Kopsidas to BK)(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 123 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 118 MOTION in Limine filed by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Dr. Buck's ITC Case Opening Expert Report, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 10/30/09 letter from Rondini to Bowers, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 4/5/10 letter from Bowers to LeRoy, # 4 Exhibit 4 - 10/1/09 letter from Rondini to Bowers with L3822-24, # 5 Exhibit 5 - 11/4/02 Email from Klitzke, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpt from Charles Hieken Dep. Trans., # 7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpt from Rodney Crawford Dep. Trans., # 8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpt from Michael Dansky Dep. Trans.)(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 122 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
                                          Opposition re 117 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Bose from Relying on an Invention Date and Documents Before the Filing Date of the '252 Patent (August 23, 1989) MOTION in Limine to Preclude Bose from Relying on an Invention Date and Documents Before the Filing Date of the '252 Patent (August 23, 1989) filed by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit I, # 9 Exhibit J, # 10 Exhibit D)(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ruffin B. Cordell Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3037848 by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                              Objection to 116 Exhibit List by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (LeRoy, John) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                First Supplemental Contested Exhibit List by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc... (LeRoy, John) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                  MOTION in Limine by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                    MOTION in Limine to Preclude Bose from Relying on an Invention Date and Documents Before the Filing Date of the '252 Patent (August 23, 1989) by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of Sapiejewski Deposition Transcript, # 2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Lightspeed's Invalidity Contentions, # 3 Exhibit C - Excerpts from Lightspeed's Supplemental Invalidity Contentions)(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                      Bose Corporation's Supplemental Trial Exhibit List by Bose Corporation.. (Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Transcript of Motion Hearing held on July 21, 2010, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com Redaction Request due 8/31/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2010. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc. Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Sec. 282 (LeRoy, John) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                              Response by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc. to 109 Response by Bose Corporation to Lightspeed's Notice 107 of Related Patent Case.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Bose's Declaratory Judgment Complaint)(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: This Court DENIES Lightspeeds motion for summary judgment in its entirety; GRANTS Boses motion for summary judgment as to infringement of Claim 1 by the Zulu headset; declares that the 252 Patent is not invalid under 35 U.S.C. § 112 and is not anticipated by the Voyager headset; and DENIES Boses motion for summary judgment as to all other issues. Further, this Court rules that the Telex headset practices all the limitations of Claim 1.SO ORDERED...(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  Response by Bose Corporation to 107 Notice (Other) of Related Patent Case. (Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of JUANITA R. BROOKS Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3004219 by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hieken, Charles) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc. of Related Patent Case (LeRoy, John) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        Objections to Lightspeed's Proposed Witnesses by Bose Corporation (Bowers, Steven) (Modified on 7/28/2010 to Update Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Bose Corporation. (Kopsidas, Andrew) (Main Document 105 replaced on 7/27/2010) (Paine, Matthew). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2010: # 1 Attachment - A, # 2 Attachment - B, # 3 Attachment - C) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial Final Pretrial Conference set for TUE. 7/27/2010 02:00 PM before Judge William G. Young.(Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              REPLY to Response to 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement of Claim 1, Validity, Enforceability, and Lightspeed's First Counterclaim filed by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit OO, # 2 Exhibit PP)(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                REPLY to Response to 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of John Rondini, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of Deposition Transcript of Charles Heiken, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts of Deposition Transcript of Allen Schrader, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts of Deposition Transcript of Joel Johnson)(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  REPLY to Response to 89 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike the Supplemental Expert Report of Marshall Buck filed by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F)(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    REPLY to Response to 97 MOTION Continuance of Trial Date [CORRECTED] filed by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Cantor, Mark) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      REPLY to Response to 97 MOTION Continuance of Trial Date filed by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Cantor, Mark) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 97 MOTION Continuance of Trial Date filed by Bose Corporation. (Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION Continuance of Trial Date by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc..(Cantor, Mark) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement of Claim 1, Validity, Enforceability, and Lightspeed's First Counterclaim filed by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (LeRoy, John) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              Opposition re 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement of Claim 1, Validity, Enforceability, and Lightspeed's First Counterclaim filed by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Dep Transcript of Marshall Buck (5/25/10), # 2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of Dep Transcript of Koopmann (5/11/10), # 3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts of Deposition of Breen (3/10/10), # 4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts of Deposition of Hieken (5/6/10))(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bose Corporation. (Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Opposition re 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit GG, # 2 Exhibit HH, # 3 Exhibit II, # 4 Exhibit JJ, # 5 Exhibit KK, # 6 Exhibit LL, # 7 Exhibit MM, # 8 Exhibit NN)(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Opposition re 90 First MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Lightspeed's Motion to Compel Production of Dr. Koopmann's Test Data filed by Bose Corporation. (Kopsidas, Andrew) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 90 First MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Lightspeed's Motion to Compel Production of Dr. Koopmann's Test Data filed by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Rule 26 with Advisory Committee Notes, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Dep. Tran. of Dr. Koopmann)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        First MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Lightspeed's Motion to Compel Production of Dr. Koopmann's Test Data by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc..(LeRoy, John) (Main Document 90 replaced on 6/21/2010) (Paine, Matthew). (Modified on 6/21/2010 to Update Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File A Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike the Supplemental Expert Report of Marshall Buck by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Supplemental MOTION to Seal Unredacted Confidential Documents and Submit Proposed Redactions by Bosch Security Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Furey, Alexander) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2010: # 2 Exhibit A - redacted locked version) (Costello2, Helen). Modified on 6/16/2010 to restrict Exhibit A and replace with properly redacted version. (Costello2, Helen). (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Opposition re 69 MOTION to Strike the Supplemental Expert Report of Marshall Buck filed by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Albert v. Warner-Lambert Co., # 2 Exhibit 2 - Ex. A to 3-12-10 Supplemental Invalidity Contentions, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts of Dep. Trans. of Johnson, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts of Dep. Trans. of Koopmann, # 5 Exhibit 5 - 5-12-10 email from Johnson to Rondini, # 6 Exhibit 6 - BASF Corp. v. Old World Trading Co., # 7 Exhibit 7 - Ambit Order, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Ambit Scheduling Order, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Baltimore Therapeutic Equip. Co. v. Loredan Biomedical, # 10 Exhibit 10 - LeRoy letter to Bowers, # 11 Exhibit 11 - 5-14-10 Letter from LeRoy to Bowers, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Excerpts of Dep. Trans. of Buck)(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION to Stay Public Filing of Confidential Documents by Bosch Security Systems, Inc..(Furey, Alexander) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 82 MOTION to Seal filed by Bosch Security Systems, Inc.. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Furey on behalf of Bosch Security Systems, Inc. (Furey, Alexander) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bosch Security Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Robert Bosch GMSH for Bosch Security Systems, Inc... (Furey, Alexander) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal by Bosch Security Systems, Inc.. Furey, Alexander) (Modified on 6/9/2010 to Update Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Intervene by Bosch Security Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit D. Zehnder)(Furey, Alexander) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Juanita Brooks Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-2932440 by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hieken, Charles) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement of Claim 1, Validity, Enforceability, and Lightspeed's First Counterclaim filed by Bose Corporation. (Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement of Claim 1, Validity, Enforceability, and Lightspeed's First Counterclaim filed by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF)(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit in its Summary Judgment Motion by Bose Corporation (Bowers, Steven) (Modified on 6/2/2010 to Update Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    (Amended) Brief in Support of Lightspeed's Motion for Summary Judgment by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Schrader Dep Trans, # 2 Exhibit E-mail fr. Lightspeed to Wood Tai)(LeRoy, John) (Modified on 6/2/2010 to Update Docket Text As Counsel Filed the Corrected Brief Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF)) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Document 74 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,, Specifically Exhibits 10, 11 and 13 to Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc..(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 2002 Settlement Agreement, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Schrader Deposition Transcript, # 4 Exhibit 4 - USPN 5181252, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Dr. Buck Opening Expert Report, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Bose Test Data, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Email from Klitzke to Hieken, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Email from Hieken to Klitzke, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Bose 4th Supplemental Response to Interrogatories, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Cover Sheet for Confidential Exhibit 10 to be filed under seal, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Cover Sheet for Confidential Exhibit 11 to be filed under seal, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Dr. Buck Supplemental Expert Report, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Cover Sheet for Confidential Exhibit 13 to be filed under seal, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Koopmann Deposition Transcript, # 15 Exhibit 15 - Invalidity Claim Charts, # 16 Exhibit 16 - 5-13-10 Letter from LeRoy to Bowers, # 17 Exhibit 17 - Baldock Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 18 - Thesis Sign-Out Sheet, # 19 Exhibit 19 - Wheeler Thesis July 1986, # 20 Exhibit 20 - Invalidity Charts in View of Wheeler, # 21 Exhibit 21 - Koopmann Rebuttal Report, # 22 Exhibit 22 - Dr. Buck Rebuttal Report, # 23 Exhibit 23 - Side-by-Side Comparison)(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement of Claim 1, Validity, Enforceability, and Lightspeed's First Counterclaim by Bose Corporation. (Bowers, Steven) (Modified on 6/2/2010 to Update Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 73 replaced on 6/2/2010) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc..(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 68 MOTION for Leave to File to Exceed Page Limit filed by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of John Rondini)(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Opposition re 65 MOTION to Compel Production of Test Data Relied on Dr. Koopmann filed by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike the Supplemental Expert Report of Marshall Buck by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File to Exceed Page Limit by Bose Corporation.(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin reports that case did not settle. (See attached report).