UnitedHealth Group Incorporated v. Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., et al.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:09-cv-00210
District Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 30, 2016 at 5:20 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo UnitedHealth Group, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "UnitedHealth Group Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JEFFREY J. BOUSLOG +1 612 605 2801 +6077 607 607 7100

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Esta L Brand +1 415 591 7022 ebrand@cov.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samantha J Choe +1 415 591 7037 schoe@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S Greenberg +1 415 591 7006 mgreenberg@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oppenheimer Wolff & Donnelly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine L Nessa +1 612 607 7000 +1 612 607 7100 cnessa@oppenheimer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marie L van Uitert +1 612 607 7000 +1 612 607 7100 mvanuitert@oppenheimer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine M Wilhoit +1 612 607 7346 +1 612 607 7100 kwilhoit@oppenheimer.com
v.
No Logo ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KEVIN M. HAAS +1 973 286 1200 khaas@cozen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J Sheridan +1 612 338 8788 ssheridan@foleymansfield.com
No Logo American Alternative Insurance Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam-NA H Fleischer
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bonny-NA S Garcha

Toggle Switch Represented by Bassford Remele, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Anderson +1 612 333 3000 +1 612 333 8829 johna@bassford.com
No Logo Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric C Tostrud +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 ectostrud@locklaw.com
No Logo Columbia Casualty Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J.-NA Robert Hall
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca-NA R. Haller
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael-NA M Marick

Toggle Switch Represented by Meagher & Geer, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tiffany M Brown +1 612 371 1324 tbrown@meagher.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katrina M Giedt +1 612 347 9147 +1 612 877 3041 kgiedt@meagher.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles E. Spevacek +1 612 338 0661 +1 612 338 8384 cspevacek@meagher.com
No Logo Darwin National Assurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis K. Loss +1 202 662 2031

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monte A Mills +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 mmills@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson, Loss & Judge, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Dendinger +1 202 778 4060 +1 202 778 4099 MDENDINGER@LJWLLP.COM
No Logo Executive Risk Specialty Insurance Company, Defendant

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Hangley, Aronchick, Segal & Pudlin, Esqs.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J Layden +1 215 496 7021 +1 215 851 1021 dlayden@hangley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald Paltin Schiller +1 215 496 7020 +1 215 851 1020 rschiller@hangley.com
No Logo Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lind Jensen Sullivan & Peterson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William L Davidson +1 612 333 3637 +1 612 333 1030 wld@lindjensen.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ted Edwin Sullivan +1 612 333 3637 +1 612 333 1030 ted.sullivan@lindjensen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louise M McCabe +1 415 984 8200 lmccabe@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo First Specialty Insurance Corporation, Defendant

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Hangley, Aronchick, Segal & Pudlin, Esqs.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J Layden +1 215 496 7021 +1 215 851 1021 dlayden@hangley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald Paltin Schiller +1 215 496 7020 +1 215 851 1020 rschiller@hangley.com
No Logo Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lazare Potter & Giacovas LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen M Lazare +1 212 758 9300 slazare@lpgllp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David E Potter +1 212 758 9300 +1 212 888 0919 dpotter@lpgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David D Leishman +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 ddleishman@locklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric C Tostrud +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 ectostrud@locklaw.com
No Logo Homeland Insurance Company of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bailey Cavalieri LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/11/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darius N Kandawalla +1 614 221 3155 darius.kandawalla@baileycavalieri.com
TERMINATED: 01/11/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith Little +1 614 221 3155 +1 614 221 0479 keith.little@baileycavalieri.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J Gollinger +1 612 339 2020 +1 612 336 9100 mgollinger@zelle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia J St Peter +1 612 339 2020 +1 612 336 9100 pstpeter@zelle.com
No Logo Lexington Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lazare Potter & Giacovas LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen M Lazare +1 212 758 9300 slazare@lpgllp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David E Potter +1 212 758 9300 +1 212 888 0919 dpotter@lpgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David D Leishman +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 ddleishman@locklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric C Tostrud +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 ectostrud@locklaw.com
Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc. Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Liberty Mutual Insurance Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bethany K Culp +1 612 333 3434 +1 612 334 8888 bculp@hinshawlaw.com

Represented by Peabody & Arnold LLP

No Logo National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin A Oglesbay +1 612 766 7527 +1 612 766 1600 eoglesbay@faegre.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winthrop & Weinstine, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas H Boyd +1 612 604 6400 +1 612 604 6800 tboyd@winthrop.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Pearson +1 612 604 6692 +1 612 604 6892 dpearson@winthrop.com
No Logo Starr Excess Liability Insurance International Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Winthrop & Weinstine, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas H Boyd +1 612 604 6400 +1 612 604 6800 tboyd@winthrop.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Pearson +1 612 604 6692 +1 612 604 6892 dpearson@winthrop.com
No Logo Steadfast Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bethany K Culp +1 612 333 3434 +1 612 334 8888 bculp@hinshawlaw.com

Represented by Peabody & Arnold LLP

