Burgi v. National Arbitration Forum, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:09-cv-02200
District Judge Paul A. Magnuson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robert Burgi, Plaintiff

Represented by Fine Kaplan & Black, RPC

Represented by Gustafson Gluek PLLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Halleland Lewis Nilan & Johnson PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tracy J Van Steenburgh +1 612 338 1838 +1 612 338 7858 tvan@halleland.com

Represented by Saltz Mongeluzzi Barrett & Bendesky PC

Toggle Switch Represented by WILLIAMSON PETTY LC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marvin Alan Miller +1 312 332 3400 +1 312 676 2676 mmiller@millerlawllc.com
v.
No Logo Accretive, Llc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Rankin Clark , +1 212 259 7163 +1 212 259 6333 crclark@dl.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin C Wallace +1 212 259 8000 +1 212 259 6333 kwallace@dl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maslon Edelman Borman & Brand LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine H. Ahlin-Halverson +1 612 672 8314 +1 612 642 8314 catherine.ahlin@maslon.com
No Logo Agora, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Rankin Clark , +1 212 259 7163 +1 212 259 6333 crclark@dl.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin C Wallace +1 212 259 8000 +1 212 259 6333 kwallace@dl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maslon Edelman Borman & Brand LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine H. Ahlin-Halverson +1 612 672 8314 +1 612 642 8314 catherine.ahlin@maslon.com
American Express Company American Express Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth L. Grayer +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 egrayer@cravath.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winthrop & Weinstine, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William A McNab +1 612 604 6652 +1 612 604 6852 wmcnab@winthrop.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brooks F Poley +1 612 604 6400 +1 612 604 6819 bpoley@winthrop.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph M Windler +1 612 604 6646 +1 612 604 6846 jwindler@winthrop.com
Bank of America Corporation Bank of America Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Paul Ladner +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 mladner@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J Gilbertson +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 rjgilbertson@rkmc.com
Capital One Bank (USA) NA Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Defendant

Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Winthrop & Weinstine, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina Rieck Loukas +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 cloukas@winthrop.com
Capital One Financial Corporation Capital One Financial Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Winthrop & Weinstine, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina Rieck Loukas +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 cloukas@winthrop.com
Capital One, NA Capital One, NA, Defendant

Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Winthrop & Weinstine, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina Rieck Loukas +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 cloukas@winthrop.com
No Logo Dispute Management Services, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Thomas Vitt +1 612 340 7809

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan Flynn +1 515 697 3636 +1 515 864 0209 flynn.megan@dorsey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J David Jackson +1 612 340 2760 +1 952 516 5596 jackson.j@dorsey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley T Smith +1 612 492 6726 +1 952 516 5553 smith.bradley@dorsey.com
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "J.P. Morgan Chase & Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Leonard Street and Deinard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Applebaum +1 612 335 1500 david.applebaum@leonard.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd A Noteboom +1 612 335 1894 +1 612 335 1657 todd.noteboom@leonard.com
No Logo Mbna Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Paul Ladner +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 mladner@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J Gilbertson +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 rjgilbertson@rkmc.com
No Logo National Arbitration Forum, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Thomas Vitt +1 612 340 7809

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan Flynn +1 515 697 3636 +1 515 864 0209 flynn.megan@dorsey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J David Jackson +1 612 340 2760 +1 952 516 5596 jackson.j@dorsey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley T Smith +1 612 492 6726 +1 952 516 5553 smith.bradley@dorsey.com
No Logo National Arbitration Forum, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Thomas Vitt +1 612 340 7809

