District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Michigan Eastern District Court United States Supreme Court

Miller v. Credit Acceptance
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:98-cv-70417
District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part II

This docket is featured in the February 9, 2018 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part II.

Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 2:21 PM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Edwin Miller, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218

Toggle Switch Represented by cwg11.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Goldberg +1 617 951 2505 +1 617 951 0679 goldberg@cwg11.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lionel Zevi Glancy +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 lglancy@glancylaw.com

Represented by Mantese and Rossman, PC

v.
No Logo Brett A. Roberts, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. McGuinness +1 734 646 8778 drewmcguin@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Lynn McDevitt +1 312 407 0910 +1 312 407 8581 donna.mcdevitt@skadden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy A. Nelsen +1 312 407 0700 +1 312 407 0700 tnelsen@skadden.com
Credit Acceptance Corporation Credit Acceptance Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. McGuinness +1 734 646 8778 drewmcguin@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Lynn McDevitt +1 312 407 0910 +1 312 407 8581 donna.mcdevitt@skadden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy A. Nelsen +1 312 407 0700 +1 312 407 0700 tnelsen@skadden.com
No Logo Foss, Donald A., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald A. Foss"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. McGuinness +1 734 646 8778 drewmcguin@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Lynn McDevitt +1 312 407 0910 +1 312 407 8581 donna.mcdevitt@skadden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy A. Nelsen +1 312 407 0700 +1 312 407 0700 tnelsen@skadden.com
No Logo Richard E. Beckman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. McGuinness +1 734 646 8778 drewmcguin@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Lynn McDevitt +1 312 407 0910 +1 312 407 8581 donna.mcdevitt@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy A. Nelsen +1 312 407 0700 +1 312 407 0700 tnelsen@skadden.com
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (106) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds granting plaintiffs' motion authorizing the disbursement of net settlement fund [105-1] in 2:98-cv-70417, 2:98-cv-70783, 2:98-cv-70985, 2:98-cv-71285, 2:98-cv-71334 [EOD Date 11/27/02] (DT) (Entered: 11/27/2002)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/26/2002
    AMENDED ex parte motion by plaintiffs' in 2:98-cv-70417, 2:98-cv-70783, 2:98-cv-70985, 2:98-cv-71285, in 2:98-cv-71334 authorizing the disbursement of net settlement fund with memorandum, amended declaration of Lionel Z Glancy, amended affidavit of Brian C. Burke, exhibits A-E, and proof of service. (PP) (Entered: 11/22/2002)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: None
      PROOF of service by Edwin Miller in 2:98-cv-70417 of [103-1], [102-1] and [101-1] in 2:98-cv-70417 (kb) (Entered: 11/14/2002)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: None
        DECLARATION of Lionel Z. Glancy in support of motion for an order authorizing the disbursement of the new settlement fund (kb) (Entered: 11/14/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: None
          AFFIDAVIT by Brian C. Burk regarding distribution of settlement fund (kb) (Entered: 11/14/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: None
            EXPARTE motion by Edwin Miller in 2:98-cv-70417 for an order authorizing the disbursement of the net settlement fund with brief (kb) (Entered: 11/14/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER and final judgment entered by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds [EOD Date: 9/25/01], with attachment. (PP) (Entered: 09/25/2001)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None
                PROOF of mailing by plaintiff in 2:98-cv-70417 of [89-1],[90-1],[92-1],[93-1],[94-1],[95-1],[96-1],[97-1],[98 - 1]. (PP) (Entered: 09/24/2001)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None
                  DECLARATION of Brian Murray (DT) (Entered: 09/20/2001)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None
                    DECLARATION of Lionel Z. Glancy (DT) (Entered: 09/20/2001)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None
                      DECLARATION of Leo W. Desmond (DT) (Entered: 09/20/2001)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None
                        DECLARATION of Garrett D. Blanchfield, Jr. (DT) (Entered: 09/20/2001)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION of Lionel Z. Glancy and Gerard Mantese (DT) Modified on 09/20/2001 (Entered: 09/20/2001)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None
                            DECLARATION of Joseph H. Weiss (DT) (Entered: 09/20/2001)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None
