Home Valu, Inc.- Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case Minnesota Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 10-04096
District Judge Nancy C Dreher, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo M&M Flooring, Inc., , Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE PORTER LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David E Albright +1 651 209 3103 dalbright@frontiernet.net
No Logo MN Carpet Crew, Inc., , Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE PORTER LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David E Albright +1 651 209 3103 dalbright@frontiernet.net
No Logo Naturally Wood Installations, Inc., , Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE PORTER LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David E Albright +1 651 209 3103 dalbright@frontiernet.net
No Logo Richard D. Olson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE PORTER LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David E Albright +1 651 209 3103 dalbright@frontiernet.net
No Logo Select Surfaces, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE PORTER LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David E Albright +1 651 209 3103 dalbright@frontiernet.net
No Logo Straight Edge Flooring, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE PORTER LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David E Albright +1 651 209 3103 dalbright@frontiernet.net
No Logo T. Meixell Floor Covering, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE PORTER LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David E Albright +1 651 209 3103 dalbright@frontiernet.net
v.
No Logo aka, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Boschwitz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David Jon Hoiland +1 612 573 3686 +1 612 330 0959 Hoilandesq@aol.com
No Logo Gerald Boschwitz, , Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David Jon Hoiland +1 612 573 3686 +1 612 330 0959 Hoilandesq@aol.com
No Logo JOHN DOE 1, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #2, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #3, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 4, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 5, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth Boschwitz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David Jon Hoiland +1 612 573 3686 +1 612 330 0959 Hoilandesq@aol.com
No Logo M&i Business Credit, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew M. Carlson +1 612 977 8242 +1 612 977 8650 acarlson@briggs.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Max C Heerman +1 612 977 8400 mheerman@briggs.com
LEAD ATTORNEY John R. McDonald +1 612 977 8754 jmcdonald@briggs.com
No Logo M&i Marshall & Ilsley Bank, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Max C Heerman +1 612 977 8400 mheerman@briggs.com
LEAD ATTORNEY John R. McDonald +1 612 977 8754 jmcdonald@briggs.com
No Logo Platinum Management LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Kathryn N Hibbard +1 612 373 0380 +1 612 373 0929 khibbard@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY John W. Ursu +1 612 373 8332 +1 612 373 0929 jursu@gr-espel.com
No Logo Rudolph Boschwitz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David Jon Hoiland +1 612 573 3686 +1 612 330 0959 Hoilandesq@aol.com
No Logo Thomas Boschwitz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David Jon Hoiland +1 612 573 3686 +1 612 330 0959 Hoilandesq@aol.com
No Logo Timothy D Moratzka, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Mackall, Crounse & Moore, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mychal A. Bruggeman +1 612 305 1478 mab@mcmlaw.com
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by M&I Business Credit LLC and Andrew M Carlson. Proof of service.. (Carlson, Andrew) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 04/22/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
      Order REMANDING AND Deferring Ruling on Motion to dismiss party (Related Doc # 51 ), REMANDING AND Deferring Ruling on Motion to dismiss party (Related Doc # 52 ), Granting Motion to amend complaint (Related Doc # 53 ). IF PLAINTIFF FILED A CLAIM IN DEBTOR'S BKY CASE, PLAINTIFF SHALL, WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THIS ORDER BECOMING FINAL AND NON-APPEALABLE, WITHDRAW SUCH CLAIM. (DREHER,J:4/20/11) (Karen K MNBM) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
        Objection by Defendant M&I Business Credit LLC to 53 Motion to amend complaint. Memorandum of law, Proof of service. (McDonald, John) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
          Opposition brief/memorandum (re: 53 Motion to amend complaint) filed by Platinum Management LLC. Proof of service.(Ursu, John) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
