Muhammad v. The Maryland Court of Appeals et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-03444
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 5, 2016 at 5:26 AM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Patrick Muhammad, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices of Patrick Muhammad PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick J Muhammad +1 443 622 3239 +1 410 234 2612
v.
No Logo Alan M. Wilner, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Ann Nolan +1 410 576 7291 +1 410 576 6955 manolan@oag.state.md.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Grams Peltzman +1 410 576 6576 +1 410 576 6393 cpeltzman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Brockman +1 410 576 7055 +1 410 576 6955 wbrockman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gloria Wilson Shelton +1 202 461 7747 +1 202 273 6388 gloria.shelton@va.gov
No Logo Attorney Grievance Commission of Maryland, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Ann Nolan +1 410 576 7291 +1 410 576 6955 manolan@oag.state.md.us

Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Brockman +1 410 576 7055 +1 410 576 6955 wbrockman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gloria Wilson Shelton +1 202 461 7747 +1 202 273 6388 gloria.shelton@va.gov
No Logo Catherine Blake, Defendant
No Logo Clayton Greene, Jr., Defendant

Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Ann Nolan +1 410 576 7291 +1 410 576 6955 manolan@oag.state.md.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Grams Peltzman +1 410 576 6576 +1 410 576 6393 cpeltzman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Brockman +1 410 576 7055 +1 410 576 6955 wbrockman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gloria Wilson Shelton +1 202 461 7747 +1 202 273 6388 gloria.shelton@va.gov
No Logo Dale R. Cathell, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Ann Nolan +1 410 576 7291 +1 410 576 6955 manolan@oag.state.md.us

Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Brockman +1 410 576 7055 +1 410 576 6955 wbrockman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gloria Wilson Shelton +1 202 461 7747 +1 202 273 6388 gloria.shelton@va.gov
No Logo Frederick Motz, Defendant
No Logo Gary Kuc, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Ann Nolan +1 410 576 7291 +1 410 576 6955 manolan@oag.state.md.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Grams Peltzman +1 410 576 6576 +1 410 576 6393 cpeltzman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Brockman +1 410 576 7055 +1 410 576 6955 wbrockman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gloria Wilson Shelton +1 202 461 7747 +1 202 273 6388 gloria.shelton@va.gov
No Logo Glenn T. Harrell, Jr., Defendant

Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Ann Nolan +1 410 576 7291 +1 410 576 6955 manolan@oag.state.md.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Grams Peltzman +1 410 576 6576 +1 410 576 6393 cpeltzman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Brockman +1 410 576 7055 +1 410 576 6955 wbrockman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gloria Wilson Shelton +1 202 461 7747 +1 202 273 6388 gloria.shelton@va.gov
No Logo Gov. Bob Erhlich, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Ann Nolan +1 410 576 7291 +1 410 576 6955 manolan@oag.state.md.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Grams Peltzman +1 410 576 6576 +1 410 576 6393 cpeltzman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Brockman +1 410 576 7055 +1 410 576 6955 wbrockman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gloria Wilson Shelton +1 202 461 7747 +1 202 273 6388 gloria.shelton@va.gov
No Logo Irma S. Raker, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Ann Nolan +1 410 576 7291 +1 410 576 6955 manolan@oag.state.md.us

Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Brockman +1 410 576 7055 +1 410 576 6955 wbrockman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gloria Wilson Shelton +1 202 461 7747 +1 202 273 6388 gloria.shelton@va.gov
No Logo Jane Doe, Defendant
No Logo Jane Doe Newspaper, Defendant
No Logo Jane Doe one, Defendant
No Logo Jane Doe two, Defendant
No Logo John Doe Newspaper, Defendant
No Logo John Doe one, Defendant
No Logo John Doe three, Defendant
No Logo John Doe two, Defendant
No Logo Lynne A. Battaglia, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Ann Nolan +1 410 576 7291 +1 410 576 6955 manolan@oag.state.md.us

Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Brockman +1 410 576 7055 +1 410 576 6955 wbrockman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gloria Wilson Shelton +1 202 461 7747 +1 202 273 6388 gloria.shelton@va.gov
No Logo Marianne Lee, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Ann Nolan +1 410 576 7291 +1 410 576 6955 manolan@oag.state.md.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Grams Peltzman +1 410 576 6576 +1 410 576 6393 cpeltzman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Brockman +1 410 576 7055 +1 410 576 6955 wbrockman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gloria Wilson Shelton +1 202 461 7747 +1 202 273 6388 gloria.shelton@va.gov
No Logo Marvin Garbis, Defendant
No Logo Melvin Hirshman, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Ann Nolan +1 410 576 7291 +1 410 576 6955 manolan@oag.state.md.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Grams Peltzman +1 410 576 6576 +1 410 576 6393 cpeltzman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Brockman +1 410 576 7055 +1 410 576 6955 wbrockman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gloria Wilson Shelton +1 202 461 7747 +1 202 273 6388 gloria.shelton@va.gov
No Logo Office of the Attorney General, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Ann Nolan +1 410 576 7291 +1 410 576 6955 manolan@oag.state.md.us

Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Brockman +1 410 576 7055 +1 410 576 6955 wbrockman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gloria Wilson Shelton +1 202 461 7747 +1 202 273 6388 gloria.shelton@va.gov
No Logo Robert M. Bell, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Ann Nolan +1 410 576 7291 +1 410 576 6955 manolan@oag.state.md.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Grams Peltzman +1 410 576 6576 +1 410 576 6393 cpeltzman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Brockman +1 410 576 7055 +1 410 576 6955 wbrockman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gloria Wilson Shelton +1 202 461 7747 +1 202 273 6388 gloria.shelton@va.gov
No Logo State of Maryland, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Ann Nolan +1 410 576 7291 +1 410 576 6955 manolan@oag.state.md.us

Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Brockman +1 410 576 7055 +1 410 576 6955 wbrockman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gloria Wilson Shelton +1 202 461 7747 +1 202 273 6388 gloria.shelton@va.gov
No Logo The Maryland Court of Appeals, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Ann Nolan +1 410 576 7291 +1 410 576 6955 manolan@oag.state.md.us

Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Brockman +1 410 576 7055 +1 410 576 6955 wbrockman@oag.state.md.us

Represented by United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gloria Wilson Shelton +1 202 461 7747 +1 202 273 6388 gloria.shelton@va.gov
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 USCA Mandate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: 3/6/2009 USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 USCA Mandate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009 USCA Mandate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: 12/19/2008 USCA Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Affidavit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Notice of Appeal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Miscellaneous Correspondence
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Memorandum Opinion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Order on Motion to Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Sealed Document +
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Motion to Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Supplemental
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 ~Notice (other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/3/2007, Entered: 9/3/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Supplemental
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Motion for Other Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Request for Extension of Time to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Request for Extension of Time to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Order on Motion to Transfer Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Motion to Transfer Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Order on Motion to Change Venue
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/9/2007 Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Motion to Change Venue
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Request for Writ
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Order on Motion to Alter/Amend Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/13/2007 Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/13/2007 Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/11/2007, Entered: 3/11/2007 Motion to Continue
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007 Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Motion to Alter/Amend Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007 Order on Motion for TRO
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Order on Motion to Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Order on Motion to Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Motion to Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Motion to Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Response in Opposition
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/28/2006 Motion for TRO
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/28/2006 Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 30 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?