Casa De Maryland, Inc. v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 8:08-cv-03249
District Judge Peter J. Messitte, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Casa De Maryland, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CASA of Maryland Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sebastian Amar +1 301 431 4185 +1 301 431 4179 samar@casamd.org
TERMINATED: 09/01/2009 Justin B Cox +1 301 431 4185 +1 301 431 4179 jcox@casamd.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberley Propeack +1 301 431 4185 +1 301 408 4123 kpropeack@casamd.org
v.
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Department of Homeland Security"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil R White +1 202 530 7436

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/03/2009 Thomas H Barnard +1 410 209 4873 +1 410 962 2310 thomas.barnard@usdoj.gov
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Internal Revenue Service"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil R White +1 202 530 7436

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/03/2009 Thomas H Barnard +1 410 209 4873 +1 410 962 2310 thomas.barnard@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 49 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 45 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay Temporarily Pending Ruling on a Stay by the Court of Appeals filed by Casa De Maryland, Inc.. Replies due by 3/22/2010. (Amar, Sebastian) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2-1-10, before Judge Messitte. Court Reporter/Transcriber L Marshall, Telephone number 301-344-3229. Total number of pages filed: 80. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER... Redaction Request due 3/25/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2010. (lcm, Court Reporter) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 46 Defendants' Motion To Shorten Time For Response To Motion To Stay Pending Appeal, Or, In The Alternative, Motion To Stay Temporarily Pending A Ruling On A Stay By The Court Of Appeals. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/2/2010. (jchss, Chambers) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
        MOTION to Shorten Time for Response to Motion to Stay Pending Appeal or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay Temporarily Pending a Ruling on a Stay by the Court of Appeals by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Internal Revenue Service Responses due by 3/19/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Neil) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
          MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay Temporarily Pending Ruling on a Stay by the Court of Appeals by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Internal Revenue Service Responses due by 3/19/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Pending Appeal or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay Temporarily Pending a Rulingon a Stay by the Court of Appeals, # 2 Exhibit 1 Transcript of Feb. 1, 2010 Motions Hearing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Neil) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 44 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF APPEAL by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Internal Revenue Service. Appeal Record due by 4/5/2010. (White, Neil) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 42 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 2/9/10. (rass, Chambers) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                MOTION for Extension of Time to Disclose Documents Pursuant to the Court's February 5, 2010 Order (Docket No. 41) by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Internal Revenue Service Responses due by 2/26/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Neil) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 41 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 27 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 2/3/2010. (kn, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Motion Hearing held on 2/1/2010 re 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Internal Revenue Service held before Judge Peter J. Messitte. (Court Reporter Marshall (4C) (esp, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 39 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None
                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Internal Revenue Service. (Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                        PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 37 Consent Motion For Extension Of Time To File Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 12/17/2009. (jchss, Chambers) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by U.S. Department of Homeland Security Responses due by 1/4/2010 (Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                            PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 35 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/18/08. (rass, Chambers) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Extension of Time by U.S. Department of Homeland Security Responses due by 12/4/2009 (Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None
                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Casa De Maryland, Inc.. Replies due by 11/17/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Sebastian Amar Declaration)(Amar, Sebastian) Courtesy copy received 1/28/10-Modified on 1/28/2010 (ch, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE to Substitute Attorney (Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 31 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/2/09. (rass, Chambers) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 28 Hearing/trial date - setting, 30 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS by Casa De Maryland, Inc. Responses due by 11/19/2009 (Amar, Sebastian) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 29 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 10/20/09. (rass, Chambers) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Casa De Maryland, Inc.. Responses due by 11/6/2009 (Amar, Sebastian) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None
                                            Memorandum setting date for MOTIONS HEARING on 27 Defendants' Partial Motion To Dismiss, Or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment for February 1, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. (Courtroom 4C) (jchss, Chambers) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 27 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Internal Revenue Service Responses due by 10/22/2009 (Attachments: # 1 TABLE OF CONTENTS, # 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS OR FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, # 3 NOTICE OF FILING OF LENGTHY EXHIBIT)(Barnard, Thomas) Modified on 10/7/2009 (kn, Deputy Clerk)(Hard Copy and Lengthy Exhibit rec'd 10/6/09 kn). (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Sebastian Amar on behalf of Casa De Maryland, Inc. (Amar, Sebastian) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 24 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/24/09. (rass, Chambers) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Internal Revenue Service Responses due by 10/13/2009 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 20 Motion To Withdraw Appearance. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/31/2009. (jchss, Chambers) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 21 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/21/09. (rass, Chambers) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Internal Revenue Service Responses due by 9/8/2009 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Casa De Maryland, Inc. Responses due by 8/27/2009 (Cox, Justin) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Telephone Conference held on 7/16/2009 at 2pm held before Judge Peter J. Messitte. (Court Reporter Sharon O'Neill.) (jc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING 17 Correspondence (re proposed schedule, etc.) re Telephone Conference Scheduled for July 16, 2009. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 7/16/09. (rass, Chambers) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  Correspondence re: teleconference scheduled this Thursday, July 16, 2009, at 2:00 pm. (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    Status Report Submitted and Request for Conference by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Internal Revenue Service (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 14 Consent Status Report and Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 5/19/2009. (jchss, Chambers) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Internal Revenue Service Responses due by 6/4/2009 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 4/23/09. (rass, Chambers) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Internal Revenue Service Responses due by 5/4/2009 (Cox, Justin) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/19/09. (Messitte, Peter) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time and Status Report by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Internal Revenue Service Responses due by 4/3/2009 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Justin B Cox on behalf of Casa De Maryland, Inc. (Cox, Justin) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 2/6/09. (Messitte, Peter) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time and to Set Date for Status Report by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Internal Revenue Service Responses due by 2/23/2009 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 5 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/13/09. (mr, Chambers) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Internal Revenue Service Responses due by 1/29/2009 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on Both Defendants, the U.S. Attorney General and the U.S. Attorney for the District of Maryland on 12/16/2008, filed by Casa De Maryland, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipts, # 2 Exhibit B - Tracking Results)(Propeack, Kimberley) (Entered: 01/01/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              Summons Issued 30 days as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Casa De Maryland, Inc. (jc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Internal Revenue Service (Filing fee $ 350 Receipt Number 84637013457.), filed by Casa De Maryland, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 151 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?