L.P.O.E., Inc. et al v. United States Drug Enforcement Administration, The et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:11-cv-00499
District Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Disc and Tape, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carol Grant +1 612 617 9000 +1 612 617 9009 kgolaw@aol.com
No Logo Down In The Valley, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carol Grant +1 612 617 9000 +1 612 617 9009 kgolaw@aol.com
No Logo Hideaway LLC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carol Grant +1 612 617 9000 +1 612 617 9009 kgolaw@aol.com
No Logo L.P.O.E., Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carol Grant +1 612 617 9000 +1 612 617 9009 kgolaw@aol.com
No Logo Midwest Botanicals, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carol Grant +1 612 617 9000 +1 612 617 9009 kgolaw@aol.com
v.
No Logo Michele M. Leonhart, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Department of Justice"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo United States Drug Enforcement Administration, The, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Bahram Samie on behalf of Michele M. Leonhart, U.S. Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Administration, The. (Samie, Bahram) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs must show cause by Friday, March 4, 2011, why their action should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to 21 U.S.C. § 877. Plaintiffs must file a brief of no more than 4,000 words by 4:00 p.m. on Friday, March 4,2011. Defendants may file a response of no more than 4,000 words by 4:00 p.m. on Monday, March 7, 2011. The Court will decide the matter on the papers, unless the Court notifies the parties that it wishes to schedule a hearing. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 3/1/11. (sf) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Appearance by David W Fuller on behalf of Michele M. Leonhart, U.S. Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Administration, The. (Fuller, David) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz for all further proceedings. Judge Ann D. Montgomery no longer assigned to case. The new case number is 11cv499 PJS/LIB. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 3/1/2011. (JME) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
          RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiffs Disc and Tape, Inc., Down In the Valley, Inc., Hideaway LLC., L.P.O.E., Inc., Midwest Botanicals. (kt) (Qc'd by akl on 3/1/11) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
            SECOND AFFIDAVIT of Tom Tepley by Disc and Tape, Inc., Down In the Valley, Inc., Hideaway LLC., L.P.O.E., Inc., Midwest Botanicals. (kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/1/11. (KT) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
              SECOND AFFIDAVIT of Wael Sakallah by Disc and Tape, Inc., Down In the Valley, Inc., Hideaway LLC., L.P.O.E., Inc., Midwest Botanicals. (kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/1/11. (KT) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                SECOND AFFIDAVIT of Scott Farrell by Disc and Tape, Inc., Down In the Valley, Inc., Hideaway LLC., L.P.O.E., Inc., Midwest Botanicals. (kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/1/11. (KT) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                  SECOND AFFIDAVIT of Blake E. Dennis by Disc and Tape, Inc., Down In the Valley, Inc., Hideaway LLC., L.P.O.E., Inc., Midwest Botanicals. (kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/1/11. (KT) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                    SECOND AFFIDAVIT of James Carlson by Disc and Tape, Inc., Down In the Valley, Inc., Hideaway LLC., L.P.O.E., Inc., Midwest Botanicals. (kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/1/11. (KT) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT of Tom Tepley by Disc and Tape, Inc., Down In the Valley, Inc., Hideaway LLC., L.P.O.E., Inc., Midwest Botanicals. (kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/1/11. (KT) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                        AFFIDAVIT of Wael Sakallah by Disc and Tape, Inc., Down In the Valley, Inc., Hideaway LLC., L.P.O.E., Inc., Midwest Botanicals. (kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/1/11. (KT) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                          AFFIDAVIT of Jeremiah Reistetter by Disc and Tape, Inc., Down In the Valley, Inc., Hideaway LLC., L.P.O.E., Inc., Midwest Botanicals. (kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/1/11. (KT) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                            AFFIDAVIT of Randy Heine by Disc and Tape, Inc., Down In the Valley, Inc., Hideaway LLC., L.P.O.E., Inc., Midwest Botanicals. (kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/1/11. (KT) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                              AFFIDAVIT of Scott Farrell by Disc and Tape, Inc., Down In the Valley, Inc., Hideaway LLC., L.P.O.E., Inc., Midwest Botanicals. (kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/1/11. (KT) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT of Blake E. Dennis by Disc and Tape, Inc., Down In the Valley, Inc., Hideaway LLC., L.P.O.E., Inc., Midwest Botanicals. (kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/1/11. (KT) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                  AFFIDAVIT of James Carlson by Disc and Tape, Inc., Down In the Valley, Inc., Hideaway LLC., L.P.O.E., Inc., Midwest Botanicals. (kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/1/11. (KT) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                    AFFIDAVIT of Todd Vanderah in SUPPORT OF 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Disc and Tape, Inc., Down In the Valley, Inc., Hideaway LLC., L.P.O.E., Inc., Midwest Botanicals. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/1/11. (KT) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Disc and Tape, Inc., Down In the Valley, Inc., Hideaway LLC., L.P.O.E., Inc., Midwest Botanicals. (kt) (Qc'd by akl on 3/1/11) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Disc and Tape, Inc., Down In the Valley, Inc., Hideaway LLC., L.P.O.E., Inc., Midwest Botanicals. (kt) (Qc'd by akl on 3/1/11) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          COMPLAINT against Michele M. Leonhart, U.S. Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Administration, The assigned to Judge Ann D. Montgomery per Fifth Division Civil Rights List and referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois (Filing fee $350.00, Receipt No. 40052588), filed by Down In the Valley, Inc., Hideaway LLC., Midwest Botanicals, L.P.O.E., Inc., Disc and Tape, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kt) Modified on 3/1/2011 (kt). (Qc'd by akl on 3/1/11) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 188 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?