            Support brief/memorandum (re: 52 Motion to dismiss party) filed by M&I Business Credit LLC. Proof of service.(Heerman, Max) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
              Support brief/memorandum (re: 51 Motion to dismiss party) filed by Platinum Management LLC. Proof of service.(Hibbard, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                Amended complaint by David E Albright on behalf of M&M Flooring, Inc., MN Carpet Crew, Inc., Naturally Wood Installations, Inc., Richard D. Olson, Select Surfaces, Inc., Straight Edge Flooring, LLC, T. Meixell Floor Covering, Inc. against Daniel Boschwitz, Gerald Boschwitz, Kenneth Boschwitz, Rudolph Boschwitz, Thomas Boschwitz, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, M&I Business Credit LLC, Platinum Management LLC. (RE: related document(s) 1 Notice of removal filed by Plaintiff MN Carpet Crew, Inc., Plaintiff Naturally Wood Installations, Inc., Plaintiff M&M Flooring, Inc., Plaintiff Richard D. Olson, Plaintiff Select Surfaces, Inc., Plaintiff Straight Edge Flooring, LLC, Plaintiff T. Meixell Floor Covering, Inc.). (Albright, David) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                  Motion to amend complaint filed by MN Carpet Crew, Inc.. Hearing scheduled 4/20/2011 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 7 West, 7th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis - Judge Nancy C. Dreher. (Albright, David) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Renewed Motion to dismiss party filed by M&I Business Credit LLC. Proof of service. Hearing scheduled 4/20/2011 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 7 West, 7th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis - Judge Nancy C. Dreher. (McDonald, John) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Renewed Motion to dismiss party filed by Platinum Management LLC. Proof of service. Hearing scheduled 4/20/2011 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 7 West, 7th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis - Judge Nancy C. Dreher. (Ursu, John) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 02/17/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                          Order Re: 1) THE STAY OF THE PROCEEDING IMPLEMENTED BY THE COURT'S 8/3/10 ORDER AND EXTENDED BY THE 11/12/10 ORDER IS EXTINGUISHED. 2) PLAINTIFFS SHALL, WITHIN 15 DAYS, COORDINATE AND FILE MOTIONS TO AMEND THEIR COMPLAINTS AND TO DISMISS CERTAIN CLAIMS. 3) DEFENDANTS M & I BUSINESS CREDIT AND PLATINUM MANAGEMENT ARE PERMITTED TO RENEW THEIR MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITHIN 15 DAYS. 4) THE HEARINGS ON THE MOTIONS IDENTIFIED IN TERM 2 AND TERM 3 SHALL BE SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ON THE SAME DATE AND TIME. (DREHER,J:2/15/11) (Karen K MNBM) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/5/2011, Entered: None
                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 02/05/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/05/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                              Reply by Defendant M&I Business Credit LLC to 45 Report of trustee. (Heerman, Max) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Order for status conference. Status Conference set for 2/15/2011 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 7 West, 7th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis - Judge Nancy C. Dreher. (DREHER,CJ:2/3/11) (Karen K MNBM) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                  Report of trustee (re: 43 Order to/for) (Moratzka, Timothy) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/14/2010, Entered: None
                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 11/14/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                      Order Re: STAYING PROCEEDING TO FEBRUARY 1, 2011. (DREHER,CJ:11/10/10) (Karen K MNBM) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                        Report of trustee (Moratzka, Timothy) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 08/05/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None
