Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas et al v. Ameriprise Trust Co. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:11-cv-01451
District Judge Michael J. Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neier, Hal +1 212 833 1100

Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell Patrick Hurley +1 212 872 1011 +1 212 872 1002 mhurley@akingump.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M Zensky +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1002 dzensky@akingump.com

Represented by Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT J. LACK +1 973 877 6400 +1 212 373 7908 rlack@fklaw.com

Represented by Kelley, Wolter & Scott, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M Scott +1 612 371 9090 +1 612 371 0574 dscott@kelleywolter.com

Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin M Magnuson +1 612 349 8242 +1 612 339 4181 kmmagnuson@rkmc.com
No Logo Law Debenture Trust Company Of New York, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neier, Hal +1 212 833 1100

Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell Patrick Hurley +1 212 872 1011 +1 212 872 1002 mhurley@akingump.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M Zensky +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1002 dzensky@akingump.com

Represented by Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT J. LACK +1 973 877 6400 +1 212 373 7908 rlack@fklaw.com

Represented by Kelley, Wolter & Scott, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M Scott +1 612 371 9090 +1 612 371 0574 dscott@kelleywolter.com

Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin M Magnuson +1 612 349 8242 +1 612 339 4181 kmmagnuson@rkmc.com
No Logo Wilmington Trust Company, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neier, Hal +1 212 833 1100

Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell Patrick Hurley +1 212 872 1011 +1 212 872 1002 mhurley@akingump.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M Zensky +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1002 dzensky@akingump.com

Represented by Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT J. LACK +1 973 877 6400 +1 212 373 7908 rlack@fklaw.com

Represented by Kelley, Wolter & Scott, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M Scott +1 612 371 9090 +1 612 371 0574 dscott@kelleywolter.com

Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin M Magnuson +1 612 349 8242 +1 612 339 4181 kmmagnuson@rkmc.com
v.
No Logo Advantus Capital Management, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Larson King LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah E Madsen +1 651 312 6591 +1 651 789 4891 smadsen@larsonking.com
No Logo Advantus Series Fund, Inc. Index 500 Portfolio, Defendant

Represented by Larson King LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah E Madsen +1 651 312 6591 +1 651 789 4891 smadsen@larsonking.com
No Logo Advantus Series Fund, Inc. Index Portfolio, Defendant

Represented by Larson King LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah E Madsen +1 651 312 6591 +1 651 789 4891 smadsen@larsonking.com
No Logo American Enterprise Investment Services Inc, Defendant

Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael M Krauss +1 612 766 8514 +1 612 766 1600 mkrauss@faegre.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen M Mertz +1 612 766 7223 +1 612 766 1600 stephen.mertz@faegrebd.com
No Logo Ameriprise Trust Co., Defendant

Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael M Krauss +1 612 766 8514 +1 612 766 1600 mkrauss@faegre.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen M Mertz +1 612 766 7223 +1 612 766 1600 stephen.mertz@faegrebd.com
No Logo Arthur Blauzda, Defendant

Represented by MN Supreme Court

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy D Eiden +1 651 757 1224 +1 651 297 8265 jeremy.eiden@state.mn.us
No Logo Copper Nugget, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Hanft Fride PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D Kelly +1 218 722 4766 +1 218 529 2401 jdk@hanftlaw.com
No Logo David R. Coggins, Jr., Defendant

Represented by Fredrikson & Byron, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew T. Boos +1 612 492 7180 +1 612 492 7077 mboos@fredlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin C Riach +1 612 492 7435 +1 612 492 7077 kriach@fredlaw.com
No Logo Evangelical Lutheran Church in America Board of Pensions, Defendant

Represented by Fredrikson & Byron, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas S Fraser +1 612 492 7028 +1 612 492 7077 tfraser@fredlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lousene M Hoppe +1 612 492 7402 +1 612 492 7077 lhoppe@fredlaw.com
No Logo Gerry Vaillancourt, Defendant

Represented by Larson King LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah E Madsen +1 651 312 6591 +1 651 789 4891 smadsen@larsonking.com
No Logo Hanft Fride, Defendant

Represented by Hanft Fride PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D Kelly +1 218 722 4766 +1 218 529 2401 jdk@hanftlaw.com
No Logo John E. Mayasich, Defendant

Represented by Leonard Street and Deinard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R Litman +1 612 335 1500 +1 612 335 1657 stephen.litman@leonard.com
No Logo L. Michael Schmitt, Defendant

