Unknown
Bankruptcy Case Minnesota Bankruptcy Court, Case No. Unknown

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John A. Hedback, Trustee
No Logo MICHAEL THOMAS MULLEN, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Curtis K Walker Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curtis K Walker +1 612 824 4357 +1 612 824 8005 curt@bankruptcytruth.com
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "US Trustee"
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: None
Order Closing Case and Discharging Trustee. (klo) (Entered: 05/20/1996)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/3/1996, Entered: None
    Courts Certificate of Mailing Re: [5-1] Discharge Order by MICHAEL THOMAS MULLEN # of Notices: 23. (LMB) (Entered: 04/03/1996)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/2/1996, Entered: None
      Order Discharging Debtor MICHAEL THOMAS MULLEN (LMB) (Entered: 04/02/1996)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: None
        Trustee's Report of No Assets. (SKM) (Entered: 02/21/1996)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/4/1996, Entered: None
          Courts Certificate of Mailing Re: [2-1] First Meeting # of Notices: 23. (LMB) (Entered: 01/04/1996)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/2/1996, Entered: None
            Notice of First Meeting of Creditors under 11 USC 341(a) Scheduled For 10:00 1/30/96 At St. Paul Last Day To Oppose Discharge: 4/1/96 (LMB) (Entered: 01/02/1996)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/29/1995, Entered: None
              Voluntary Petition all schedules and statements. ( Filing Fee $ 175.00 Receipt # 55034) (LMB) (Entered: 01/02/1996)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 8 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?