Uhr v. Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:10-cv-04945
District Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 28, 2017 at 1:05 AM EDT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Steven E. Uhr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lommen, Abdo, Cole, King & Stageberg, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven E Uhr +1 612 336 9330 +1 612 339 8064 s_uhr@lommen.com
v.
No Logo American Beverage Licensees, Inc.,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ankoor Bagchi +1 612 977 8846
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen A Brinkman +1 612 977 8868 +1 612 977 8650 ebrinkman@briggs.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Schooler +1 612 977 8797 +1 612 977 8650 dschooler@briggs.com
No Logo Applebee's International Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Maslon Edelman Borman & Brand LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alain M Baudry +1 612 672 8344 +1 612 642 8344 alain.baudry@maslon.com
No Logo Arthur, Chapman, Kettering, Smetak & Pikala, PA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bassford Remele, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher R. Morris +1 612 333 3000 +1 612 333 8829 cmorris@bassford.com
Space Rachel B Peterson +1 612 333 3000 +1 612 333 8829 rachelp@bassford.com
No Logo Chili's of Minnesota Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Maslon Edelman Borman & Brand LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alain M Baudry +1 612 672 8344 +1 612 642 8344 alain.baudry@maslon.com
Citibank, NA Citibank, NA, Defendant
Officer/Director, Kemet Corporation
Officer/Director, STRATOS LIGHTWAVE, INC.
Officer/Director, Chippac, Inc.
Officer/Director, Citicorp Holdings, Inc.
Citigroup, Inc. Officer/Director, Citigroup, Inc.
Officer/Director, CITICORP
Officer/Director, Intersil Holding Co
Officer/Director, Citigroup Holdings Co

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin M Decker +1 612 977 8243 kdecker@briggs.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark G Schroeder +1 612 977 8450 +1 612 977 8650 mschroeder@briggs.com
No Logo Corporate 4 Insurance Agency, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tomsche Sonnesyn & Tomsche, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron M Simon +1 612 520 8617 +1 763 521 4482 asimon@tstlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rolf E Sonnesyn +1 763 521 4499 +1 763 521 4482 rsonnesyn@tstlaw.com
No Logo Diageo North America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bethany D Krueger +1 612 373 8353 +1 612 339 4181 bkrueger@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Sindberg Porter +1 612 373 0380 +1 612 373 0929 esindbergporter@greeneespel.com
No Logo Distilled Spirits Council Of The United States, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P Kane +1 612 333 3434 +1 612 334 8888 tkane@hinshawlaw.com
No Logo Downtown Madison, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WESSELS & PAUTSCH PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY James B Sherman +1 952 746 1700 +1 952 746 1704 jasherman@wesselssherman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wessels Sherman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chad A Staul +1 952 746 1700 +1 952 746 1704 chstaul@wesselssherman.com
No Logo Famous Dave's Of America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Maslon Edelman Borman & Brand LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alain M Baudry +1 612 672 8344 +1 612 642 8344 alain.baudry@maslon.com
No Logo Gary Zizka, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bethany D Krueger +1 612 373 8353 +1 612 339 4181 bkrueger@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Sindberg Porter +1 612 373 0380 +1 612 373 0929 esindbergporter@greeneespel.com
No Logo International Downtown Association, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ankoor Bagchi +1 612 977 8846
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen A Brinkman +1 612 977 8868 +1 612 977 8650 ebrinkman@briggs.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Schooler +1 612 977 8797 +1 612 977 8650 dschooler@briggs.com
No Logo James C. Wicka, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bassford Remele, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher R. Morris +1 612 333 3000 +1 612 333 8829 cmorris@bassford.com
Space Rachel B Peterson +1 612 333 3000 +1 612 333 8829 rachelp@bassford.com
No Logo James F. Mosher, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Madigan Dahl & Harlan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard M Dahl +1 612 604 2000 +1 612 604 2599 dahl@mdh-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D Madigan +1 612 604 2000 +1 612 604 2599 madigan@mdh-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon R Steckler +1 612 604 2000 +1 612 604 2599 steckler@mdh-law.com
No Logo Jay Wanserski, Defendant
No Logo Jeremiah P. Gallivan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bassford Remele, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher R. Morris +1 612 333 3000 +1 612 333 8829 cmorris@bassford.com
Space Rachel B Peterson +1 612 333 3000 +1 612 333 8829 rachelp@bassford.com
No Logo Jim Peters, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ankoor Bagchi +1 612 977 8846
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen A Brinkman +1 612 977 8868 +1 612 977 8650 ebrinkman@briggs.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Schooler +1 612 977 8797 +1 612 977 8650 dschooler@briggs.com
No Logo John D. Bodnivich, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ankoor Bagchi +1 612 977 8846
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen A Brinkman +1 612 977 8868 +1 612 977 8650 ebrinkman@briggs.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Schooler +1 612 977 8797 +1 612 977 8650 dschooler@briggs.com
No Logo Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan D Wilson +1 612 492 6651 +1 612 340 2807 wilson.jonathan@dorsey.com
No Logo Messerli & Kramer, PA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bassford Remele, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher R. Morris +1 612 333 3000 +1 612 333 8829 cmorris@bassford.com
Space Rachel B Peterson +1 612 333 3000 +1 612 333 8829 rachelp@bassford.com
No Logo National Beer Wholesalers Association, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Madigan Dahl & Harlan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard M Dahl +1 612 604 2000 +1 612 604 2599 dahl@mdh-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D Madigan +1 612 604 2000 +1 612 604 2599 madigan@mdh-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon R Steckler +1 612 604 2000 +1 612 604 2599 steckler@mdh-law.com
No Logo Prudential Financial, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Havenwood Ventures Inc
Officer/Director, Tortoise Mlp Corp.