Represented by MN Supreme Court

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy D Eiden +1 651 757 1224 +1 651 297 8265 jeremy.eiden@state.mn.us
No Logo Lutheran Brotherhood, Defendant

Represented by Larson King LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah E Madsen +1 651 312 6591 +1 651 789 4891 smadsen@larsonking.com
No Logo Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Defendant

Represented by Larson King LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah E Madsen +1 651 312 6591 +1 651 789 4891 smadsen@larsonking.com
No Logo Minnesota State Board of Investment, Defendant

Represented by Minnesota Attorney General's Office - Ste 1200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy D Eiden +1 651 757 1224 +1 651 297 8265 jeremy.eiden@state.mn.us
No Logo North Shore Bank of Commerce, Defendant

Represented by Hanft Fride PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D Kelly +1 218 722 4766 +1 218 529 2401 jdk@hanftlaw.com
No Logo Richard Burns, Defendant

Represented by Hanft Fride PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D Kelly +1 218 722 4766 +1 218 529 2401 jdk@hanftlaw.com
No Logo Thrivent Fin for Lutherans, Defendant

Represented by Larson King LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah E Madsen +1 651 312 6591 +1 651 789 4891 smadsen@larsonking.com
No Logo Thrivent Series Fund Balanced Portfolio, Defendant

Represented by Larson King LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah E Madsen +1 651 312 6591 +1 651 789 4891 smadsen@larsonking.com
No Logo Thrivent Series Fund Large Cap Index Portfolio, Defendant

Represented by Larson King LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah E Madsen +1 651 312 6591 +1 651 789 4891 smadsen@larsonking.com
No Logo Union Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Union Bank & Trust Company"