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
  Entries (173) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER FROM DISTRICT JUDGE. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 02/01/11. (bjs) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Civil-8th Circuit Pre-Hearing Conference Notice, # 2 Civil Notice - appeal)(kt) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 11/12/10. (sf) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
        STIPULATION for Entry of Judgment by Ace American Insurance Company, Darwin National Assurance Company, Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Homeland Insurance Company of New York, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tostrud, Eric) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          NOTICE OF JANUARY AND FEBRUARY 2011 STATUS CONFERENCES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 11/3/10. (kt) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND MOTION HEARING: A status conference of trial counsel along with oral argument on Defendants' Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order and Defendants' various discovery-related motions will be held before Magistrate Judge Susan Richard Nelson on October 20, 2010, at 9:00 a.m. (CST) in Courtroom 9E, U.S. Courthouse, 300 South Fourth Street, Minneapolis, Minnesota. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 09/28/2010. (MMP) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 6/16/2010 before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson. (114 pages). Court Reporter: Tracy A. Schmitz (E-mail: tracyaschmitz@aol.com. Telephone: 651-698-0319). Redaction Request due 7/27/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/6/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2010. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (jam) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (jam) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Johns, Douglas) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Minute Entry: (Amended) Joint Status Conference proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 6/16/2010 in Minneapolis, Minnesota. (Court Reporter Tracy Schmitz) (MMP) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, WILL RE-FILE. Minute Entry: Joint Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 6/16/2010 at Minneapolis, Minnesota. (Court Reporter Tracy Schmitz) (MMP) Modified on 6/17/2010 (JME). (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER TO STAY ACTION: Pursuant to the Parties' 161 Stipulation to Stay Action - See Order for Details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 04/15/2010. (MMP) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                          STIPULATION to Stay by Ace American Insurance Company, Darwin National Assurance Company, Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Homeland Insurance Company of New York, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tostrud, Eric) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Minute Entry: Joint Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 4/14/2010. (Court Reporter Jackie McKone) (MMP) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Minute Entry: Joint Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson Status Conference on 3/18/2010. (Court Reporter Jackie McKone) (MMP) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to the parties 157 Stipulation the period within which Defendants shall serve their responsive pleadings be enlarged from April 2, 2010 to April 16, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 03/31/2010. (MMP) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                  STIPULATION to Enlarge Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Darwin National Assurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Mills, Monte) Added filers on 4/1/2010 (RLR). (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Ace American Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sheridan, Steven) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for JESSICA W. CHAN by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bouslog, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER: Pursuant to the Parties' Stipulation to Enlarge Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Doc. No. 153 and Rules 6(b) and 12(a)(4)(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, IT IS ORDERED that the period within which Defendants shall serve their responsive pleadings be enlarged from February 23, 2010 to April 2, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 02/23/2010. (MMP) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                          STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Ace American Insurance Company, Darwin National Assurance Company, Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Homeland Insurance Company of New York, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tostrud, Eric) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Minute Entry: Joint Status Conference proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 2/17/2010. (Court Reporter Jackie McKone) (MMP) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 151 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER - Based on the foregoing, and on all of the files, records, and proceedings herein, the Court ADOPTS IN PART the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 117 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Defendants' objection 124 is SUSTAINED IN PART AND OVERRULED IN PART. Granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion to Dismiss. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 02/09/10. (bjs) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER: The status conference scheduled for February 17, 2010, at 10:30 a.m. will now begin at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Susan Richard Nelson in Courtroom 9E, U.S. Courthouse, 300 South Fourth Street, Minneapolis, Minnesota. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 02/08/2010. Associated Cases: 0:05-cv-01289-PJS-SRN, 0:09-cv-00210-PJS-SRN(MMP) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Minute Entry: Joint Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 1/15/2010 at Minneapolis, Minnesota. (Court Reporter Jackie McKone) (MMP) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel (St Peter, Patricia) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER: The status conference scheduled for January 15, 2010, at 10:30 a.m. will now begin at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Susan Richard Nelson in Courtroom 9E, U.S. Courthouse, 300 South Fourth Street, Minneapolis, Minnesota. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 01/06/2010. Associated Cases: 0:05-cv-01289-PJS-SRN, 0:09-cv-00210-PJS-SRN(MMP) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        NOTICE OF 2010 STATUS CONFERENCES: The 2010 monthly status conferences will be held before Magistrate Judge Susan Richard Nelson in Courtroom 9E, U.S. Courthouse, 300 South Fourth Street, Minneapolis, Minnesota, at 10:30 a.m. (CST) on the following dates: January 15, 2010, February 17, 2010, March 18, 2010, April 14, 2010, May 21, 2010, June 16, 2010, July 21, 2010, August 20, 2010 September 22, 2010, October 22, 2010, November 19, 2010, and December 15, 2010 Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 12/04/2009. Associated Cases: 0:05-cv-01289-PJS-SRN, 0:09-cv-00210-PJS-SRN(MMP) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Minute Entry: Joint Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 12/2/2009. (Court Reporter Cindy Trattles, Benchmark Reporting) (MMP) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                            OBJECTION to 117 Report and Recommendations (SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF) filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Darwin National Assurance Company, Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Homeland Insurance Company of New York, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Tostrud, Eric) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 143 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                              RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to 124 Report and Recommendation (Supplemental Brief) filed by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Goodwin, David) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 11/4/09 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (163 pages). Court Reporter: Debra Beauvais (E-mail: Debra_Beauvais@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1223). Redaction Request due 12/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/14/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/11/2010. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (db) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. (db) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the parties' Stipulation of Confidentiality dated November 6, 2009 Doc. No. 139 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Stipulation of Confidentiality dated November 6, 2009 Doc. 139 is adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 11/09/2009. (MMP) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      STIPULATION of Confidentiality by Ace American Insurance Company, Darwin National Assurance Company, Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Homeland Insurance Company of New York, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(van Uitert, Marie) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated re 136 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for ESTA L. BRAND, 137 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for SAMANTHA J. CHOE (Bouslog, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for SAMANTHA J. CHOE by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Bouslog, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for ESTA L. BRAND by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Bouslog, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Each side must submit one brief on the following issues: a. The nature of the Assurance of Discontinuance ("AOD"), including whether the AOD is simply a contract or is instead a type of "injunctive, declaratory, or administrative relief" within the meaning of Lloyd's Policy No. 509/QG007207. b. Whether the Anti-Trust Endorsement of Lloyd's Policy No. 509/QG007207 provides coverage for the NYAG Claim. c. Whether plaintiff waived any argument in favor of applying the Anti-Trust Endorsement to the NYAG Claim by failing to raise it until oral argument on defendants' objections. 2. Each side's brief must be no longer than 6,000 words and must be filed and served no later than Wednesday, November 25, 2009. No responses will be permitted. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 11/5/09. (sf) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson: Joint Status Conference held on 11/3/2009. (Court Reporter Cindy Trattles) (LPH) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Hearing held on 11/4/2009 re Defendants' Objections 124 to 117 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 81 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Darwin National Assurance Company, 69 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ace American Insurance Company, 75 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York, 72 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd and Lexington Insurance Company, 78 MOTION to Dismiss filed by National Union. Matter taken under advisement. Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais) (sf) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated re 130 Response to Objection to Report and Recommendation, 131 Affidavit of Michael S. Greenberg. (Goodwin, David) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Michael S. Greenberg re 130 Response to Objection to Report and Recommendation by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Goodwin, David) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to 124 Report and Recommendation filed by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Goodwin, David) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR- AFFIDAVIT in Support of Plaintiff UnitedHealth Group Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Joint Objections to Magistrate Judge Nelson's August 27, 2009 Report and Recommendation re Motions to Dismiss the Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s))(Greenberg, Michael) Modified text on 10/13/2009 (jz). (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 117 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 81 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Darwin National Assurance Company, 69 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ace American Insurance Company, 75 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York, 72 MOTION to DismisREPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 81 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Darwin National Assurance Company, 69 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ace American Insurance Company, 75 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York, 72 MOTION to DismisREPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 81 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Darwin National Assurance Company, 69 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ace American Insurance Company, 75 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York, 72 MOTION to Dismis Plaintiff UnitedHealth Group Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Joint Objections to Magistrate Judge Nelson's August 27, 2009 Report and Recommendation re Motions to Dismiss the Complaint filed by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Greenberg, Michael) Modified on 10/13/2009 (jz). (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              AMENDED NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 11/3/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 10/8/09. (LPH) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                **TEXT ONLY ENTRY** NOTICE OF HEARING ON OBJECTION 124 TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 117 . The hearing will be held on November 4, 2009 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 7B in St. Paul. (sf) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2009, Discovery