Toggle Switch Represented by Berens & Miller, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justi R Miller +1 612 349 6171 +1 612 349 6416 jmiller@berensmiller.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly & Berens, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara P Berens +1 612 349 6171 +1 612 349 6416 bberens@berensmiller.com
No Logo Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ankoor Bagchi +1 612 977 8846
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen A Brinkman +1 612 977 8868 +1 612 977 8650 ebrinkman@briggs.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Schooler +1 612 977 8797 +1 612 977 8650 dschooler@briggs.com
No Logo Richard A. Yoast, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bassford Remele, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark R Whitmore +1 612 376 1603 +1 612 333 8829 markw@bassford.com
No Logo Richard Lyshek, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Lyshek +1 608 576 3877 dlyshek@msn.com
No Logo Rick Petri, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Meagher & Geer, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E Salmon +1 612 338 0661 +1 612 338 8384 rsalmon@meagher.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan D Yelle +1 612 337 9661 +1 612 877 3026 myelle@meagher.com
No Logo Robert H. Bruininks, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Minnesota Duluth

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian J Slovut +1 612 624 4100 +1 612 626 9624 slov0002@umn.edu
No Logo Wine And Spirits Wholesalers Of America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leonard Street and Deinard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William L Greene +1 612 335 1568 +1 612 335 1657 william.greene@leonard.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter J. Schwingler +1 612 335 1500 +1 612 335 1657 peter.schwingler@stinsonleonard.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 15
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (194) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Jay Wanserski. (Johanningmeier, Joshua) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
    MOTION for Non-Resident Pro Hac Vice Admission for Kendall W. Harrison by Jay Wanserski. (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Johanningmeier, Joshua) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
      REPLY re 174 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,,, Memorandum In Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint For Failure To State An Antitrust Claim and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For Leave to Amend The Complaint filed by American Beverage Licensees, Inc., Applebee's International Inc., Arthur, Chapman, Kettering, Smetak, and Pikala P.A., John D. Bodnivich, Robert H. Bruininks, Chili's of Minnesota Inc., Citibank, N.A., Corporate 4 Insurance Agency, Inc., Diageo North America, Inc., Distilled Spirits Council of the United States, Inc., Downtown Madison, Inc., Famous Dave's of America, Inc., Jeremiah P. Gallivan, International Downtown Association, Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC, Richard Lyshek, Messerli & Kramer P.A., James F. Mosher, National Beer Wholesalers Association, National Beer Wholesalers of America, Inc., Jim Peters, Rick Petri, Prudential Financial, Inc., Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc., Jay Wanserski, James C. Wicka, Wine and Spirits Wholesalers of America, Inc., Richard A. Yoast, Gary Zizka. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
        Supplemental Declaration of Ankoor Bagchi in Support of 188 Reply to Response to Motion,,, filed by John D. Bodnivich, Jim Peters, Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Bagchi, Ankoor) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
          LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by John D. Bodnivich, Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC, Richard Lyshek, Jim Peters, Rick Petri, Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc., Jay Wanserski, Richard A. Yoast, Gary Zizka re 188 Reply to Response to Motion,,,,, filed by John D. Bodnivich, Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC, Richard Lyshek, Jim Peters, Rick Petri, Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc., Jay Wanserski, Richard A. Yoast, Gary Zizka. (Bagchi, Ankoor) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
            REPLY re 155 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,, filed by American Beverage Licensees, Inc., Applebee's International Inc., John D. Bodnivich, Citibank, N.A., Diageo North America, Inc., Distilled Spirits Council of the United States, Inc., Famous Dave's of America, Inc., International Downtown Association, Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC, Richard Lyshek, James F. Mosher, National Beer Wholesalers Association, National Beer Wholesalers of America, Inc., Jim Peters, Rick Petri, Prudential Financial, Inc., Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc., Jay Wanserski, Wine and Spirits Wholesalers of America, Inc., Richard A. Yoast, Gary Zizka. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Schroeder, Mark) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
              REPLY to Response to Motion re 66 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 147 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, 142 First MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint, 73 MOTION Defendant Rick Petri's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint re 20 Amended Complaint, 83 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue, 86 MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint, 75 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 46 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendant Gary Zizka's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by John D. Bodnivich, Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC, Richard Lyshek, Jim Peters, Rick Petri, Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc., Jay Wanserski, Richard A. Yoast, Gary Zizka. (Bagchi, Ankoor) Modified filers on 5/27/2011 (jam). (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Rick Petri re 184 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff (Salmon, Robert) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 184 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff filed by Rick Petri. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Salmon, Robert) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 177 MOTION for Sanctions, 184 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff : Defendant Rick Petri's Notice of Sanctions Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Salmon, Robert) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None Motion for Sanctions