                              DECLARATION of Mel E. Lifshitz (DT) (Entered: 09/20/2001)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None
                                DECLARATION of Ira M. Press (DT) (Entered: 09/20/2001)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None
                                  BRIEF by plaintiffs in support of request for attorney fees and reimbusement of expenses with exhibits (DT) (Entered: 09/20/2001)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None
                                    MEMORANDUM of law by plaintiffs in support of plaintiffs' application for approval of the proposed class action settlement with proof of mailing (DT) (Entered: 09/20/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds with stipulation, modifying order dated 06/07/01 with respect to certification, notice and hearing on proposed class action settlement [EOD Date: 7/9/01] (dh) (Entered: 07/09/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: None
                                        PROOF of mailing of stipulated order regarding notice ot class (RH) (Entered: 06/27/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          LETTER by counsel for plaintiff Edwin Miller to Judge Edmunds in 2:98-cv-70417 regarding the stipulated order regarding notice to class with exhibit (DT) (Entered: 06/22/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds with stipulation, regarding notice to class [EOD Date: 6/15/01] (dh) (Entered: 06/15/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds with respect to certification, notice and setting hearing on proposed class action settlement for 10:00 8/14/01 in 98-70417 [EOD Date 6/6/01] (lh) (Entered: 06/06/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                STIPULATION of settlement [EOD Date: 6/6/01] with exhibits (lh) Modified on 06/06/2001 (Entered: 06/06/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                  PROOF of mailing of stipulation of settlement, order, notice and hearing on proposed class action settlement (ew) (Entered: 05/30/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                    NON-CERTIFIED copy of order from USCA remanding the case for further proceedings - appeal case # 00-1450 (dh) (Entered: 11/29/2000)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: None
                                                      PROOF of mailing of stipulated order regarding remand for purpose of considering tentative settlement (dh) (Entered: 11/14/2000)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/7/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds with stipulation regarding remand for purposes of considering tentative settlement [EOD Date: 11/9/00] (lh) (Entered: 11/09/2000)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: None
                                                          TRANSCRIPT taken on 4/21/99 of Motion to Dismiss Hearing (ew) (Entered: 05/15/2000)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: None
                                                            TRANSCRIPT taken on 3/1/00 of Motion to Dismiss Hearing (ew) (Entered: 05/15/2000)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: None
                                                              ACKNOWLEDGEMENT from USCA of receipt of appeal notice of appeal & docket [74-1] - appeal case # 00-1450 (PP) (Entered: 05/08/2000)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: None
                                                                TRANSCRIPT order form regarding appeal notice of appeal & docket [74-1] in 2:98-cv-70417, [0-1] in 2:98-cv-70783, [0-1] in 2:98-cv-70985, [0-1] in 2:98-cv-71285, [0-1] in 2:98-cv-71334 requesting transcript(s) of: 4/27/99,3/1/00 (ew) (Entered: 04/19/2000)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/11/2000, Entered: None
                                                                  CERTIFIED copy of appeal notice by plaintiffs [72-1] and docket transmitted to USCA (do) (Entered: 04/11/2000)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/11/2000, Entered: None
                                                                    PROOF of mailing of notice of appeal to USCA, all counsel of record and Suzanne Jacques (do) (Entered: 04/11/2000)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: None
                                                                      APPEAL by plaintiffs Edwin Miller, Reed Westphal, George Hoffman, Andrew Loesberg, Rich Schrager, Marvin Slomovics of orders [71-1] and [70-1] in 2:98-cv-70417 to USCA - FEE: PAID - Receipt #: 397144 (do) (Entered: 04/11/2000)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/24/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        JUDGMENT entered by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds for Brett A. Roberts, Richard E. Beckman, Donald A. Foss, Credit Acceptance against Edwin Miller at 0% interest [EOD Date: 3/28/00] (ew) (Entered: 03/28/2000)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/24/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          MEMORANDUM opinion and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds granting motion to dismiss plaintiffs' second amended consolidated class action complaint by Brett A. Roberts, Richard E. Beckman, Donald A. Foss, Credit Acceptance [59-1] in 2:98-cv-70417, [0-1] in 2:98-cv-70783, 2:98-cv-70417, 2:98-cv-70985, 2:98-cv-71285, 2:98-cv-71334 [EOD Date: 3/27/00] (ew) (Entered: 03/27/2000)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: None
