Joseph Bonfiglio et al v. Walsh Corp. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-11608
District Judge George A. OToole, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James Merloni, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Micah T. Drayton +1 617 742 0208 mdrayton@segalroitman.com
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Joseph Bonfiglio, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Micah T. Drayton +1 617 742 0208 mdrayton@segalroitman.com
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Louis Mandarini, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Micah T. Drayton +1 617 742 0208 mdrayton@segalroitman.com
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Martin F. Walsh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Micah T. Drayton +1 617 742 0208 mdrayton@segalroitman.com
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Micah T. Drayton +1 617 742 0208 mdrayton@segalroitman.com
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Micah T. Drayton +1 617 742 0208 mdrayton@segalroitman.com
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Micah T. Drayton +1 617 742 0208 mdrayton@segalroitman.com
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Micah T. Drayton +1 617 742 0208 mdrayton@segalroitman.com
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Micah T. Drayton +1 617 742 0208 mdrayton@segalroitman.com
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo Walsh Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brodigan & Gardiner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph J. Brodigan +1 617 542 1871 +1 617 482 1871 JBrodigan@BrodiganLaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1132
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT (Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered. FINDINGS OF FACT and CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, and ORDER FOR JUDGMENT.(Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None Motion in Limine
      MOTION in Limine by Joseph Bonfiglio, Louis Mandarini, Jr., Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, James Merloni, Jr., New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund, Martin F. Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Walsh Corp Check Register)(Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
        Exhibit\Witness List. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
          TRIAL BRIEF by Walsh Corp.. (Brodigan, Joseph) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
            TRIAL BRIEF by All Plaintiffs. (Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
              Assented to MOTION to Continue STATUS CONFERENCE to August 2, 2010 by Walsh Corp..(Brodigan, Joseph) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance by Micah T. Drayton on behalf of Joseph Bonfiglio, Louis Mandarini, Jr., Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, James Merloni, Jr., New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund, Martin F. Walsh (Drayton, Micah) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn S. Shea on behalf of Joseph Bonfiglio, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund, Louis Mandarini, Jr., Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, James Merloni, Jr., Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund (Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Gregory A Geiman (Geiman, Gregory) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None
                      JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Geiman, Gregory) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                        General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                          NOTICE of Hearing : Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge George A. OToole Jr.. Please mark your calendars accordingly. (Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
                            DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by Walsh Corp..(Brodigan, Joseph) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Walsh Corp. served on 10/9/2009, answer due 10/29/2009. (Geiman, Gregory) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                Summons Issued as to Walsh Corp.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Cummings, Mary) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
                                  General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Cummings, Mary) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                    COMPLAINT against Walsh Corp. Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 01010000000002598657, filed by Joseph Bonfiglio, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund, Louis Mandarini, Jr., Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, James Merloni, Jr., Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet & Title Sheet)(Geiman, Gregory) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 143 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?