Barnett v. Uniformed Services University of the Health Sciences
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 8:10-cv-02681
District Judge Deborah K. Chasanow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2019 at 12:58 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charolette Barnett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernabei & Wachtel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily Brittain Read +202745 194 2ext237 +1 202 745 2627 read@BernabeiPLLC.com
v.
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates"
Brinker International, Inc. Officer/Director, Brinker International, Inc.
Nacco Industries, Inc. Officer/Director, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Parker Drilling Co /de/
Starbucks Corporation Officer/Director, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas H Barnard +1 410 209 4873 +1 410 962 2310 thomas.barnard@usdoj.gov
No Logo The Corbin Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Akia Fox Roane +1 202 857 6000 roane.akia@arentfox.com
No Logo Uniformed Services University Of The Health Sciences, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas H Barnard +1 410 209 4873 +1 410 962 2310 thomas.barnard@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 8/9/11. (sat, Chambers)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
    RESPONSE in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Charolette Barnett. Replies due by 5/5/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Plaintiffs Motion Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d))(Read, Emily) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
      REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION to Strike Defendant Corbin Companys Thirteenth Affirmative Defense filed by Charolette Barnett. (Read, Emily) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
        RESPONSE in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Strike Defendant Corbin Companys Thirteenth Affirmative Defense filed by The Corbin Company. Replies due by 4/14/2011. (Roane, Akia) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
          MOTION to Strike Defendant Corbin Companys Thirteenth Affirmative Defense by Charolette Barnett Responses due by 3/28/2011 (Read, Emily) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 16 Plaintiff's motion for extension of time. Plaintiff's response to 15 motion to dismiss or alternatively, for summary judgment is now due 4/18/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 2/28/11. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Charolette Barnett. Responses due by 3/17/2011 (Read, Emily) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by Robert M. Gates, Uniformed Services University of the Health Sciences Responses due by 3/7/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Table of Contents, # 3 Exhibit List, # 4 Notice of Lengthy Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7)(Barnard, Thomas) Modified on 2/22/2011 (ranks, Deputy Clerk).(Hard Copy rec'd 2/18/2011 rk) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                  Defendant Corbin Company's ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by The Corbin Company.(Roane, Akia) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                    Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Corbin Company. (Roane, Akia) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Corbin Company's response to Plaintiff's complaint is now due 2/18/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 12/10/10. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by The Corbin Company Responses due by 12/30/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum In Support of Defendant The Corbin Company's Consent Motion To Further Extend Time To Answer or Otherwise Plead, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Roane, Akia) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                          PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's complaint is now due 2/18/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 12/7/10. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Robert M. Gates, Uniformed Services University of the Health Sciences. Responses due by 12/27/2010 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                              NOTICE by Charolette Barnett of Proof of Service of Process (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1.Affidavit of Service upon United States Attorney Rod J. Rosenstein, # 2 Exhibit 2.Affidavit of Service upon John E. Baker, General Counsel, Uniformed Services University of the Health Sciences, # 3 Exhibit 3.Summons and Proof of Service upon Attorney General Eric Holder, # 4 Exhibit 4.Summons and Proof of Service upon The Honorable Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense, # 5 Exhibit 5.Summons and Proof of Service upon The Corbin Company)(Read, Emily) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's complaint is now due 12/20/10. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 11/5/10. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by The Corbin Company Responses due by 11/22/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant Corbin Company's Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Roane, Akia) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                    Summons Issued 60 days as to Robert M. Gates, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 summons, # 2 summons, # 3 summons, # 4 summons)(elts, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                      Summons Issued 21 days as to The Corbin Company. (elts, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                        Summons Issued 21 days as to Uniformed Services University of the Health Sciences. (ranks, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/18/2010 (elts, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                          Supplemental to Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Summons to Attorney General as to Defendant Gates, # 2 Supplement Summons to US Attorney as to Defendant Gates, # 3 Supplement Summons to Attorney General as to Defendant USUHS, # 4 Supplement Summons to US Attorney as to Defendant USUHS)(Read, Emily) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                            COMPLAINT against Department of Defense, The Corbin Company, Uniformed Services University of the Health Sciences ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0416-2693171.), filed by Charolette Barnett. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Huhta, Susan) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 200 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?