                                                                            PROOF of mailing of amended order setting motion hearing date (ew) (Entered: 02/07/2000)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              AMENDED ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds, setting hearing on motion to dismiss plaintiffs' second amended consolidated class action complaint by Credit Acceptance, Donald A. Richard E. Beckman, Brett A. Roberts [59-1] for 2:00 [EOD Date 2/3/00] with proof of mailing (ew) (Entered: 02/03/2000)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                EXPARTE motion by defendants' for leave to file brief in excess of 5 pages with proposed order, exhibit and proof of mailing (no brief) (lh) (Entered: 01/18/2000)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/7/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds, setting hearing on motion to dismiss plaintiffs' second amended consolidated class action complaint by Credit Acceptance, Donald A. Richard E. Beckman, Brett A. Roberts [59-1] for 2:00 [EOD Date 1/10/00] (RH) (Entered: 01/10/2000)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/14/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                    PROOF of mailing of order regarding page length of responsive brief (DT) (Entered: 12/15/1999)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 64 Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                      APPENDIX of exhibits by defendants' Brett A. Roberts, Richard E. Beckman, Donald A. Foss, and Credit Acceptance in support of Motion to Dismiss plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Credit Acceptance, Donald A. Foss, Richard E. Beckman, Brett A. Roberts [53-1] (bk) (Entered: 12/07/1999)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/6/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE brief by plaintiff Edwin Miller in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Credit Acceptance, Donald A. Foss, Richard E. Beckman, Brett A. Roberts [59-1] with exhibits (bk) (Entered: 12/07/1999)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/6/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds GRANTING Motion to file brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss in excess of 20 pages by Edwin Miller [60-1] [EOD Date 12/7/99] (bk) (Entered: 12/07/1999)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                            PROOF of mailing by plaintiff Edwin Miller of Opposition to defendants' Motion to Dismiss (bk) (Entered: 12/06/1999)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/6/1999
                                                                                              EXPARTE motion and brief by plaintiff Edwin Miller to file brief in opposition to motion to dismiss in excess of 20 pages (bk) (Entered: 12/06/1999)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION by defendants to dismiss plaintiffs' second amended consolidated class action complaint with brief and proof of mailing (ls) (Entered: 12/01/1999)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                  PROOF of mailing of true copy of the stipulated order regarding plaintiff's motion to amend and extending briefing schedule on defendants' motion to dismiss (lh) (Entered: 11/15/1999)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 57 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                    AMENDED complaint 2 by plaintiff Edwin Miller, with jury demand, exhibit 1, A-J and proof of mailing (RH) (Entered: 11/12/1999)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds granting motion for leave to file second amended consolidated class action complaint by Edwin Miller [55-1]; setting deadline for response to motion to dismiss plaintiffs' first amended consolidated class action complaint [53-1] for 12/3/99 ; setting deadline for reply to response to motion to dismiss plaintiffs' first amended consolidated class action complaint [53-1] for 1/14/00 and re-scheduling hearing on motion to dismiss plaintiffs' first amended consolidated class action complaint by Credit Acceptance, Donald A. Foss, Richard E. Beckman, Brett A. Roberts [53-1] for 2:00 2/9/00 [EOD Date 11/12/99] (RH) (Entered: 11/12/1999)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/10/1999
