Kuntz v. National Arbitration Forum, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:09-cv-01949
District Judge Paul A. Magnuson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 11:47 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rebecca Kuntz, Plaintiff

Represented by Gustafson Gluek PLLC

Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by ROBERTS LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily A Neal +1 501 821 5575 robertslawfirm@aristotle.net
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MICHAEL L. ROBERTS +1 501 821 5575 +1 501 821 4474 mikeroberts@aristotle.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Rodanast, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dianne M. Nast +1 717 892 3000 +1 717 892 1200 dnast@rodanast.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F Roda +1 717 892 3000 +1 717 892 1200 jroda@rodanast.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JENNIFER S. SNYDER +1 717 892 3000 +1 717 892 1200 jsnyder@rodalaw.com
v.
No Logo Accretive, Llc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Rankin Clark , +1 212 259 7163 +1 212 259 6333 crclark@dl.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin C Wallace +1 212 259 8000 +1 212 259 6333 kwallace@dl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maslon Edelman Borman & Brand LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine H. Ahlin-Halverson +1 612 672 8314 +1 612 642 8314 catherine.ahlin@maslon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David F. Herr +1 612 672 8200 +6728 672 672 8397 david.herr@maslon.com
No Logo Agora, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Rankin Clark , +1 212 259 7163 +1 212 259 6333 crclark@dl.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin C Wallace +1 212 259 8000 +1 212 259 6333 kwallace@dl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maslon Edelman Borman & Brand LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine H. Ahlin-Halverson +1 612 672 8314 +1 612 642 8314 catherine.ahlin@maslon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David F. Herr +1 612 672 8200 +6728 672 672 8397 david.herr@maslon.com
American Express Company American Express Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "American Express"

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth L. Grayer +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 egrayer@cravath.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winthrop & Weinstine, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William A McNab +1 612 604 6652 +1 612 604 6852 wmcnab@winthrop.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brooks F Poley +1 612 604 6400 +1 612 604 6819 bpoley@winthrop.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph M Windler +1 612 604 6646 +1 612 604 6846 jwindler@winthrop.com
No Logo Axiant, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bowman and Brooke LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin P Curry +1 612 672 3243 +1 612 672 3200 kevin.curry@bowmanandbrooke.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W. Soule, Esq. +1 612 672 3251 +1 612 672 3200 george.soule@bowmanandbrooke.com
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bank of America"
Unknown Role, Oneida Ltd.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Unknown Role, Nb Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Paul Ladner +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 mladner@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J Gilbertson +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 rjgilbertson@rkmc.com
Capital One Bank (USA) NA Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Defendant

Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Winthrop & Weinstine, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina Rieck Loukas +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 cloukas@winthrop.com
Capital One Financial Corporation Capital One Financial Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Winthrop & Weinstine, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina Rieck Loukas +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 cloukas@winthrop.com
Capital One, NA Capital One, NA, Defendant

Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Winthrop & Weinstine, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina Rieck Loukas +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 cloukas@winthrop.com
Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Chippac, Inc.
Unknown Role, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Unknown Role, Citibank, NA
Unknown Role, Keane, Inc.
Unknown Role, Macdermid Inc.
Unknown Role, CITICORP
Unknown Role, Imc Mortgage Co
Unknown Role, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Unknown Role, Pfs Services Inc
Unknown Role, Citicorp Banking Corp
Unknown Role, Intersil Holding Co
Unknown Role, Citigroup Holdings Co
Unknown Role, Cvc Partners LLC
Unknown Role, Ness Technologies Inc
Unknown Role, Primerica, Inc.
Unknown Role, Student Loan Corp
Unknown Role, Pacholder Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Salomon Inc
Unknown Role, Jones Energy, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Halleland Lewis Nilan & Johnson PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tracy J Van Steenburgh +1 612 338 1838 +1 612 338 7858 tvan@halleland.com

Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

No Logo Discover Card, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J Long +1 612 977 8400 +1 612 977 8650 jlong@briggs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Joseph Rivelli +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 7000 trivelli@winston.com
No Logo Dispute Management Services, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Thomas Vitt +1 612 340 7809

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan Flynn +1 515 697 3636 +1 515 864 0209 flynn.megan@dorsey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J David Jackson +1 612 340 2760 +1 952 516 5596 jackson.j@dorsey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley T Smith +1 612 492 6726 +1 952 516 5553 smith.bradley@dorsey.com
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "J.P. Morganchase"