                      MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff by Rick Petri. (Salmon, Robert) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Leonard A. Nelson by Richard A. Yoast. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Whitmore, Mark) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                          LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Jay Wanserski re 179 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Jay Wanserski. (Johanningmeier, Joshua) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Jay Wanserski re 177 MOTION for Sanctions (Johanningmeier, Joshua) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
                              Declaration of Kendall W. Harrison in Support of 177 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Jay Wanserski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C)(Johanningmeier, Joshua) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 177 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Jay Wanserski. (Johanningmeier, Joshua) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 177 MOTION for Sanctions : Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Johanningmeier, Joshua) Modified text and reset hrg on 5/26/2011 (akl). (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None Motion for Sanctions
                                    MOTION for Sanctions by Jay Wanserski. (Johanningmeier, Joshua) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None
                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service by Steven E. Uhr re 173 Exhibit (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                        AFFIDAVIT of Steve Uhr in OPPOSITION TO 66 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 147 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, 142 First MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint, 133 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 20 Amended Complaint,,,, 13 MOTION to Dismiss/General [Rule 12], 34 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 92 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 83 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue, 152 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 75 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 25 MOTION to Dismiss/General Amended Complaint, 99 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 94 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 102 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 73 MOTION Defendant Rick Petri's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint re 20 Amended Complaint, 128 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 63 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 69 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 86 MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint, 46 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendant Gary Zizka's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, 107 MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint, 110 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 10 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Steven E. Uhr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 2, # 2 Exhibit(s) 3, # 3 Exhibit(s) 4, # 4 Exhibit(s) 5, # 5 Exhibit(s) 6, # 6 Exhibit(s) 7, # 7 Exhibit(s) 8, # 8 Exhibit(s) 9, # 9 Exhibit(s) 10 Part 1, # 10 Exhibit(s) 10 Part 2, # 11 Exhibit(s) 11, # 12 Exhibit(s) 12, # 13 Exhibit(s) 13 Part 1, # 14 Exhibit(s) 13 Part 2, # 15 Exhibit(s) 14, # 16 Exhibit(s) 15 Part 1, # 17 Exhibit(s) 15 Part 2, # 18 Exhibit(s) 15 Part 3, # 19 Exhibit(s) 15 Part 4, # 20 Exhibit(s) 16, # 21 Exhibit(s) 17)(Uhr, Steven) Modified text on 5/23/2011 (akl). (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 102 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 66 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 147 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, 142 First MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint, 73 MOTION Defendant Rick Petri's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint re 20 Amended Complaint,,,, 133 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 20 Amended Complaint,,,, 128 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 34 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 92 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 83 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue, 152 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 86 MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint, 75 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 46 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendant Gary Zizka's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, 99 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 107 MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint, 110 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 44 MOTION to Dismiss/General [Defendant Diageo North America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint], 10 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 94 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Steven E. Uhr. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                            EXHIBIT Placeholder of Ex. 1 to May 20, 2011 Uhr Affidavit by Steven E. Uhr filed by Steven E. Uhr. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 5/20/11. (Uhr, Steven) Modified on 5/24/2011 (akl). (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung, this case is reassigned to him. Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham is no longer assigned to the case. Please contact Kathleen Feldman at 651-848-1870, for scheduling or other matters related to Magistrate Judge Leung. (MGV) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert H. Bruininks re 164 Affidavit in Support of Motion (Slovut, Brian) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert H. Bruininks re 164 Affidavit in Support of Motion (Slovut, Brian) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                    LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by John D. Bodnivich, Jim Peters, Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc. re 158 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, filed by John D. Bodnivich, Jim Peters, Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc.. (Bagchi, Ankoor) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                      First Declaration of Gary Zizka in Support of 158 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, filed by John D. Bodnivich, Jim Peters, Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc.. (Bagchi, Ankoor) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                        First Declaration of Richard Yoast in Support of 158 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, filed by John D. Bodnivich, Jim