PJC Logistics LLC v. Fleet Management Solutions Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:11-cv-02999
District Judge Donovan W. Frank, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 29, 2017 at 11:46 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pjc Logistics LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dietz & Jarrard, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Mark Dietz +1 512 244 9314 rmdietz@lawdietz.com
v.
No Logo Fleet Management Solutions, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kane, Russell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zach T Mayer +1 214 777 4271 +1 214 777 4299 zmayer@krcl.com
No Logo Fleetmatics USA Inc, Defendant

Represented by Frommer Lawrence & Haug LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardere Wynne Sewell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig Buck Florence +1 214 999 4796 +1 214 999 3796 cflorence@gardere.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrell R Miller +1 214 999 4106 +1 214 999 3623 tmiller@gardere.com
No Logo Fleetronix International LLC, Defendant
No Logo G.e. Capital Fleet Services, Defendant
No Logo GPS Insight LLC, Defendant
No Logo GPS Logic LLC, Defendant
No Logo GPS Technologies of North America Inc, Defendant
No Logo IndusTrack LLC, Defendant
No Logo Navtrak, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brackett & Ellis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Cleveland +1 817 338 1700

Toggle Switch Represented by Hill Kertscher & Pixley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martha Logan Decker +1 770 953 0995 +1 770 953 1358 mh@hkw-law.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven G. Hill +1 770 953 0995 +1 770 953 1358 sgh@hkw-law.com
No Logo Networkfleet, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Peoplenet Communications Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Procon Fleet Services, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Luedeka Neely & Graham, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Bradford +1 865 546 4305 +1 865 523 4478 mbradford@lng-patent.com
Qualcomm, Inc. Qualcomm, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan D Albright +1 512 721 2710 +1 512 721 2656 alan.albright@bgllp.com
No Logo SageQuest I LLC, Defendant