Represented by Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Paul Wassweiler +1 612 371 3211 +1 612 371 3207 wwassweiler@lindquist.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (89) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re 85 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Summons and Complaint, 87 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 86 Notice (Other), 88 Declaration in Support, (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
    Declaration of Kevin M. Magnuson in Support of 85 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
      MEMORANDUM in Support re 85 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
        NOTICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re 85 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Summons and Complaint:Date and Time to be Determined. (Magnuson, Kevin) Modified text on 9/12/2011 (akl). (Entered: 09/09/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
          MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Summons and Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Hal Neier by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Lousene M Hoppe on behalf of Evangelical Lutheran Church in America Board of Pensions. (Hoppe, Lousene) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Robert J. Lack by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Ricardo Solano Jr. by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Amy C. Brown by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M Employees Welfare Benefits Association Trust I, Advantus Capital Management Inc.(on behalf of themselves and a class of similarly situated persons and entities), Advantus Capital Management Inc., Advantus Series Fund, Inc. Index Portfolio, American Enterprise Investment Services Inc, Ameriprise Trust Co., Arthur Blauzda, Richard Burns, Clearwater Growth Fund, David R. Coggins, Jr, Copper Nugget, Inc., Employee Retirement Income Pln TR of MINN MNG & MFG Co, Evangelical Lutheran Church in America Board of Pensions, Fifth Third Bank, First American Equity Index Fund, First American Investment Funds, Inc.-Equity Index Fund, Firstar Equity Index Fund, Hanft Fride, Lutheran Brotherhood, John E. Mayasich, Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Minnesota State Board of Investment, NSP-Minnesota Prairie I Retail Qualified Trust, NSP-Minnesota Retail Prairie II Qualified Trust, NSP-Monticello Minnesota Retail Qualified Trust, North Shore Bank of Commerce, Primevest Financial Services, L. Michael Schmitt, Thrivent Fin for Lutherans, Thrivent Series Fund Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Series Fund Large Cap Index Portfolio, Union Bank & Trust Company, Gerry Vaillancourt, filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Certificate of Service) (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T Boos on behalf of David R. Coggins, Jr. (Boos, Matthew) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                          RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Evangelical Lutheran Church in America Board of Pensions. (Moen, Nicole) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M Moen on behalf of Evangelical Lutheran Church in America Board of Pensions. (Moen, Nicole) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas S Fraser on behalf of Evangelical Lutheran Church in America Board of Pensions. (Fraser, Thomas) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re 73 Notice (Other) (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5)(Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. David R. Coggins, Jr served on 6/30/2011, answer due 7/21/2011. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. Advantus Series Fund, Inc. Index Portfolio served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. Evangelical Lutheran Church in America Board of Pensions served on 7/1/2011, answer due 7/22/2011. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. John E. Mayasich served on 6/26/2011, answer due 7/18/2011. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. Minnesota Life Insurance Company served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. Union Bank & Trust Company served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. Thrivent Series Fund Large Cap Index Portfolio served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. Thrivent Series Fund Balanced Portfolio served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. Primevest Financial Services served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. Lutheran Brotherhood served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. Firstar Equity Index Fund served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. First American Investment Funds, Inc.-Equity Index Fund served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. First American Equity Index Fund served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. Employee Retirement Income Pln TR of MINN MNG & MFG Co served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. Clearwater Growth Fund served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. 3M Employees Welfare Benefits Association Trust I served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. North Shore Bank of Commerce served on 7/1/2011, answer due 7/22/2011. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. Richard Burns served on 7/12/2011, answer due 8/2/2011. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. Copper Nugget, Inc. served on 7/6/2011, answer due 8/2/2011. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. Copper Nugget, Inc. served on 7/12/2011, answer due 8/2/2011. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING: 1. That the Stipulation shall be, and hereby is, adopted as the Order of this Court, and the deadline for Defendants Copper Nugget, Inc., Richard Burns, Hanft Fride and North Shore Bank of Commerce to file and serve an Answer or file and serve a Rule 12 Motion is extended until the later of: (i) ten days after the date the Court rules on Plaintiffs Amended Motion to Stay, or (ii) such date as may be prescribed by the Court. 2. That Defendants Copper Nugget, Inc., Richard Burns, Hanft Fride and North Shore Bank of Commerce and their counsel, having agreed to not to challenge service of the Complaint, shall file notices of appearance and Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statements within three business days of the execution of this Stipulation. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 07/22/2011. (lmb) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R Litman on behalf of John E. Mayasich. (Litman, Stephen) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard Burns, Copper Nugget, Inc., Hanft Fride, North Shore Bank of Commerce re 47 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, 48 Stipulation, 46 Notice of Appearance (Kelly, John) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or File Responsive Pleading by Richard Burns, Copper Nugget, Inc., Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hanft Fride, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, North Shore Bank of Commerce, Wilmington Trust Company. (Kelly, John) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Copper Nugget, Inc. is a corporation organized under the laws of the State of Nevada. Copper Nugget, Inc. is a wholly owned subsidiary of the Superior Telegram Company. No publicly held corporation owns ten percent (10%) or more of Copper Nugget, Inc.'s stock. (Kelly, John) Modified text on 7/22/2011 (akl). (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by John D Kelly on behalf of Richard Burns, Copper Nugget, Inc., Hanft Fride, North Shore Bank of Commerce. (Kelly, John) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy D Eiden on behalf of Arthur Blauzda, Minnesota State Board of Investment, L. Michael Schmitt. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Eiden, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED MOTION TO STAY. (See Order). Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 07/21/2011. (lmb) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re 41 Second MOTION to Stay re 20 Amended MOTION to Stay, 42 Notice (Other) (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re 41 Second MOTION to Stay re 20 Amended MOTION to Stay: Date and Time to be Determined. (Magnuson, Kevin) Modified text on 7/21/2011 (akl). (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Second MOTION to Stay re 20 Amended MOTION to Stay by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. That the Stipulation shall be, and hereby is, adopted as the Order of this Court, and Advantus Capital Management, Inc., Advantus Series Fund, Inc. Index 500 Portfolio, Gerry Vaillancourt, Lutheran Brotherhood, Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Series Fund Balanced Portfolio and Thrivent Series Fund Large Cap Index Portfolio shall respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint no sooner than seven days after the date the Court rules on Plaintiffs' Amended Motion to Stay, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. 2. That Advantus Capital Management, Inc., Advantus Series Fund, Inc. Index 500 Portfolio, Gerry Vaillancourt, Lutheran Brotherhood, Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Series Fund Balanced Portfolio and Thrivent Series Fund Large Cap Index Portfolio and their counsel, having agreed to accept service of the Complaint, shall file notices of appearance within three business days of the execution of this Stipulation. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 07/19/2011. (lmb) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER REGARDGING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. That the Stipulation shall be, and hereby is, adopted as the Order of this Court, and the deadline for Defendant Union Bank & Trust Company to file and serve its Answer or file and serve a Rule 12 Motion is extended until the later of: (i) seven days after the date the Court rules on Plaintiffs Amended Motion to Stay, or (ii) such date as may be prescribed by the Court. 2. That Defendant Union Bank & Trust Company and its counsel, having agreed to accept service of the Complaint, shall file notices of appearance and a Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement within three business days of the execution of this Stipulation. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 07/18/2011. (lmb) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER CANCELING THE HEARINGS ON PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTIONS TO STAY: Plaintiffs, by and through counsel, have moved this Court in the above captioned cases for orders requesting that the Court stay the time for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above captioned actions. The Hearings on Plaintiffs Amended Motions to Stay scheduled for Wednesday, July 20, 2011 at 10:30 a.m. before the Honorable Arthur J. Boylan, Chief Magistrate Judge of the United States District Court, District of Minnesota, have been CANCELED because of a scheduling conflict on the Courts calendar. If a party requests a hearing by 5 pm, Tuesday, July 26, 2011, the Court will consider whether to reschedule the hearing. If no party requests a hearing or the Court determines that a hearing is not necessary, the Amended Motions to Stay in the above captioned cases will be decided on the motion papers without a hearing. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 07/18/2011. (lmb) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Mitchell Hurley by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Union Bank & Trust Company re 35 Stipulation, 33 Notice of Appearance, 34 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Wassweiler, William) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or File Responsive Pleading by Union Bank & Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company, Wilmington Trust Company. (Wassweiler, William) Modified filers and text on 7/18/2011 (akl). (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Union Bank & Trust Company. (Wassweiler, William) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by William P Wassweiler on behalf of Union Bank & Trust Company. (Wassweiler, William) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service by Advantus Capital Management Inc., Advantus Series Fund, Inc. Index Portfolio, Lutheran Brotherhood, Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Fin for Lutherans, Thrivent Series Fund Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Series Fund Large Cap Index Portfolio, Gerry Vaillancourt re 30 Stipulation, 28 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, 27 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, 26 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, 25 Notice of Appearance, 29 Notice of Appearance, (Madsen, Sarah) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service by Advantus Capital Management Inc., Advantus Series Fund, Inc. Index Portfolio, Lutheran Brotherhood, Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Fin for Lutherans, Thrivent Series Fund Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Series Fund Large Cap Index Portfolio, Gerry Vaillancourt re 30 Stipulation, 28 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, 27 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, 26 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, 25 Notice of Appearance, 29 Notice of Appearance, (Madsen, Sarah) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or File Responsive Pldg by Advantus Capital Management Inc., Advantus Series Fund, Inc. Index Portfolio, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Lutheran Brotherhood, Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Fin for Lutherans, Thrivent Series Fund Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Series Fund Large Cap Index Portfolio, Gerry Vaillancourt, Wilmington Trust Company. (Madsen, Sarah) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E Madsen on behalf of Advantus Capital Management Inc., Advantus Series Fund, Inc. Index Portfolio, Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Fin for Lutherans, Thrivent Series Fund Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Series Fund Large Cap Index Portfolio, Gerry Vaillancourt. (Madsen, Sarah) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Lutheran Brotherhood, Thrivent Fin for Lutherans, Thrivent Series Fund Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Series Fund Large Cap Index Portfolio. (Madsen, Sarah) Modified filers and text on 7/19/2011 (akl). (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Defendant Minnesota Life Insurance Company ("Minnesota Life") states the all shares of its stock are owned by a second tier intermediate stock holding company called "Securian Financial Group, Inc.," which is a wholly-owned subsidiary of a first tier intermediate stock holding company called "Securian Holding Company." Securian Holding Company is a whollyowned subsidiary of a mutual insurance holding company called "Minnesota Mutual Companies, Inc." No publicly held corporation owns more than ten percent (10%) of Minnesota Life's stock. (Madsen, Sarah) Modified text on 7/19/2011 (akl). (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. All of the shares of Advantus' stock are owned by a second tier intermediate stock holding company called "Securian Financial Group, Inc.," which is a wholly-owned subsidiary of a first tier intermediate stock holding company called "Securian Holding Company." Securian Holding Company is a wholly-owned subsidiary of a mutual insurance holding company called "Minnesota Mutual Companies, Inc." No publicly held corporation owns more than ten percent (10%) of Advantus' stock. Advantus Series Fund, Inc. is a Minnesota corporation registered under the Investment Company Act of 1940 as an open-ended management investment company with a series of seven portfolios, including the Index 500 Portfolio. No publicly held corporation owns more than ten percent (10%) of its stock. (Madsen, Sarah) Modified on 7/19/2011 (akl). (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E Madsen on behalf of Lutheran Brotherhood, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Series Fund Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Series Fund Large Cap Index Portfolio, Gerry Vaillancourt, Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Advantus Capital Management, Inc., Advantus Series Fund, Inc. Index 500 Portfolio. (Madsen, Sarah) Modified filers and text on 7/14/2011 (akl). (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re 22 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 20 Amended MOTION to Stay, 21 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 23 Declaration in Support, (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Declaration of David M. Zensky in Support of 20 Amended MOTION to Stay filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F)(Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 20 Amended MOTION to Stay filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 20 Amended MOTION to Stay : Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Amended MOTION to Stay by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re 18 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 17 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 17 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. American Enterprise Investment Services Inc served on 6/17/2011, answer due 7/8/2011; Ameriprise Trust Co. served on 6/17/2011, answer due 7/8/2011. (Scott, Daniel) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw Admission 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Angeline Lam Koo by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Scott, Daniel) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Angeline Lam Koo by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Daniel H. Golden by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for James P. Chou by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Stephen M. Baldini by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David M. Zensky by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jason L. Goldsmith by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Michael M Krauss on behalf of American Enterprise Investment Services Inc, Ameriprise Trust Co.. (Krauss, Michael) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE EXHIBIT A TO THE 1 COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 06/03/11. (TSS) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION TO FILE EXHIBIT A TO THE 1 COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL by Plaintiffs.(TSS) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 11-1452 (PAM/FLN) and 11-1453 (ADM/AJB) has been reassigned to Chief Judge Michael J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis, Judge Paul. A. Magnuson, and Ann D. Montgomery on 06/03/11. (TSS) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            DISQUALIFICATION AND ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT. Senior Judge David S. Doty recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Michael J. Davis for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 11cv1451 MJD/AJB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 6/3/2011. (JME) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. Judge Richard H. Kyle recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge David S. Doty for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 11cv1451 (DSD/AJB). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 06/03/2011. (TSS) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas ("DBTCA"), by and through its undersigned counsel, make the following disclosure: (a) Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas is a banking institution governed by the laws of the State of New York, with a principal place of business at 60 Wall Street, New York, NY. (b) DBTCA is a wholly owned-subsidiary of Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation; (c) Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation is a wholly owned subsidiary of Taunus Corporation; (d) Taunus Corporation is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Deutsche Bank AG; and (e) No corporation directly or indirectly owns 10% or more of any class of Deutsche Bank AG's equity interests. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Law Debenture Trust Company of New York ("Law Debenture"), by and through its undersigned counsel, make the following disclosure: (a) Law Debenture Trust Company of New York is a limited purpose trust company governed by the laws of the State of New York, with a principal place of business at 400 Madison Avenue, Suite 4D, New York, NY 10017. (b) Law Debenture is a wholly-owned subsidiary of The Law Debenture Corporation plc; and (c) The Law Debenture Corporation plc has no parent corporation, and no corporation owns 10% or more of Law Debenture plc's equity interests. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Wilmington Trust Company ("Wilmington Trust"), by and through its undersigned counsel, make the following disclosure: (a) Wilmington Trust is a bank and trust company governed by the laws of the State of Delaware, with a principal place of business at 1100 North Market Street, Wilmington, DE; (b) Wilmington Trust is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Wilmington Trust Corporation; and (c) Wilmington Trust is a wholly-owned subsidiary of M&T Bank Corporation. (akl) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against 3M Employees Welfare Benefits Association Trust I, Advantus Capital Management Inc.(on behalf of themselves and a class of similarly situated persons and entities), Advantus Capital Management Inc., Advantus Series Fund, Inc. Index Portfolio, American Enterprise Investment Services Inc, Ameriprise Trust Co., Arthur Blauzda, Richard Burns, Clearwater Growth Fund, David R. Coggins, Jr, Copper Nugget, Inc., Employee Retirement Income Pln TR of MINN MNG & MFG Co, Evangelical Lutheran Church in America Board of Pensions, Fifth Third Bank, First American Equity Index Fund, First American Investment Funds, Inc.-Equity Index Fund, Firstar Equity Index Fund, Hanft Fride, Lutheran Brotherhood, John E. Mayasich, Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Minnesota State Board of Investment, NSP-Minnesota Prairie I Retail Qualified Trust, NSP-Minnesota Retail Prairie II Qualified Trust, NSP-Monticello Minnesota Retail Qualified Trust, North Shore Bank of Commerce, Primevest Financial Services, L. Michael Schmitt, Thrivent Fin for Lutherans, Thrivent Series Fund Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Series Fund Large Cap Index Portfolio, Union Bank & Trust Company, Gerry Vaillancourt, filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4054825) Assigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle per Master List and referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (akl) UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT A FILED UNDER SEAL IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 06/03/2011. Modified on 6/3/2011 (TSS). (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 365 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?