Packianathan v. Jacob
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 8:07-cv-01104
District Judge Deborah K. Chasanow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 1:54 AM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David Packianathan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Andalman and Flynn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Adlai Katz +1 301 563 6685 +1 301 563 6681 dkatz@a-f.net
v.
No Logo Integrated Facility Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Daniel M Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Mark Press +1 703 734 3800 +1 703 734 0590 dpress@chung-press.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE MARTIN LAW FIRM, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Allen Martin +1 703 918 0350 +1 703 918 0386 Ken@martin-lawfirm.com
No Logo Mohan Jacob, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Daniel M Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Mark Press +1 703 734 3800 +1 703 734 0590 dpress@chung-press.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE MARTIN LAW FIRM, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Allen Martin +1 703 918 0350 +1 703 918 0386 Ken@martin-lawfirm.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 32 Withdrawal of Motion to Reopen and WITHDRAWING 31 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 12/4/08. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
    MOTION to Withdraw 31 MOTION to Reopen Case by David Packianathan Responses due by 12/22/2008 (Katz, Daniel) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
      MOTION to Reopen Case by David Packianathan Responses due by 12/19/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Daniel) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated within 190 days. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 5/30/08. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
          PAPERLESS ORDER granting 28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Kenneth A Martin on behalf of Mohan Jacob and Integrated Facility Systems, Inc. Directing attorney Kenneth A Martin to register on-line for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attorney/registration.asp.. Signed by Clerk on 5/30/08, upon the authority of Judge Chasanow. (cmns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
            MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth A. Martin on behalf of Mohan Jacob, Integrated Facility Systems, Inc. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 04160000000001741502. by Mohan Jacob, Integrated Facility Systems, Inc. (Press, Daniel) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None Motion to Compel
              MOTION to Compel Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests and Memorandum in Support Thereof by David Packianathan Responses due by 6/6/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Discovery, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Daniel) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                Letter/ORDER scheduling settlement conference for May 30, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on 3/20/2008. (elt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Connelly for settlement. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/17/08. (jmw, Chambers) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Joint Correspondence re: Joint Intitial Report Regarding Proceeding Before a United States Magistrate Judge (Katz, Daniel) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None
                      Settlement Conference - requesting (Katz, Daniel) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery closes and status report due by 7/16/2008, motions due by 8/15/2008. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/3/08. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                          Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Mohan Jacob, Integrated Facility Systems, Inc.. (Press, Daniel) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Mohan Jacob, Integrated Facility Systems, Inc..(Press, Daniel) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER DENYING 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 2/14/08. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 2/14/08. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' reply to 10 Motion to Dismiss due 10/12/07. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/27/07. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 09/27/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None
                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Dismiss by Mohan Jacob, Integrated Facility Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 10/15/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Press, Daniel) (Entered: 09/27/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by David Packianathan.Replies due by 9/27/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Daniel) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel M Press (Press, Daniel) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER DENYING 5 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 8/28/07. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response to 10 Motion to Dismiss due 9/14/07, Defendant's reply due 9/28/07. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 7/19/07. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by David Packianathan. Responses due by 8/6/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Daniel) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 10 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Mohan Jacob, Integrated Facility Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 8/3/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum# 2 Affidavit of Mohan Jacob)(Press, Daniel) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's complaint due 7/17/07 (c/m to Defendants 7/5/07 sat). Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 7/5/07. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                    RESPONSE re 7 MOTION for Extension of Time, 6 Response in Opposition to Motion Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Entry of Default and Motion for Additional Time to File an Answer filed by David Packianathan. (Katz, Daniel) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to engage counsel by Mohan Jacob. Responses due by 7/20/2007 (elt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 5 MOTION for Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense filed by Mohan Jacob.Replies due by 7/17/2007. (elt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by David Packianathan. Responses due by 7/9/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, and Civil Cover Sheet served on Mohan Jacob on May 14, 2007, filed by David Packianathan. (Katz, Daniel) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons and Civil Cover Sheet served on Integrated Facility Systems, Inc. on May 14, 2007, filed by David Packianathan. (Katz, Daniel) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                Summons Issued 20 days as to Mohan Jacob, Inergrated Facility Systems, Inc.. (rank, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  COMPLAINT against Mohan Jacob, Inergrated Facility Systems, Inc. (Receipt No. 845637009415; Filing fee $ 350.), filed by David Packianathan. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rank, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 66 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?