(Franklin, Yvonne) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 65 MOTION to Compel Production of Test Data Relied on Dr. Koopmann filed by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Dr. Buck Opening Expert Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Dr. Koopmann Rebuttal Expert Report, # 3 Exhibit C - 5-10-10 Email from LeRoy to Bowers, # 4 Exhibit D - Excerpts from Rough Deposition Trans. of Dr. Koopman, # 5 Exhibit E - 5-13-10 Letter from LeRoy to Bowers, # 6 Exhibit F - 5-13-10 Letter from Bowers to LeRoy, # 7 Exhibit G - 5-14-10 Letter from LeRoy to Bowers)(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Production of Test Data Relied on Dr. Koopmann by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc..(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: In light of the intrinsic evidence and relevant extrinsic evidence, the Court construes the disputed terms as stated in the memorandum and order. SO ORDERED... (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Response to Bose's Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc. 43 Brief, 62 Brief (LeRoy, John) (Modified on 4/13/2010 to Update Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Claim Construction Sur-Reply Brief by Bose Corporation.(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bowers, Steven) (Modified on 4/12/2010 to Update Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Response to Bose's Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Response to Bose's Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief)(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File a Claim Construction Sur-reply Brief by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Letter/request (non-motion) from John S. Le Roy, counsel for defendant Lightspeed Aviation, Inc. to Hon. William G. Young. (LeRoy, John) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Markman Hearing held on March 24, 2010, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com Redaction Request due 4/15/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2010. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 54 Emergency MOTION to Compel Bose to Identify/Produce the Engineering Notebooks of Sapiejewski, Breen and Gauger filed by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 54 Emergency MOTION to Compel Bose to Identify/Produce the Engineering Notebooks of Sapiejewski, Breen and Gauger filed by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Lightspeed 1st Doc Reqs to Bose, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 2-17-10 Letter from Rondini to Bowers, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 2-23-10 Letter from Edelin to Cantor, # 4 Exhibit 4 - 3-2-10 Letter from Rondini to Bowers)(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Emergency MOTION to Compel Bose to Identify/Produce the Engineering Notebooks of Sapiejewski, Breen and Gauger by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc..(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: This Court grants Bose's motion to dismiss as to Counterclaim Count II and otherwise denies the motion. SO ORDERED...(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 49 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Ad Testificandum And Duces Tecum To Bose's Counsel Charles Hieken And For Costs filed by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Genal Strap v. Dar, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Plymouth Ind. v. Sioux Steel Co., # 3 Exhibit 3 - Environ Prod. v. Total Containment, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Bose Initial Disclosure, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Original Declaration of 252 Patent, # 6 Exhibit 6 - 3/16/91 PTO Examiner's Action, # 7 Exhibit 7 - 6/6/91 Amendment B, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Petition to Delete John Breen, # 9 Exhibit 9 - 8/26/08 Request for Certificate of Correction, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Supplement to Request for Certificate of Correction, # 11 Exhibit 11 - MPEP 1481.02, # 12 Exhibit 12 - MPEP 2010)(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Disclosure of Supplemental Infringement Contentions Pursuant to LR 16.6 by Bose Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Bowers, Steven) (Modified on 2/23/2010 to Update Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 49 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Ad Testificandum And Duces Tecum To Bose's Counsel Charles Hieken And For Costs filed by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Hieken, Charles) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Quash Subpoena Ad Testificandum And Duces Tecum To Bose's Counsel Charles Hieken And For Costs by Bose Corporation.(Hieken, Charles) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement. (Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Motion re 46 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Plaintiff Bose Corporation's Reply Brief on Claim Construction filed by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 - Figure 2 as originally filed, # 2 Exhibit 3 - USPN 3,908,200)(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Plaintiff Bose Corporation's Reply Brief on Claim Construction by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Lightspeed's PROPOSED Sur-Reply, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Fig. 2 as originally filed, # 3 Exhibit 3 - USPN 3908200)(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Claim Construction Reply Brief re 42 Opening Claim Construction Brief by Bose Corporation . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Bowers, Steven) (Modified on 1/22/2010 to Update Docket) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 43 Bose's Opening Claim Construction Brief by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc..(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Sennheiser Web Page, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Fig. 2 of 252 application as originally filed, # 3 Exhibit 3 - original 252 application, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Amended specification of 252 application)(LeRoy, John) (Modified on 1/22/2010 to Update Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opening Claim Construction Brief by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bowers, Steven) Modified on 1/11/2010 to Update Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION Brief by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - USPN 5181252, # 2 Exhibit B - original application, # 3 Exhibit C - 3/16/91 Office Action, # 4 Exhibit D - 6/6/91 Response to Office Action, # 5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Marshall Buck PhD)(LeRoy, John) (Modified on 1/11/2010 to Update Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to 36 MOTION to Strike 28 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Bose Corporation. (Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief re 36 MOTION to Strike 28 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Reply Brief)(Bowers, Steven) (Modified on 1/8/2010 to Update the Docket Text as Counsel Used the Wrong Event in CM/ECF to File the Motion for Leave) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 36 MOTION to Strike 28 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Petition to Delete Inventor, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Request for Certificate of Correction, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Notice re Certificates of Correction, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Supplement to Request for Certificate of Correction, # 7 Exhibit 7 - MPEP Duty of Disclosure, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpt from Deposition of Roman Sapiejewski, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Letter from LeRoy to Kopsidas dated 12/10/09, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Email from Kopsidas to LeRoy dated 12/14/09)(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Bose ANSWER to 28 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Lightspeed Aviation, Inc. by Bose Corporation.