Hoffman, et al v. Credit Acpt Corp, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:98-cv-70783
District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part II

This docket is featured in the February 9, 2018 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part II.

Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo George Hoffman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lionel Zevi Glancy +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 lglancy@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirby McInerney LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ira Michael Press +1 212 317 2300 +1 212 751 2540 ipress@kmslaw.com

Represented by Mantese and Rossman, PC

No Logo Reed Westphal, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lionel Zevi Glancy +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 lglancy@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirby McInerney LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ira Michael Press +1 212 317 2300 +1 212 751 2540 ipress@kmslaw.com

Represented by Mantese and Rossman, PC

v.
Credit Acceptance Corporation Credit Acceptance Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. McGuinness +1 734 646 8778 drewmcguin@gmail.com
No Logo Foss, Donald A., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald A. Foss"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. McGuinness +1 734 646 8778 drewmcguin@gmail.com
No Logo Richard E. Beckman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. McGuinness +1 734 646 8778 drewmcguin@gmail.com
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/17/1999, Entered: None
NOTICE by court of non-admission of attorney Stanley D Bernstein, Mel E Lifshitz and Sandy A Liebhard (lh) (Entered: 02/18/1999)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/5/1999, Entered: None
    EXPARTE motion by defendants in 2:98-cv-70417 to file brief in excess of five pages (DT) (Entered: 02/08/1999)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/25/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds that case is closed for administrative purposes only; consolidated with 98-70783, 98-70985, 98-71285 and 98-71334 (dp) (Entered: 06/26/1998)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/15/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER reassigning case from Judge Gerald E. Rosen to Judge Nancy G. Edmunds (RH) (Entered: 04/16/1998)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: None
          COMPLAINT with jury demand - Receipt # 357616 - Date Fee Received: 02/23/98 (dp) (Entered: 02/26/1998)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 239 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?