                                            Order Re: DENYING (re: 24 Motion to dismiss party, 25 Motion to dismiss party, 32 Motion for abstention). THIS ACTION SHALL BE STAYED FOR 90 DAYS WHILE TRUSTEE INVESTIGATES ESTATE'S CLAIMS. (DREHER,CJ:8/3/10) (Karen K MNBM) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 07/22/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                Order Denying Motion for abstention (Related Doc # 32 ). THE ORAL MOTION BY M&I BUSINESS CREDIT TO STRIKE IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; DOCUMENT 18 (AFFIDAVIT OF DAVID E. ALBRIGHT) WAS WITHDRAWN ON THE RECORD; DOCUMENT 32-2 (AFFIDAVIT OF DAVID E. ALBRIGHT) IS STRICKEN EXCEPT FOR PARAGRAPHS 1, 2, 3, 4, 7, 9 AND 22; PAGES 2-6 OF DOCUMENT 37 (PLAINTIFFS' JOINT MEMO OPPOSING RULE 12 MOTION TO DISMISS M&I BUSINESS [SIC], LLC AND PLATINUM MANAGEMENT LLC) ARE STRICKEN. (DREHER,CJ:7/20/10) (Karen K MNBM) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                  Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding Memorandum Joint of Pltfs filed by MN Carpet Crew, Inc.. Memorandum of law. Hearing scheduled 7/20/2010 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 7 West, 7th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis - Judge Nancy C. Dreher. (Albright, David) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                    Response by Defendants Daniel Boschwitz, Gerald Boschwitz, Kenneth Boschwitz, Rudolph Boschwitz, Thomas Boschwitz to 32 Motion for abstention. An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proof of service. (Hoiland, David) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                      Objection by Defendants M&I Business Credit LLC, M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank to 32 Motion for abstention. An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proof of service, Proposed order. (McDonald, John) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                        Response by Trustee TIMOTHY D MORATZKA to 24 Motion to dismiss party, 25 Motion to dismiss party, 32 Motion for abstention. Proof of service. (Bruggeman, Mychal) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                          Opposition brief/memorandum (re: 32 Motion for abstention) filed by Platinum Management LLC. Proof of service.(Ursu, John) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Motion for abstention filed by Plaintiff MN Carpet Crew, Inc.. An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proof of service. Hearing scheduled 7/20/2010 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 7 West, 7th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis - Judge Nancy C. Dreher. (Attachments: # 1 Not of Hrg# 2 Aff D Albright# 3 Exhibits Aff D Albright# 4 Memorandum Motion to Abstain# 5 Cert Serv) (Albright, David) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ENTRY EDITED: IMAGE SUPPRESSED. DOCUMENT REFILED AS #32 WITH ATTACHMENTS. Motion for abstention filed by Plaintiff MN Carpet Crew, Inc.. Hearing scheduled 7/20/2010 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 7 West, 7th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis - Judge Nancy C. Dreher. (Albright, David) Modified on 7/9/2010 (Karen K MNBM). (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                Support brief/memorandum (re: 25 Motion to dismiss party) filed by M&I Business Credit LLC. Proof of service. (McDonald, John) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  Support brief/memorandum (re: 24 Motion to dismiss party, 28 Amended notice of hearing) filed by Platinum Management LLC. Proof of service.(Ursu, John) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    Amended notice of hearing (re: 24 Motion to dismiss party) filed by Platinum Management LLC. Proof of service. (re: 24 Motion to dismiss party). Hearing to be held on 7/20/2010 at 10:30 AM for 24 , (Hibbard, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Notice of rescheduled hearing (re: 24 Motion to dismiss party, 25 Motion to dismiss party) filed by M&I Business Credit LLC. (re: 24 Motion to dismiss party, 25 Motion to dismiss party). Hearing to be held on 7/20/2010 at 10:30 AM Courtroom 7 West, 7th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis - Judge Nancy C. Dreher for 25 and for 24 , (McDonald, John) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 04/30/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/01/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                          Motion to dismiss party filed by M&I Business Credit LLC. Proof of service. Hearing scheduled 6/16/2010 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 7 West, 7th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis - Judge Nancy C. Dreher. (McDonald, John) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                            Motion to dismiss party filed by Platinum Management LLC. Proof of service. Hearing scheduled 6/16/2010 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 7 West, 7th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis - Judge Nancy C. Dreher. (Ursu, John) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              Order Re: (re: 22 Stipulation) SUBSTITUTING PLATINUM MANAGEMENT, LLC