(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 36 MOTION to Strike 28 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike 28 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition to Cross-Motion for Sanctions by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc. to 34 Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of John LeRoy)(LeRoy, John) (Modified on 11/25/2009 to Update Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 32 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Bose's Complete Response to Lightspeed's Interrogatory No. 12 filed by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 32 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Bose's Complete Response to Lightspeed's Interrogatory No. 12 filed by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories, # 3 Exhibit C - 11/12/09 Letter from A. Kopsidas to J. LeRoy)(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Bose's Complete Response to Lightspeed's Interrogatory No. 12 by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc..(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Tentative Witness List by Bose Corporation (Bowers, Steven) (Modified on 11/16/2009 to Update Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Tentative Witness List by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (LeRoy, John) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Tentative Witness List by Bose Corporation (Bowers, Steven) (Modified on 11/16/2009 to Update Docket Text)(Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ANSWER to 4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Bose Corporation by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (LeRoy, John) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re 24 MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiff Bose's Prior Art Noise Cancelling Headsets for Testing filed by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of David L. Schuler, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File UNDER SEAL Exhibits 8, 10, 11 and 12 to Lightspeed's Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Production by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc..(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 24 MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiff Bose's Prior Art Noise Cancelling Headsets for Testing filed by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Bose Contentions, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Dep. Trans. of Sapiejewski, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Lightspeed's Doc. Req. 2 to Bose, # 4 Exhibit 4 - 8/27/09 letter to Kopsidas, # 5 Exhibit 5 - 9/1/09 letter to Kopsidas, # 6 Exhibit 6 - 9-9-09 letter to Kopsidas, # 7 Exhibit 7 - 9-28-09 letter to Kopsidas, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Notice re CONFIDENTIAL exhibit, # 9 Exhibit 9 - USPN 5,181,252, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Notice re CONFIDENTIAL exhibit, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Notice re CONFIDENTIAL exhibit, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Notice re CONFIDENTIAL exhibit)(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiff Bose's Prior Art Noise Cancelling Headsets for Testing by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc..(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc. with Filing of Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Disclosures Pursuant to L.R. 16.6 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Invalidity Contention Charts)(LeRoy, John) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - A)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Document(s) submitted by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc., Bose Corporation. Document received: Protective Order. (Lorelli, Marc) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John S. LeRoy Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002572090. by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John S. LeRoy)(McCreadie, Gina) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Document disclosure by Bose Corporation.(Bowers, Steven) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. SO ORDERED as modified re 16 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lorelli, Marc) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. re 14 Joint submission is so ordered as modified as the case management scheduling order. DISCOVERY DUE March 12, 2010 and DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE February 26, 2010. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 and 16.6 and Federal Rule 26(f) by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 5 Corrected Exhibit 1 - Bose LR 16 Certifications, # 6 Corrected Exhibit 2 - Lightspeed LR16 Certifications, # 7 Corrected Exhibit 3 - Proposed Scheduling Order )(Kopsidas, Andrew) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bose Corporation. (Hieken, Charles) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Bose Corporation.(Hieken, Charles) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mark A. Cantor Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002464415. by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mark A. Cantor)(McCreadie, Gina) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Marc Lorelli Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002464394. by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Marc Lorelli)(McCreadie, Gina) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Steven A. Bowers by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Bowers Affidavit)(Hieken, Charles) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Andrew R. Kopsidas by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Kopsidas Affidavit)(Hieken, Charles) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 7/6/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Robins on behalf of Lightspeed Aviation, Inc. (Robins, Mark) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. (McCreadie, Gina) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Bose Corporation by Lightspeed Aviation, Inc..(McCreadie, Gina) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPORT on the filing/termination of patent/trademark case. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Lightspeed Aviation, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Lightspeed Aviation, Inc. Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 01010000000002301222, filed by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Sheet )(Hieken, Charles) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 148 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?