Toggle Switch Represented by Leonard Street and Deinard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Applebaum +1 612 335 1500 david.applebaum@leonard.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd A Noteboom +1 612 335 1894 +1 612 335 1657 todd.noteboom@leonard.com
No Logo Mbna Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Paul Ladner +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 mladner@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J Gilbertson +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 rjgilbertson@rkmc.com
No Logo National Arbitration Forum, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Thomas Vitt +1 612 340 7809

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan Flynn +1 515 697 3636 +1 515 864 0209 flynn.megan@dorsey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J David Jackson +1 612 340 2760 +1 952 516 5596 jackson.j@dorsey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley T Smith +1 612 492 6726 +1 952 516 5553 smith.bradley@dorsey.com
No Logo National Arbitration Forum, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Thomas Vitt +1 612 340 7809

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan Flynn +1 515 697 3636 +1 515 864 0209 flynn.megan@dorsey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J David Jackson +1 612 340 2760 +1 952 516 5596 jackson.j@dorsey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley T Smith +1 612 492 6726 +1 952 516 5553 smith.bradley@dorsey.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (106) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 106 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re E-Discovery Protocol. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 12/7/09. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-01939-PAM-JSM et al.(kt) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
    LREF
    Blank 105 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Rebecca Kuntz of Dismissal Without Prejudice. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
      LREF
      Blank 104 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
      PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2010, Class Discovery due by 4/1/2010, Class non-dispositive motions due by 4/1/010. Merit discovery due by 1/1/11, Merit non-dispositve motions due by 1/1/11, Merit dispositive motions due by 5/1/011, ready for trial date 7/1/11. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 10/22/09. (VEM) Modified date on 10/27/2009 (vem). (Entered: 10/27/2009)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 9/02/2009 before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (35 pages). Court Reporter: Ron Moen (E-mail: Ron_Moen@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1222). Redaction Request due 11/9/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2010. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (RJM) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (RJM) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
            CONSOLIDATION AND SERVICE BY EMAIL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 10/13/09. (jam) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine H. Ahlin-Halverson on behalf of Accretive, LLC, Agora. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ahlin-Halverson, Catherine) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER dismissing without prejudice Defendants American Express Company; Bank of America Corporation (named in the Complaint as Bank of America Corporation and MBNA Corporation); Wells Fargo; Wachovia; Capital One Financial Corporation; Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.; Capital One, N.A.; JP Morgan Chase & Co. (named in the Complaint as J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.); Citigroup Inc; and Discover Financial Services (named in the Complaint as Discover Card). Each party shall bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on September 30, 2009. (alt) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None
                  Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases of Related Actions by Rebecca Kuntz. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rebecca Kuntz re 95 Notice (Other), 96 Affidavit. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT of Daniel E. Gustafson re 95 Notice (Other) Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Rebecca Kuntz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G)(Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to certain defendants ONLY by Rebecca Kuntz (Gustafson, Daniel) Modified text on 9/25/2009 (RLR). (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Emily A. Neal by Rebecca Kuntz. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER re 89 Stipulation; Axiant, LLC answer due 11/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 9/17/09. (LPH) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                              RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC of National Arbitration Forum, Inc. as corporate parent and/or publicly held company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ralph, F) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Theodore R. Scarborough by Citigroup, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Van Steenburgh, Tracy) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David F. Graham by Citigroup, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Van Steenburgh, Tracy) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                    STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Axiant, LLC, to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Axiant, LLC and Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Curry, Kevin) Modified filers on 9/16/2009 (RLR). (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Kuntz. Accretive, LLC served on 9/11/2009, answer due 10/1/2009; Agora served on 9/11/2009, answer due 10/1/2009. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER re 84 Stipulation; Discover Card answer due 11/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 9/11/09. (LPH) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER re 83 Stipulation; Citigroup, Inc. answer due 11/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 9/11/09. (LPH) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Daniel Hutchinson by Rebecca Kuntz. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None
                                              STIPULATION re 1 Complaint,, Stipulation Regarding Extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Discover Card, Rebecca Kuntz. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Long, James) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                STIPULATION re 1 Complaint,, Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Citigroup, Inc., Rebecca Kuntz. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Van Steenburgh, Tracy) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Karen C. Quirk by Discover Card. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Long, James) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth L. Grayer by American Express. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Poley, Brooks) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER re 77 Stipulation; Dispute Management Services, LLC answer due 11/2/2009; National Arbitration Forum, Inc. answer due 11/2/2009; National Arbitration Forum, LLC answer due 11/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 9/8/09. (LPH) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Timothy J. Rivelli by Discover Card. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Long, James) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for William C. O'Neil by Discover Card. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Long, James) Modified on 9/4/2009 (MMC). (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                            STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC and Plaintiff's. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ralph, F) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER GRANTING AXIANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE AND FILE ITS ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT 74 . Axiant, LLC answer due 9/17/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 09/04/2009. (NES) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                Order Denying 28 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; Granting Plaintiffs' Motions for a Rule 16 Conference; and Granting in Part and Denying in part Plaintiffs' Motions for Accelerated Discovery. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 09/03/2009. (LM) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Axiant, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Curry, Kevin) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    Amended MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Mark P. Ladner by Bank of America, MBNA Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gilbertson, Robert) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Express re 71 Notice of Appearance William A. McNab. (McNab, William) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by William A McNab on behalf of American Express. (McNab, William) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER re 44 Stipulation; American Express answer now due 11/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 9/2/09. (LPH) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER re 42 Stipulation; Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. answer now due 11/2/2009; Capital One Financial Corporation answer now due 11/2/2009; Capital One, N.A. answer now due 11/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 9/2/09. (LPH) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER re 41 Stipulation; Bank of America answer now due 11/2/2009; MBNA Corporation answer now due 11/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 9/2/09. (LPH) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Kuntz. J.P. Morganchase served on 8/14/2009, answer due 9/3/2009. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Kuntz. American Express served on 8/14/2009, answer due 9/3/2009. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Kuntz. Axiant, LLC served on 8/14/2009, answer due 9/3/2009. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Kuntz. Dispute Management Services, LLC served on 8/17/2009, answer due 9/8/2009. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Kuntz. National Arbitration Forum, Inc. served on 8/17/2009, answer due 9/8/2009. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Kuntz. National Arbitration Forum, LLC served on 8/17/2009, answer due 9/8/2009. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Kuntz. Accretive, LLC served on 8/21/2009, answer due 9/10/2009. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Kuntz. Discover Card served on 8/28/2009, answer due 9/17/2009. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Kuntz. Citigroup, Inc. served on 8/21/2009, answer due 9/10/2009. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Kuntz. Capital One Financial Corporation served on 8/17/2009, answer due 9/8/2009. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Kuntz. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. served on 8/17/2009, answer due 9/8/2009. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Kuntz. Capital One, N.A. served on 8/17/2009, answer due 9/8/2009. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks F Poley on behalf of American Express. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Poley, Brooks) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - replaced by doc. #73. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Mark P. Ladner by Bank of America, MBNA Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gilbertson, Robert) Modified on 9/3/2009 (MMC). (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Defendants from Conducting Consumer Arbitrations, an Expedited Rule 16 Conference, and Accelerated Discovery filed by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Certificate of Service)(Van Oort, Aaron) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC re 51 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 50 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 47 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 49 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 48 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion. (Smith, Bradley) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of F. Matthew Ralph in OPPOSITION TO 28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Defendants from Conducting Consumer Arbitrations, an Expedited Rule 16 Conference, and Accelerated Discovery filed by Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5, # 6 Exhibit(s) 6, # 7 Exhibit(s) 7)(Smith, Bradley) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of David J. Schaibley in OPPOSITION TO 28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Defendants from Conducting Consumer Arbitrations, an Expedited Rule 16 Conference, and Accelerated Discovery filed by Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5, # 6 Exhibit(s) 6)(Smith, Bradley) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Michael F. Kelley in OPPOSITION TO 28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Defendants from Conducting Consumer Arbitrations, an Expedited Rule 16 Conference, and Accelerated Discovery filed by Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC. (Smith, Bradley) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Ryan D. Chandlee in OPPOSITION TO 28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Defendants from Conducting Consumer Arbitrations, an Expedited Rule 16 Conference, and Accelerated Discovery filed by Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC. (Smith, Bradley) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Defendants from Conducting Consumer Arbitrations, an Expedited Rule 16 Conference, and Accelerated Discovery filed by Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Smith, Bradley) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J.P. Morganchase re 45 Stipulation. (Applebaum, David) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to extend time to answer re 1 Complaint, by J.P. Morganchase and Plaintiff. (Applebaum, David) Added text and filer on 9/2/2009 (RLR). (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by American Express, Rebecca Kuntz. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Windler, Joseph) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for American Express. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Windler, Joseph) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A., Rebecca Kuntz. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Van Oort, Aaron) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re 1 Complaint,, Regarding Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Bank of America, Rebecca Kuntz, MBNA Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gilbertson, Robert) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by James J Long on behalf of Discover Card. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Long, James) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Rieck Loukas on behalf of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Loukas, Christina) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rebecca Kuntz re 29 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 33 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 30 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 31 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 34 Declaration in Support, 32 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Defendants from Conducting Consumer Arbitrations, an Expedited Rule 16 Conference, and Accelerated Discovery. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J.P. Morganchase re 36 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Andrew A. Ruffino, 35 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Robert D. Wick. (Applebaum, David) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Andrew A. Ruffino by J.P. Morganchase. (Applebaum, David) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Robert D. Wick by J.P. Morganchase. (Applebaum, David) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Marla Kendal in Support of 28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Defendants from Conducting Consumer Arbitrations, an Expedited Rule 16 Conference, and Accelerated Discovery filed by Rebecca Kuntz. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Gabriel Aquino in SUPPORT OF 28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Defendants from Conducting Consumer Arbitrations, an Expedited Rule 16 Conference, and Accelerated Discovery filed by Rebecca Kuntz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1 - 3)(Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of John Sanford in SUPPORT OF 28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Defendants from Conducting Consumer Arbitrations, an Expedited Rule 16 Conference, and Accelerated Discovery filed by Rebecca Kuntz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Elizabeth J. Cabraser in SUPPORT OF 28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Defendants from Conducting Consumer Arbitrations, an Expedited Rule 16 Conference, and Accelerated Discovery filed by Rebecca Kuntz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - D, # 2 Exhibit(s) E - G, # 3 Exhibit(s) H - K)(Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Defendants from Conducting Consumer Arbitrations, an Expedited Rule 16 Conference, and Accelerated Discovery filed by Rebecca Kuntz. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Defendants from Conducting Consumer Arbitrations, an Expedited Rule 16 Conference, and Accelerated Discovery : Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Defendants from Conducting Consumer Arbitrations, an Expedited Rule 16 Conference, and Accelerated Discovery by Rebecca Kuntz. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Megan C Dempsey on behalf of Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Dempsey, Megan) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by J Thomas Vitt on behalf of Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Vitt, J) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by F Matthew Ralph on behalf of Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC. (Ralph, F) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley T Smith on behalf of Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Bradley) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by J D Jackson on behalf of Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jackson, J) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J.P. Morganchase re 21 Notice of Appearance. (Noteboom, Todd) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Todd A Noteboom on behalf of J.P. Morganchase. (Noteboom, Todd) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J.P. Morganchase re 19 Notice of Appearance. (Applebaum, David) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by David A Applebaum on behalf of J.P. Morganchase. (Applebaum, David) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF DIRECTION TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson and Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron for all further proceedings. Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson no longer assigned to case. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 8/20/09 and Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 8/21/09. (JME) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Kuntz. Wachovia served on 8/20/2009, answer due 9/9/2009; Wells Fargo served on 8/20/2009, answer due 9/9/2009. (Gustafson, Daniel) Modified dates on 8/21/2009 (lph). (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Michael L. Roberts by Rebecca Kuntz. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Joseph F. Roda by Rebecca Kuntz. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Dianne M. Nast by Rebecca Kuntz. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer S. Snyder by Rebecca Kuntz. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Rebecca Kuntz. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Rachel Geman by Rebecca Kuntz. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Kelly M. Dermody by Rebecca Kuntz. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Michael W. Sobol by Rebecca Kuntz. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER FROM DISTRICT JUDGE. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 08/10/09. (bjs) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth J. Cabraser by Rebecca Kuntz. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - replaced by doc. #7. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth J. Cabraser by Rebecca Kuntz. (Gustafson, Daniel) Modified on 8/6/2009 (MMC). (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ann D. Montgomery recused. Case reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 09-cv-1949 PJS/SRN. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 7/30/09. (LJG) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Michael J. Davis recused. Case reassigned to Judge Ann D. Montgomery for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 09cv1949 ADM/SRN. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/29/09. (JME) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 09cv1949 MJD/SRN. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 7/29/09. (JME) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. Judge Richard H. Kyle recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Michael J. Davis for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 09cv1949 MJD/JJK. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 7/29/09. (JME) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Accretive, LLC, Agora, American Express, Axiant, LLC, Bank of America, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A., Citigroup, Inc., Discover Card, J.P. Morganchase, MBNA Corporation, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC, Wachovia, Wells Fargo ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 04-36393.) assigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle per Anti- Trust referred to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes, filed by Rebecca Kuntz. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (VEM) Document QC'd on 8/3/2009 (nes). (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 234 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?