Peters, Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc.. (Bagchi, Ankoor) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                          First AFFIDAVIT of Jonathan Wilson in SUPPORT OF 147 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by John D. Bodnivich, Jim Peters, Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Bagchi, Ankoor) Modified text on 5/2/2011 (akl). (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                            First Declaration of Jay Wanerski in Support of 158 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, filed by John D. Bodnivich, Jim Peters, Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc.. (Bagchi, Ankoor) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Brian J. Slovut in SUPPORT OF 63 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Robert H. Bruininks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Placeholder for Exhibit B) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 4/29/11. (Slovut, Brian) Modified on 5/4/2011 (akl). (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                First Declaration of Rick Petri in Support of 158 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, filed by John D. Bodnivich, Jim Peters, Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc.. (Bagchi, Ankoor) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  First Declaration of Jim Peters in Support of 158 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, filed by John D. Bodnivich, Jim Peters, Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc.. (Bagchi, Ankoor) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    First Declaration of Kendall W. Harrison in Support of 158 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by John D. Bodnivich, Jim Peters, Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C)(Bagchi, Ankoor) Modified text on 5/2/2011 (akl). (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      First Declaration of John Bodnovich in Support of 158 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, filed by John D. Bodnivich, Jim Peters, Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc.. (Bagchi, Ankoor) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        First Declaration of Ankoor Bagchi in Support of 158 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by John D. Bodnivich, Jim Peters, Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D)(Bagchi, Ankoor) Modified text on 5/2/2011 (akl). (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 66 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 147 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, 142 First MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint, 73 MOTION Defendant Rick Petri's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint re 20 Amended Complaint,,,, 83 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue, 86 MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint, 75 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 46 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendant Gary Zizka's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Failure to State a Claim Due to Lack of Successor Liability, and Failure to State a Claim Due to Res Judicata and Collateral Estoppel filed by John D. Bodnivich, Jim Peters, Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc., American Beverage Licensees, Inc., International Downtown Association, Jay Wanerski, Diageo North America, Gary Zizka, Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC, Rick Petri, Richard Yoast, Richard A. Lyshek. (Bagchi, Ankoor) Modified filers and text on 5/2/2011 (akl). (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            Declaration of Alain M. Baudry in Support of 156 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,,,, filed by American Beverage Licensees, Inc., Applebee's International Inc., John D. Bodnivich, Robert H. Bruininks, Chili's of Minnesota Inc., Citibank, N.A., Diageo North America, Inc., Distilled Spirits Council of the United States, Inc., Famous Dave's of America, Inc., International Downtown Association, Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC, Richard Lyshek, James F. Mosher, National Beer Wholesalers Association, Jim Peters, Rick Petri, Prudential Financial, Inc., Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc., Jay Wanserski, Wine and Spirits Wholesalers of America, Inc., Richard A. Yoast, Gary Zizka. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 102 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 66 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 147 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, 142 First MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint, 73 MOTION Defendant Rick Petri's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint re 20 Amended Complaint,,,, 133 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 20 Amended Complaint,,,, 128 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 34 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 92 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 63 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 83 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue, 152 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 86 MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint, 75 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 46 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendant Gary Zizka's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, 99 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 107 MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint, 110 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 44 MOTION to Dismiss/General [Defendant Diageo North America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint], 10 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 94 MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint for Failure to State an Antitrust Claim and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint filed by American Beverage Licensees, Inc., Applebee's International Inc., John D. Bodnivich, Robert H. Bruininks, Chili's of Minnesota Inc., Citibank, N.A., Diageo North America, Inc., Distilled Spirits Council of the United States, Inc., Famous Dave's of America, Inc., International Downtown Association, Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC, Richard Lyshek, James F. Mosher, National Beer Wholesalers Association, Jim Peters, Rick Petri, Prudential Financial, Inc., Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc., Jay Wanserski, Wine and Spirits Wholesalers of America, Inc., Richard A. Yoast, Gary Zizka. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 102 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 66 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 147 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, 142 First MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint, 73 MOTION Defendant Rick Petri's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint re 20 Amended Complaint,,,, 128 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 34 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 92 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 83 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue, 152 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 86 MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint, 75 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 46 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendant Gary Zizka's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, 99 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 107 MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint, 110 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 44 MOTION to Dismiss/General [Defendant Diageo North America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint], 10 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 94 MOTION to Dismiss/General RICO Claim filed by Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Schroeder, Mark) Modified filers and text on 5/2/2011 (akl). (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Brinker Restaurant Corporation, owner and operator of some Chili's Grill & Bar restaurants, is a wholly owned subsidiary of Brinker International, Inc., a publically traded company.(Baudry, Alain) Modified text on 5/2/2011 (akl). (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 152 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2011 08:30 AM before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Baudry, Alain) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss/General by Chili's of Minnesota Inc.. (Baudry, Alain) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: 34 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Miller, Justi) Modified text on 5/2/2011 (akl). (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: 66 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Whitmore, Mark) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC re 147 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, 148 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 146 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Wilson, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 147 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Wilson, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC. (Wilson, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurant, LLC, in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, states that it is more than 10% owned by its parent corporation Luby's Limited Partner, Inc.(Wilson, Jonathan) Modified text on 4/29/2011 (akl). (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    LETTER FROM DISTRICT JUDGE re 133 Plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 4/11/11. (sf) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant American Beverage Licensees, Inc.. (Schooler, David) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 142 First MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Schooler, David) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          First MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint by American Beverage Licensees, Inc., John D. Bodnivich. (Schooler, David) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Gary Zizka served on 3/30/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 04/09/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Steven E. Uhr re 133 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 20 Amended Complaint,,, (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 10cv4945 PJS/JJG. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/31/11. (JMH) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. John D. Bodnivich served on 3/21/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. American Beverage Licensees, Inc. served on 3/21/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT (Proposed Second Amended Complaint) re 133 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 20 Amended Complaint by Steven E. Uhr filed by Steven E. Uhr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1-2 to Proposed 2nd Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit(s) 3-5 to Proposed 2nd Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit(s) 6-9 to Proposed 2nd Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit(s)-redlined version of Proposed 2nd Amended Complaint)(Uhr, Steven) Modified text on 3/31/2011 (akl). (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 133 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 20 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Steven E. Uhr. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 133 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 20 Amended Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Uhr, Steven) Modified text on 3/31/2011 (akl). (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 20 Amended Complaint,,, by Steven E. Uhr. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Citibank, N.A. is an indirect wholly-owned subsidiary of Citigroup Inc. Citigroup Inc. is a publicly-held company whose shares are traded on the New York Stock Exchange. Citigroup Inc. has no parent company and no publicly-held company owns more than 10% of Citigroup Inc.'s shares. No other publicly traded company holds more than a 10% ownership interest in Citigroup Inc. or Citibank, N.A. (Schroeder, Mark) Modified text on 3/28/2011 (akl). (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. American Beverage Licensees, Inc. served on 3/14/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. John D. Bodnivich served on 3/14/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 128 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Schroeder, Mark) Modified text on 3/25/2011 (akl). (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss/General by Citibank, N.A.. (Schroeder, Mark) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER ON BRIEFING SCHEDULE (See Order for Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/17/11. (akl) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on all of the motions to dismiss: 66 , 110 , 34 , 99 , 102 , 86 , 10 , 75 , 83 , 107 , 73 , 46 , 92 , 94 , 44 , and 63 : Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (sf) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Clerk's Notice of APPLICATION FOR PRO SE LITIGANT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Richard Lyshek is GRANTED e-filing privileges in this case. Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 5 and 7(d), Richard Lyshek has consented to electronic service and has agreed to waive service by other means for all subsequent filings in this case, except when electronic service is not allowed under the rules. (MMC) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Citibank, N.A. served on 3/4/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT CORPORATE 4 INSURANCE AGENCY, INC. re 120 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Steven E. Uhr, Corporate 4 Insurance Agency, Inc. IT IS ORDERED that Corporate 4 Insurance Agency is dismissed with prejudice on the merits, without costs or disbursements to any party. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 3/15/11. (sf) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James F. Mosher, National Beer Wholesalers Association re 118 Notice of Appearance, 121 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Madigan, Michael) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant National Beer Wholesalers Association. (Madigan, Michael) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice in regards to defendant Corp 4 Ins Agency by Corporate 4 Insurance Agency, Inc., Steven E. Uhr. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sonnesyn, Rolf) Modified filers and text on 3/16/2011 (akl). (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL. IT IS ORDERED that Jeremiah P. Gallivan, Messerli & Kramer P.A., Downtown Madison, Inc., Arthur, Chapman, Kettering, Smetak and Pikala P.A., and James C. Wicka are dismissed without prejudice and without costs or disbursements to any party. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 3/14/11. (sf) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D Madigan on behalf of James F. Mosher, National Beer Wholesalers Association. ATTACHMENTS FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE AS SEPARATE ENTRIES-(Attachments: # 1 NBWA's Corporate Disclosure Stmt, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Madigan, Michael) Modified on 3/15/2011 (akl). (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re: James C. Wicka by Steven E. Uhr (Uhr, Steven) Modified text on 3/14/2011 (lph). (Entered: 03/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re: Arthur, Chapman, Kettering, Smetak and Pikala P.A. by Steven E. Uhr (Uhr, Steven) Modified text on 3/14/2011 (lph). (Entered: 03/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re: Downtown Madison, Inc. by Steven E. Uhr (Uhr, Steven) Modified text on 3/14/2011 (lph). (Entered: 03/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re: Messerli & Kramer P.A. by Steven E. Uhr (Uhr, Steven) Modified text on 3/14/2011 (lph). (Entered: 03/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re: Jeremiah P. Gallivan by Steven E. Uhr (Uhr, Steven) Modified text on 3/14/2011 (lph). (Entered: 03/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Distilled Spirits Council of the United States, Inc.. (Kane, Thomas) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 110 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Kane, Thomas) Modified location on 3/14/2011 (lph). (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss/General by Distilled Spirits Council of the United States, Inc.. (Kane, Thomas) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant International Downtown Association. (Brinkman, Ellen) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 107 MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Brinkman, Ellen) Modified location on 3/14/2011 (lph). (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint by International Downtown Association. (Brinkman, Ellen) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 96 Letter to Counsel (See Order for Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/9/11. (akl) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC answer due 6/8/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/9/11. (akl) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Wine and Spirits Wholesalers of America, Inc.. (Greene, William) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 102 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Greene, William) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss/General by Wine and Spirits Wholesalers of America, Inc.. (Greene, William) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Applebee's International, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of DineEquity, Inc., a publicly traded corporation. (Baudry, Alain) Modified text on 3/10/2011 (akl). (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 99 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Baudry, Alain) Modified text on 3/10/2011 (akl). (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss/General by Applebee's International Inc.. (Baudry, Alain) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James F. Mosher re 95 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 94 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Madigan, Michael) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Beer Wholesalers Association re 92 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 93 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Madigan, Michael) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER TO COUNSEL from Judge Schiltz. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 3/8/11. (sf) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 94 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Madigan, Michael) Modified text on 3/9/2011 (akl). (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss/General by James F. Mosher. (Madigan, Michael) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 92 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Madigan, Michael) Modified text on 3/9/2011 (akl). (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss/General by National Beer Wholesalers Association. (Madigan, Michael) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service by Steven E. Uhr re 79 Amended Summons Returned Executed, 78 Amended Summons Returned Executed, 80 Amended Summons Returned Executed, 81 Amended Summons Returned Executed RHI, Peters, Mosher, Appelbee's (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC re 89 Stipulation (Wilson, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re 20 Amended Complaint by Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC, Steven E. Uhr. (Wilson, Jonathan) Modified filers and text on 3/9/2011 (akl). (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Jim Peters, Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc.. (Brinkman, Ellen) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 86 MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Brinkman, Ellen) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss/General the First Amended Complaint by Jim Peters, Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc.. (Brinkman, Ellen) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in SUPPORT OF 83 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Richard Lyshek. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(kt) QCd on 3/7/11. (RLR) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 83 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Richard Lyshek. (kt) QCd on 3/7/11. (RLR) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction/for Improper Venue/for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue by Richard Lyshek. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(kt) QCd on 3/7/11. (RLR) Modified text on 5/31/2011 (lph). (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Prudential Financial, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Justi) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Applebee's International Inc. served on 3/4/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. James F. Mosher served on 3/1/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 03/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Jim Peters served on 2/15/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 03/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc. served on 2/15/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 03/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jay Wanserski re 75 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 76 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Johanningmeier, Joshua) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 75 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Johanningmeier, Joshua) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jay Wanserski. (Johanningmeier, Joshua) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 73 MOTION to Dismiss 20 Amended Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Salmon, Robert) Modified text on 3/3/2011 (akl). (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss 20 Amended Complaint by Rick Petri. (Salmon, Robert) Modified text on 3/3/2011 (akl). (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Chad A Staul on behalf of Downtown Madison, Inc.. (Staul, Chad) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Downtown Madison, Inc.. (Sherman, James) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 69 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Sherman, James) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss/General by Downtown Madison, Inc.. (Sherman, James) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by James B Sherman on behalf of Downtown Madison, Inc.. (Sherman, James) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 66 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Whitmore, Mark) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss/General by Richard A. Yoast. (Whitmore, Mark) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert H. Bruininks re 63 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 64 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Slovut, Brian) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 63 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Slovut, Brian) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss/General by Robert H. Bruininks. (Slovut, Brian) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. National Beer Wholesalers of America, Inc. served on 2/18/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Distilled Spirits Council of the United States, Inc. served on 2/18/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. International Downtown Association served on 2/18/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Wine and Spirits Wholesalers of America, Inc. served on 2/18/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Famous Dave's of America, Inc.. (Baudry, Alain) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. James C. Wicka served on 2/11/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Jeremiah P. Gallivan served on 2/11/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Richard A. Yoast served on 2/14/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Richard Lyshek served on 2/12/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Jay Wanserski served on 2/10/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service by Steven E. Uhr re 51 Amended Summons Returned Executed, 49 Amended Summons Returned Executed, 50 Amended Summons Returned Executed 02/16/2011 (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC served on 2/15/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Rick Petri served on 2/9/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Downtown Madison, Inc. served on 2/8/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for D. Bruce Hoffman by Diageo North America, Inc., Gary Zizka. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 46 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendant Gary Zizka's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendant Gary Zizka's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint by Gary Zizka. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 44 MOTION to Dismiss/General [Defendant Diageo North America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint] : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss/General [Defendant Diageo North America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint] by Diageo North America, Inc.. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service by Steven E. Uhr re 41 Amended Summons Returned Executed, 42 Amended Summons Returned Executed, 38 Amended Summons Returned Executed, 40 Amended Summons Returned Executed, 39 Amended Summons Returned Executed 02/09/2011 (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Prudential Financial, Inc. served on 2/8/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC served on 2/7/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Applebee's International Inc. served on 2/7/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Chili's of Minnesota Inc. served on 2/7/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Robert H. Bruininks served on 2/8/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: 13 MOTION to Dismiss/General [Rule 12] : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Morris, Christopher) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Prudential Financial, Inc. re 35 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 34 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Miller, Justi) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 34 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Miller, Justi) Modified text on 2/9/2011 (akl). (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss/General by Prudential Financial, Inc.. (Miller, Justi) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: 10 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 08:30 AM before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Baudry, Alain) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Corporate 4 Insurance Agency, Inc. re 31 Answer to Amended Complaint (Simon, Aaron) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Corporate 4 Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Simon, Aaron) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arthur, Chapman, Kettering, Smetak, and