Thrivent Financial for Lutherans et al v. Countrywide Financial Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:11-cv-01111
District Judge Susan Richard Nelson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Thrivent Balanced Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald H. Silk +1 212 554 1400 +1 212 554 1444

Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Michels & Walther

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin E Peterson +1 612 676 2300 +1 612 676 2319 kpeterson@ricemichels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian F Rice +1 612 676 2303 +1 612 676 2319 brice@ricemichels.com
No Logo Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald H. Silk +1 212 554 1400 +1 212 554 1444

Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Michels & Walther

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin E Peterson +1 612 676 2300 +1 612 676 2319 kpeterson@ricemichels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian F Rice +1 612 676 2303 +1 612 676 2319 brice@ricemichels.com
No Logo Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald H. Silk +1 212 554 1400 +1 212 554 1444

Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Michels & Walther

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin E Peterson +1 612 676 2300 +1 612 676 2319 kpeterson@ricemichels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian F Rice +1 612 676 2303 +1 612 676 2319 brice@ricemichels.com
No Logo Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald H. Silk +1 212 554 1400 +1 212 554 1444

Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Michels & Walther

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin E Peterson +1 612 676 2300 +1 612 676 2319 kpeterson@ricemichels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian F Rice +1 612 676 2303 +1 612 676 2319 brice@ricemichels.com
No Logo Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald H. Silk +1 212 554 1400 +1 212 554 1444

Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Michels & Walther

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin E Peterson +1 612 676 2300 +1 612 676 2319 kpeterson@ricemichels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian F Rice +1 612 676 2303 +1 612 676 2319 brice@ricemichels.com
No Logo Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald H. Silk +1 212 554 1400 +1 212 554 1444

Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Michels & Walther

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin E Peterson +1 612 676 2300 +1 612 676 2319 kpeterson@ricemichels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian F Rice +1 612 676 2303 +1 612 676 2319 brice@ricemichels.com
No Logo Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald H. Silk +1 212 554 1400 +1 212 554 1444

Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Michels & Walther

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin E Peterson +1 612 676 2300 +1 612 676 2319 kpeterson@ricemichels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian F Rice +1 612 676 2303 +1 612 676 2319 brice@ricemichels.com
No Logo Thrivent Income Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald H. Silk +1 212 554 1400 +1 212 554 1444

Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Michels & Walther

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin E Peterson +1 612 676 2300 +1 612 676 2319 kpeterson@ricemichels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian F Rice +1 612 676 2303 +1 612 676 2319 brice@ricemichels.com
No Logo Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald H. Silk +1 212 554 1400 +1 212 554 1444

Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Michels & Walther

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin E Peterson +1 612 676 2300 +1 612 676 2319 kpeterson@ricemichels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian F Rice +1 612 676 2303 +1 612 676 2319 brice@ricemichels.com
No Logo Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald H. Silk +1 212 554 1400 +1 212 554 1444

Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Michels & Walther

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin E Peterson +1 612 676 2300 +1 612 676 2319 kpeterson@ricemichels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian F Rice +1 612 676 2303 +1 612 676 2319 brice@ricemichels.com
No Logo Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald H. Silk +1 212 554 1400 +1 212 554 1444

Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Michels & Walther

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin E Peterson +1 612 676 2300 +1 612 676 2319 kpeterson@ricemichels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian F Rice +1 612 676 2303 +1 612 676 2319 brice@ricemichels.com
v.
No Logo Ally Bank, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carpenter & Lipps LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JENNIFER A. L. BATTLE +1 614 365 4100 +1 614 365 9145 battle@carpenterlipps.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Alan Lipps +1 614 365 4100 +1 614 365 9145 lipps@carpenterlipps.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angela Paul Whitfield +1 614 365 4100 paul@carpenterlipps.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly & Berens, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah E. Bushnell +1 612 349 6171 +1 612 349 6416 sbushnell@kellyhannahlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy D Kelly +1 612 349 6171 +1 612 349 6416 tkelly@kellyandberens.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/09/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrence J. Fleming +1 612 371 3248 +1 612 371 3207 tfleming@lindquist.com
TERMINATED: 06/09/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kim Ruckdaschel-Haley +1 612 371 3946 +1 612 371 3207 kruckdaschel-haley@lindquist.com
No Logo Angelo Mozilo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Sindberg Porter +1 612 373 0380 +1 612 373 0929 esindbergporter@greeneespel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John W. Ursu +1 612 373 8332 +1 612 373 0929 jursu@gr-espel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED A Matthew Ashley +1 949 760 0991 +1 949 760 5200 mashley@irell.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benedetto Balding +1 310 203 7004 +1 310 203 7199 bbalding@irell.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Siegel +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 dsiegel@irell.com
No Logo BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Felhaber Larson Fenlon & Vogt, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Hashmall +1 612 339 6321 +1 612 338 0535 dhashmall@felhaber.com

Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Bank of America Corporation Bank of America Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bank of America Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Felhaber Larson Fenlon & Vogt, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Hashmall +1 612 339 6321 +1 612 338 0535 dhashmall@felhaber.com

Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

No Logo Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian G Burke +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 7179 brian.burke@shearman.com
No Logo Countrywide Financial Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian G Burke +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 7179 brian.burke@shearman.com
No Logo Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Defendant

Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian G Burke +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 7179 brian.burke@shearman.com
Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian G Burke +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 7179 brian.burke@shearman.com
No Logo Countrywide Securities Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian G Burke +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 7179 brian.burke@shearman.com
No Logo CWALT, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian G Burke +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 7179 brian.burke@shearman.com
No Logo CWHEQ, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian G Burke +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 7179 brian.burke@shearman.com
No Logo CWMBS, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian G Burke +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 7179 brian.burke@shearman.com
No Logo David A Sambol, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Anthony Ostlund Baer & Louwagie PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brooke D Anthony +1 612 349 6969 +1 612 349 6996 banthony@aoblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent D Louwagie +1 612 349 6969 +1 612 349 6996 vlouwagie@aoblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by aoblr.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Courtland C Merrill +1 612 349 6969 +1 612 349 6996 cmerrill@aoblr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank M Scaduto +1 415 773 5700 fscaduto@orrick.com
No Logo Gmac Mortgage, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carpenter & Lipps LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JENNIFER A. L. BATTLE +1 614 365 4100 +1 614 365 9145 battle@carpenterlipps.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Alan Lipps +1 614 365 4100 +1 614 365 9145 lipps@carpenterlipps.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angela Paul Whitfield +1 614 365 4100 paul@carpenterlipps.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly & Berens, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah E. Bushnell +1 612 349 6171 +1 612 349 6416 sbushnell@kellyhannahlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy D Kelly +1 612 349 6171 +1 612 349 6416 tkelly@kellyandberens.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/09/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrence J. Fleming +1 612 371 3248 +1 612 371 3207 tfleming@lindquist.com
TERMINATED: 06/09/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kim Ruckdaschel-Haley +1 612 371 3946 +1 612 371 3207 kruckdaschel-haley@lindquist.com
No Logo Homecomings Financial, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carpenter & Lipps LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JENNIFER A. L. BATTLE +1 614 365 4100 +1 614 365 9145 battle@carpenterlipps.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Alan Lipps +1 614 365 4100 +1 614 365 9145 lipps@carpenterlipps.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angela Paul Whitfield +1 614 365 4100 paul@carpenterlipps.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly & Berens, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah E. Bushnell +1 612 349 6171 +1 612 349 6416 sbushnell@kellyhannahlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy D Kelly +1 612 349 6171 +1 612 349 6416 tkelly@kellyandberens.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/09/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrence J. Fleming +1 612 371 3248 +1 612 371 3207 tfleming@lindquist.com
TERMINATED: 06/09/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kim Ruckdaschel-Haley +1 612 371 3946 +1 612 371 3207 kruckdaschel-haley@lindquist.com
No Logo Nb Holdings Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Felhaber Larson Fenlon & Vogt, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Hashmall +1 612 339 6321 +1 612 338 0535 dhashmall@felhaber.com

Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

No Logo Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carpenter & Lipps LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JENNIFER A. L. BATTLE +1 614 365 4100 +1 614 365 9145 battle@carpenterlipps.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Alan Lipps +1 614 365 4100 +1 614 365 9145 lipps@carpenterlipps.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angela Paul Whitfield +1 614 365 4100 paul@carpenterlipps.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly & Berens, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah E. Bushnell +1 612 349 6171 +1 612 349 6416 sbushnell@kellyhannahlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy D Kelly +1 612 349 6171 +1 612 349 6416 tkelly@kellyandberens.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/09/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrence J. Fleming +1 612 371 3248 +1 612 371 3207 tfleming@lindquist.com
TERMINATED: 06/09/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kim Ruckdaschel-Haley +1 612 371 3946 +1 612 371 3207 kruckdaschel-haley@lindquist.com
No Logo Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carpenter & Lipps LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JENNIFER A. L. BATTLE +1 614 365 4100 +1 614 365 9145 battle@carpenterlipps.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Alan Lipps +1 614 365 4100 +1 614 365 9145 lipps@carpenterlipps.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angela Paul Whitfield +1 614 365 4100 paul@carpenterlipps.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly & Berens, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah E. Bushnell +1 612 349 6171 +1 612 349 6416 sbushnell@kellyhannahlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy D Kelly +1 612 349 6171 +1 612 349 6416 tkelly@kellyandberens.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/09/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrence J. Fleming +1 612 371 3248 +1 612 371 3207 tfleming@lindquist.com
TERMINATED: 06/09/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kim Ruckdaschel-Haley +1 612 371 3946 +1 612 371 3207 kruckdaschel-haley@lindquist.com
No Logo Residential Funding Company, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carpenter & Lipps LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Alan Lipps +1 614 365 4100 +1 614 365 9145 lipps@carpenterlipps.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carpenter Lipps & Leland LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JENNIFER A. L. BATTLE +1 614 365 4100 +1 614 365 9145 battle@carpenterlipps.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angela Paul Whitfield +1 614 365 4100 paul@carpenterlipps.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly & Berens, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah E. Bushnell +1 612 349 6171 +1 612 349 6416 sbushnell@kellyhannahlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy D Kelly +1 612 349 6171 +1 612 349 6416 tkelly@kellyandberens.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/09/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrence J. Fleming +1 612 371 3248 +1 612 371 3207 tfleming@lindquist.com
TERMINATED: 06/09/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kim Ruckdaschel-Haley +1 612 371 3946 +1 612 371 3207 kruckdaschel-haley@lindquist.com
No Logo Residential Funding Securities, LLC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carpenter & Lipps LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JENNIFER A. L. BATTLE +1 614 365 4100 +1 614 365 9145 battle@carpenterlipps.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Alan Lipps +1 614 365 4100 +1 614 365 9145 lipps@carpenterlipps.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angela Paul Whitfield +1 614 365 4100 paul@carpenterlipps.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly & Berens, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah E. Bushnell +1 612 349 6171 +1 612 349 6416 sbushnell@kellyhannahlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy D Kelly +1 612 349 6171 +1 612 349 6416 tkelly@kellyandberens.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/09/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrence J. Fleming +1 612 371 3248 +1 612 371 3207 tfleming@lindquist.com
TERMINATED: 06/09/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kim Ruckdaschel-Haley +1 612 371 3946 +1 612 371 3207 kruckdaschel-haley@lindquist.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1442
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (121) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 121 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2), transferring case to the Central District of California per MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (akl) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
    LREF
    Blank 120 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER THAT: The Countrywide Defendants' Motion to Sever and to Transfer (ECF No. 80), and the Bank of America Defendants' Motion to Sever and to Transfer (ECF. No. 84) are hereby withdrawn without prejudice; The briefing schedule set forth in the July 22, 2011 Order (ECF No. 59) is vacated and the hearing scheduled for September 30, 2011 is cancelled. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/29/11. (jam) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
      LREF
      Blank 119 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER in re: severance and remand of the "GMAC" defendant-related claims to State Court. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/26/11. (jam) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
        LREF
        Blank 118 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
        STIPULATION with attached Exhibit A Between Plaintiffs and The Countrywide Defendants, The Bank of America Defendants, Angelo Mozilo and David A. Sambol by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation, Angelo Mozilo, NB Holdings Corporation, David A Sambol, Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio, CWABS, Inc.. (Wales, David) Modified text on 8/29/2011 (akl). (Entered: 08/26/2011)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
          STIPULATION Between Plaintiffs and The "GMAC" Defendants Regarding Severance of Claims and Remand of The "GMAC" Defendant-Related Claims to State Court by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC., Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Wales, David) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
            LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Attachment)(Kreps, Ronn) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
              EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit G by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                MEMORANDUM in Support re 28 MOTION to Dismiss/General Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                  EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit V by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                    EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit U by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                      EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit T by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                        EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit S by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                          EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit R by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                            EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit Q by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                              EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit P by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit O by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                  EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit N by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                    EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit M by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                      EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit L by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                        EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit K by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                          EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit J by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                            EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit I by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                              EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit H by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit F by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                  EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit E (part 3) by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                    EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit E (part 2) by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                      EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit E (part 1) by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                        EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit D by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                          EXHIBIT re 92 Exhibit Exhibit C by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                            EXHIBIT re 91 Exhibit, Exhibit B by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                              EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit A by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                AFFIDAVIT of David L. Hashmall in SUPPORT OF 28 MOTION to Dismiss/General Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of David L. Hashmall in SUPPORT OF 84 MOTION to Sever Under Fed. Rule Civ. P. 42(b) and to Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 84 MOTION to Sever Under Fed. Rule Civ. P. 42(b) and to Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation re 80 Final MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue (Hanson, Andre) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 84 MOTION to Sever Under Fed. Rule Civ. P. 42(b) and to Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) : Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Memorandum in Support of 80 Final MOTION to Sever, MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hanson, Andre) Modified link and text on 8/3/2011 (akl). (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION to Sever Under Fed. Rule Civ. P. 42(b) and to Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 80 Final MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue : Countrywide Defendants' Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Hanson, Andre) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Declaration of Andre Hanson in Support of 80 Final MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G, # 8 Exhibit(s) H, # 9 Exhibit(s) I, # 10 Exhibit(s) J, # 11 Exhibit(s) K, # 12 Exhibit(s) L, # 13 Exhibit(s) M, # 14 Exhibit(s) N, # 15 Exhibit(s) O, # 16 Exhibit(s) P, # 17 Exhibit(s) Q, # 18 Exhibit(s) R, # 19 Exhibit(s) S, # 20 Exhibit(s) T, # 21 Exhibit(s) U, # 22 Exhibit(s) V, # 23 Exhibit(s) W, # 24 Exhibit(s) X, # 25 Exhibit(s) Y)(Hanson, Andre) Modified text on 8/3/2011 (akl). (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  Declaration of Paul T. Liu in Support of 80 Final MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Hanson, Andre) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    Final MOTION to Sever, MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Hanson, Andre) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation re 76 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Hanson, Andre) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        Declaration of Andre Hanson in Support of 77 Memorandum in Support filed by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E)(Hanson, Andre) Modified text on 8/3/2011 (akl). (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          Memorandum in Support of 33 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint filed by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hanson, Andre) Modified link and text on 8/3/2011 (akl). (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss/General by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Hanson, Andre) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P. Notice of Merger and Name Change (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC. re 70 Declaration in Support,,, 68 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 71 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Bushnell, Sarah) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of David Sambol in SUPPORT OF 24 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint filed by David A Sambol. (Louwagie, Vincent) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 24 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint filed by David A Sambol. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Louwagie, Vincent) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 60 MOTION to Sever Claims filed by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bushnell, Sarah) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Declaration of Jeffrey A. Lipps in Support of 31 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5, part 1, # 6 Exhibit(s) 5, part 2, # 7 Exhibit(s) 5, part 3, # 8 Exhibit(s) 5, part 4, # 9 Exhibit(s) 6, part 1, # 10 Exhibit(s) 6, part 2, # 11 Exhibit(s) 6, part 3, # 12 Exhibit(s) 6, part 4, # 13 Exhibit(s) 7, part 1, # 14 Exhibit(s) 7, part 2, # 15 Exhibit(s) 7, part 3, # 16 Exhibit(s) 7, part 4, # 17 Exhibit(s) 7, part 5, # 18 Exhibit(s) 8)(Bushnell, Sarah) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER that Countrywide's request for a word count enlargement [Doc. 63] is GRANTED and that the Countrywide Defendants may submit opening and reply memoranda in support of their motion to strike and to dismiss that shall not exceed 16,000 words in the aggregate. Plaintiffs likewise may submit a memorandum in opposition to the Countrywide Defendants' motion to strike and to dismiss that shall not exceed 16,000 words. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/2/11. (jam) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 31 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bushnell, Sarah) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Angelo Mozilo re 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure To State A Claim Against Angelo Mozilo Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Declaration of Angelo R. Mozilo in Support of 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure To State A Claim Against Angelo Mozilo Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Angelo Mozilo. