USA v. Cole et al
Criminal Case Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:09-cr-00193
District Judge Michael J. Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 21, 2017 at 11:53 AM EDT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Abby Rae Cole, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Carolyn Pelling Gurland +1 312 420 9263 cgurland@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Wallace-Jackson +1 612 373 8329 +1 612 373 0929 dwallace-jackson@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Timothy D Webb, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy D Webb +1 612 340 7970 +1 952 746 2401 twebb@nevewebb.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (339) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Receipt of Letter from Clerk's Office. (AKL) Document QC'd by JLW. Modified text on 2/8/2016 (JLW). (Entered: 01/26/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Receipt of Letter from Clerk's Office. (LPH) Document QCd by JLW. Modified text on 1/25/2016 (JLW). (Entered: 01/21/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Letter from Clerk's Office as to Abby Rae Cole. (LEG) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER granting 425 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Lauren Weil Solomon withdrawn from case as to Abby Rae Cole (2). Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/5/16. (KMW) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Letter from Clerk's Office re: ORDER 424 . (JDF) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL FROM CASE as to Abby Rae Cole (Solomon, Lauren) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION for Withdrawal as Counsel by Lauren Weil Solomon by Abby Rae Cole. (Solomon, Lauren) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER as to Abby Rae Cole (2). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Defendant's Request for Hearing on Writ of Garnishment and for Change of Venue for Hearing 417 is GRANTED as follows: The garnishment matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois and all pleadings already filed in regards to the garnishment action 412 , [414-415], 417 , [419-423] are transferred as well. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/30/15. (GRR) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  RESPONSE by USA as to Abby Rae Cole re 417 MOTION to Change Venue (Brooker, Gregory) (Entered: 12/29/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 12/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - RESPONSE by USA as to Abby Rae Cole re 417 MOTION to Change Venue (Brooker, Gregory) Modified on 12/28/2015 (JAM). (Entered: 12/24/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING re 417 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Abby Rae Cole as to Abby Rae Cole. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/7/15. (KMW) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Abby Rae Cole filed by State Farm Life Insurance Co.. (AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 11/2/2015 (JGK). (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RESPONSE by USA as to Abby Rae Cole re 417 MOTION to Change Venue (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate) (Brooker, Gregory) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            TRANSMITTAL OF RECORDS as to Abby Rae Cole re: Transcripts received from the USCA. (AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 2/11/2015 (JGK). (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Letter/Request to Change Venue by Abby Rae Cole. (Solomon, Lauren) Modified on 4/21/2015 (AKL). (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MANDATE of USCA (electronic copy) as to Abby Rae Cole re 307 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (AKL) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Certificate of Service by USA as to Abby Rae Cole . (Attachments: # 1 Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment)(Voss, Ana) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Certificate of Service by USA as to Abby Rae Cole . (Attachments: # 1 Writ of Garnishment)(Voss, Ana) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - Certificate of Service by USA as to Abby Rae Cole . (Attachments: # 1 Writ of Garnishment)(Voss, Ana) Modified text on 12/19/2014 (MKG). (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT as to Abby Rae Cole and State Farm Life Insurance Co. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 11/3/14. Writ issued on 11/4/14. (AKL)DOCUMENT QC'D ON 12/24/14 LGL Modified on 12/24/2014 (LGL). (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          JUDGMENT of USCA (electronic copy) as to Abby Rae Cole re 307 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (AKL) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Opinion of USCA (electronic copy) as to Abby Rae Cole re 307 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (AKL) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              TRANSMITTAL OF RECORDS as to Abby Rae Cole re: Transcripts 407 sent to the USCA. (LEG) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                ORDER of USCA as to Abby Rae Cole. Appellant's motion to reopen the appeal is granted as to Notice of Appeal filed by USA, document number 307 . (LEG) Modified text on 5/2/2014 (LEG). (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Eighth Circuit Remand Hearing held on 04/09/2014 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Abby Rae Cole. (26 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 5/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2014. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (LAS) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript as to Abby Rae Cole. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (LAS) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      CJA 20 as to Abby Rae Cole: Appointment of Attorney Lauren Weil Solomon. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/6/13. (MKG) DOCUMENT QC'D ON 4/17/14 LGL Modified on 4/17/2014 (LGL). (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis: as to Abby Rae Cole (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Abby Rae Cole. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/2/14. (KMW) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Rescheduling Sentencing as to Abby Rae Cole: Sentencing is rescheduled for 4/9/2014 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (KMW) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Rescheduling Re-Sentencing as to Abby Rae Cole. Re-Sentencing is rescheduled for 4/16/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (KMW) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Setting Re-Sentencing as to Abby Rae Cole: Re-Sentencing is set for 4/16/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (KMW) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 397 Motion for Leave to File as to Abby Rae Cole (2). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/27/14. (KMW) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support by Abby Rae Cole re 397 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Authority In Support of Supplemental Brief (Solomon, Lauren) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Additional Authority by Abby Rae Cole. (Solomon, Lauren) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        APPENDIX as to Abby Cole - Re: 394 * * * Pursuant to the Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1 an unredacted version of this document is filed under seal with the Clerk. Receipt of sealed document(s) on (1/13/14). (KNK) . Document QC'd on 2/10/2014 (las). (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Abby Rae Cole. (Solomon, Lauren) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            BRIEF by Abby Rae Cole re 392 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lauren Weil Solomon (Attachments: # 1 Appendix UNREDACTED version - See Redacted version, doc no. 396 )(Solomon, Lauren) Modified on 1/15/2014 (KNK). Modified text on 1/17/2014 (MKG). (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting 392 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lauren Weil Solomon for Abby Rae Cole. Approved by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/13/2014. (MGV) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lauren Weil Solomon as to Abby Rae Cole. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 74621. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter) (LEG) Document QC'd by jdf. Modified text on 2/6/2014 (jdf). (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER APPOINTING LOCAL COUNSEL as to Abby Rae Cole. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/13/14. (KMW) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    SECOND AMENDED ORDER FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON SUPPLEMENTAL SENTENCING BRIEF as to Abby Rae Cole. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/16/13. (KMW) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      BRIEF by USA as to Abby Rae Cole re 387 Order Government's Supplemental Brief Regarding Remand (Otteson, William) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        TRANSMITTAL OF RECORDS as to Abby Rae Cole re: Transcripts received from the USCA. (jdf) Document QCd by leg. Modified text on 9/17/13 (LEG). (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          AMENDED ORDER FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON SUPPLEMENTAL SENTENCING BRIEFS as to Abby Rae Cole. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 9/3/13. (KMW) cc: Deft. Modified text on 9/9/2013 (jdf). (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON SUPPLEMENTAL SENTENCING BRIEFS as to Abby Rae Cole. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 9/3/13. (KMW) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MANDATE of USCA (electronic copy) as to Abby Rae Cole re 307 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, 312 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (LEG) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Vacated - JUDGMENT of USCA (electronic copy) as to Abby Rae Cole re 307 Notice of Appeal by USA; 312 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (jdf) Modified text on 8/7/2013 (jdf). Modified text on 9/2/2014 (LEG). (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Vacated - Opinion of USCA (electronic copy) as to Abby Rae Cole re 307 Notice of Appeal by USA; 312 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (jdf) Modified text on 8/7/2013 (jdf). Modified text on 9/2/2014 (LEG). (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    TRANSMITTAL LETTER - Receipt of Final Transfer Out as to Abby Rae Cole. (jdf) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      TRANSMITTAL LETTER - Final Transfer Out as to Abby Rae Cole. (LEG) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Probation Jurisdiction Transferred to the Northern District of Illinois as to Abby Rae Cole. Transmitted Transfer of Jurisdiction form, with certified copies of redacted indictment, judgment and docket sheet. (LEG) Document QCd by mkg. Modified text on 11/7/2012 (MKG). (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          TRANSMITTAL LETTER - Receipt of Initial Transfer Out as to Abby Rae Cole. (LEG) Document QCd by mkg. Modified text on 10/18/2012 (MKG). (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            TRANSMITTAL LETTER - Initial Transfer Out as to Abby Rae Cole. (jdf) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              REDACTED Version of previously filed TRANSCRIPT 366 Trial, Volume XIX, held on 05/26/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (234 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                REDACTED Version of previously filed TRANSCRIPT 350 Trial, Volume VII, held on 05/04/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (269 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  REDACTED Version of previously filed TRANSCRIPT 345 Trial, Volume III, held on 04/28/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (152 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    REDACTED Version of previously filed TRANSCRIPT 344 Trial, Volume II, held on 04/27/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (105 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 357 Motion for Leave to File Government's Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Statement of Redaction Out of Time to as to Russell Adam Cole (1) and Abby Rae Cole (2). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/9/11. (KMW) Modified text on 12/9/2011 (jdf). Regenerated NEF to Court Reporter on 12/9/2011 (jdf). (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF REDACTION by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole, re 366 Transcript. Regenerated NEF to Court Reporter (Otteson, William) Modified text on 12/8/2011 (jdf). (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 366 Transcript. Regenerated NEF to court Reporter (Otteson, William) Modified text on 12/8/2011 (jdf). (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Volume XVIII, held on 05/25/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (197 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 12/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2012. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript, as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Volume XXI, held on 06/03/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (22 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 12/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2012. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Volume XX, held on 06/02/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (20 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 12/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2012. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Volume XIX, held on 05/26/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (234 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 12/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2012. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Volume XVII held on 05/24/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (282 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 12/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2012. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Volume XXI, held on 05/20/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (235 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 12/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2012. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Volume XV, held on 05/19/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (284 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 12/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2012. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Volume XIV, held on 05/18/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (153 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 12/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2012. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript, as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. A total of 7 transcripts are associated with this filing. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT OF REDACTION by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole, re 350 Transcript, 354 Transcript, 346 Transcript, 355 Transcript, 342 Transcript, 351 Transcript, 352 Transcript, 345 Transcript, 353 Transcript, 349 Transcript, 347 Transcript, 356 Transcript, 344 Transcript. (Otteson, William) Modified text on 11/21/2011 (jdf). (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 350 Transcript, 354 Transcript,, 346 Transcript, 355 Transcript, 342 Transcript, 351 Transcript,, 352 Transcript, 345 Transcript, 353 Transcript, 349 Transcript, 347 Transcript, 356 Transcript, 344 Transcript. (Otteson, William) Modified text on 11/21/2011 (jdf). (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    FILED IN ERROR/TO BE REFILED - NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 350 Transcript,, 345 Transcript,, 342 Transcript,, 349 Transcript,, 347 Transcript,, 344 Transcript,, 346 Transcript,,. (Otteson, William) Modified text on 11/18/2011 (las). (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Government's Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Statement of Redaction Out of Time by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Otteson, William) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Volume XIII, held on 05/17/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (269 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 11/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2012. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Volume XII, held on 05/12/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (178 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 11/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2012. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Volume XI, held on 05/11/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (230 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 11/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2012. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Volume X, held on 05/07/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (213 pages) Court Reporters: Lori Simpson and Ronald Moen (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 11/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2012. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Volume IX, held on 05/06/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (109 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 11/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2012. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Volume VIII, held on 05/05/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (247 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 11/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2012. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Volume VII, held on 05/04/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (269 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 11/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2012. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Volume VI, held on 05/03/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (195 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 11/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2012. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript, as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. A total of 8 transcripts are associated with this filing. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Volume V, held on 04/30/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (179 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 9/30/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/10/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2011. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Volume IV, held on 04/29/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (219 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 9/30/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/10/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2011. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Volume III, held on 04/28/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (152 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 9/30/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/10/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2011. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 04/27/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (105 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 9/30/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/10/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2011. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Jury Voir Dire Proceedings held on 04/19/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole (261 pages). Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Volume I, held on 04/19/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (11 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 9/30/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/10/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2011. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Motions Hearing and Arraingments held on 04/16/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (22 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 9/30/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/10/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2011. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript, as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. A total of 7 transcripts are associated with this filing. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (jdf) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE. As to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/20/11. (GRR) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE. Granting 332 MOTION FOR FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Russell Adam Cole (1), Abby Rae Cole (2). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/20/11. (GRR) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Service by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 333 Declaration, 332 MOTION FOR FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE, 334 Stipulation, 335 Stipulation.(Alexander, James) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT OF REAL ESTATE TAXES by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Alexander, James) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION EXPEDITED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1 & 2) (Alexander, James) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA MCWHORTER by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 332 MOTION FOR FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B) (Alexander, James) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION FOR FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Alexander, James) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Three (3) Designated Clerk's Records sent to USCA by Abby Rae Cole re 312 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (GMO) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Three (3) Designated Clerk's Records sent to USCA by Abby Rae Cole re 307 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (GMO) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED JUDGMENT as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (jdf) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED ORDER granting 325 MOTION FOR FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Russell Adam Cole (1) and Abby Rae Cole (2). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/11/11. (KMW) Regenerated NEF to CFU, FLU and USM. Modified text on 4/11/2011 (jdf). (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (jdf) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 325 MOTION FOR FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Russell Adam Cole (1) and Abby Rae Cole (2). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/8/11. (KMW) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION FOR FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Alexander, James) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 324 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document. (LEG) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 323 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document. (LEG) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT (Excerpt) of the Testimony of Robert Bossany in Trial held on 5/11/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (182 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 3/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2011. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT (Excerpt) of the Testimony of Robert Bossany in Trial held on 5/7/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (212 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson and Ronald Moen (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 3/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2011. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT (Excerpt) of the Testimony of Robert Bossany in Trial held on 5/6/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (109 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 3/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2011. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT (Excerpt) of the Testimony of Robert Bossany in Trial held on 5/5/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (102 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 3/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2011. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript, as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. A total of 4 transcripts are associated with this filing. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION OF PUBLICATION by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole (Attachments: # 1 1) (Alexander, James) Modified text on 2/24/2011 (jdf). (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Defendant Abby Cole's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis in Connection with Appeal in a Criminal Case 315 is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 2/23/11. (GRR) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis by Abby Rae Cole. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit(s) Financial Affidavit) **Pursuant to Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1, an unredacted version of this document has been filed under seal with the Clerk. Receipt of sealed document(s) on 2/10/11 See doc. #313. (Gurland, Carolyn) Modified text on 2/10/2011 (jdf). (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REVISED INFORMATION SHEET TO U. S. COURT OF APPEALS, 8TH CIRCUIT as to Abby Rae Cole **Pursuant to Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1, an unredacted version of this document has been filed under seal with the Clerk. Receipt of sealed document(s) on 2/8/11(jdf) Modified text on 2/8/2011 (jdf). (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION (Unredacted) for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis by Abby Rae Cole. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit(s)) (Gurland, Carolyn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2011: # 3 Slip Sheet) (jdf). Modified text on 2/10/2011 (jdf). (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL by Abby Rae Cole re 298 Judgment, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gurland, Carolyn) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED Version of previously filed TRANSCRIPT 300 Sentencing Hearing held on 12/20/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Abby Rae Cole. (65 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REVISED INFORMATION SHEET TO U. S. COURT OF APPEALS, 8TH CIRCUIT as to Abby Rae Cole. **Pursuant to Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1, an unredacted version of this document has been filed under seal with the Clerk. Receipt of sealed document(s) on 1/27/11. (jdf) Modified text on 1/27/2011 (jdf). (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judgment Returned Executed as to Abby Rae Cole - Deft released to Probation on 12/20/2010. (las) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA as to Abby Rae Cole re 298 Judgment, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Otteson, William) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF REDACTION by USA as to Abby Rae Cole, re 300 Transcript. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Otteson, William) Modified text and Regenerated NEF to Lori Simpson on 1/12/2011 (jdf). (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by USA as to Abby Rae Cole re 300 Transcript. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Otteson, William) Modified text on 1/7/2011 (jdf). Regenerated NEF to Lori Simpson on 1/7/2011 (jdf). (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Sentencing Hearing held on 12/20/2010 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis as to Abby Rae Cole. (65 pages) Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 1/24/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/3/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/4/2011. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript, as to Abby Rae Cole. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SENTENCING JUDGMENT as to Abby Rae Cole (2), SENTENCED to 3 years Probation; consisting of 3 years on Count 1rss and Counts 22rss through 26rss, all such terms to run concurrently; $36,196,547.12 Restitution; $600.00 total Special Assessment. Defendant found Not Guilty on Counts 14rss-19rss, 20rss, 21rss, 2rss-13rss. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/23/10. (GMO) Modified text on 1/1/2011 (mkg). (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Sentencing held on 12/20/2010 for Abby Rae Cole. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) Modified on 12/29/2010 (leg) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RECEIPT number 4-050934 in the amount of $100.00 issued to Carolyn Gurland. (jdf) Modified file date on 12/21/2010 (jdf). (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE. Granting 251 Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Russell Adam Cole (1) and Abby Rae Cole (2).(Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/21/10. (GRR) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Carolyn Pelling Gurland filed by Timothy Webb as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole. (las) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 270 Position on Sentencing/Sentencing Memorandum, 273 Position on Sentencing/Sentencing Memorandum (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Otteson, William) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW & ORDER. Accordingly, based upon the files, records, and proceedings herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Defendants' Renewed Joint Motion for Judgment of Acquittal 239 is DENIED. 2. Defendants' Joint Motion for a New Trial 240 is DENIED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 11/24/10. (GRR) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER scheduling sentencing as to Abby Rae Cole. Sentencing is scheduled for 12/20/2010 at 2:00 PM before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis.Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 11/24/10. (KMW) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW & ORDER. Accordingly, based upon the files, records, and proceedings herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Defendants' Renewed Joint Motion for Judgment of Acquittal 239 is DENIED. 2. Defendants' Joint Motion for a New Trial 240 is DENIED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 11/22/10. (GRR) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 251 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Alexander, James) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service by Abby Rae Cole re 273 Position on Sentencing/Sentencing Memorandum.(Kulwin, Shelly) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        POSITION ON SENTENCING/SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Abby Rae Cole (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A) (Kulwin, Shelly) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          POSITION ON SENTENCING/SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Otteson, William) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Service by Abby Rae Cole re 264 Response in Opposition.(Kulwin, Shelly) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition by Abby Rae Cole re 251 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE (Kulwin, Shelly) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE from Bill Otteson and Nicole Engisch by USA (Otteson, William) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 254 256 Motion for Extension of Time to File Position Pleadings as to Abby Rae Cole (2). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/30/10. (KMW) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Abby Rae Cole re 256 Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to File Position Pleadings, 254 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Position Pleadings (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Otteson, William) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service by Abby Rae Cole re 256 Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to File Position Pleadings Regarding Sentencing.(Kulwin, Shelly) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to File Position Pleadings by Abby Rae Cole. (Kulwin, Shelly) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service by Abby Rae Cole re 254 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Position Pleadings.(Kulwin, Shelly) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Position Pleadings by Abby Rae Cole. (Kulwin, Shelly) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 252 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 251 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE.(Alexander, James) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT in Support by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 251 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE (Alexander, James) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Alexander, James) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 240 Joint MOTION for New Trial (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Otteson, William) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 239 Joint MOTION for Acquittal - RENEWED (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Engisch, Nicole) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ORDER granting 244 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Russell Adam Cole (1), Abby Rae Cole (2). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/19/10. (KMW) Modified text on 7/19/2010 (jdf). (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 239 Joint MOTION for Acquittal - RENEWED, 240 Joint MOTION for New Trial - Government's Unopposed Motion to Extend Response to Defendants' Post-Trial Motions by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Otteson, William) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 242 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Presentence Investigation Report as to defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/16/10. (KMW) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to Presentence Investigation Report by Abby Rae Cole. (Kulwin, Shelly) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Service by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole.(Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for New Trial by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Acquittal - RENEWED by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT LIST by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REGARDING POST-TRIAL MOTIONS as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole. Defendant's post-trial motions are due by 6/30/10 and the government's response is due by 7/23/10. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/11/10. (KMW) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Otteson, William) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER FOR PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole. Copy of this order shall be provided to the U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services Office. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/4/10. (KMW) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER MODIFYING CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/4/10. (KMW) Regenerated NEF to USM. Modified text on 6/7/2010 (jdf). (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JURY VERDICT as to Russell Adam Cole (1) Guilty on Counts 1- 14, 16, 17 18, 19, 20, 22, 23, 24, 25 and 26 and Abby Rae Cole (2) Guilty on Counts 1, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26. Russell Adam Cole (1) Not Guilty on Count 15, 21 and Abby Rae Cole (2) Not Guilty on Count 2-20 and 21. **Pursuant to Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1, an unredacted version of this document has been filed under seal with the Clerk. Receipt of sealed document(s) on 6/3/10.(LEG) Modified text on 6/4/2010 (leg). (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JURY QUESTION No. 7 and Answer as to Russell Adam Cole (1) and Abby Rae Cole (2). **Pursuant to Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1, an unredacted version of this document has been filed under seal with the Clerk. Receipt of sealed document(s) on 6/3/10.(LEG) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JURY QUESTION No. 6 and Answer as to Russell Adam Cole (1) and Abby Rae Cole (2). (LEG) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JURY QUESTION No. 5 and Answer as to Russell Adam Cole (1) and Abby Rae Cole (2). **Pursuant to Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1, an unredacted version of this document has been filed under seal with the Clerk. Receipt of sealed document(s) on 6/3/10.(LEG) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JURY QUESTION No. 4 and Answer as to Russell Adam Cole (1) and Abby Rae Cole (2). (LEG) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JURY QUESTION No. 3 and Answer as to Russell Adam Cole (1) and Abby Rae Cole (2). (LEG) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JURY QUESTION No. 2 and Answer as to Russell Adam Cole (1) and Abby Rae Cole (2). (LEG) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JURY QUESTION No. 1, Addendum to Question 1 and Answer as to Russell Adam Cole (1) and Abby Rae Cole (2). **Pursuant to Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1, an unredacted version of this document has been filed under seal with the Clerk. Receipt of sealed document(s) on 6/3/10. (LEG) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole held on 6/3/2010. Jury Trial Ended. Verdict Received. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 6/2/2010. Jury Deliberations. (Day 22) (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 6/1/2010. Jury Deliberations held. (Day 21) (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 5/28/2010. Jury Deliberations held. (Day 20) (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole. Jury Deliberations held on 5/27/2010. (Day 19) (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) Modified file date on 6/1/2010 (jdf). (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED INDICTMENT as to Russell Adam Cole (1) and Abby Rae Cole (2). (LEG) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Final Jury Instructions as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole. (KMW) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 5/26/2010. (Day 18) (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole held on 5/25/2010 (Day 17) (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (GRR) Modified text on 5/26/2010 (jdf). (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 5/24/2010. (Day 16) (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. Based on the parties submissions and upon review of the files, record, oral arguments, and proceedings herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Defendants joint objection to Government exhibits 515, 521, 523, 576-582, and 585-590 and expert testimony related to these exhibits is DENIED. 2. Defendants joint motion for a mistrial as to Defendant Abby Rae Cole is DENIED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/24/10. (GRR) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 211 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Offering Insurance Evidence (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 5/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service (Supplemental))(Otteson, William) (Entered: 05/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 5/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole Reply Memorandum Concerning Defendants' Objections to New and Revised Tax Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-D, # 2 Certificate of Service) (Otteson, William) (Entered: 05/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 5/23/2010, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Offering Insurance Evidence by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, Trial Subpoena, # 2 Certificate of Service) (Otteson, William) Modified text on 5/24/2010 (jdf). (Entered: 05/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 205 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Engisch, Nicole) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 203 Memorandum Concerning Defendants' Objections to New and Revised Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 5/20/2010. (Day 15) (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 206 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 204 Joint MOTION in Limine to Preclude Government Cross Examination Topics, 205 Memorandum in Support of Motion.(Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 204 Joint MOTION in Limine to Preclude Government Cross Examination Topics (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 204 Joint MOTION in Limine to Preclude Government Cross Examination Topics (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION in Limine to Preclude Government Cross Examination Topics by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole Concerning Defendants' Objections to New and Revised Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Otteson, William) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 5/19/2010. (Day 14) (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 5/18/2010. (Day 13) (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) Modified file date on 5/20/2010 (jdf). (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 5/17/2010. (Day 12) (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. Defendants' Joint Motion under Rule 29(a) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure for Acquittal of Counts 1-21 195 , brought before the Government has rested its case, is DENIED as premature (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/17/10. (GRR) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 195 Joint MOTION for Acquittal of Counts 1-21 under Rule 29(a) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Engisch, Nicole) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 196 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 195 Joint MOTION for Acquittal of Counts 1-21 under Rule 29(a) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure.(Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 195 Joint MOTION for Acquittal of Counts 1-21 under Rule 29(a) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Acquittal of Counts 1-21 under Rule 29(a) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 5/12/2010. (Day 11) (Court Reporter Lori simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 5/11/2010. (Day 10) (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 5/7/2010. (Day 9) (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 5/6/2010. (Day 8) (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 5/5/2010. (Day 7) (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 5/4/2010. (Day 6) (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 5/3/2010. (Day 5) (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) Modified file date on 5/5/2010 (mkg). (Entered: 05/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 4/30/2010. (Day 4) (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis: Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 4/29/2010. (Day 3) (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Trial as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 4/28/2010. Day 2. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis: Jury Trial - Opening Arguments as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 4/27/2010/ (Day 1) (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Jury Selection and Voir Dire as to Russell Adam Cole (1) and Abby Rae Cole (2) held on 4/20/2010. Trial is continued to 4/27/10 at 12:00 p.m. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) Modified text on 4/20/2010 (jdf). Modified file date on 4/28/2010 (mkg). (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for Pretrial Conference and Arraignment held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis: as to Russell Adam Cole (1), Abby Rae Cole (2). (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 04/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Motion in Limine No. 1 119 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; Motion in Limine No. 2 121 is GRANTED; Motion in Limine No. 3 123 is DENIED; Motion in Limine No. 4 125 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; Motion in Limine No. 5 127 is DENIED; Motion in Limine No. 6 129 is DENIED; Motion in Limine No. 7 131 is DENIED; 8. Motion in Limine No; 8 133 is DENIED; Motion in Limine No. 9 135 is RESERVED; Motion in Limine No. 10 137 is DENIED; Motion in Limine No. 11 138 is DENIED; Motion in Limine No. 12 140 is DENIED; Motion in Limine No. 13 158 is RESERVED; Motion in Limine No. 14 174 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; Governments Motion in Limine 149 is DENIED; Governments Motion in Limine 150 is DENIED; Governments Motion in Limine 153 is RESERVED; Defendants letter request for redaction of undercover tape recordings, set forth in Defendants letter to the Court dated April 13, 2010, is DENIED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/15/10. (GRR) Modified text on 4/16/2010 (jdf). (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. Accordingly, based upon the files, records, and proceedings herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Defendants' Joint Motion for Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum to Benjamin Ripstein 163 is DENIED (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/15/10. (GRR) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CANCELLATION/ORDER that arraignment scheduled on April 16, 2010, at 9:15 a.m., in Courtroom 3C of the U.S. Courthouse, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, MN, 55101, before the undersigned Magistrate Judge is canceled as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 4/14/10. (jdf) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 174 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 14 to Exclude Proposed Government Exhibit 147 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Otteson, William) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Service by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 176 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 175 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 174 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 14 to Exclude Proposed Government Exhibit 147.(Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 174 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 14 to Exclude Proposed Government Exhibit 147 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - C)(Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 174 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 14 to Exclude Proposed Government Exhibit 147 (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION in Limine No. 14 to Exclude Proposed Government Exhibit 147 by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 168 Motion to Seal Document as to Abby Rae Cole (2); denying 169 Motion to Seal Document as to Abby Rae Cole (2). Motions shall be filed via electronic filing. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/13/10. (KMW) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole. The arraignment on the superseding indictment will be held on April 16, 2010 at 1:00 p.m. before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis in Courtroom 15E. (KMW) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING/ORDER as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole Arraignment set for 4/16/2010 09:15 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan.Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 4/13/10. (jdf) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT assigned to Chief Judge Michael J. Davis referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan by USA Nicole A. Engisch and William J. Otteson as to Russell Adam Cole (1) counts 1ss, 2ss-13ss, 14ss-19ss, 20ss, 21ss, 22ss, 23ss, 24ss, 25ss, 26ss and Abby Rae Cole (2) counts 1ss, 2ss-13ss, 14ss-19ss, 20ss, 21ss, 22ss, 23ss, 24ss, 25ss, 26ss. Forfeiture Allegations as to this Indictment. (las) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Seal Document by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Seal Document by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 163 Joint MOTION For Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum to Benjamin Ripstein (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Otteson, William) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 164 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 163 Joint MOTION For Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum to Benjamin Ripstein, 165 Affidavit in Support of Motion.(Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 163 Joint MOTION For Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum to Benjamin Ripstein (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-C)(Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 163 Joint MOTION For Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum to Benjamin Ripstein (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION For Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum to Benjamin Ripstein by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Certificate of Service by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 160 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 157 Response to Motion, 159 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 158 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 13 to Exclude Unfairly Prejudicial Statements of Stephen Kozer.(Wallace-Jackson, David) Modified text on 4/6/2010 (jdf). (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Service by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 160 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 157 Response to Motion, 159 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 158 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 13 to Exclude Unfairly Prejudicial Statements of Stephen Kozer.(Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 158 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 13 to Exclude Unfairly Prejudicial Statements of Stephen Kozer (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 158 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 13 to Exclude Unfairly Prejudicial Statements of Stephen Kozer (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION in Limine No. 13 to Exclude Unfairly Prejudicial Statements of Stephen Kozer by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 149 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Impeachment Through Specific Instances of Prior Acts, 153 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants' Proposed Hearsay Exhibits, 150 MOTION in Limine to Preclude a Defendant from Offering Evidence of "Good Character" Other than Through Opinion or Reputation (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Service by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 138 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude Unfairly Prejudicial Statements of Witness Michael A. Hartman, C.P.A., 126 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 122 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 139 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 127 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Evidence of Creditor Obligations, 140 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Exclude Unfairly Prejudicial Statements of Janyce Barkan, 124 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 130 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 141 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 128 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 135 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Evidence of the Merchandise Incident, 120 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 121 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence of Prescription Drug Purchases and Use, 134 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 145 Proposed Jury Instructions, 137 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Evidence of the Core Receivable Incident, 129 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Evidence of the Football Incident, 132 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 142 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 143 Proposed Voir Dire, 125 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence of Defendant Russell Cole's Demeanor and Treatment of Employees, 123 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of Defendants' Purportedly Extravagant Lifestyle, 131 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Evidence of Pre-Program Gifts, 136 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 133 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude Evidence of Prior Business Practices, 119 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of the Loading Dock Incident, 144 Certificate of Service,.(Wallace-Jackson, David) Modified text on 4/2/2010 (jdf). (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Service by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 153 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants' Proposed Hearsay Exhibits, 154 Response to Motion.(Engisch, Nicole) Modified text on 4/1/2010 (jdf). (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 135 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Evidence of the Merchandise Incident, 129 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Evidence of the Football Incident, 138 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude Unfairly Prejudicial Statements of Witness Michael A. Hartman, C.P.A., 123 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of Defendants' Purportedly Extravagant Lifestyle, 133 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude Evidence of Prior Business Practices, 127 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Evidence of Creditor Obligations, 125 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence of Defendant Russell Cole's Demeanor and Treatment of Employees, 119 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of the Loading Dock Incident, 131 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Evidence of Pre-Program Gifts, 121 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence of Prescription Drug Purchases and Use, 140 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Exclude Unfairly Prejudicial Statements of Janyce Barkan, 137 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Evidence of the Core Receivable Incident (Engisch, Nicole) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants' Proposed Hearsay Exhibits by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Engisch, Nicole) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO ATTORNEY as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole. The Trial will begin on Tuesday, April 27, 2010 at 12:00 p.m. before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis in the Minneapolis Federal Courthouse, Courtoom 15E. All other deadlines and hearings shall remain in effect. (KMW) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 150 MOTION in Limine to Preclude a Defendant from Offering Evidence of "Good Character" Other than Through Opinion or Reputation, 146 Trial Brief, 149 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Impeachment Through Specific Instances of Prior Acts, 148 Proposed Voir Dire, 147 Proposed Jury Instructions.(Engisch, Nicole) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Preclude a Defendant from Offering Evidence of "Good Character" Other than Through Opinion or Reputation by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Engisch, Nicole) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Preclude Impeachment Through Specific Instances of Prior Acts by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Engisch, Nicole) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Voir Dire by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole (Engisch, Nicole) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole (Engisch, Nicole) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRIAL MEMORANDUM by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole (Engisch, Nicole) Modified text on 3/30/2010 (mkg). (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Jury Instructions by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 138 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude Unfairly Prejudicial Statements of Witness Michael A. Hartman, C.P.A., 126 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 122 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 139 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 127 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Evidence of Creditor Obligations, 140 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Exclude Unfairly Prejudicial Statements of Janyce Barkan, 124 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 130 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 141 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 128 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 135 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Evidence of the Merchandise Incident, 120 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 121 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence of Prescription Drug Purchases and Use, 134 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 137 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Evidence of the Core Receivable Incident, 129 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Evidence of the Football Incident, 132 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 142 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 143 Proposed Voir Dire, 125 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence of Defendant Russell Cole's Demeanor and Treatment of Employees, 123 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of Defendants' Purportedly Extravagant Lifestyle, 131 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Evidence of Pre-Program Gifts, 136 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 133 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude Evidence of Prior Business Practices, 119 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of the Loading Dock Incident.