due by 9/1/2010, Motions (non-disp) due 9/15/2010, Motions (disp) due by 12/1/2010, Ready for trial due by 3/1/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 10/2/09. (kt) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    OBJECTION to 117 Report and Recommendations of August 27, 2009 filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Darwin National Assurance Company, Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Homeland Insurance Company of New York, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Tostrud, Eric) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE: A status conference of trial counsel in the above matters will be held before Magistrate Judge Susan Richard Nelson in Courtroom 9E, U.S. Courthouse, 300 South Fourth Street, Minneapolis, Minnesota, on October 30, 2009, at 10:30 a.m. (CST). The parties are directed to create an agenda of items to be discussed at the status conference no later than one week before the conference. All items presented to the Court at the status conference must be the subject of a meet and confer before the conference. The parties shall submit simultaneous brief submissions to the Court's email box at nelson_chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov no later than 48 hours before the conference. No reply submissions will be entertained by the Court but the Court will allow each party to be fully heard at the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 09/23/2009. (MMP) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Minute Entry: Pretrial Scheduling Conference proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 9/22/2009. Scheduling order to be issued. (MMP) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          REPORT Rule 26F by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Lexington Insurance Company, Darwin National Assurance Company, Homeland Insurance Company of New York, Ace American Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Goodwin, David) Modified filers on 9/17/2009 (lph). (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER. Defendants' motion for an extension of time to file written objections [Docket No. 119 ] is GRANTED. Defendants' written objections must be filed and served no later than September 25, 2009. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 09/04/09. (BJS) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Written Objections by Ace American Insurance Company, Darwin National Assurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Homeland Insurance Company of New York, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, . (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tostrud, Eric) Modified filers on 9/3/2009 (jam). (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/14/2009. Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 08/31/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(MMP) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: 1. Defendant Ace American Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Doc. No. 69 be DENIED; 2. Defendant Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member and Lexington Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Doc. No. 72 be DENIED; 3. Defendant Homeland Insurance Companys Motion to Dismiss Doc. No. 75 be DENIED; 4. Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Doc. No. 78 be DENIED; and 5. Defendant Darwin National Assurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Doc. No. 81 be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 9/11/2009 Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 08/27/2009. (MMP) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on July 8, 2009 before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson. (59 pages). Court Reporter: Lorilee Fink (E-mail: Lorilee_Fink@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5105). Redaction Request due 8/11/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2009. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (LKF) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (LKF) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        Minute Entry: Civil Motion hearing for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 7/8/2009. RE: Hearing on Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Ace American Insurance Company (Doc. No. 69 ); Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member and Lexington Insurance Company (Doc. No. 72 ); Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Homeland Insurance Company (Doc. No. 75 ); Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company (Doc. No. 78 ); and Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Darwin National Assurance Company (Doc. No. 81 ). The Motions were submitted, argued, and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to be submitted by the Court. (Court Reporter Lorilee Fink) (MMP) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          REPLY re 78 MOTION to Dismiss filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Oglesbay, Erin) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Lexington Insurance Company re 111 Reply to Response to Motion. (Tostrud, Eric) Modified text on 6/30/2009 (akl). (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to 72 Motion to Dismiss filed by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Tostrud, Eric) Modified link and text on 6/30/2009 (akl). (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                REPLY re 75 MOTION to Dismiss REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HOMELAND INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(St Peter, Patricia) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  REPLY re 69 MOTION to Dismiss Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Ace American Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Sheridan, Steven) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    REPLY re 81 MOTION to Dismiss REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DARWIN NATIONAL ASSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12 (b)(6) filed by Darwin National Assurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Mills, Monte) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 106 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 6/25/09. (akl) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 81 MOTION to Dismiss, 69 MOTION to Dismiss, 75 MOTION to Dismiss, 72 MOTION to Dismiss, 78 MOTION to Dismiss by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Darwin National Assurance Company, Homeland Insurance Company of New York, Ace American Insurance Company, Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tostrud, Eric) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Memorandum 103 in Opposition and Affidavit 104 by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Goodwin, David) Added links on 6/19/2009 (RLR). (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Support of UnitedHealth Group Incorporated's Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss The Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Fourth Amended Complaint)(Goodwin, David) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to Defendant's Motion 72 to Dismiss by Plaintiff UnitedHealth