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan Flynn +1 515 697 3636 +1 515 864 0209 flynn.megan@dorsey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J David Jackson +1 612 340 2760 +1 952 516 5596 jackson.j@dorsey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley T Smith +1 612 492 6726 +1 952 516 5553 smith.bradley@dorsey.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 15
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Order Denying Kevin Weldon's Motion to Intervene 125 ; Denying Kevin Weldon's Motion to Amend or Alter 126 ; Denying Jonathan Miller and Dale Robertson's Motion to Alter, Amend, or Vacate 128 ; and Denying Danny Malone's Motion to Alter, Amend, or Vacate 131 . Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 09/08/2011. (LLM) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Civil Notice - appeal, # 2 Civil-8th Circuit Pre-Hearing Conference Notice)(akl) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      FINDINGS OF FACT. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 08/08/2011. Associated Cases: 0:10-md-02122-PAM -JSM et al.(LM) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER Granting (91) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-01939-PAM-JSM; Granting (107) Motion for Approval of Settlement in case 0:10-md-02122-PAM -JSM. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 08/08/2011. Associated Cases: 0:10-md-02122-PAM-JSM et al.(LLM) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          Order for Stay of Proceedings Pending Mediation. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 07/06/2010. Associated Cases: 0:10-md-02122-PAM-JSM et al.(LM) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 61 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
            STIPULATION for Stay of Proceedings Pending Mediation by Accretive, LLC, Agora, Robert Burgi, Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC. (Jackson, J) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER re: 2/17/10 Status Conference: (Next Status Conference set for 3/17/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron). Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 2/18/10. Associated Cases: 0:10-md-02122-PAM-JSM et al.(akl) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                Order stating that Defendants' Objection to Discovery Ruling 193 is Denied; Magistrate Judge Mayeron's Order 187 is Affirmed; and that the Temporary Stay 197 is Lifted and the parties shall proceed expeditiously with class-certification discovery. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 02/03/2010.Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-01939-PAM-JSM et al.(LM) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 12/29/2009. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-01939-PAM-JSM et al.(LM) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 12/23/2009. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-01939-PAM-JSM et al.(LM) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER re E-Discovery Protocol. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 12/7/09. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-01939-PAM-JSM et al.(kt) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 9/02/2009 before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (35 pages). Court Reporter: Ron Moen (E-mail: Ron_Moen@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1222). Redaction Request due 11/9/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2010. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (RJM) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (RJM) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                            CONSOLIDATION AND SERVICE BY EMAIL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 10/13/09. (jam) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine H. Ahlin-Halverson on behalf of Accretive, LLC, Agora. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ahlin-Halverson, Catherine) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER dismissing without prejudice Defendants American Express Company; Bank of America Corporation (named in the Complaint as Bank of America Corporation and MBNA Corporation); Wells Fargo; Wachovia; Capital One Financial Corporation; Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.; Capital One, N.A.; JP Morgan Chase & Co. (named in the Complaint as J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.); Citigroup Inc; and Discover Financial Services (named in the Complaint as Discover Card). Each party shall bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on September 30, 2009. (alt) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Burgi re 49 Affidavit, 48 Notice (Other). (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                    AFFIDAVIT of Daniel E. Gustafson re 48 Notice (Other) (Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice) by Robert Burgi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G)(Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Dismissal without prejudice as to certain defendants ONLY by Robert Burgi. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Donald L. Perelman by Robert Burgi. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Roberta D. Liebenberg by Robert Burgi. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC of National Arbitration Forum, Inc. as corporate parent and/or publicly held company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ralph, F) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Burgi. Accretive, LLC served on 9/11/2009, answer due 10/1/2009; Agora served on 9/11/2009, answer due 10/1/2009. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Simon B. Paris by Robert Burgi. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Patrick Howard by Robert Burgi. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER re 39 Stipulation; Citigroup, Inc. answer due 11/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 9/11/09. (LPH) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Burgi. Citigroup, Inc. served on 9/9/2009, answer due 9/29/2009. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                        STIPULATION re 1 Complaint,, Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Robert Burgi, Citigroup, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Van Steenburgh, Tracy) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth L. Grayer by American Express Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Poley, Brooks) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER re 35 Stipulation; Dispute Management Services, LLC answer due 11/2/2009; National Arbitration Forum, Inc. answer due 11/2/2009; National Arbitration Forum, LLC answer due 11/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 9/8/09. (LPH) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Marvin A. Miller by Robert Burgi. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC and Plaintiff's. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ralph, F) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Order Denying 12 Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunction; Granting Plaintiffs' Motions for a Rule 16 Conference; and Granting in part and Denying in part Plaintiffs' Motions for Accelerated Discovery. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 09/03/2009. (LM) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Defendants from Conducting Consumer Arbitrations, an Expedited Rule 16 Conference, and Accelerated Discovery filed by Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Bradley) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      Amended MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Mark P. Ladner by Bank of America Corporation, MBNA Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gilbertson, Robert) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Express Company re 30 Notice of Appearance William A. McNab. (McNab, William) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by William A McNab on behalf of American Express Company. (McNab, William) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER re 20 Stipulation; American Express Company answer now due 11/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 9/2/09. (LPH) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER re 18 Stipulation; Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. answer now due 11/2/2009; Capital One Financial Corporation answer now due 11/2/2009; Capital One, N.A. answer now due 11/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 9/2/09. (LPH) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - duplicate filing. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Mark P. Ladner by Bank of America Corporation, MBNA Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gilbertson, Robert) Modified on 9/2/2009 (MMC). (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks F Poley on behalf of American Express Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Poley, Brooks) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - replaced by doc. #32. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Mark P. Ladner by Bank of America Corporation, MBNA Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gilbertson, Robert) Modified on 9/3/2009 (MMC). (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER re 17 Stipulation; Bank of America Corporation answer now due 11/2/2009; MBNA Corporation answer now due 11/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 9/2/09. (LPH) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Defendants from Conducting Consumer Arbitrations, an Expedited Rule 16 Conference, and Accelerated Discovery filed by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Certificate of Service)(Van Oort, Aaron) Modified text on 9/3/2009 (kt). (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. re 21 Stipulation. (Applebaum, David) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            STIPULATION for extension of time to answer re 1 Complaint, by J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. and Plaintiff's. (Applebaum, David) Modified on 9/2/2009 (RLR). (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by American Express Company, Robert Burgi. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Windler, Joseph) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for American Express Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Windler, Joseph) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Robert Burgi, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Van Oort, Aaron) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    STIPULATION re 1 Complaint,, Regarding Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Bank of America Corporation, Robert Burgi, MBNA Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gilbertson, Robert) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Rieck Loukas on behalf of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Loukas, Christina) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Burgi re 14 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Defendants from Conducting Consumer Arbitrations, an Expedited Rule 16 Conference, and Accelerated Discovery, 13 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Daniel E. Gustafson in SUPPORT OF 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Defendants from Conducting Consumer Arbitrations, an Expedited Rule 16 Conference, and Accelerated Discovery filed by Robert Burgi. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Defendants from Conducting Consumer Arbitrations, an Expedited Rule 16 Conference, and Accelerated Discovery : Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Defendants from Conducting Consumer Arbitrations, an Expedited Rule 16 Conference, and Accelerated Discovery by Robert Burgi. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Megan C Dempsey on behalf of Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Dempsey, Megan) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by J Thomas Vitt on behalf of Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Vitt, J) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER OF DIRECTION TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson and Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron for all further proceedings. Judge Ann D. Montgomery, Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson no longer assigned to case. The new case number is 09cv2200 PAM/JSM. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson and Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 8/28/09. (JME) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by F Matthew Ralph on behalf of Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC. (Ralph, F) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley T Smith on behalf of Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Bradley) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by J D Jackson on behalf of Dispute Management Services, LLC, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jackson, J) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. re 4 Notice of Appearance. (Noteboom, Todd) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Todd A Noteboom on behalf of J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. (Noteboom, Todd) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. re 2 Notice of Appearance. (Applebaum, David) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by David A Applebaum on behalf of J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. (Applebaum, David) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Accretive, LLC, Agora, American Express Company, Axiant, LLC, Bank of America Corporation, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A., Citigroup, Inc., Discover Card, Dispute Management Services, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., MBNA Corporation, National Arbitration Forum, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, LLC, Wachovia, Wells Fargo ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 40037130.) assigned to Judge Ann D. Montgomery per Antitrust List and referred to Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson, filed by Robert Burgi. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kt) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 222 times.

                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?