(Wallace-Jackson, David) Modified text on 3/29/2010 (jdf). (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Voir Dire by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 135 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Evidence of the Merchandise Incident, 129 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Evidence of the Football Incident, 138 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude Unfairly Prejudicial Statements of Witness Michael A. Hartman, C.P.A., 125 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence of Defendant Russell Cole's Demeanor and Treatment of Employees, 123 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of Defendants' Purportedly Extravagant Lifestyle, 131 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Evidence of Pre-Program Gifts, 127 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Evidence of Creditor Obligations, 140 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Exclude Unfairly Prejudicial Statements of Janyce Barkan, 133 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude Evidence of Prior Business Practices, 119 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of the Loading Dock Incident, 137 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Evidence of the Core Receivable Incident, 121 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence of Prescription Drug Purchases and Use (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - C)(Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 140 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Exclude Unfairly Prejudicial Statements of Janyce Barkan (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Exclude Unfairly Prejudicial Statements of Janyce Barkan by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 138 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude Unfairly Prejudicial Statements of Witness Michael A. Hartman, C.P.A. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude Unfairly Prejudicial Statements of Witness Michael A. Hartman, C.P.A. by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Evidence of the Core Receivable Incident by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 135 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Evidence of the Merchandise Incident (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Evidence of the Merchandise Incident by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 133 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude Evidence of Prior Business Practices (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude Evidence of Prior Business Practices by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 131 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Evidence of Pre-Program Gifts (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Evidence of Pre-Program Gifts by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 129 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Evidence of the Football Incident (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Evidence of the Football Incident by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 127 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Evidence of Creditor Obligations (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Evidence of Creditor Obligations by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 125 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence of Defendant Russell Cole's Demeanor and Treatment of Employees (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence of Defendant Russell Cole's Demeanor and Treatment of Employees by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 123 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of Defendants' Purportedly Extravagant Lifestyle (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of Defendants' Purportedly Extravagant Lifestyle by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 121 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence of Prescription Drug Purchases and Use (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence of Prescription Drug Purchases and Use by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 119 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of the Loading Dock Incident (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of the Loading Dock Incident by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 117 Motion to Withdraw Document as to Russell Adam Cole (1), Abby Rae Cole (2). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/25/10. (KMW) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Withdraw Document 116 Certificate of Service, 115 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 114 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 113 Joint MOTION for Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum to Computer Parts Repair & Services, Inc. by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Wallace-Jackson, David) Modified text on 1/25/2010 (las). (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 115 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 114 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 113 Joint MOTION for Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum to Computer Parts Repair & Services, Inc..(Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 113 Joint MOTION for Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum to Computer Parts Repair & Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-C)(Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 113 Joint MOTION for Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum to Computer Parts Repair & Services, Inc. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum to Computer Parts Repair & Services, Inc. by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  THIRD AMENDED TRIAL NOTICE as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole. Jury Selection is scheduled for 4/19/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. Jury Trial is scheduled to begin 4/26/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. The Pretrial Motions Hearing is scheduled for 4/16/2010 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. Please read the trial notice for all new deadlines and due dates. (KMW) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis:Status Conference as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole held on 1/4/2010. The Trial Date has been moved to 4/26/10 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 15E before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole. The Status Conference has been rescheduled to 1/4/10 at 11:00 a.m. before Chief Judge Davis in Courtroom 15E, (KMW) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** NOTICE TO ATTORNEY as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole. The status conference scheduled for 12/15/09 at 11:00 a.m. has been cancelled. (KMW) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** NOTICE TO ATTORNEY as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole. A status conference is scheduled for 12/15/09 at 11:00 a.m. before Chief Judge Davis in Courtroom 15E. All counsel and defendants shall be present for this hearing. (KMW) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Russell Adam Cole (1) and Abby Rae Cole (2). Granting 60 Motion for Discovery; denying 95 Motion to Compel; the 98 Motion for Disclosure is moot; granting 100 Motion for Discovery; granting 101 Motion for Release of Brady Materials; granting 102 Motion for Disclosure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 11/30/09. (LEG) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan: Arraignment as to Russell Adam Cole (1) Counts 1s,2s-13s,14s-19s,20s,21s,22s,23s,24s,25s,26s and Abby Rae Cole (2) Count 1s,2s-13s,14s-19s,20s,21s,22s,23s,24s,25s,26s held on 11/19/2009. Not Guilty Plea Entered. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (LEG) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan:Motion Hearing as to Russell Adam Cole Abby Rae Cole held on 11/19/2009. Motions taken under advisement as of 11/19/09. Order to be issued. No R&R to be issued. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (MKG) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 102 Joint MOTION for Disclosure of Rule 404(b) Evidence, 95 Joint MOTION to Compel Production and Designation of Rule 16 Materials or Alternatively for a Bill of Particulars Under Rule 7(F), 98 Joint MOTION for Disclosure of Early Jencks Act Material, 101 Joint MOTION for Release of Brady Materials and Giglio Materials, 100 Joint MOTION for Discovery of Rule 16(a)(1)(G) Evidence (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Otteson, William) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 97 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 102 Joint MOTION for Disclosure of Rule 404(b) Evidence, 98 Joint MOTION for Disclosure of Early Jencks Act Material, 99 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 95 Joint MOTION to Compel Production and Designation of Rule 16 Materials or Alternatively for a Bill of Particulars Under Rule 7(F), 101 Joint MOTION for Release of Brady Materials and Giglio Materials, 96 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 100 Joint MOTION for Discovery of Rule 16(a)(1)(G) Evidence.(Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Disclosure of Rule 404(b) Evidence by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Release of Brady Materials and Giglio Materials by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Discovery of Rule 16(a)(1)(G) Evidence by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 98 Joint MOTION for Disclosure of Early Jencks Act Material (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Disclosure of Early Jencks Act Material by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 95 Joint MOTION to Compel Production and Designation of Rule 16 Materials or Alternatively for a Bill of Particulars Under Rule 7(F) (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 95 Joint MOTION to Compel Production and Designation of Rule 16 Materials or Alternatively for a Bill of Particulars Under Rule 7(F) (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Compel Production and Designation of Rule 16 Materials or Alternatively for a Bill of Particulars Under Rule 7(F) by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER of Appearance for Arraignment on Superseding Indictment and Entry of Plea of Not Guilty by Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Serivce). Original Ink signed signatures re: 90 .(las) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. Arraignment and Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan. Disclosure due by 11/5/2009. Motions due by 11/12/2009. Voir Dire/Jury Instructions deadline due by 4/5/2010. Jury Trial set for 5/3/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 11/2/09. (BJS) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by USA - request new deadline for filing pretrial motions and schedule arraignment and motions hearing (Otteson, William) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 90 Waiver of Appearance and Hearing. The Court accepts the waiver and the defendants are excused from making a personal appearance on 11/3/09, and a plea of not guilty is hereby entered on behalf of deft Russell Adam Cole and deft Abby Rae Cole. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 10/28/09. (BJS) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER of Appearance and Hearing by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE from David J. Wallace-Jackson by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole requesting arraignment to take place in conjunction with the new motions hearing (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER/NOTICE OF HEARING as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole - Arraignment regarding superseding indictment set for 11/3/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 10/23/09. (las) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan by USA William J. Otteson and Nicole A. Engisch as to Russell Adam Cole (1) count(s) 1s, 2s-13s, 14s-19s, 20s, 21s, 22s, 23s, 24s, 25s, 26s, Abby Rae Cole (2) count(s) 1s, 2s-13s, 14s-19s, 20s, 21s, 22s, 23s, 24s, 25s, 26s. Forfeiture allegations as to this indictment. (BJS) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 83 Motion to Stay as to Russell Adam Cole (1) and Abby Rae Cole (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 10/16/09. (KNK) Modified text on 10/16/2009 (knk). (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 83 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Motions Deadlines, 84 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Stay Pretrial Motions Deadlines.(Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 83 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Motions Deadlines (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Stay Pretrial Motions Deadlines by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Wallace-Jackson, David) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND AMENDED TRIAL NOTICE as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole. Jury Trial is set for 5/3/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. Please read the trial notice for all deadlines and due dates. (KMW) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 77 Motion to Continue as to Russell Adam Cole (1), Abby Rae Cole (2). The trial has been moved to begin on 5/3/10 at 9:00 a.m. before Chief Judge Davis in Courtroom 15E. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/8/09. (KMW) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 77 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Date (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Otteson, William) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 77 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Date, 78 Affidavit in Support of Motion.(Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole re 77 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Date (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Date by Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED TRIAL NOTICE as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole (Updated attorney information). Jury Trial is set for 3/1/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. Please read the trial notice for all deadlines and due dates. (KMW) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRIAL NOTICE as to Russell Adam Cole and Abby Rae Cole. Jury Trial is set for 3/1/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. Please read the trial notice for all deadlines and due dates. (KMW) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Bench Warrant Returned Executed on 7/23/09 as to Abby Rae Cole.(jdf) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting 71 Motion to Continue / Joint Motion to Designate Case as Complex Under Speedy Trial Act and for Continuance as to Russell Adam Cole (1) and Abby Rae Cole (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 08/11/09. (las) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Continue / Joint Motion to Designate Case as Complex Under Speedy Trial Act and For Continuance by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Otteson, William) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ARRAIGNMENT ORDER as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 7/23/09. (jdf) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Shelly B. Kulwin by Abby Rae Cole. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appearance Bond Entered as to Abby Rae Cole in amount of $ 25,000 rpr. (jdf) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Abby Rae Cole (2) $25,000 rpr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 7/23/09. (jdf) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes:Arraignment as to Russell Adam Cole (1) Count 1,2-13,14-19,20,21 and Abby Rae Cole (2) Count 1,2-13,14-19,20,21 held on 7/23/2009. Not Guilty Plea Entered. Disclosure due by 7/31/2009. Motions due by 8/14/2009. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan. Voir Dire/Jury Instructions deadline due by 9/28/2009. Jury Trial set for 10/5/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. Counsel to be notified of additional dates by separate Order to be issued. (jdf) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes:Initial Appearance as to Abby Rae Cole held on 7/23/2009; Counsel retained; Bond set at $25,000 rpr; Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan. Deft also arraigned. See separate minutes. (jdf) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure 16(b), 12,1, 12.2 and 26.2 by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Otteson, William) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASE in case as to Russell Adam Cole (1) and Abby Rae Cole (2). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Case No. 09-193 be assigned to Chief Judge Michael J. Davis, nunc pro tunc, by use of a card on the CRIMINAL List of the automated case assignment system, and the Clerk of Court is directed to void and reuse a card on the same list pursuant to this Court's Assignment of Cases Order dated December 19, 2008. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that a copy of this order shall be placed in each of the above respective files. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/21/09 and signed by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 7/23/09. New case number is CR 09-193 MJD/AJB. (LEG) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO THE COURT OF POSSIBLE RELATED CASE (08-388 (MJD)) by USA as to Russell Adam Cole, Abby Rae Cole (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Otteson, William) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      INDICTMENT assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan by USA William J. Otteson and Nicole A. Engisch as to Russell Adam Cole (1) counts 1, 2-13, 14-19, 20, and 21; and Abby Rae Cole (2) counts 1, 2-13, 14-19, 20, and 21. Forfeiture allegations as to this indictment. (MKG) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 276 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?