Pikala P.A., Jeremiah P. Gallivan, Messerli & Kramer P.A., James C. Wicka re 29 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, 28 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, (Peterson, Rachel) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Messerli & Kramer P.A. (Peterson, Rachel) Modified filers and text on 1/26/2011 (akl). (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Arthur, Chapman, Kettering, Smetak, and Pikala P.A. (Peterson, Rachel) Modified filers and text on 1/26/2011 (akl). (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arthur, Chapman, Kettering, Smetak, and Pikala P.A., Jeremiah P. Gallivan, Messerli & Kramer P.A., James C. Wicka re 25 MOTION to Dismiss/General Amended Complaint, 26 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Peterson, Rachel) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 25 MOTION to Dismiss/General Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Peterson, Rachel) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss/General Amended Complaint by Arthur, Chapman, Kettering, Smetak, and Pikala P.A., Jeremiah P. Gallivan, Messerli & Kramer P.A., James C. Wicka. (Peterson, Rachel) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service by Steven E. Uhr re 20 Amended Complaint,,, (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service by Steven E. Uhr re 20 Amended Complaint,,, (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Diageo North America, Inc. answer due 2/18/2011; Gary Zizka answer due 2/18/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 1/19/11. (akl) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Corporate 4 Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sonnesyn, Rolf) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Beverage Licensees, Inc., Applebee's International Inc., Arthur, Chapman, Kettering, Smetak, and Pikala P.A., John D. Bodnivich, Robert H. Bruininks, Chili's of Minnesota Inc., Citibank, N.A., Corporate 4 Insurance Agency, Inc., Diageo North America, Inc., Distilled Spirits Council of the United States, Inc., Famous Dave's of America, Inc., Jeremiah P. Gallivan, International Downtown Association, Luby's, Inc., Messerli & Kramer P.A., James F. Mosher, National Beer Wholesalers of America, Inc., Jim Peters, Prudential Financial, Inc., Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc., James C. Wicka, Wine and Spirits Wholesalers of America, Inc., Richard A. Yoast, Gary Zizka, filed by Steven E. Uhr. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Part 2, # 2 Exhibit(s)) (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diageo North America, Inc., Gary Zizka re 17 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, 18 Stipulation, 16 Notice of Appearance (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION re 1 Complaint Extension of Time to Respond by Diageo North America, Inc., Gary Zizka, Steven E. Uhr. (Luger, Andrew) Modified filers and text on 1/19/2011 (akl). (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Diageo North America, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Diageo, PLC, a publicly-held corporation. No publicly-held corporation owns 10% or more of Diageo PLC. (Luger, Andrew) Modified text on 1/19/2011 (akl). (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M Luger on behalf of Diageo North America, Inc., Gary Zizka. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arthur, Chapman, Kettering, Smetak, and Pikala P.A., Jeremiah P. Gallivan, Messerli & Kramer P.A., James C. Wicka re 13 MOTION to Dismiss/General [Rule 12], 14 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Morris, Christopher) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 13 MOTION to Dismiss/General [Rule 12] : Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Morris, Christopher) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss/General [Rule 12] by Arthur, Chapman, Kettering, Smetak, and Pikala P.A., Jeremiah P. Gallivan, Messerli & Kramer P.A., James C. Wicka. (Morris, Christopher) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Famous Dave's of America, Inc. re 11 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 10 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Baudry, Alain) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 10 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2011 08:30 AM before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Baudry, Alain) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss/General by Famous Dave's of America, Inc.. (Baudry, Alain) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Messerli & Kramer P.A. served on 12/28/2010, answer due 1/18/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Arthur, Chapman, Kettering, Smetak, and Pikala P.A. served on 12/28/2010, answer due 1/18/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Diageo North America, Inc. served on 12/28/2010, answer due 1/18/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Corporate 4 Insurance Agency, Inc. served on 12/28/2010, answer due 1/18/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven E. Uhr. Famous Dave's of America, Inc. served on 12/29/2010, answer due 1/19/2011. (Uhr, Steven) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Corporate 4 Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Sonnesyn, Rolf) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 10cv4945 PJS/FLN. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 12/22/10. (JMH) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ann D. Montgomery recused. Case reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz for all further proceedings. The new case number is 10cv4945 PJS/JJK. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/22/10. (JMH) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against American Beverage Licensees, Inc., Applebee's International Inc., Arthur, Chapman, Kettering, Smetak, and Pikala P.A., John D. Bodnivich, Robert H. Bruininks, Chili's of Minnesota Inc., Citibank, N.A., Corporate 4 Insurance Agency, Inc., Diageo North America, Inc., Distilled Spirits Council of the United States, Inc., Famous Dave's of America, Inc., Jeremiah P. Gallivan, International Downtown Association, Luby's, Inc., Messerli & Kramer P.A., James F. Mosher, National Beer Wholesalers of America, Inc., Jim Peters, Prudential Financial, Inc., Responsible Hospitality Institute, Inc., James C. Wicka, Wine and Spirits Wholesalers of America, Inc., Richard A. Yoast, Gary Zizka ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 3007845.) assigned to Judge Ann D. Montgomery per Antitrust List and referred to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes, filed by Steven E. Uhr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (kt) QCd on 12/28/10. (RLR) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 269 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?