Gorham-Bey v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 8:09-cv-01166
District Judge Roger W Titus, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 8:43 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Edna Gorham-Bey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edna Gorham-Bey
v.
Corrections Corporation of America Corrections Corporation of America, Defendant
Federal Bureau of Prisons Federal Bureau of Prisons, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry D Adams +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 larry.adams@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 10/23/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas H Barnard +1 410 209 4873 +1 410 962 2310 thomas.barnard@usdoj.gov
No Logo Howard County Detention Center, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howard County Office of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louis P Ruzzi +1 410 313 2100 +1 410 313 3292 lruzzi@howardcountymd.gov
No Logo Montgomery County Dentention Center, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Montgomery County Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia Lisehora Kane +1 240 777 6743 +1 240 777 6706 patricia.kane@montgomerycountymd.gov
No Logo U.S. Marshal Service et al, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry D Adams +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 larry.adams@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 10/23/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas H Barnard +1 410 209 4873 +1 410 962 2310 thomas.barnard@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying as moot 47 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 7/8/10. (apl, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 7/9/10) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
    MOTION requesting Extension for filing of Reply to Defendants Response by Edna Gorham-Bey (apl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER denying 43 Motion for Reconsideration and Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 6/15/10. (apl, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 6/17/10). (Entered: 06/17/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
        RESPONSE to Motion re 43 MOTION for Reconsideration MOTION to Amend/Correct Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration filed by Montgomery County Dentention Center. Replies due by 6/7/2010. (Kane, Patricia) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
          RESPONSE to Motion re 43 MOTION for Reconsideration MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Corrections Corporation of America. Replies due by 6/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Paul) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 43 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
            MOTION for Reconsideration and Leave to Amend by Edna Gorham-Bey (apl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 21 Motion for Summary Judgment; entering Judgment in favor of the U S Marshal Service and the Bureau of Prisons; denying 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal; dismissing as moot 25 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend; granting 29 Motion for Summary Judgment; entering Judgment in favor of the Corrections Corporation of America; granting 32 Motion to Dismiss; granting 34 Motion to Dismiss; and closing the case. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 3/29/10. (c/m 3/30/10)(apl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 3/29/10. (apl, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 3/30/10) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE to 34 Howard County's Request for Dismissal filed by Edna Gorham-Bey. (apl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE in Support re 29 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Corrections Corporation of America. Replies due by 1/28/2010. (Maloney, Paul) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: None
                      Motion in RESPONSE to 32 Montgomery County's Motion to Dismiss filed by Edna Gorham-Bey. (apl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: None
                        Motion in RESPONSE to 29 Corrections Corporation of America's MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment filed by Edna Gorham-Bey. (apl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
                          Rule 12/56 letter. (apl, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 12/28/09) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Howard County Detention Center re 34 MOTION to Dismiss the Supplemented Complaint for Failure to State a Claim (Ruzzi, Louis) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                              MOTION to Dismiss the Supplemented Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Howard County Detention Center Responses due by 1/11/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of law in support of Motion)(Ruzzi, Louis) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None
                                Rule 12/56 letter. (apl, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 12/7/09) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                  MOTION to Dismiss Montgomery County Detention Center, Properly Known as Montgomery County, Maryland's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Montgomery County Dentention Center Responses due by 12/24/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memo of Points & and Authorities in Support of MTD)(Kane, Patricia) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
                                    Rule 12/56 letter. (apl, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 12/4/09) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
                                      Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Corrections Corporation of America. (Maloney, Paul) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                        MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Corrections Corporation of America Responses due by 12/21/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Paul) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                          Summons Returned Unexecuted by Edna Gorham-Bey as to Alexandria Detention Center. (apl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edna Gorham-Bey. Corrections Corporation of America served on 11/16/2009, answer due 12/7/2009; Howard County Detention Center served on 11/16/2009, answer due 12/7/2009; Montgomery County Dentention Center served on 11/14/2009, answer due 12/7/2009. (apl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None
                                              Motion in RESPONSE to 21 Defendant's MOTION to Dimiss or Alternatively for Summary Judgment filed by Edna Gorham-Bey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D)(apl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                MOTION Seeking Leave to Amend lists of Defendants to include Allegheny County Jail by Edna Gorham-Bey (apl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  MOTION Seeking Recusal of Judge Roger W. Titus due to Plausible Conflict of Interest by Edna Gorham-Bey (apl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Summons Issued 20 days as to Montgomery County Dentention Center, Alexandria Detention Center, Howard County Detention Center, Corrections Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 attachments)(apl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Rule 12/56 letter. (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION to Dimiss or Alternatively for Summary Judgment by Federal Bureau Of Prisons, U.S. Marshal Service et al Responses due by 11/9/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Adams, Larry) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE to Substitute Attorney (Adams, Larry) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER amending the docket to add the Montgomery County Detention Center, Alexandria Detention Center, Howard County Detention Center and Corrections Corporation of America as Defendants; directing Clerk to mail 4 copies of the USM 285 forms to Plaintiff; and granting Plaintiff 30 days to complete and return all forms to effect service of process. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 10/7/09. (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 10/8/09) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                              RESPONSE to 14 Government's MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Edna Gorham-Bey. (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER directing Plaintiff to forward $34.50 to the Clerk within 20 days as the initial partial filing and to make monthly payments on the remainder of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 9/1/09. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 9/2/09) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER dismissing without prejudice 12 Motion for Appointment of Counsel; dismissing as moot 12 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 8/31/09. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 9/2/09) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER denying without prejudice 11 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 8/31/09. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 9/1/09) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Federal Bureau Of Prisons, U.S. Marshal Service et al. Responses due by 9/8/2009 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Edna Gorham-Bey. (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edna Gorham-Bey (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Edna Gorham-Bey (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER dismissing as moot 8 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 7/21/09. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 7/22/09) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER directing the Finance Officer to file an inmate account summary information sheet within 20 days. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 7/21/09. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 7/22/09) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edna Gorham-Bey (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    Correspondence from Finance Office re: informing the Court that Plaintiff is not part of the Maryland DOC. (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER directing Clerk to mail copies and withhold service; and directing Defendants to answer the complaint. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 6/22/09. (Attachments: # 1 service letters)(bmh, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 6/25/09) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER directing the Finance Officer to file an inmate account summary information sheet within 20 days. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 6/22/09. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 6/25/09) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          Supplemental to 1 Complaint filed by Edna Gorham-Bey. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Notice of Documents Filed Under Seal)(cem, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2009: # 3 SEALED Document) (cem, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 6/17/2009 (cem, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and granting Plaintiff to supplement the Complaint. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 5/13/09. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 5/13/09) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edna Gorham-Bey (Attachments: # 1 Inmate Account Inquiry)(cem, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau Of Prisons, U.S. Marshal Service et al, filed by Edna Gorham-Bey.(cem, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2009: # 1 Envelope) (cem, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 149 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?