PB&J Software, LLC v. Code 42 Software, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:09-cv-00206
District Judge Donovan W. Frank, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 7:51 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pb&j Software, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwebel Goetz & Sieben, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S Ballentine +1 612 333 8361
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R Schwebel +1 612 333 8361 +1 612 333 6311 jschwebel@schwebel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Coburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Gerard Simon +1 314 552 6000 +2412 241 241 2029
No Logo Code 42 Software, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leonard Street and Deinard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin D Conneely +1 612 335 1500 +1 612 335 1657 kevin.conneely@leonard.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erik M Drange +1 612 335 1421 +1 612 335 1657 erik.drange@leonard.com
No Logo Cucku, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leonard Street and Deinard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin D Conneely +1 612 335 1500 +1 612 335 1657 kevin.conneely@leonard.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erik M Drange +1 612 335 1421 +1 612 335 1657 erik.drange@leonard.com
No Logo Q Point Technology, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leonard Street and Deinard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin D Conneely +1 612 335 1500 +1 612 335 1657 kevin.conneely@leonard.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erik M Drange +1 612 335 1421 +1 612 335 1657 erik.drange@leonard.com
v.
No Logo Code 42 Software, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leonard Street and Deinard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin D Conneely +1 612 335 1500 +1 612 335 1657 kevin.conneely@leonard.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erik M Drange +1 612 335 1421 +1 612 335 1657 erik.drange@leonard.com
No Logo Cucku, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leonard Street and Deinard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin D Conneely +1 612 335 1500 +1 612 335 1657 kevin.conneely@leonard.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erik M Drange +1 612 335 1421 +1 612 335 1657 erik.drange@leonard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Coburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Gerard Simon +1 314 552 6000 +2412 241 241 2029
No Logo LogMein Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP (919 Third Ave)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sydenham B. Alexander, III +1 617 526 6049 +1 617 526 5000 sandy.alexander@wilmerhale.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel Cavanaugh +1 617 526 6625 +1 617 526 5000 joel.cavanaugh@wilmerhale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David H. Judson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H Judson +1 972 385 2018 +1 253 369 3141 mail@davidjudson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wayne L. Stoner +1 617 526 6000 +1 617 526 5000 Wayne.Stoner@haledorr.com
No Logo Q Point Technology, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leonard Street and Deinard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin D Conneely +1 612 335 1500 +1 612 335 1657 kevin.conneely@leonard.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erik M Drange +1 612 335 1421 +1 612 335 1657 erik.drange@leonard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwebel Goetz & Sieben, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S Ballentine +1 612 333 8361
No Logo Pb&j Software, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwebel Goetz & Sieben, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S Ballentine +1 612 333 8361
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R Schwebel +1 612 333 8361 +1 612 333 6311 jschwebel@schwebel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Coburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Gerard Simon +1 314 552 6000 +2412 241 241 2029
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (108) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 1/6/2012. (BJS) cc: Joel Cavanaugh. Modified on 1/9/2012 (lmb). (Entered: 01/06/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Code 42 Software, Inc., PB&J Software, LLC. (Kramer, Charles) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
      NOTICE by PB&J Software, LLC, Code 42 Software, Inc., JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1-PB&J's Claim Chart, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2-Code 42's Claim Chart, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3-Declaration of W. Curtis Preston, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4-Declaration of Ron Cytron). (Nolte, Nelson) Modified filers on 10/4/2011 (lmb). (Entered: 10/04/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
        LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by PB&J Software, LLC LETTER TO JUDGE DONOVAN FRANK RE JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT. (Nolte, Nelson) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PB&J Software, LLC re 102 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 101 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 100 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Curtis Preston and to Preclude His Testimony Via Deposition, Live Testimony Or Otherwise, 103 Affidavit in Support of Motion, and Proposed Order (Kramer, Charles) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