                                                                                                        MOTION by plaintiff Edwin Miller for leave to file second amended consolidated class action complaint (RH) (Entered: 11/12/1999)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds, setting hearing on motion to dismiss plaintiffs' first amended consolidated class action complaint by Brett A. Roberts, Richard E. Beckman, Donald A. Foss, Credit Acceptance [53-1] for 2:00 2/2/00 [EOD Date 10/27/99] (ew) (Entered: 10/27/1999)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant Credit Acceptance, defendant Donald A. Foss, defendant Richard E. Beckman, defendant Brett A. Roberts to dismiss plaintiffs' first amended consolidated class action complaint , with brief, exhibits A-M and proof of mailing (RH) Modified on 10/07/1999 (Entered: 10/07/1999)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds granting motion to file excess pages by Credit Acceptance, Donald A. Foss, Richard E. Beckman, Brett A. Roberts [51-1] [EOD Date 10/7/99] (RH) (Entered: 10/07/1999)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/30/1999, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/6/1999
                                                                                                                EXPARTE motion by defendant to file excess pages , with proof of mailing (RH) (Entered: 10/04/1999)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  PROOF of mailing by defendants' of stipulation and order for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead. (PP) (Entered: 08/27/1999)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds with stipulation, extending time to answer amended complaint by Edwin Miller [47-1] , setting deadline for answer to amended complaint [47-1] for 9/30/99 [EOD Date: 8/24/99], with proof of mailing. (PP) (Entered: 08/24/1999)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds, reopening case [EOD Date 8/12/99] (PP) (Entered: 08/12/1999)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                        FIRST AMENDED complaint by plaintiff with jury demand, exhibits and proof of mailing (ls) (Entered: 08/03/1999)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/13/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds granting motion for reconsideration of the order dismissing the consolidated class action complaint with prejudice by Edwin Miller [42-1], granting motion motion for leave to file an amended complaint by Edwin Miller [42-2] with proof of mailing [EOD Date 7/14/99] (ls) (Entered: 07/14/1999)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/17/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REPLY to response to Motion for Reconsideration of the Order dismissing the consolidated class action complaint with prejudice by Edwin Miller [42-1] and proof of service (bk) (Entered: 06/25/1999)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by defendant to motion for reconsideration of the order dismissing the consolidated class action complaint with prejudice by Edwin Miller [42-1] and motion for leave to file an amended complaint by Edwin Miller [42-2] with exhibits A-D (RH) (Entered: 06/03/1999)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/12/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds, setting deadline for Response to Motion for Reconsideration of the Order Dismissing the consolidated class action complaint with prejudice by Edwin Miller [42-1] for 6/1/99 with certificate of mailing (bk) (Entered: 05/13/1999)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/13/1999
                                                                                                                                  MOTION by plaintiffs' for reconsideration of the order dismissing the consolidated class action complaint with prejudice and alternatively, motion for leave to file an amended complaint with declaration, exhibits and proof of mailing (lh) (Entered: 05/07/1999)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/23/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    JUDGMENT entered by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds for defendants' and against plaintiff (2:98-cv-70783 2:98-cv-70985 2:98-cv-71285 2:98-cv-71334) (RH) (Entered: 04/26/1999)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Opinion 40 Filed: 4/23/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      OPINION and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds granting motion to strike the affidavit of Michele M. Stanton submitted in support of plaintiffs' response [25-1] to defendants' and motion to dismiss [18-1] by Brett A. Roberts, Richard E. Beckman, Donald A. Foss, Credit Acceptance in 2:98-cv-70417; in 2:98-cv-70783; in 2:98-cv-70985; in 2:98-cv-70417; (RH) (Entered: 04/26/1999)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        AMENDED order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds scheduling hearing on motion to dismiss by Credit Acceptance, Donald A. Foss, Richard E. Beckman, Brett A. Roberts [18-1] for 12:00 4/21/99 in 2:98-cv-70417 with proof of mailing (lh) Modified on 03/31/1999 (Entered: 03/30/1999)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          PROOF of mailing by plaintiff in 2:98-cv-70417 of pleading #37 (lh) Modified on 03/31/1999 (Entered: 03/19/1999)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            SUBMISSION of additional supplemental authority plaintiff in 2:98-cv-70417in further opposition to motion to dismiss by Credit Acceptance, Donald A. Foss, Richard E. Beckman, Brett A. Roberts [18-1] in 2:98-cv-70417 with exhibt and attachments (lh) (Entered: 03/19/1999)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 2/25/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in