FOR DEFENDANT PLATINUM GROUP CONSULTING. (DREHER,CJ:4/28/10) (Karen K MNBM) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                ENTRY EDITED: STIPULATION IS BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND PLATINUM MANAGEMENT GROUP ONLY, NOT ALL DEFENDANTS AS DOCKETED. Stipulation filed by Daniel Boschwitz, Gerald Boschwitz, Kenneth Boschwitz, Rudolph Boschwitz, Thomas Boschwitz, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, M&I Business Credit LLC, M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank, M&M Flooring, Inc., MN Carpet Crew, Inc., Naturally Wood Installations, Inc., Richard D. Olson, Platinum Management LLC, Select Surfaces, Inc., Straight Edge Flooring, LLC, T. Meixell Floor Covering, Inc. and David E. Albright. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: Stipulation to Substitute Platinum Management. LLC for Defendant Platinum Group Consulting(Ursu, John) Modified on 4/28/2010 (Karen K MNBM). (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  COPY OF ORDER re 19 Stipulation. MIBC is hereby substituted for M&I, and M&I is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs may file a second amended complaint consistent with the Stipulation, all documents previously filed on behalf of M&I shall stand as documents filed on behalf of MIBC, and Defendant M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank's previously filed Notice of Motion and Motions to Dismiss shall constitute MIBCs responsive pleading to the second amended complaint. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 4/23/10 ORIGINALLY ENTERED IN U.S DISTRICT COURT CASE 10-615 ON 4/23/10. (MaryB MNBM QC) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    COPY OF STIPULATION to Refer this Case to the Bankruptcy Court by Daniel Boschwitz, Gerald Boschwitz, Kenneth Boschwitz, Rudolph Boschwitz, Thomas Boschwitz, M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank, M&M Flooring, Inc., MN Carpet Crew, Inc., Naturally Wood Installations, Inc., Richard D. Olson, Platinum Group Consulting, Select Surfaces, Inc., Straight Edge Flooring, LLC, T. Meixell Floor Covering, Inc. ORIGINALLY ENTERED IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT CASE 10-615 ON 4/23/10. (MaryB MNBM QC) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      COPY OF STIPULATION to Substitute M&I Business Credit, LLC for Defendant M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank by M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank, M&M Flooring, Inc., MN Carpet Crew, Inc., Naturally Wood Installations, Inc., Richard D. Olson, Select Surfaces, Inc., Straight Edge Flooring, LLC, T. Meixell Floor Covering, Inc. ORIGNINALLY ENTERED IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT CASE 10-615 ON 4/23/10. (MaryB MNBM QC) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        COPY OF AFFIDAVIT of David E Albright in SUPPORT OF 15 MOTION to Remand filed by M&M Flooring, Inc., MN Carpet Crew, Inc., Naturally Wood Installations, Inc., Richard D. Olson, Select Surfaces, Inc., Straight Edge Flooring, LLC, T. Meixell Floor Covering, Inc. ORIGINALLY ENTERED IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT CASE 10-615 ON 4/5/10. EXHIBITS. (MaryB MNBM QC) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by M&M Flooring, Inc., MN Carpet Crew, Inc., Naturally Wood Installations, Inc., Richard D. Olson, Select Surfaces, Inc., Straight Edge Flooring, LLC, T. Meixell Floor Covering, Inc. re 15 MOTION to Remand, 16 Notice of Hearing on Motion ORIGINALLY ENTERED IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT CASE 10-615 ON 4/2/10. (MaryB MNBM QC) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            COPY OF NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 15 MOTION to Remand : Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz ORIGINALLY ENTERED IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT CASE 10-615 ON 4/2/10. (MaryB MNBM QC) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              COPY OF MOTION to Remand by M&M Flooring, Inc., MN Carpet Crew, Inc., Naturally Wood Installations, Inc., Richard D. Olson, Select Surfaces, Inc., Straight Edge Flooring, LLC, T. Meixell Floor Covering, Inc. ORIGINALLY ENTERED IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT CASE 10-615 ON 4/2/10. (MaryB MNBM QC) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Boschwitz, Gerald Boschwitz, Kenneth Boschwitz, Rudolph Boschwitz, Thomas Boschwitz ORIGINALLY ENTERED IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT CASE 10-615 ON 3/11/10. MaryB MNBM QC) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint by Daniel Boschwitz, Gerald Boschwitz, Kenneth Boschwitz, Rudolph Boschwitz, Thomas Boschwitz ORIGINALLY ENTERED IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT CASE 10-615 ON 3/11/10. (MaryB MNBM QC) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Platinum Group Consulting re 10 MOTION to Dismiss, 11 Notice of Hearing on Motion ORIGINALLY ENTERED IN U.S. DISTRCT COURT CASE 10-615 ON 3/11/10. (MaryB MNBM QC) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      COPY OF NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 10 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz ORIGINALLY ENTERED IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT CASE NO. 10-615 ON 3/11/10. (MaryB MNBM QC) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        COPY OF MOTION to Dismiss by Platinum Group Consulting ORIGINALLY ENTERED IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT CASE NO. 10-615 ON 3/11/10. (MaryB MNBM QC) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank re 8 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 7 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Join the Trustee of the Bankruptcy Estate of Home Valu, Inc. to any Surviving Claims Against M&I ORIGINALLY ENTERED IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT CASE NO. 10-615 ON 3/11/10. (MaryB MNBM QC) Modified on 4/27/2010 (MaryB MNBM QC). (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            COPY OF NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 7 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Join the Trustee of the Bankruptcy Estate of Home Valu, Inc. to any Surviving Claims Against M&I : Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz ORIGINALLY ENTERED IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT CASE NO. 10-615 ON 3/11/10. (MaryB MNBM QC) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              COPY OF MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Join the Trustee of the Bankruptcy Estate of Home Valu, Inc. to any Surviving Claims Against M&I by M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank ORIGINALLY ENTERED IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT CASE NO. 10-615 ON 3/11/10. (MaryB MNBM QC) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                COPY OF AFFIDAVIT of Service by M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank re 2 Notice of Removal,, and Request for Immediate Referral to Bankruptcy Cover, and Civil Cover Sheet ORIGINALLY ENTERED IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT CASE NO. 10-615 ON 3/11/10. (MaryB MNBM QC) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  COPY OF RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank of Marshall & Ilsley Corporation as corporate parent and/or publicly held company ORIGINALLY ENTERED IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT CASE NO. 10-615 ON 3/11/10. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (MaryB MNBM QC). (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    COPY OF RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Platinum Group Consulting that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report ORIGINALLY ENTERED IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT CASE NO. 10-615 ON 3/8/10. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (MaryB MNBM QC). (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      COPY OF DISQUALIFICATION AND ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT ORIGINALLY ENTERED IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT CASE NO. 10-615 ON 3/5/10. Judge James M. Rosenbaum recused. Case reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 10cv615 PJS/FLN. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge James M. Rosenbaum on 3/5/2010. (MaryB MNBM QC). (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        COPY OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL ORIGINALLY ENTERED IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT CASE NO. 10-615 ON 3/4/10 from Dakota County their case number 19 HA CV-10-807, by Gerald Boschwitz, Daniel Boschwitz, Kenneth Boschwitz, Platinum Group Consulting, M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank, Rudolph Boschwitz, Thomas Boschwitz from Dakota County First Judicial District, ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4-2722). Assigned to Judge James M.Rosenbaum per Master List, referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. AMENDED COMPLAINT, COMPLAINT AND CIVIL COVER SHEET (MaryB MNBM QC). (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Adversary case 10-04096. COPY OF DISTRICT COURT ORDER ORIGINALLY ENTERED IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT CASE NO. 10-615 ON APRIL 23, 2010, REFERRING MATTER TO BANKRUPTCY COURT. (MaryB MNBM QC). (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?