            DECLARATION of Charles S. Kramer in SUPPORT OF 100 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Curtis Preston and to Preclude His Testimony Via Deposition, Live Testimony Or Otherwise filed by PB&J Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Curtis Preston, # 2 Exhibit(s) Deposition of Curtis Preston, # 3 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Ron K. Cytron). (Kramer, Charles) Modified text on 9/30/2011 (lmb). (Entered: 09/29/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM in Support re 100 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Curtis Preston and to Preclude His Testimony Via Deposition, Live Testimony Or Otherwise filed by PB&J Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kramer, Charles) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 100 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Curtis Preston and to Preclude His Testimony Via Deposition, Live Testimony Or Otherwise : Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Kramer, Charles) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Curtis Preston and to Preclude His Testimony Via Deposition, Live Testimony Or Otherwise by PB&J Software, LLC. (Kramer, Charles) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin P Freedland on behalf of Code 42 Software, Inc.. (Freedland, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      THIRD AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER Amended Pleadings due by 10/21/2011. Discovery due by 5/11/2012. Motions (non-disp) due 5/25/2012. Motions (disp) due by 7/13/2012. Ready for trial due by 12/1/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 08/30/2011. (jz) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Code 42 Software, Inc., PB&J Software, LLC re 96 Stipulation (Axtell, David) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                          STIPULATION Joint Stipulated Motion for a Third Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order by Code 42 Software, Inc., PB&J Software, LLC. (Axtell, David) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Ruth A Rivard on behalf of Code 42 Software, Inc.. (Rivard, Ruth) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                              Plaintiff's REPLY to Counterclaim of Defendant by PB&J Software, LLC with attached Certificate of Service. (Nolte, Nelson) Modified text on 7/28/2011 (MMP). (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Schwebel, James) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER 1. The parties' July 21, 2011 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Answer to Defendant's Counterclaims [Docket No. 90 ] is granted. 2. On or before July 29, 2011, plaintiff shall serve and file its answer to defendant's counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 07/22/2011. (jz) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by PB&J Software, LLC re 90 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaims (Nolte, Nelson) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaims by PB&J Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1- Proposed Answer)(Nolte, Nelson) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A Lengeling on behalf of PB&J Software, LLC. (Lengeling, Robert) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ballentine, James) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            SECOND AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/21/2011, Discovery due by 5/11/2012, Motions (non-disp) due 5/25/2012, Motions (disp) due by 7/13/2012, Ready for trial due by 12/1/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 5/23/11. (jam) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against PB&J Software, LLC by Code 42 Software, Inc.. (Axtell, David) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PB&J Software, LLC or Second Amended Scheduling Order (Nolte, Nelson) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER: 1. The stay is lifted, and this case may proceed. 2. On or before May 20, 2011, defendant shall serve and file a response to the Amended Complaint. 3. On or before May 20, 2011, the parties shall submit to the undersigned a proposed Second Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order. If the parties cannot agree, each party should submit their own proposed Second Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 5/9/11. (jam) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                    LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by PB&J Software, LLC and Code 42 Software, Inc.. (Nolte, Nelson) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by David D Axtell on behalf of Code 42 Software, Inc.. (Axtell, David) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Schwebel, James) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PB&J Software, LLC re 79 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for William B. Cunningham, Jr., 78 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Nelson D. Nolte, 77 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Charles S. Kramer, 76 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Eric W. Evans (Schwebel, James) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for William B. Cunningham, Jr. by PB&J Software, LLC. (Schwebel, James) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Nelson D. Nolte by PB&J Software, LLC. (Schwebel, James) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Charles S. Kramer by PB&J Software, LLC. (Schwebel, James) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Eric W. Evans by PB&J Software, LLC. (Schwebel, James) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Drange, Erik) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 12/16/2010. (BJS) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by PB&J Software, LLC, Q Point Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ballentine, James) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          JUDGMENT as to Cucku, Inc. only. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Notice - appeal, # 2 Civil-8th Circuit Pre-Hearing Conference Notice)(LPH) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            FINAL JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST CUCKO, INC. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 9/3/2010. (BJS) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              STIPULATION For Entry of Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction by Cucku, Inc., PB&J Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) a)(Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for PB&J Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ballentine, James) Modified on 8/30/2010 (jam). (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the retirement of Judge Rosenbaum, this case is reassigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank. Judge James M. Rosenbaum no longer assigned to the case.