opposition by plaintiffs' in 2:98-cv-70417, 2:98-cv-70783, 2:98-cv-70985, 2:98-cv-71285,2:98-cv-71334 to motion to strike the affidavit of Michele M. Stanton submitted in support of plaintiffs' response [25-1] to defendants' to dismiss [18-1] by Credit Acceptance, Donald A. Foss, Richard E. Beckman, Brett A. Roberts [31-1] in 2:98-cv-70417, motion to strike the affidavit of Michele M. Stanton submitted in support of plaintiffs' response [25-1] to defendants' motion to dismiss [18-1] by Credit Acceptance, Donald A. Foss, Richard E. Beckman, Brett A. Roberts [0-1] in 2:98-cv-70783, motion to strike the affidavit of Michele M. Stanton submitted in support of plaintiffs' response [25-1] to defendants' motion to dismiss [18-1] by Credit Acceptance, Donald A. Foss, Richard E. Beckman, Brett A. Roberts [0-1] in 2:98-cv-70985, motion to strike the affidavit of Michele M. Stanton submitted in support of plaintiffs' response [25-1] to defendants' motion to dismiss [18-1] by Credit Acceptance, Donald A. Foss, Richard E. Beckman, Brett A. Roberts [0-1] in 2:98-cv-71285, motion to strike the affidavit of Michele M. Stanton submitted in support of plaintiffs' response [25-1] to defendants' motion to dismiss [18-1] by Credit Acceptance, Donald A. Foss, Richard E. Beckman, Brett A. Roberts [0-1] in 2:98-cv-71334, with proof of mailing (PP) (Entered: 02/26/1999)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/17/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by court of non-admission of attorney Stanley D Bernstein, Mel E Lifshitz and Sandy A Liebhard (lh) (Entered: 02/18/1999)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  PROOF of mailing of true copy of order granting defendants leave to file a reply brief up to 20 pages in support of their motion to dismiss the consolidated amended complaint (lh) (Entered: 02/18/1999)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/9/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by defendants in 2:98-cv-70417 to plaintiffs' response to defendants' motion to dismiss [18-1] in 2:98-cv-70417 with exhibits (DT) (Entered: 02/10/1999)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/9/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds granting ex parte motion to file reply brief in excess of five pages [30-1] (DT) (Entered: 02/10/1999)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/5/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by defendants in 2:98-cv-70417 to strike the affidavit of Michele M. Stanton submitted in support of plaintiffs' response [25-1] to defendants' motion to dismiss [18-1] with brief (DT) (Entered: 02/08/1999)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/5/1999, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/9/1999
                                                                                                                                                          EXPARTE motion by defendants in 2:98-cv-70417 to file brief in excess of five pages (DT) (Entered: 02/08/1999)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/22/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by defendants' in 2:98-cv-70417, 2:98-cv-70783, 2:98-cv-70985, 2:98-cv-71285, 2:98-cv-71334, setting hearing on motion to dismiss for 2:00 3/24/99 (RH) (Entered: 01/25/1999)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              PROOF of mailing by defendant Brett A. Roberts in 2:98-cv-70417, defendant Richard E. Beckman in 2:98-cv-70417, defendant Donald A. Foss in 2:98-cv-70417, defendant Credit Acceptance in 2:98-cv-70417 of Agreed Order upon counsel of record (bk) (Entered: 01/21/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/7/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                PROOF of mailing of stipulation for extension of time to file reply brief and proposed order (ls) (Entered: 01/14/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/12/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds with stipulation, setting deadline for reply to response to motion to dismiss by Credit Acceptance, Donald A. Foss, Richard E. Beckman, Brett A. Roberts [18-1] for 2/5/99 in 2:98-cv-70417 (ls) (Entered: 01/14/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/18/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by plaintiffs in 2:98-cv-70417, 2:98-cv-70783, 2:98-cv-70985, 2:98-cv-71285, 2:98-cv-71334 to motion to dismiss by Brett A. Roberts, Richard E. Beckman, Donald A. Foss, Credit Acceptance [18-1] in 2:98-cv-70417, [0-1] in 2:98-cv-70783, [0-1] in 2:98-cv-70985, [0-1] in 2:98-cv-71285, [0-1] in 2:98-cv-71334 with brief and affidavit in support with attachments (ew) (Entered: 12/23/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/19/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds with stipulation expanding deadline for plaintiff to file response to motion to dismiss by Brett A. Roberts, Richard E. Beckman, Donald A. Foss, Credit Acceptance [18-1] set for 12/18/98 , deadline for defendants to file reply to plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss [18-1] set for 1/15/98 and scheduling hearing on motion to dismiss by Brett A. Roberts, Richard E. Beckman, Donald A. Foss, Credit Acceptance [18-1] set for 2:00 2/24/99 (lh) (Entered: 11/20/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/6/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds hearing on motion to dismiss by Brett A. Roberts, Richard E. Beckman, Donald A. Foss, Credit Acceptance [18-1] set for 2:00 1/27/99 in 2:98-cv-70417 with proof of mailing (ls) Modified on 11/09/1998 (Entered: 11/09/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF of mailing by defendants of order granting defendants leave to file a brief in excess of 20 pages. (PP) (Entered: 11/06/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/28/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF of mailing of true copy of stip and order extending time to answer or otherwise plead (lh) (Entered: 10/29/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/26/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            CORRECTED brief by Credit Acceptance, Donald A. Foss, Richard E. Beckman and Brett A. Roberts in 2:98-cv-70417 in support of their motion to dismiss [18-1] with proof of mailing (lh) (Entered: 10/29/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/27/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              APPENDIX of exhibits by defendants Credit Acceptance, Donald A. Foss, Richard E. Beckman, and Brett A. Roberts in 2:98-cv-70417 in support of motion to dismiss [18-1] (exhibits included) (lh) (Entered: 10/29/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/27/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by defendants Credit Acceptance, Donald A. Foss, Richard E. Beckman and Brett A. Roberts in 2:98-cv-70417 to dismiss with brief (lh) (Entered: 10/29/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/27/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE motion and order by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds for leave to file in excess of twenty pages (lh) (Entered: 10/28/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds with stipulation extending time to answer or otherwise plead (ls) (Entered: 10/06/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by firm of Mantese, Miller and Mantese, P.L.L.C. of change of address with proof of mailing. (PP) (Entered: 08/27/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT and jury demand with proof of mailing (ew) Modified on 08/17/1998 (Entered: 08/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/11/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds, setting deadline for filing first amended complaint , setting deadline for filing dispositive motions (ew) (Entered: 08/12/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/29/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds, appointing lead plaintiff and, approving selection of lead counsel (ew) (Entered: 07/30/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/25/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds, consolidating cases and administrative closing 98-70783,98-70985,98-71285 and 98-71334 with proof of mailing. (LS) Modified on 06/26/1998 (Entered: 06/26/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/11/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                APPEARANCE for defendants Richard E. Beckman, Donald A. Foss and Credit Acceptance of attorney Andrew J. McGuinness with proof of mailing (lh) (Entered: 06/15/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds, setting date for status conference with proof of mailing (bk) (Entered: 06/10/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT memorandum of law by plaintiffs and defendants in support of motion to consolidate pending actions [5-1] with attachment and proof of mailing (lh) (Entered: 05/29/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/30/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF of mailing of documents 5 and 6 (ew) (Entered: 03/31/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/30/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by plaintiffs for appointment as lead plaintiffs and, for approval of movants' selection of lead counsel and plaintiffs' counsel executive committee with memorandum in support and declaration of Marc Newman (ew) (Entered: 03/31/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/30/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by plaintiffs to consolidate cases for all purposes with memorandum in support and declaration of Marc Newman (ew) Modified on 06/26/1998 (Entered: 03/31/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS returned executed by personal service on 1/30/98 - answer due 2/19/98 for Richard E. Beckman (db) (Entered: 02/09/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS returned executed by personal servicwe on 1/30/98 - answer due 2/19/98 for Donald A. Foss (db) (Entered: 02/09/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS returned executed by certified mail on 1/30/98 - answer due 2/19/98 for Credit Acceptance (db) (Entered: 02/09/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/29/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT with; jury demand - Receipt # 356352 - Date Fee Received: 1/29/98 (PP) (Entered: 02/02/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 409 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?