Alvarez v. United States of America
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-03333
District Judge William M Nickerson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 27, 2016 at 3:01 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Denis Alvarez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Yale University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Anne Keyes +1 202 274 4147 +1 202 274 0659 ekeyes@wcl.american.edu
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas H Barnard +1 410 209 4873 +1 410 962 2310 thomas.barnard@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2671
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
SETTLEMENT ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 10/6/11. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None
    Paperless Request for Written Status Report Status Report due by 10/14/2011. (cae, Chambers) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      PAPERLESS ORDER NOTIFYING Counsel that the settlement conference originally set for September 28, 2011 has been moved to Tuesday, October 4, 2011, at 8:30 a.m. The conference may be interrupted on occasion as I am also responsible for criminal proceedings that day. Ex parte letters are now due September 20, 2011. Counsel are advised to follow the instructions as set forth in the original Order Scheduling Settlement Conference dated August 3, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm on 08/23/2011. (Grimm, Paul) (lyb) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/3/11. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm for settlement. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 7/22/11. (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            PAPERLESS ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time as set forth therein. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 7/21/11. (cae, Chambers) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time and Request for Settlement Conference by United States of America Responses due by 8/8/2011 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                PAPERLESS ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as set forth therein. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 7/5/11. (cae, Chambers) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by United States of America. Responses due by 7/18/2011 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE to Motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Stay filed by Denis Alvarez. Replies due by 7/11/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A - Dana Marks Article, # 2 Exhibit Exh B - Morton Memo, # 3 Exhibit Exh C - Sharon Cohen Article)(Keyes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                      Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, by Denis Alvarez Responses due by 6/9/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Amended Complaint (Redlined), # 2 Supplement Amended Complaint (Clean Copy))(Keyes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                        (FILED IN ERROR - Counsel will refile) AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Denis Alvarez. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint "Clean", # 2 Amended Complaint "Red-lined")(Keyes, Elizabeth) Modified on 5/23/2011 (bmh, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                          PAPERLESS ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 5/19/11. (cae, Chambers) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Stay by Denis Alvarez. Responses due by 6/6/2011 (Keyes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                              MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Stay by United States of America Responses due by 5/26/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit List, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14)(Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                PAPERLESS ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 3/28/11. (caes, Chambers) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by United States of America Responses due by 4/11/2011 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Denis Alvarez. United States of America served on 1/26/2011, answer due 3/28/2011. (Keyes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None
                                      Summons Issued 60 days as to United States of America, served on the U.S. Attorney and the U.S. Attorney General (raf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and directing Counsel to effectuate service of the summons and complaint on Defendant. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 12/8/10. (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                          Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Denis Alvarez. (Keyes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Denis Alvarez (Keyes, Elizabeth) Modified on 11/29/2010 (raf, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                              COMPLAINT Alvarez against United States of America, filed by Denis Alvarez. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4(Filed in Error-counsel will refile) In Forma Pauperis, # 5 (Filed in Error-counsel will refile)Notice of Corporate Affiliations)(Keyes, Elizabeth) Modified on 11/29/2010 (raf, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 135 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?