USA v. Coccia
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:02-cr-10031
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Larry J. Coccia, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Larry J. Coccia
TERMINATED: 05/05/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Clifford S. Sutter, Jr. +1 508 674 8633 +1 508 673 3766 samsutter@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/31/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Howard M. Lewis +1 508 370 3400 +1 508 370 3300 howard@lewisleeper.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (124) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: None
Letter (non-motion) from Larry J. Coccia Regarding His (2255) Motion to Vacate Sentence. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
    USCA Judgment as to Larry J. Coccia: Re: Petition : Petitioner has filed and application for leave to file a second or successuve 2255 petition challenging his May 2, 2003 conviction in the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, No. 02-10031. Consequently, we deny leave to file a second or successive 2255 petition, but transfer the petition to the district court so that it may be treated as a first 2255 petition, provided the petitioner promptly notifies the district court that he wishes the transferred petition to be treated as a first petition. Judgment issued in the USCA 2/1/2008 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
      MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to Larry J. Coccia re 101 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy) as to Larry J. Coccia re 101 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. By Orders dated 5/20/03 and 7/10/03 appellant was directed to show cause, in writing, why this appeal should not be dismissed to these orders would result in this appeal being dismissed for lack of diligent prosecution. Appellant having failed to respond to these directives, this appeal is dismissed for lack of diligent prosecution. Local Rule 3(b). (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: None
          MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to Larry J. Coccia re 96 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 09/19/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: None
            JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy) as to Larry J. Coccia re 96 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. This cause came on to be heard on appeal from the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts and was argued by counsel. Upon consideration whereof, it is now here ordered, adjudged and decreed as follows: The conviction of Larry J.Coccia is affirmed. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 09/19/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: None
              Transmitted Supplemental Record on Appeal as to Larry J. Coccia re 101 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, 96 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment Documents included: PSR & Sentencing Memorandum (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 08/16/2005)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: None
                Transmitted Supplemental Record on Appeal as to Larry J. Coccia re 101 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, 96 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, documents numbered 110-116 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 06/09/2004)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                  TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day Five (Verdict) as to Larry J. Coccia held on October 7, 2004 before Judge Young. Court Reporter: Donald E. Womack. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/07/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day Four as to Larry J. Coccia held on September 30, 2002 before Judge Young. Court Reporter: Donald E. Womack. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/07/2004)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                      TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day Three as to Larry J. Coccia held on September 25, 2002 before Judge Young. Court Reporter: Donald E. Womack. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/07/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day Two as to Larry J. Coccia held on September 24, 2002 before Judge Young. Court Reporter: Donald E. Womack. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/07/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day One as to Larry J. Coccia held on September 23, 2002 before Judge Young. Court Reporter: Donald E. Womack. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/07/2004)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                            TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Suppress Hearing as to Larry J. Coccia held on September 16, 2002 before Judge Young. Court Reporter: Donald E. Womack. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/07/2004)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Suppress Hearing as to Larry J. Coccia held on September 11, 2002 before Judge Young. Court Reporter: Donald E. Womack. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/07/2004)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                TRANSCRIPT of Disposition as to Larry J. Coccia held on May 1, 2003 before Judge Young. Court Reporter: Carol Lynn Scott. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/330-1377 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 01/06/2004)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                  Ex Parte MOTION for transcripts at government expense as to Larry J. Coccia . (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: None
                                    Transmitted Supplemental Record on Appeal as to Larry J. Coccia re 96 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, 101 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment; Document numbered 106 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 09/29/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered as to Larry J. Coccia "The motion of the defendant for leave to appeal in forma pauperis is ALLOWED. (Smith, Bonnie)cc/cl (Entered: 09/24/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: None
