A.F. of L. - A.G.C., et al v. SmithKline Beecham, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-10205

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: None
STIPULATION For Extension of Page Limit for Memoranda on CLass Certification by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, IBEW - NECA Local 505 Health & Welfare Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local 441 Health & Welfare Plan, SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham plc. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 07/10/2003)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
    Chief Judge William G. Young . Order entered granting [20-1] motion to approve joint statement #1 re:certain structural matters . See Document #21. cc/cl. [EOD Date 6/4/02] (mlb) Modified on 06/04/2002 (Entered: 06/04/2002)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: None
      Motion by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. in 1:02-cv-10205, Sheet Metal Workers in 1:02-cv-10205, IBEW-NECA Local 505 in 1:02-cv-10205, SmithKline Beecham in 1:02-cv-10205, SmithKline Beecham p in 1:02-cv-10205 to approve joint statement #1 re:certain structural matters , filed. (efs) (Entered: 05/28/2002)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: None
        STIPULATION (Motion) by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. in 1:02-cv-10205, Sheet Metal Workers in 1:02-cv-10205, IBEW-NECA Local 505 in 1:02-cv-10205, SmithKline Beecham in 1:02-cv-10205, SmithKline Beecham p in 1:02-cv-10205, for entry of case management orders 1 and 2 , filed. (efs) (Entered: 05/28/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None
          Affidavit of Kevin T. Kerns in 1:02-cv-10205 , re: [13-1] motion for Joseph A. Tate, George G. Gordon, Kevin T. Kerns, Christopher N. Sipes and Timothy C. Hester to appear pro hac vice fee status: pd fee amt: $250.00 Receipt #: 38819 , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 05/17/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None
            Affidavit of Timothy C. Hester in 1:02-cv-10205 , re: [13-1] motion for Joseph A. Tate, George G. Gordon, Kevin T. Kerns, Christopher N. Sipes and Timothy C. Hester to appear pro hac vice fee status: pd fee amt: $250.00 Receipt #: 38819 , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 05/17/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None
              Affidavit of Joseph A. Tate in 1:02-cv-10205 , re: [13-1] motion for Joseph A. Tate, George G. Gordon, Kevin T. Kerns, Christopher N. Sipes and Timothy C. Hester to appear pro hac vice fee status: pd fee amt: $250.00 Receipt #: 38819 , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 05/17/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None
                Affidavit of Christopher N. Sipes in 1:02-cv-10205 , re: [13-1] motion for Joseph A. Tate, George G. Gordon, Kevin T. Kerns, Christopher N. Sipes and Timothy C. Hester to appear pro hac vice fee status: pd fee amt: $250.00 Receipt #: 38819 , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 05/17/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None
                  Affidavit of George G. Gordon in 1:02-cv-10205 , re: [13-1] motion for Joseph A. Tate, George G. Gordon, Kevin T. Kerns, Christopher N. Sipes and Timothy C. Hester to appear pro hac vice fee status: pd fee amt: $250.00 Receipt #: 38819 , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 05/17/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None
                    Motion by SmithKline Beecham in 1:02-cv-10205, SmithKline Beecham p in 1:02-cv-10205 for Joseph A. Tate, George G. Gordon, Kevin T. Kerns, Christopher N. Sipes and Timothy C. Hester to appear pro hac vice fee status: pd fee amt: $250.00 Receipt #: 38819 , filed. c/s. (mlb) (Entered: 04/30/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Chief Judge William G. Young . Notice of Hearing/conference: set status conference for 3:00 4/30/01 . (efs) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: None
                        Notice of filing motion to transfer and consolidate before the Judicial Panel on MLultidistrict Litigation, filed by Teamsters Local No. 35, plaintiff in CA02-10487-RCL. (sat) (Entered: 04/16/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Notice of case assignment. Case reassigned. from Judge Reginald C. Lindsay to Chief Judge William G. Young. Notice sent to counsel on 4/16/02. (sat) (Entered: 04/16/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. Order entered, transferring case , terminated deadlines ....I hereby transfer this case for all purposes to Chief Judge William G. Young with his consent. All matters scheduled in my session are hereby canceled. SO ORDERED. [EOD Date 4/16/02]. Copy sent to counsel on 4/16/02. (sat) (Entered: 04/16/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. Notice of Hearing/conference: terminated deadlines , set status conference for 2:30 4/25/02 .....TAKE NOTICE that the Scheduling Conference set for April 25, 2002 at 2:30PM....has been changed to a Status Conference. Copy sent to counsel on 3/13/02. (sat) (Entered: 03/13/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: None
                                Return of service executed as to SmithKline Beecham in 1:02-cv-10205 with service on 2/8/02 filed. Answer due on 2/28/02 for SmithKline Beecham (sat) (Entered: 03/13/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. Procedural Order entered....All matters in this case are stayed pending, the scheduling/status conference in this case scheduled for April 25, 2002 at 2:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. [EOD Date 3/7/02]. Copy sent to counsel on 3/7/02. (sat) (Entered: 03/07/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. Notice of Hearing/conference: set scheduling conference for 2:30 4/25/02 . Notice sent to counsel on 3/5/02. (sat) (Entered: 03/05/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: None
                                      Memorandum by SmithKline Beecham in 1:02-cv-10205 in support of [3-1] motion to dismiss, filed; c/s. (sat) (Entered: 03/05/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: None
                                        Motion by SmithKline Beecham in 1:02-cv-10205 to dismiss , filed; c/s. (sat) (Entered: 03/05/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None
                                          Letter by Thomas M. Sobol in 1:02-cv-10205 dated: February 6, 2002 to: Honorable Reginald C. Lindsay re: requesting deferring consideration of proposed case management order until counsel for all parties in all the Relafen actions pending before you reports back to you, filed. (sat) (Entered: 02/07/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Complaint filed. Case assigned to Judge: Lindsay. Receipt #: 36827 Amount:$150.00. Fee Status: paid (sat) (Entered: 02/07/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?