Group Inc.'s. (Goodwin, David) Modified description on 6/19/2009 (RLR). (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                AMENDED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re: Motion 72 to Dismiss by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Tostrud, Eric) Added link on 5/28/2009 (RLR). (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Homeland Insurance Company of New York of Proposed Order. (St Peter, Patricia) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 78 MOTION to Dismiss filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Oglesbay, Erin) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Darwin National Assurance Company re 98 Declaration in Support, 95 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). (Mills, Monte) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Matthew J. Dendinger in Support of 81 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Darwin National Assurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Mills, Monte) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Homeland Insurance Company of New York re 94 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 96 Declaration in Support. (St Peter, Patricia) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Darius N. Kandawalla in Support of 94 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 75 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s))(St Peter, Patricia) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 81 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Darwin National Assurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Mills, Monte) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 75 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(St Peter, Patricia) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Lexington Insurance Company re 92 Declaration in Support, 90 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Tostrud, Eric) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Stephen M. Lazare in Support of 90 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1 and 2, # 2 Exhibit(s) 3 and 4, # 3 Exhibit(s) 5 (part 1), # 4 Exhibit(s) 5 (part 2), # 5 Exhibit(s) 6)(Tostrud, Eric) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ace American Insurance Company. (Sheridan, Steven) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        DOCUMENT REMOVED AND FILED IN ERROR, RE-FILED SEE DOC. #102. MEMORANDUM in Support re 72 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Tostrud, Eric) Modified text on 5/27/2009 (JME). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/27/2009: # 2 PLACEHOLDER) (JME) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH LR 37.1 re: 69 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ace American Insurance Company by Ace American Insurance Company filed by Ace American Insurance Company. (Sheridan, Steven) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Steven J. Sheridan in SUPPORT OF 69 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Ace American Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A to Affidavit of Steven Sheridan)(Sheridan, Steven) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 69 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Ace American Insurance Company. (Sheridan, Steven) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Oral argument on Defendant Ace American Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Doc. No. 69 , Defendant Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd. and Lexington Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Doc. No. 72 , Defendant Homeland Insurance Company of New York's Motion to Dismiss Doc. No. 75 , Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh's Motion to Dismiss Doc. No. 78 and Defendant Darwin National Assurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Doc. No. 81 will be heard before Magistrate Judge Susan Richard Nelson on July 8, 2009 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9E, U.S. Courthouse, 300 South Fourth Street, Minneapolis, Minnesota. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 05/08/2009. (MMP) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: 81 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Darwin National Assurance Company, 69 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ace American Insurance Company, 75 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York, 72 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Lexington Insurance Company, 78 MOTION to Dismiss filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. IT IS ORDERED that the motions to dismiss filed by the defendants [Docket Nos. 69 , 72 , 75 , 78 , 81 ] are referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Richard Nelson. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 05/06/09. (pjss) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Darwin National Assurance Company re 81 MOTION to Dismiss, 82 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE DOCUMENT - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Darwin National Assurance Company re 81 MOTION to Dismiss, 82 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Luger, Andrew) Modified on 5/4/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 81 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2009 08:30 AM in Judge's Chambers before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss by Darwin National Assurance Company. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA re 79 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 78 MOTION to Dismiss. (Pearson, David) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 78 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2009 08:30 AM before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Pearson, David) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Pearson, David) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Homeland Insurance Company of New York re 76 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 75 MOTION to Dismiss. (St Peter, Patricia) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 75 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (St Peter, Patricia) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by Homeland Insurance Company of New York. (St Peter, Patricia) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Lexington Insurance Company re 73 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 72 MOTION to Dismiss. (Tostrud, Eric) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 72 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Tostrud, Eric) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Lexington Insurance Company. (Tostrud, Eric) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ace American Insurance Company re 70 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 69 MOTION to Dismiss. (Sheridan, Steven) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 69 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2009 08:30 AM before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Sheridan, Steven) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss by Ace American Insurance Company. (Sheridan, Steven) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Darwin National Assurance Company re 67 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Matthew J. Dendinger, 66 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Lewis K. Loss. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Matthew J. Dendinger by Darwin National Assurance Company. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Lewis K. Loss by Darwin National Assurance Company. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Homeland Insurance Company of New York re 64 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement. (St Peter, Patricia) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Homeland Insurance Company of New York of OneBeacon Insurance Group, Ltd. as corporate parent and/or publicly held company. (St Peter, Patricia) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Lexington Insurance Company of Hiscox Plc; Hiscox Ltd.; AIG Casualty Company; The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, Pennsylvania; American International Group, Inc. as corporate parent and/or publicly held company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tostrud, Eric) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Lexington Insurance Company re 60 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Stephen M. Lazare, 61 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David E. Potter (Tostrud, Eric) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David E. Potter by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Lexington Insurance Company. (Tostrud, Eric) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Stephen M. Lazare by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Lexington Insurance Company. (Tostrud, Eric) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER for Reassignment of Related Cases. Order that 09-cv-651 JNE/JJG be reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 3/26/09.(MGV) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT: Defendants Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Darwin National Assurance Company, Homeland Insurance Company of New York, and ACE American Insurance Company shall have until May 4, 2009, to answer or otherwise plead in response to the First Amended Complaint brought by Plaintiff UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 03/17/2009. (MMP) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Homeland Insurance Company of New York re 55 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Keith Little, 56 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Darius N. Kandawalla (St Peter, Patricia) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Darius N. Kandawalla by Homeland Insurance Company of New York. (St Peter, Patricia) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Keith Little by Homeland Insurance Company of New York. (St Peter, Patricia) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated re 50 Stipulation, 53 Stipulation, 48 Stipulation, 52 Stipulation, 51 Stipulation, 49 Stipulation (Bouslog, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION re 44 Amended Complaint, FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Ace American Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Bouslog, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re 44 Amended Complaint, FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Homeland Insurance Company of New York, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Bouslog, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re 44 Amended Complaint, FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Darwin National Assurance Company, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Bouslog, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION re 44 Amended Complaint, FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Bouslog, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION re 44 Amended Complaint, FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Lexington Insurance Company. (Bouslog, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION re 44 Amended Complaint, FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd. (Bouslog, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. Lexington Insurance Company waiver sent on 3/5/2009, answer due 5/4/2009. (Bouslog, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd. waiver sent on 3/5/2009, answer due 5/4/2009. (Bouslog, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated re 44 Amended Complaint, First Amended Complaint (Bouslog, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Darwin National Assurance Company, Homeland Insurance Company of New York, Ace American Insurance Company, filed by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A to First Amended Complaint) (Bouslog, Jeffrey) Modified text on 3/9/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Thomas M. Jones by Ace American Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sheridan, Steven) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Steadfast Insurance Company shall have until April 20, 2009 to answer or otherwise plead in response to the Complaint brought by Plaintiff UnitedHealth Group Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 02/26/2009. (MMP) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated re 40 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for MICHAEL S. GREENBERG, 39 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for DAVID B. GOODWIN (Nessa, Christine) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for MICHAEL S. GREENBERG by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Nessa, Christine) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for DAVID B. GOODWIN by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Nessa, Christine) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Culp, Bethany) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. Starr Excess Liability Insurance International Limited waiver sent on 2/9/2009, answer due 4/20/2009. (Nessa, Christine) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - replaced by doc. #43. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Thomas M. Jones by Ace American Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sheridan, Steven) Modified on 3/10/2009 (MMC). (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Kevin M. Haas by Ace American Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sheridan, Steven) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company re 33 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jill M. Brannelly, 31 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Michael P. Duffy, 30 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Harvey Weiner, 32 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for E. Joseph O'Neil (Culp, Bethany) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jill M. Brannelly by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company. (Culp, Bethany) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for E. Joseph O'Neil by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company. (Culp, Bethany) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Michael P. Duffy by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company. (Culp, Bethany) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Harvey