                                        Judgment Returned Executed as to Larry J. Coccia on 6/5/03. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 07/25/2003)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
                                          ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to Larry J. Coccia re 96 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, 101 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment; Appellant has filed a Motion, Affidavit to Accompany Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma pauperis with prison trust account information in this court that we request the district court to construe as a compliant motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. We transmit the request to the district court for action. Fed. R. App. P. 24(a). Copies of the district court's ruling shall be forwarded to this court. See Order for further details. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/10/2003)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None
                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Clifford Samuel Sutter. as to Larry J. Coccia . (Bell, Marie) (Entered: 06/05/2003)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None
                                              USCA Case Number as to Larry J. Coccia 03-1690 for 101 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Larry J. Coccia. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 05/20/2003)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                MOTION by Larry J. Coccia for appointment of counsel , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 05/13/2003)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to seal Medical Records , filed. c/s. (mlb) (Entered: 05/09/2003)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                    Letter (non-motion) filed by Leo Puma, Pennsylvania Constable, dated: , re: Larry Coccia and his son Joseph Anthony. (mlb) (Entered: 05/09/2003)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION by Larry J. Coccia for reconsideration of [94-1] judgment order , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 05/08/2003)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to Correct sentence , filed. (efs) (Entered: 05/08/2003)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL by Larry J. Coccia , filed. Larry J. Coccia (1) count(s) 1 Appealing: [94-1] judgment order Appeal record due on 5/21/03 for Larry J. Coccia. cc/cl. (mlb) (Entered: 05/07/2003)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Chief Judge William G. Young . Statement of reasons as to Larry J. Coccia (mlb) (Entered: 05/05/2003)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Chief Judge William G. Young . JUDGMENT entered Larry J. Coccia (1) count(s) 1. The dft. was found guilty on Count 1. The dft. is hereby committed to the custody of the US BOP for a term of 60 months. The dft. is to receive credit for time served from 11/12/01 to the present. The dft. is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Supervised Release: 36 months. The dft. shall not possess a firearm. The dft. is to comply with any extant protective order or separation order from his wife issued by any court of competent jurisdiction. The dft. is to participate in a mental health program as directed by probation. The dft. may be required to contribute to the cost of services based on his ability to pay. Assessment: $100.00. Lump sum payment of $100.00 due immediately. (mlb) (Entered: 05/05/2003)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                Chief Judge William G. Young . CLERK'S NOTES as to Larry J. Coccia , re: Sentencing hearing held. The court announces the Guideline Calculations. The Court hears argument on Govt's [89-1] motion for upward departure as to Larry J. Coccia (1) and defense Motion for Downward Departure. AFter hearing the Govt's Motion is Allowed and the Dft's Motion is Denied. The Court hears from the dft. and imposes the following sentence: Imprisonment: 60 months. Fine: 0. Special Assessment: $100.00. Supervised Release: 3 years. Special Conditions: no firearm, comply with any protective order issued by any Court. Mental Health Counseling. The dft. is to receive credit for time served from 11/12/01 to the present. The dft. is advised of right to appeal. The dft. is remanded. Oral Motion for New Trial is DENIED. Court Reporter: C. Scott (mlb) (Entered: 05/02/2003)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                  RESPONSE by USA as to Larry J. Coccia re:sentencing memorandum and opposition to the Motion for downward departure , filed. (efs) (Entered: 05/01/2003)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                    SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Larry J. Coccia , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 04/29/2003)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to continue sentencing hearing , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 04/29/2003)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION by USA , as to Larry J. Coccia for upward departure , filed. (efs) (Entered: 04/29/2003)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION by USA , as to Larry J. Coccia for leave to file more than 20 pages , filed. (efs) (Entered: 04/29/2003)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to continue sentencing , filed. (efs) (Entered: 04/29/2003)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to readdress Motion for Attorney Lewis to release all monies and property of defendant , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to seal medical records , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION by Larry J. Coccia for copy of transcript(s) at government expense , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to extend time to 5/1/03 to file Motion for New Trial , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 04/18/2003)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE issued of Hearing/Conference as to Larry J. Coccia, reset Sentencing for 2:00 5/1/03 for Larry J. Coccia (efs) (Entered: 