Auto Tech Intl Inc v. TRW Vehicle Safety, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:02-cv-73572

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

  Entries (251) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Acknowledgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 Order Dismissing Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Motion for Reconsideration
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 Transcript
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 2/27/2007 Order on Motion in Limine
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Proposed Voir Dire
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Exhibit
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Exhibit
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Exhibit
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Exhibit
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Exhibit
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Pretrial Order - Joint Final
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 Order on Motion in Limine
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Response to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Response to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Response to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Response to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Response to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Response to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Response to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Response to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Response to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Response to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Response to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Response to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Exhibit
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Exhibit
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Exhibit
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: 2/7/2007 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: 2/7/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Notice of Change of Electronic Filing Registration Information
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006 Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 Order
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Transcript
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Application
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Notice to Appear
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 181 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006 order adopting report and recommendation
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006 Notice to Appear
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Report of Special Master
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006 Report (Free)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Report (Free)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Report (Free)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Order to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 Order on Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005 Notice of Correction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Notice of Failure to Comply with LR 5.1.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Response - Free
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Notice to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 ~Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Notice of Change of Electronic Filing Registration Information
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Notice to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 order adopting report and recommendation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004 Report and Recommendation - Special Master
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004 Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 Report and Recommendation - Special Master
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/9/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/29/2003, Entered: 12/31/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/18/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/24/2003 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: 9/18/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Deadline Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 Motion to Extend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Attorney Substitution
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003 Deadline Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?