USA v. Holloway
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:02-cr-10050

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 3, 2017 at 10:14 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: 4/7/2009 Supplemental Record Sent USCA
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009 Transcript
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: 10/15/2008 USCA Case Number
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: 10/1/2008 Full Record on Appeal Sent to USCA
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: 9/23/2008 Amended Judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: 9/22/2008 Notice of Appeal
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008 Appendix/Exhibit
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008 Sentencing Memorandum
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 USCA Mandate
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 USCA Mandate
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 judgment of revocation
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Response to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Motion for Hearing
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 USCA Opinion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 USCA Judgment
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007 judgment of revocation
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 judgment of revocation
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 USCA Case Number
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 USCA Case Number
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: 8/12/2005 Full Record on Appeal Sent to USCA
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: 8/12/2005 Full Record on Appeal Sent to USCA
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 Statement of Reasons +
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Judgment*
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Transcript
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 Motion to Continue
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Motion for Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Motion to Exclude
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/10/2003 Transcript
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Set Deadlines
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 Motion to Continue
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 Order Appointing Federal Defender Program.
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Set Deadlines
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Witness List
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Exhibit/Witness List
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Status Report by Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Joint Memorandum - Initial Status Conference
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Order on Excludable Delay
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002 Set Deadlines
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: 5/20/2002 Order on Excludable Delay
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: 5/20/2002 Status Report by Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: 5/20/2002 Joint Memorandum - Initial Status Conference
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: 5/17/2002
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Order on Excludable Delay
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002 Set Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 Indictment -Sealed
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?