04/15/2003)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION by Larry J. Coccia for appointment of counsel , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 04/07/2003)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to extend time to 4/18/03 to file Motion for a New Trial , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 03/20/2003)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to continue 3/19/03 sentencing date , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 03/14/2003)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              Chief Judge William G. Young . MEMORANDUM AND ORDER as to Larry J. Coccia : Accordingly, Coccia's [70-1] motion for Judgment of Acquittal as to Larry J. Coccia (1) and [76-1] motion for new trial and Acquittal as to Larry J. Coccia (1) are DENIED. SO ORDERED. cc/cl. (mlb) (Entered: 03/12/2003)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                Chief Judge William G. Young . CLERK'S NOTES as to Larry J. Coccia , re: Hearing on Dft's Motion for Acquittal. After hearing the [70-1] motion for Judgment of Acquittal taken under advisement as to Larry J. Coccia (1); Court Reporter: D. Womack. (mlb) (Entered: 02/07/2003)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Preliminary MOTION by Larry J. Coccia for new trial and Acquittal , filed. (efs) (Entered: 02/05/2003)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION by Larry J. Coccia for issuance of an order directing the US Marshal Service to escort defendant to Beth Israel DEaconess Hospital for a behavioral neurologic evaluation , filed. (efs) (Entered: 02/03/2003)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to extend time to 3/19/03 to file motion for new trial , filed. (efs) (Entered: 02/03/2003)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Memorandum in RESPONSE by USA as to Larry J. Coccia re: [70-1] motion for Judgment of Acquittal , filed. c/s. (mlb) (Entered: 01/22/2003)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION by USA , as to Larry J. Coccia to extend time to 1/21/03 to file response , filed. (efs) (Entered: 01/10/2003)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to continue sentencing , filed. (efs) (Entered: 01/03/2003)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION by Larry J. Coccia for Judgment of Acquittal , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 12/30/2002)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to extend time to 12/30/02 to file motion for aquittal , filed. (efs) (Entered: 12/17/2002)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to extend time to 1/31/03 to file motion for new trial , filed. (efs) (Entered: 12/17/2002)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Larry J. Coccia , as to Larry J. Coccia , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 11/26/2002)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION by Larry J. Coccia for appointment of counsel , and for copy of transcript(s) at government expense , filed. c/s. (mlb) (Entered: 11/26/2002)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION by Larry J. Coccia for funds to retain expert witness , filed. (efs) (Entered: 11/12/2002)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Letter (non-motion) filed by Larry J. Coccia to Elizabeth Smith, dated: 10/11/102, re: copies of documents and request for transcripts to the suppression hearing and trial.. (mlb) (Entered: 10/25/2002)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to order Government to return dfts. property , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 10/24/2002)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to extend time to file Motion for Judgment of Acquittal , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to extend time to 11/18/02 to file Motion for New Trial , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  Chief Judge William G. Young . Procedural order re sentencing hearing as to Larry J. Coccia entered. set Sentencing for 2:00 1/14/03 for Larry J. Coccia. Final Pre-sentence Report due 1/6/03 (mlb) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    JURY VERDICT as to Larry J. Coccia Guilty: Larry J. Coccia (1) count(s) 1 . (mlb) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Chief Judge William G. Young . CLERK'S NOTES as to Larry J. Coccia , re: Hearing out of presence of the jury re: transcript out of Pennsylvania Court. Transcript admitted. Criminal Jury Trial Day 5 held. Govt. rebuttal witness. Govt. Rests. Oral Motion for Dft. for directed verdict - Denied. Final arguments by Govt. dft. rebuttal argument by Govt. The Court charges the jury as to the law. Jury commences deliberations. Jury questions 18, 19 asked and answered. Jury returns verdict of Guilty. The sentencing is set for 1/14/03 at 2 p.m. Dft. remanded to custody. Court Reporter: D. Womack. (mlb) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        Chief Judge William G. Young . CLERK'S NOTES as to Larry J. Coccia , re: Criminal Jury Trial Day 4 held. Dft. evidence continues. Dft. rests. Dft. files Motions. Motion for Appt. of Counsel and continuance-Denied. Motion to Dissmiss-Denied. Motion to Dismiss-Denied. Motion to Dismiss-Denied. Motion for reconsideration-suppress-Denied. Motion for New Trial - No Action. Oral Motion for Direct Verdict-Denied. The court recesses the case until Monday 01/7/02. Motion for visitation with son-Denied due to lack of jurisdiction. Court Reporter: D. Womack. (mlb) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Larry J. Coccia for appointment of counsel and/or continuance , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to dismiss the case and charge against the dft. due to unconstitutionality of Title 18 USC 922 G(8) on its face-specifically (8) , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to dismiss the case due to unconstitutional protection order and procedure , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to dismiss the charge and case against the dft. due to lack of violation of interstate commerce , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Larry J. Coccia for jury to consider suppresion motion or reconsideration hearing of suppression issue , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to order visitation order for defendant and