Scott et al v. U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, Housing and Redevelopment Authority of Douglas County et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:10-cv-04118
District Judge Michael J. Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Candice K. Herzog, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Housing Preservation Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D Cann +1 651 642 0102 +1 651 642 0051 jcann@hppinc.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ann M. Norton +1 651 642 0102 +1 651 642 0051 anorton@tela.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy L. Thompson +1 651 642 0102 +1 651 642 0051 tthompsn@midmnlegal.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Services of Northwest Minnesota

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherry Bruckner +1 320 762 0663 +1 320 762 0740 sbruckner@lsnmlaw.org
No Logo Mary E. Scott, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Housing Preservation Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D Cann +1 651 642 0102 +1 651 642 0051 jcann@hppinc.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ann M. Norton +1 651 642 0102 +1 651 642 0051 anorton@tela.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy L. Thompson +1 651 642 0102 +1 651 642 0051 tthompsn@midmnlegal.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Services of Northwest Minnesota

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherry Bruckner +1 320 762 0663 +1 320 762 0740 sbruckner@lsnmlaw.org
v.
No Logo Housing and Redevelopment Authority of Douglas County, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jardine Logan & O'Brien PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pierre N Regnier +1 651 290 6500 +1 651 223 5070 pregnier@jlolaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica E Schwie +1 651 290 6591 +1 651 223 5070 jschwie@jlolaw.com
No Logo Jeffrey Schiffman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jardine Logan & O'Brien PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pierre N Regnier +1 651 290 6500 +1 651 223 5070 pregnier@jlolaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica E Schwie +1 651 290 6591 +1 651 223 5070 jschwie@jlolaw.com
United States Department of Housing and Urban Development United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory G Brooker +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 greg.brooker@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bahram Samie +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 bahram.samie@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 405
Nature of Suit 230 - Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Civil Notice - appeal, # 2 Civil-8th Circuit Pre-Hearing Conference Notice)(LPH) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE re 25 Affidavit filed by Jeffrey Schiffman, Housing and Redevelopment Authority of Douglas County. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/2/10. (KMW) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
      AFFIDAVIT of Jessica E. Schwie by Housing and Redevelopment Authority of Douglas County, Jeffrey Schiffman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Ex A - Resolution, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Schwie, Jessica) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER re 23 Stipulation filed by Candice K. Herzog, U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, Jeffrey Schiffman, Mary E. Scott, Housing and Redevelopment Authority of Douglas County. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 11/30/10. (KMW) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
          STIPULATION by Candice K. Herzog, Housing and Redevelopment Authority of Douglas County, Jeffrey Schiffman, Mary E. Scott, U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Samie, Bahram) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Appearance by Bahram Samie on behalf of U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Samie, Bahram) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
              JOINT ANSWER to Complaint by Housing and Redevelopment Authority of Douglas County, Jeffrey Schiffman. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Schwie, Jessica) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance by Pierre N Regnier on behalf of Housing and Redevelopment Authority of Douglas County, Jeffrey Schiffman. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Regnier, Pierre) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                  AFFIDAVIT of Service by Candice K. Herzog, Mary E. Scott re 13 Summons Returned Executed, 10 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, 11 Summons Returned Executed, 15 Letter re: withdrawal of motion. (Cann, John) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                    AFFIDAVIT of Service by Candice K. Herzog, Mary E. Scott re 13 Summons Returned Executed, 10 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, 11 Summons Returned Executed. (Cann, John) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT of Service by Candice K. Herzog, Mary E. Scott re 12 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (Cann, John) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                        NOTICE to Attorneys: The Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for October 8, 2010 at 11:00 a.m. in the Minneapolis Federal Courthouse before the Honorable Judge Michael J. Davis is cancelled based on the agreement by stipulation of all parties 14 and the withdrawal of the Motion for TRO filed on ECF 15 . Plaintiff shall notify Defendants Jeffrey Shiffman and The Housing and Redevelopment Authority of Douglas County of this cancelled hearing as they are not listed as being served by ECF at this time. (KMW) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                          Letter re: withdrawal of motion re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (Cann, John) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                            STIPULATION by Candice K. Herzog, Housing and Redevelopment Authority of Douglas County, Jeffrey Schiffman, Mary E. Scott, U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Brooker, Gregory) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary E. Scott, Candice K. Herzog. Jeffrey Schiffman served on 10/5/2010, answer due 10/26/2010. (Cann, John) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (Cann, John) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary E. Scott, Candice K. Herzog. Housing and Redevelopment Authority of Douglas County served on 10/4/2010, answer due 10/25/2010. (Cann, John) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary E. Scott, Candice K. Herzog. U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development served on 10/4/2010, answer due 12/3/2010. (Cann, John) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is reassigned to Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. Judge Richard H. Kyle no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 10cv4118 MJD/LIB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JME) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER for Disqualification and for Reassignment. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 10/04/10. (kll) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                          Declaration of Sherry Ann Bruckner in Support of 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Candice K. Herzog, Mary E. Scott. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(kt) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                            Declaration of Candice K. Herzog in Support of 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Candice K. Herzog, Mary E. Scott. (kt) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                              Declaration of Mary E. Scott in Support of 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Candice K. Herzog, Mary E. Scott. (kt) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                Declaration of John Cann in Support of 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Candice K. Herzog, Mary E. Scott. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(kt) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Candice K. Herzog, Mary E. Scott. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(kt) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Candice K. Herzog, Mary E. Scott. (kt) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Schiffman, U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, Housing and Redevelopment Authority of Douglas County ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 3007587.) assigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle per Sixth Division Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois, filed by Mary E. Scott, Candice K. Herzog. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kt) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 201 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?