USA v. Pala
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:10-cr-10103
District Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Asu Pala, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Geoffrey G. Nathan +1 617 472 5775 +1 617 479 0917 Nathanlaw@earthlink.net

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Asu Pala. (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: Endorsed ORDER entered granting 17 Motion for Forfeiture of Property as to Asu Pala (1) (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 18 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
      SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Asu Pala (Garland, Scott) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
        MOTION for Forfeiture of Property (Preliminary) as to Asu Pala by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Preliminary Order of Forfeiture)(Lei, Veronica) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
          PLEA AGREEMENT as to Asu Pala (Duong, Diep) (Rec'd for docketing 1/26/11) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
            MOTION Authorization to Use Alternative Notice Procedures for Victims Without Objection as to Asu Pala by USA. (Garland, Scott) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 12 Motion to Unseal Case as to Asu Pala (1) (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/26/2010, Entered: None
                Sentencing Memorandum and MOTION for Variant Sentence as to Asu Pala. (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 11/26/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Unseal Case as to Asu Pala by USA. (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                    MOTION to Continue for 60 days to continue sentencing as to Asu Pala. (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                      MOTION to Continue Sentencing as to Asu Pala. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Duong, Diep) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                        UNEDITED STENO FILE of hearing as to Asu Pala held on 4/21/10 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Court Reporter: Helana Kline at 508-525-7769. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                          MOTION to Continue Sentencing to October 21, 2010 as to Asu Pala by USA. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re sentencing hearing as to Asu Pala Sentencing set for 7/21/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Nicewicz, Craig) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                              WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Asu Pala (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                Appearance Bond as to Asu Pala in amount of $ 50,000.00 (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Asu Pala (1). Unsecured Bond of 50,000.00 as to Asu Pala. (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Geoffrey G. Nathan appearing for Asu Pala. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: None
                                      MOTION to Seal Case as to Asu Pala by USA. (Cummings, Mary) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: None
                                        INFORMATION - Felony & Misdemeanor(Sealed) as to Asu Pala (1) count(s) 1, 2-6. (Attachments: # 1 JS45)(Cummings, Mary) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 461 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?