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Erin Sindberg Porter in SUPPORT OF 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure To State A Claim Against Angelo Mozilo Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5)(Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure To State A Claim Against Angelo Mozilo Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation in Support of Unopposed Request for Word Count Extension. (Hanson, Andre) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC. re 61 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 60 MOTION to Sever Claims (Kelly, Timothy) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 60 MOTION to Sever Claims : Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Kelly, Timothy) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Sever Claims by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC.. (Kelly, Timothy) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT: 1) Defendants' Memoranda of Law and any other supporting papers are due on August 2, 2011; 2) Plaintiffs' Opposition Memorandum of Law and any other supporting papers are due on September 6, 2011, and 3) Defendants' Reply Memoranda of Law and any other supporting papers are due on September 16, 2011. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/22/11. (jam) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule by all parties. (Wales, David) Modified filers and text on 7/22/2011 (akl). (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER : The hearing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss [Doc.24, 26, 28, 33, & 31] scheduled for September 15, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. is hereby rescheduled to Friday, September 30, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Susan Richard Nelson in Courtroom 7B, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul Minnesota. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/21/11. (jam) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER: The hearing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss [Doc.24, 26, 28, 33, & 31] scheduled for September 2, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. is hereby rescheduled to Thursday, September 15, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Susan Richard Nelson in Courtroom 7B, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul Minnesota. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/19/11. (jam) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER that: The Countrywide Defendants' informal request for a stay (Doc. No. 53) is DENIED.(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/18/11. (jam) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Status Conference held on 7/14/2011. Status Conference held before Susan Richard Nelson, United States Magistrate Judge, at St. Paul, Minnesota. The request by the Countrywide defendants to stay this matter pending the resolution of the MDL motion is taken under advisement. An order will issue. (Court Reporter Ron Moen) (jam) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Kreps, Ronn) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT (Status Conference Submission of the "GMAC" Defendants by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kelly, Timothy) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio re 49 Letter to District Judge )Plaintiffs' Submission in Opposition to Defendants' Request for a Stay of Proceedings) filed by Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C)(Wales, David) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Angelo Mozilo Pursuant to Order Dated June 29, 2011 [Docket 47]. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by David A Sambol. (Louwagie, Vincent) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/14/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. Parties are to file on ECF simultaneous submissions on or before July 12, 20011 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 6/29/11. (jam) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Blair A. Nicholas. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2845106 by Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Blair A. Nicholas)(Peterson, Karin) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Bradley J. Butwin by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Frank M. Scaduto by David A Sambol. (Anthony, Brooke) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC. re 42 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution, (Bushnell, Sarah) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC.. (Bushnell, Sarah) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Plaintiff Thrivent Financial for Lutherans ("Thrivent Financial") is a not-for-profit fraternal benefit society. No publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of its stock. Plaintiff Thrivent Life Insurance Company is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Thrivent Financial. No publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of its stock. Plaintiff Thrivent Financial for Lutherans Foundation is a private 501(c)(3) foundation funded by Thrivent Financial and its subsidiaries. No publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of its stock. Plaintiffs Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Income Fund, and Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund (the "Funds") are each a series of Thrivent Mutual Funds. Thrivent Mutual Funds is organized as a Massachusetts business trust and is registered as an open-end management investment company under the Investment Company Act of 1940. No publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of the stock of any of the Funds. Plaintiffs Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, and Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio (the "Portfolios") are each a series of Thrivent Series Fund, Inc. Thrivent Series Fund, Inc. is a Minnesota corporation registered as an open-end management investment company under the Investment Company Act of 1940. No publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of the stock of any of the Portfolios. Plaintiff Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust is an individual pension account plan funded by Thrivent Financial. No publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of its stock. (Wales, David) Modified text on 6/7/2011 (akl). (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Michael D. Torpey by David A Sambol. (Anthony, Brooke) Modified on 6/6/2011 (MMC). (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Michael C. Tu by David A Sambol. (Anthony, Brooke) Modified on 6/6/2011 (MMC). (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - replaced by doc. #39. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Michael C. Tu by David A Sambol. (Anthony, Brooke) Modified on 6/6/2011 (MMC). (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - replaced by doc. #40. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Michael D. Torpey by David A Sambol. (Anthony, Brooke) Modified on 6/6/2011 (MMC). (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: 1. Within 30 days of the Motion to Dismiss being denied or granted in part, Plaintiff shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Tony Leung, by letter or e-mail, for the purpose of scheduling a pretrial conference. 