(JME) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER of Dismissal per 65 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant LogMeIn, Inc. Signed by Judge James M. Rosenbaum on 7/28/2010. (HLW) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LogMeIn, Inc. re 65 Stipulation of Dismissal (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to LogMeIn, Inc. ONLY filed by LogMeIn, Inc., PB&J Software, LLC. (Bazis, Jeanette) Modified filers and text on 7/28/2010 (akl). (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER That LogMeIn, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Supplementation of Plaintiff's Infringement Claim Chart Docket No. 47 and plaintiff's Motion to Continue Hearing on Defendant LogMeIn, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Docket No. 58 are denied as moot. These motions may be refiled, if necessary, after the stay has been lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 01/28/2010. (jz) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 12/14/09. (LPH) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 47 MOTION to Compel Supplementatoin of Plaintiff's Infringement Claim Chart : Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                STIPULATION (Joint) for Stay of Action Pending Reexamination Proceedings of Patent-In-Suit by Code 42 Software, Inc., Cucku, Inc., LogMeIn, Inc., PB&J Software, LLC, Q Point Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Drange, Erik) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER for ( Settlement Conference set for 1/15/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 12/4/09. (RLR) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER Pursuant to the parties' 11/24/09 Joint Stipulated Motion for A First Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order [Docket No. 54]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 12/2/09. (LPH) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendant LogMeIn, Inc.'s Motion to Compel by PB&J Software, LLC. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Code 42 Software, Inc., Cucku, Inc., Q Point Technology, Inc. re 55 Memorandum, 56 Declaration in Opposition, Regarding Defendant LogMeIn's Motion to Compel (Conneely, Kevin) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Erik M. Drange in Opposition to 47 MOTION to Compel Supplementatoin of Plaintiff's Infringement Claim Chart filed by Code 42 Software, Inc., Cucku, Inc., Q Point Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, part 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) A, part 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) A, part 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) B, # 5 Exhibit(s) C, # 6 Exhibit(s) D, # 7 Exhibit(s) E, # 8 Exhibit(s) F, # 9 Exhibit(s) G, # 10 Exhibit(s) H)(Conneely, Kevin) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Code 42 Software, Inc., Cucku, Inc., Q Point Technology, Inc. of Defendants in Response to Defendant LogMeIn's Motion to Compel filed by Code 42 Software, Inc., Cucku, Inc., Q Point Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Conneely, Kevin) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              STIPULATION (Joint) for a First Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order by Code 42 Software, Inc., Cucku, Inc., LogMeIn, Inc., PB&J Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Conneely, Kevin) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 47 MOTION to Compel Supplementatoin of Plaintiff's Infringement Claim Chart filed by PB&J Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F)(Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  REQUEST re 48 Notice of Hearing on Motion Telephonic Hearing Requested by PB&J Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ballentine, James) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LogMeIn, Inc. re 47 MOTION to Compel Supplementatoin of Plaintiff's Infringement Claim Chart, 50 Declaration in Support, 48 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 49 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Declaration of Joel Cavanaugh in Support of 47 MOTION to Compel Supplementatoin of Plaintiff's Infringement Claim Chart filed by LogMeIn, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E)(Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 47 MOTION to Compel Supplementatoin of Plaintiff's Infringement Claim Chart filed by LogMeIn, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 47 MOTION to Compel Supplementatoin of Plaintiff's Infringement Claim Chart : Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Supplementatoin of Plaintiff's Infringement Claim Chart by LogMeIn, Inc.. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David H. Judson by LogMeIn, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bazis, Jeanette) Modified text on 11/6/2009 (kt). (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 10/15/09. (LPH) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION For Protective Order by all parties. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Drange, Erik) Modified text on 10/16/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2010. Discovery due by 12/1/2010. Motions (non-disp) due 12/15/2010. Motions (disp) due by 2/1/2011. Ready for trial due by 4/1/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 8/26/09. (LPH) (Entered: 08/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/24/2009. Order to issue. (LPH) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - NOTICE by PB&J Software, LLC of Proposed Pretrial Scheduling Order (Grochocinski, Timothy) Modified on 8/17/2009 (jam). (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by PB&J Software, LLC, Code 42 Software, Inc., Cucku, Inc., Q Point Technology, Inc., and Logmein, Inc.(Grochocinski, Timothy) Modified filers on 8/17/2009 (jam). (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PB&J Software, LLC (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LogMeIn, Inc. re 36 Answer to Amended Complaint, 37 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LogMeIn, Inc. that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint by LogMeIn, Inc.. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Timothy E. Grochocinski by PB&J Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ballentine, James) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Amended MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Wayne L. Stoner by LogMeIn, Inc.. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LogMeIn, Inc. re 32 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Sydenham B. Alexander, 30 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Wayne L. Stoner, 31 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Joel Cavanaugh (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Sydenham B. Alexander by LogMeIn, Inc.. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Joel Cavanaugh by LogMeIn, Inc.. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - wrong document. Replaced by doc. #34. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Wayne L. Stoner by LogMeIn, Inc.. (Bazis, Jeanette) Modified on 7/28/2009 (MMC). (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by PB&J Software, LLC. LogMeIn, Inc. served on 7/20/2009, answer due 8/10/2009. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by PB&J Software, LLC. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 26 Stipulation to file Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 7/10/09. (kt) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION to Amend by PB&J Software, LLC., Code 42 Software, Inc., Cucku, Inc., and Q Point Technology, Inc. (Simon, Anthony) Modified filers on 7/8/2009 (jam). (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's REPLY to Counterclaim of Code 42 Software, Inc. by PB&J Software, LLC. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's REPLY to Counterclaim of Q Point Technology, Inc. by PB&J Software, LLC. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's REPLY to Counterclaim of Cucku, Inc. by PB&J Software, LLC. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER from Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron to Counsel with Notice of Pretrial Conference attached and proposed Pretrial Scheduling Order. Pretrial conference set for 8/24/09 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron in Chambers, Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/14/09. (kt) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Q Point Technology, Inc. that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Conneely, Kevin) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cucku, Inc. that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Conneely, Kevin) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Code 42 Software, Inc. that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Conneely, Kevin) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Code 42 Software, Inc., Cucku, Inc., Q Point Technology, Inc. re 15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Conneely, Kevin) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against PB&J Software, LLC by Code 42 Software, Inc. (Conneely, Kevin) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against PB&J Software, LLC by Q Point Technology, Inc. (Conneely, Kevin) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against PB&J Software, LLC by Cucku, Inc. (Conneely, Kevin) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-NOTICE by PB&J Software, LLC re 13 Amended Complaint (Simon, Anthony) Modified text on 6/8/2009 (akl). (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECT CASE CAPTION-WILL REFILE--AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by PB&J Software, LLC. (Simon, Anthony) Modified on 6/8/2009 (akl). (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by PB&J Software, LLC. Cucku, Inc. served on 4/21/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by PB&J Software, LLC. Code 42 Software, Inc. served on 4/20/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by PB&J Software, LLC. Q Point Technology, Inc. served on 4/21/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR- TO BE REFILED // Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Cucku, Inc. on 04/21/2009, filed by PB&J Software, LLC. (Simon, Anthony) Modified text on 5/20/2009 (lph). (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR- TO BE REFILED // Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Matthew Dornquast on 04/20/2009, filed by PB&J Software, LLC. (Simon, Anthony) Modified text on 5/20/2009 (lph). (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 5 Stipulation; Code 42 Software, Inc. answer due 6/8/2009; Cucku, Inc. answer due 6/8/2009; Q Point Technology, Inc. answer due 6/8/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 5/13/09. (LPH) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 09cv206 JMR/JSM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 5/12/09. (JME) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, For Extension of Time to Respond by Code 42 Software, Inc., Cucku, Inc., Q Point Technology, Inc. and PB&J Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Conneely, Kevin) Modified filers on 5/12/2009 (jam). (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Erik M. Drange on behalf of Code 42 Software, Inc., Cucku, Inc., Q Point Technology, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Conneely, Kevin) Modified text on 5/11/2009 (akl). (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin D Conneely on behalf of Code 42 Software, Inc., Cucku, Inc., Q Point Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Conneely, Kevin) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Anthony G. Simon by PB&J Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Schwebel, James) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Code 42 Software, Inc., Cucku, Inc., Q Point Technology, Inc., Universe Point, L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4-30029), filed by PB&J Software, LLC. Assigned to Judge James M. Rosenbaum per Patent List, referred to Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jam) Document QC'd by JME. (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 160 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?