Gambino v. Tri-State Signal, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-11973
District Judge Nancy Gertner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2019 at 3:36 PM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Electrical Workers' Deferred Income Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A.W. Shaw +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 jshaw@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Electrical Workers' Educational and Cultural Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A.W. Shaw +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 jshaw@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A.W. Shaw +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 jshaw@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Electrical Workers' Joint Apprentice and Training Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A.W. Shaw +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 jshaw@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A.W. Shaw +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 jshaw@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Electrical Workers' Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A.W. Shaw +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 jshaw@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Lawrence J. Bradley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A.W. Shaw +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 jshaw@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo National Electrical Benefit Fund, Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Ramtron International Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A.W. Shaw +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 jshaw@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Richard P. Gambino, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A.W. Shaw +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 jshaw@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1132
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lawrence J. Bradley, Electrical Workers' Deferred Income Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Educational and Cultural Fund, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Joint Apprentice and Training Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Richard P. Gambino, National Electrical Benefit Fund (Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Appearance by James A.W. Shaw on behalf of Lawrence J. Bradley, Electrical Workers' Deferred Income Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Educational and Cultural Fund, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Joint Apprentice and Training Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Richard P. Gambino, National Electrical Benefit Fund (Shaw, James) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
        STATUS REPORT by Lawrence J. Bradley, Electrical Workers' Deferred Income Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Educational and Cultural Fund, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Joint Apprentice and Training Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Richard P. Gambino, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None
          MOTION to Reopen Case by Lawrence J. Bradley, Electrical Workers' Deferred Income Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Educational and Cultural Fund, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Joint Apprentice and Training Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Richard P. Gambino, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered. ORDER of approval of settlement agreement and dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule 41(a)(2). SO ORDERED... (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
              Proposed Document(s) submitted by Lawrence J. Bradley, Electrical Workers' Deferred Income Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Educational and Cultural Fund, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Joint Apprentice and Training Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Richard P. Gambino, National Electrical Benefit Fund. Document received: Order of Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule 41(a)(2). (Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                MOTION for Settlement, MOTION to Dismiss ( Responses due by 4/29/2010) by Lawrence J. Bradley, Electrical Workers' Deferred Income Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Educational and Cultural Fund, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Joint Apprentice and Training Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Richard P. Gambino, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                  Proposed Document(s) submitted by Lawrence J. Bradley, Electrical Workers' Deferred Income Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Educational and Cultural Fund, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Joint Apprentice and Training Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Richard P. Gambino, National Electrical Benefit Fund. Document received: Default Judgment. (Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                    AFFIDAVIT of Kathryn S. Shea in Support re 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Tri-State Signal, Inc. filed by Lawrence J. Bradley, Electrical Workers' Deferred Income Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Educational and Cultural Fund, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Joint Apprentice and Training Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Richard P. Gambino, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT of Richard P. Gambino in Support re 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Tri-State Signal, Inc. filed by Lawrence J. Bradley, Electrical Workers' Deferred Income Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Educational and Cultural Fund, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Joint Apprentice and Training Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Richard P. Gambino, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Tri-State Signal, Inc. filed by Lawrence J. Bradley, Electrical Workers' Deferred Income Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Educational and Cultural Fund, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Joint Apprentice and Training Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Richard P. Gambino, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Default Judgment as to Tri-State Signal, Inc. by Lawrence J. Bradley, Electrical Workers' Deferred Income Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Educational and Cultural Fund, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Joint Apprentice and Training Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Richard P. Gambino, National Electrical Benefit Fund.(Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                            NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Tri-State Signal, Inc. (Molloy, Maryellen) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
                              Request for notice of default as to defendant Tri-State Signal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn S. Shea on behalf of Richard P. Gambino, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Deferred Income Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Joint Apprentice and Training Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Educational and Cultural Fund, Lawrence J. Bradley, National Electrical Benefit Fund (Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Gregory A Geiman (Geiman, Gregory) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Tri-State Signal, Inc. served on 11/30/2009, answer due 12/21/2009. (Geiman, Gregory) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Anne R. Sills on behalf of Richard P. Gambino, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Deferred Income Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Joint Apprentice and Training Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Educational and Cultural Fund, Lawrence J. Bradley, National Electrical Benefit Fund (Sills, Anne) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                        Summons Issued as to Tri-State Signal, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None
                                          General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None
                                            COMPLAINT against Tri-State Signal, Inc. Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 01010000000002669088, filed by Richard P. Gambino, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Deferred Income Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Joint Apprentice and Training Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers' Educational and Cultural Fund, Lawrence J. Bradley, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet & Title Sheet)(Geiman, Gregory) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Civil Case Terminated. (Folan, Karen)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/21/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Conference : Further Status Conference set for 3/21/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner to discuss resolution of this matter-see status report filed on 2/4/11. (Molloy, Maryellen)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nancy Gertner: Status Conference held on 2/7/2011. Counsel are working on resolving this matter and will report to the court on or before 3/21/11 at 2:30 on the status. (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.)(Attorneys present: AttyShaw (plf), no one appeared for dfts) (Molloy, Maryellen)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Conference: Status Conference set for 2/7/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner. (Molloy, Maryellen)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Judge Nancy Gertner: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 18 Motion to Reopen Case (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Case Reopened per Electronic Order dated 6/24/2010. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Civil Case Terminated. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nancy Gertner assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Dein (Patch, Christine)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?