2. Failure to comply with this Order or any other prior consistent Order shall subject the non-complying party, non-complying counsel and/or the party such counsel represents to any and all appropriate remedies, sanctions and the like, including without limitation: assessment of costs, fines and attorneys fees and disbursements; waiver of rights to object; exclusion or limitation of witnesses, testimony, exhibits and other evidence; striking of pleadings; complete or partial dismissal with prejudice; entry of whole or partial default judgment; and/or any other relief that this Court may from time to time deem appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/1/11. (akl) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., GMAC Mortgage LLC, Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., and Ally Bank are wholly-owned indirect subsidiaries of Ally Financial Inc. f/k/a GMAC Inc. ("Ally"). Residential Funding Securities, LLC is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Ally, Ally is not publicly held. No publicly held corporation owns more than 10% of the common stock of Ally. (Ruckdaschel-Haley, Kim) Modified text on 6/7/2011 (akl). (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 33 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Hanson, Andre) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Hanson, Andre) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 31 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Complaint : by GMAC Defendants Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Ruckdaschel-Haley, Kim) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Complaint by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC.. (Ruckdaschel-Haley, Kim) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. 1. BAC is a publicly-held corporation whose shares are traded on the New York Stock Exchange. It has no parent company and no publicly-held company owns more than 10% of BACs shares. 2. NB is a wholly-owned direct BAC subsidiary. 3. Servicing is a wholly-owned indirect BAC subsidiary. BAC GP, LLC and BANA LP, LLC are Servicings general and limited partners and own 100% of Servicing. GP and for LP are wholly owned direct subsidiaries of Bank of America, N.A. Bank of America, N.A. is a wholly owned subsidiary of BANA Holding Corporation, which is wholly-owned by BAC North America Holding Company. NB wholly owns BAC North America Holding Company. (Hashmall, David) Modified text on 5/31/2011 (lmb). (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 28 MOTION to Dismiss/General Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) : Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss/General Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure To State A Claim Against Angelo Mozilo Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted : Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure To State A Claim Against Angelo Mozilo Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by Angelo Mozilo. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 24 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Anthony, Brooke) Modified text on 6/1/2011 (akl). (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint by David A Sambol. (Anthony, Brooke) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Bank of America Corporation is a corporate parent of Defendants CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Hanson, Andre) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan Rosenberg by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for William J. Sushon by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Adam S. Hakki. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2806976 by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Hanson, Andre) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Kirsten N. Cunha. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2806966 by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Hanson, Andre) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Brian G. Burke. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2806949 by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Hanson, Andre) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Ally Bank answer due 5/31/2011; BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P. answer due 5/31/2011; Bank of America Corp. answer due 5/31/2011; CWALT, Inc. answer due 5/31/2011; CWHEQ, Inc. answer due 5/31/2011; CWMBS, Inc. answer due 5/31/2011; Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC answer due 5/31/2011; Countrywide Financial Corporation answer due 5/31/2011; Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP answer due 5/31/2011; Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. answer due 5/31/2011; Countrywide Securities Corporation answer due 5/31/2011; GMAC Mortgage LLC answer due 5/31/2011; Homecomings Financial, LLC answer due 5/31/2011; Angelo Mozilo answer due 5/31/2011; NB Holdings Corporation answer due 5/31/2011; Residential Accredit Loans, Inc. answer due 5/31/2011; Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc. answer due 5/31/2011; Residential Funding Company, LLC answer due 5/31/2011; Residential Funding Securities, LLC. answer due 5/31/2011; David A Sambol answer due 5/31/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/10/11. (akl) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David Siegel by Angelo Mozilo. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Allison Libeu by Angelo Mozilo. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Holly Gershow by Angelo Mozilo. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Benedetto Balding by Angelo Mozilo. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for A. Matthew Ashley by Angelo Mozilo. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Ally Bank, BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Angelo Mozilo, NB Holdings Corporation, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC., David A Sambol, Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Hanson, Andre) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Angela Paul Whitfield by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC.. (Ruckdaschel-Haley, Kim) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer A.L. Battle by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC.. (Ruckdaschel-Haley, Kim) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey A. Lipps by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC.. (Ruckdaschel-Haley, Kim) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Lauren A. McMillen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2791860 by Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Pro Hac Vice)(Rice, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jai K. Chandrasekhar. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2791844 by Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Rice, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David L. Wales. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2791832 by Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Rice, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Gerald H. Silk. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2791819 by Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Rice, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Bruce D. Bernstein. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2791768 by Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Rice, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 11cv1111 SRN/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 4/29/2011. (JME) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County by Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Ally Bank, CWALT, Inc., NB Holdings Corporation, CWHEQ, Inc., David A Sambol, Countrywide Securities Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Residential Funding Securities, LLC., Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Angelo Mozilo, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Bank of America Corp., CWMBS, Inc. from Hennepin County, Fourth Judicial District, their case number 27-cv-11-5830 ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4-54011). Case assigned to Judge Susan R. Nelson per Master List, referred to Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Exhibits & Summons, # 3 Notice of Filing Removal, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Certificate of Service, # 6 Certificate of Service) (jam) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 316 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?