son-Joseph's contact be authorized and enforced , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Jury Instructions by Larry J. Coccia as to Larry J. Coccia , filed. (efs) (Entered: 09/30/2002)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Chief Judge William G. Young . CLERK'S NOTES as to Larry J. Coccia , re: Criminal Jury Trial Day 3 held. Hearing out of presence of the jury: The Court rules that the dft. does not have the right to argue the validity of PA Order. The Motin to dismiss is Denied. Dft files Motion to Dismiss. After hrg. the Motion is Denied. Defense evidence continues. Dft. orally moves for a mistrial- Denied. Court Reporter: D. Womack. (mlb) (Entered: 09/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to dismiss , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 09/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Chief Judge William G. Young . CLERK'S NOTES as to Larry J. Coccia , re: Criminal Jury Trial Day 2 held. Govt. evidence continues. Govt. Rests; Dft. orally moves for Directed Verdict - Denied. Dft. opening remarks; defense evidence commences. Hrg. out of presence of the jury. After hearing the Court takes the matter at issue under advisement. Court Reporter: D. Womack. (mlb) (Entered: 09/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Chief Judge William G. Young . CLERK'S NOTES as to Larry J. Coccia , re: Dft. Motion to Withdraw/Criminal Jury Trial Day 1 held. The case is called for hearing on Dft. Motion to Withdraw - the Court hears from dft. Dfts. oral Motion to Reconsider ruling on Motion to Suppress-DENIED. Govts. motion in limine to admit testimony of Dr. Margaret Mary McGovern as to Larry J. Coccia (1)-DENIED. CRIMINAL JURY TRIAL DAY 1. Jury of 14 selected and sworn. The Court gives a pretrial charge. Dft. Coccia is representing himself with Mr. Sutter as stand by counsel. Opening remarks by Govt. Hearing out of presence of jury re: Motion to Dismiss filed 9/23/02. After hearing the Motion is Denied without prejudice to its renewal. Court Reporter: Donald Womack (mlb) (Entered: 09/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to dismiss the charge and case against the defendant for constitutional rights violations of liberty and due process of law guranteed by the fifth amendment , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 09/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to dismiss the case and charges against the defendant due to non-violation of federal law , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 09/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Voir Dire Questions by USA as to Larry J. Coccia , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 09/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Trial Witness list by USA as to Larry J. Coccia , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 09/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Jury Instructions as to Larry J. Coccia , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 09/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Trial Exhibit list by USA as to Larry J. Coccia , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 09/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA , as to Larry J. Coccia in limine to admit testimony of Dr. Margaret Mary McGovern , filed. c/s. (mlb) (Entered: 09/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Chief Judge William G. Young . CLERK'S NOTES as to Larry J. Coccia , re: suppression hearing; Govt evidence continues; Govt Rests; Defense evidence commences; Defense Rests; Court hears final argument by Defense and Govt. After hearing the Court Denies the motion to Suppress ; Court Reporter: Womack (efs) (Entered: 09/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Chief Judge William G. Young . CLERK'S NOTES as to Larry J. Coccia , re: motion hearing on Dft's Motion to Suppress...Day one. The dft requests that a new attorney be appointed. The Court orders all motions personally filed by Dft Denied. The Court informs Mr. Coccia that he would have to file a financial affidavit for the Court to determine whether he is eligible for a court appointed attorney. This case is set for trial 9/23/02 and will not be continued. The hearing on the motion to Suppress goes forward. Govt evidence commences. Hrg continued to Mon.9/16/02 at 9:30 AM The court accepts the Motion filed by dft Coccia, but informs the dft that he will not files the motion.; ; Court Reporter: Womack (efs) (Entered: 09/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of proceedings held on 5/2/02 hearing date: before Judge: Judith G. Dein, as to Larry J. Coccia , Court Reporter: APEX Reporting, filed. (mlb) (Entered: 09/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to continue Suppression Hearing , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 09/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA as to Larry J. Coccia re: [22-1] motion to suppress evidence , filed. c/s. (mlb) (Entered: 08/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Larry J. Coccia , re service of [32-1] Corrected support memorandum of, [22-1] motion to suppress evidence , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 08/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Corrected MEMORANDUM by Larry J. Coccia in support of [22-1] motion to suppress evidence (mlb) (Entered: 08/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Larry J. Coccia for appointment of counsel and for all discovery and investigation reports be provided to defendant , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 08/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to relocate to Wyatt Facility , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 08/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to order Visition Order for Defendant and son-Joseph's contact be authorized and enforced , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 08/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Chief Judge William G. Young . ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Larry J. Coccia . Time ordered excluded from 7/17/02 to 9/23/02. cc/cl. (mlb) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Chief Judge William G. Young . PRETRIAL ORDER entered as to Larry J. Coccia setting Jury Trial for 9:00 9/23/02 for Larry J. Coccia. See Document #27. cc/cl. (mlb) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Chief Judge William G. Young . CLERK'S NOTES as to Larry J. Coccia , re: Status Conference held. Court inquires of dft. re: letter sent to the Court re: representation. Dft. is satisfied with counsel. The case is set for trial Monday, 9/23/02. Revised Motion to Suppress to be filed by Monday 8/5/02. The time between 7/17/02 and 9/23/02 is excluded. Final Pretrial Conference held. A Pretrial Order will issue. Dft. remanded to custody. Court Reporter: D. Womack. (mlb) Modified on 07/23/2002 (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to authorize dft. to wear civilian clothes to all court appearances and hearings , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 07/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE issued of Hearing/Conference as to Larry J. Coccia, set status conference for 2:00 7/18/02 for Larry J. Coccia (efs) (Entered: 07/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Larry J. Coccia in support of [22-1] motion to suppress evidence (sat) (Entered: 07/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to suppress evidence , filed. (sat) (Entered: 07/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to be permitted to represent himself , filed. (efs) (Entered: 07/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to extend time to 7/9/02 to file motion to suppress , filed. (efs) (Entered: 07/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Larry J. Coccia for Attorney Lewis to release all monies and property of defendant , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 06/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Larry J. Coccia for Howard Lewis to withdraw as attorney , filed. c/s. (mlb) (Entered: 05/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/2/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mag. Judge Judith G. Dein . CLERK'S NOTES as to Larry J. Coccia , re: Detention hearing held. Govt. evidence begins Calls witness #1 Detective J. McDermott-direct exam; cross exhibits admitted - photos and transcript. Witness #2 direct exam; cross exam; closing arguments. Court takes matter under advisement. Court Reporter: Tape 2002. (Received for Docketing 5/21/02). (mlb) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION by Larry J. Coccia to extend time to 6/3/02 to file substantive motions , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 05/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mag. Judge Judith G. Dein . MEMORANDUM AND ORDER on Motion for Order of Detention as to Larry J. Coccia. IT IS ACCORDINGLY ORDERED that the dft. remain DETAINED pending trial, and it is further ORDERED-The dft.: be committed to the custody of the Attorney General for confinement in a correction facility, be afforded a reasonable opportunity for private consultation with counsel. On Order of a court of the U.S. or on request by an attorney of the government, the person in charge of corrections facility shall deliver the dft. to an authorized Deputy U.S. Marshal for the purpose of any appearance in connection with a court proceeding. (mlb) (Entered: 05/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Chief Judge William G. Young . SCHEDULING ORDER entered as to Larry J. Coccia setting Final Pretrial Conference for 2:00 6/3/02 for Larry J. Coccia ; Jury Trial Assignment for 7/1/02 for Larry J. Coccia. See Document #14. cc/cl. (mlb) (Entered: 04/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Chief Judge William G. Young . ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Larry J. Coccia . Time ordered excluded from 4/1/02 to 7/1/02. cc/cl. (mlb) (Entered: 04/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Chief Judge William G. Young . CLERK'S NOTES as to Larry J. Coccia , re: Initial Scheduling Conference held. set final pretrial conference for 2:00 6/3/02 for Larry J. Coccia , tentative Jury trial for 9:00 7/1/02 for Larry J. Coccia . The Court orders the time between 4/1/02 and 7/1/02 excluded in the interst of justice. (mlb) (Entered: 04/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance of counsel for Larry J. Coccia , by Attorney C. Samuel Sutter. (mlb) (Entered: 03/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Arrest warrant returned executed as to Larry J. Coccia on 12/21/01 . (mlb) (Entered: 03/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE issued of Initial Status Conference as to Larry J. Coccia, set status conference for 2:00 3/26/02 for Larry J. Coccia . cc/cl. (mlb) (Entered: 02/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mag. Judge Judith G. Dein . ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Larry J. Coccia . Time ordered excluded from 2/13/02 to 3/13/02. (mlb) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mag. Judge Judith G. Dein . INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER entered as to Larry J. Coccia. An Initial Status Conference to be scheduled by Judge William G. Young. See Document #7. (mlb) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              INDICTMENT returned Larry Coccia (1) count(s) 1 . (sad) (Entered: 01/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mag. Judge Judith G. Dein . CLERK'S NOTES as to Larry Coccia , re: detention hearing; The deft waives p.c. hearing. Deft consents to detention. [ 1:01-m -1107 ] (eaf) (Entered: 01/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by Larry Coccia , filed. [ 1:01-m -1107 ] (eaf) (Entered: 01/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mag. Judge Judith G. Dein . CLERK'S NOTES as to Larry Coccia , re: initial appearance;, reset Detention Hearing for 3:00 1/3/02 for Larry Coccia The Govt moves for dtention and continuance. Deft temporarily detained pending hearing. [ 1:01-m -1107 ] (eaf) (Entered: 01/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mag. Judge Judith G. Dein . ORDER entered for detention as to Larry Coccia Bond set to NO BAIL for Larry Coccia. [ 1:01-m -1107 ] (eaf) (Entered: 01/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT as to Larry Coccia , filed. [ 1:01-m -1107 ] (eaf) (Entered: 01/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 157 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?