Weiner by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company. (Culp, Bethany) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by First Specialty Insurance Corporation, Executive Risk Specialty Insurance Company for Motions Pro Hac Vice (Kildow, Alan) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Daniel J. Layden by First Specialty Insurance Corporation, Executive Risk Specialty Insurance Company. (Kildow, Alan) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Ronald P. Schiller by First Specialty Insurance Corporation, Executive Risk Specialty Insurance Company. (Kildow, Alan) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany K Culp on behalf of Steadfast Insurance Company (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Culp, Bethany) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany K Culp on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Culp, Bethany) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Darwin National Assurance Company of Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, Ltd as corporate parent and/or publicly held company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, DUPLICATE ENTRY, SEE DOC 22 *** ORDER FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Defendants American Alternative Insurance Corporation, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Starr Excess Liability Insurance International Limited, and Fireman's Fund Insurance Company shall have until April 20, 2009 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint brought by Plaintiff United Health Group Incorporated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 02/20/2009. (MMP) Modified text on 4/27/2009 (RLR). (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by David P Pearson on behalf of Starr Excess Liability Insurance International Limited, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Pearson, David) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Defendants Darwin National Assurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company, Homeland Insurance Company of New York, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Columbia Casualty Company, Executive Risk Specialty Insurance Company, and First Specialty Insurance Company, shall have until April 20, 2009 to answer or otherwise plead in response to the Complaint brought by Plaintiff UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 02/19/2009. (MMP) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, For Extension to Respond to Complaint by Starr Excess Liability Insurance International Limited, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, American Alternative Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Davidson, William) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company re 18 Notice of Appearance (Davidson, William) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by William L Davidson on behalf of Fireman's Fund Insurance Company (Davidson, William) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Nessa, Christine) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION For Extension to Respond to Complaint by First Specialty Insurance Corporation, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Darwin National Assurance Company, Homeland Insurance Company of New York, Ace American Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Columbia Casualty Company, Executive Risk Specialty Insurance Company. (Nessa, Christine) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ace American Insurance Company re 14 Notice of Appearance, 13 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Sheridan, Steven) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J Sheridan on behalf of Ace American Insurance Company (Sheridan, Steven) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ace American Insurance Company of ACE Limited as corporate parent and/or publicly held company. (Sheridan, Steven) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Katrina M Giedt on behalf of Columbia Casualty Company (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Giedt, Katrina) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER for Reassignment of Related Cases that 05-cv-1289 PJS/JJG and 08-cv-5146 PJS/JJG be reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 2/12/09. (MGV) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Alan L Kildow on behalf of First Specialty Insurance Corporation, Executive Risk Specialty Insurance Company (Kildow, Alan) Certificate of Service attached to end of document. Modified text on 2/13/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated re 8 Letter to Magistrate Judge (Nessa, Christine) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Nessa, Christine) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 09-cv-210 PJS/SRN. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 2/10/09. (MGV) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham for all further proceedings. Judge James M. Rosenbaum and Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron no longer assigned to case. The new case number is 09cv210 PJS/JJG. Order signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 2/3/09 and Judge James Rosenbaum on 2/9/09. (MGV) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M Luger on behalf of Darwin National Assurance Company (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report. (jz) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. First Specialty Insurance Corporation served on 1/30/2009, answer due 2/19/2009; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 1/30/2009, answer due 2/19/2009; Steadfast Insurance Company served on 1/30/2009, answer due 2/19/2009; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA served on 1/30/2009, answer due 2/19/2009; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's served on 1/30/2009, answer due 2/19/2009; Darwin National Assurance Company served on 1/30/2009, answer due 2/19/2009; Homeland Insurance Company of New York served on 1/30/2009, answer due 2/19/2009; Ace American Insurance Company served on 1/30/2009, answer due 2/19/2009; Columbia Casualty Company served on 1/30/2009, answer due 2/19/2009; Fireman's Fund Insurance Company served on 1/30/2009, answer due 2/19/2009; American Alternative Insurance Corporation served on 1/30/2009, answer due 2/19/2009; Executive Risk Specialty Insurance Company served on 1/30/2009, answer due 2/19/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B)(Bouslog, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, WILL RE-FILE. AFFIDAVIT of KATHERINE M. WILHOIT re Summons Issued,, 1 Complaint, AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B)(Wilhoit, Katherine) Modified text on 2/2/2009 (JME). (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $350 receipt number 4030027) assigned to Judge James M. Rosenbaum per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron, filed by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Cover Letter) (jz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/30/2009: # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (JME) Documents QC'd by JME. (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 265 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?