Represented by Frommer Lawrence & Haug LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardere Wynne Sewell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig Buck Florence +1 214 999 4796 +1 214 999 3796 cflorence@gardere.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrell R Miller +1 214 999 4106 +1 214 999 3623 tmiller@gardere.com
No Logo Teletrac, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kane Russell Coleman & Logan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zach T Mayer +1 214 777 4271 +1 214 777 4299 zmayer@krcl.com
No Logo Telogis, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Klemchuk Kubasta LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirby Blair Drake +1 214 367 6000 +1 214 367 6001 kirby.drake@kk-llp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly James Kubasta +1 214 367 6000 +1 214 367 6001 kelly@kk-llp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean Christian Platt +1 858 720 2500 +1 858 720 2555 christianplatt@paulhastings.com
No Logo Wireless Matrix Usa, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Xata Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E Florey +1 612 337 2505 florey@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Gerasimow +1 612 337 5070 +1 612 288 9696 gerasimow@fr.com
No Logo Xrs Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E Florey +1 612 337 2505 florey@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Gerasimow +1 612 337 5070 +1 612 288 9696 gerasimow@fr.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (109) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT GPS TECHNOLOGIES OF NORTH AMERICAN, INC. re 108 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PJC Logistics LLC. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff PJC Logistics, LLC, and Defendant GPS Technologies of North America, Inc., in the above-captioned action are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/28/2013. (Associated Cases: 0:11-md-2249 DWF/SER and 0:011-cv-2999 DWF/SER)(BJS) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PJC Logistics LLC (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS FLEETMATICS USA, INC., AND SAGEQUEST I, LLC re 106 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by SageQuest I LLC, Fleetmatics USA Inc, PJC Logistics LLC. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff PJC Logistics, LLC, and Defendants Fleetmatics USA, Inc. (now known as Fleetmatics USA, LLC), and SageQuest I, LLC, in the above-captioned action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/18/2013. (Associated Cases: 0:11-md-2249 DWF/SER; 0:11-cv-2999 DWF/SER)(BJS) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
        STIPULATION of Dismissal of Fleetmatics USA, Inc. and SageQuest I, LLC With Prejudice by Fleetmatics USA Inc, PJC Logistics LLC, SageQuest I LLC. (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT XRS CORPORATION (F/K/A/ XATA CORPORATION) re 104 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 2/11/2013. (Associated Cases: 0:11-md-2249 DWF/SER; 0:11-cv-2999 DWF/SER)(BJS) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
            STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of XRS Corporation f/n/a XATA Corporation by PJC Logistics LLC, XRS Corporation, Xata Corporation. (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
              RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. XRS certifies that it has no parent corporation. XRS certifies that the following publicly-held entities own 10% or more of XRSs stock: Technology Crossover Ventures and Trident Capital Management-V LLC. XRS has the following subsidiaries: Turnpike Global Technologies, Inc., Turnpike Global Technologies, LLC, and Geologic Solutions, Inc. XRS is publicly traded on the NASDAQ small cap under the symbol XRSC. (Gerasimow, David) Modified on 9/10/2012 (akl). (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by PJC Logistics LLC (relating to Docket No. 92). (Anderson, Alan) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                  LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by PJC Logistics LLC Reply to Defendants Joint Letter Brief. (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT TELETRAC, INC., ONLY. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff PJC Logistics, LLC, and Defendant Teletrac, Inc., in the above-captioned action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE by agreement of the parties pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) (A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and without costs or disbursements to any party. (Associated Cases: 0:11-md-2249 DWF/SER; 0:11-cv-2999 DWF/SER). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/3/2012.(BJS) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT NAVTRAK, INC., ONLY. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff PJC Logistics, LLC, and Defendant Navtrak, Inc., in the above-captioned action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE by agreement of the parties pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) (A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and without costs or disbursements to any party. (Associated Cases: 0:11-md-2249 DWF/SER; 0:11-cv-2999 DWF/SER). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/3/2012. (bjs) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT TELETRAC, INC., ONLY re 93 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by TeleTrac Inc, PJC Logistics LLC. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 4/25/2012. (BJS) cc: Jeffery N Luthi. Modified on 5/2/2012 (lmb). Modified on 5/7/2012 (TSS). (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                          LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by PJC Logistics LLC CORRECTED Overview Brief relating to all Defendants (Exclusive of GM-Related Defendants) pursuant to MDL Pretrial Order No. 4. (Farney, W) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                            LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by PJC Logistics LLC Overview Brief relating to all Defendants (pursuant to MDL Pretrial Order No. 4). (Farney, W) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                              LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by PJC Logistics LLC relating to FLEETMATICS (pursuant to MDL Pretrial Order No. 4). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C)(Farney, W) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                STIPULATION of Dismissal of Navtrak, Inc. with Prejudice by Navtrak Inc, PJC Logistics LLC. (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal of Teletrac, Inc. with Prejudice by PJC Logistics LLC, TeleTrac Inc. (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT GPS LOGIC LLC ONLY. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/19/2012. Associated Cases: 0:11-md-02249-DWF-SER, 0:11-cv-02999-DWF-SER. (BJS) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PJC Logistics LLC (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by David A Gerasimow on behalf of Xata Corporation. (Gerasimow, David) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Bradley, William) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                            Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to GPS Technologies of North America Inc (akl) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
                                              AFFIDAVIT in Support re 86 Application for Entry of Default on GPS Technologies of North America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Daniels, Steven) Modified on 1/12/2012 (akl). (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT GPS Technologies of North America Inc. ATTACHMENTS FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE AS SEPARATE EVENTS-(Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Daniels, Steven) Modified on 1/12/2012 (akl). (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by PJC Logistics LLC. GPS Logic LLC served on 10/18/2011, answer due 11/8/2011. (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF AGENDA FOR PRETRIAL HEARING. The parties should be prepared to discuss the following items during the Pretrial Hearing on December 15, 2011 (please see Agenda for details). Associated Cases: 0:11-md-02249-DWF-SER et al.(BJS) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE Regarding December 15, 2011 Pretrial Hearing. Associated Cases: 0:11-md-02249-DWF-SER et al.(akl) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene LeDonne on behalf of Fleetmatics USA Inc, SageQuest I LLC. (LeDonne, Eugene) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NOTICE TO COUNSEL: First Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank and Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Written order with additional details to follow shortly. Approved by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 11/16/2011. Associated Cases: 0:11-md-02249-DWF-SER et al.(BJS) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                            PJC's REPLY to Counterclaim of Fleetmatics USA, LLC and Sagequest I, LLC by PJC Logistics LLC. (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                              PJC's REPLY to Counterclaim of Teletrac, Inc. by PJC Logistics LLC. (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PJC Logistics LLC (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PJC Logistics LLC (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PJC Logistics LLC (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PJC Logistics LLC (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ***TEXT ONLY ORDER*** The Court GRANTS the Unopposed Motion Extending Time to Answer (Doc. No. 64 ). Defendants have until Friday, November 4, 2011, to answer, move or otherwise plead. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 10/24/11.(BJS) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent by PJC Logistics LLC. (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Navtrak Inc. (Hill, Steven) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. FleetMatics Group Ltd. is the ultimate parent company of both FleetMatics and SageQuest. FleetMatics is a wholly owned subsidiary of SageQuest LLC. SageQuest is a wholly owned subsidiary of FleetMatics USA Holdings, Inc. FleetMatics and SageQuest disclose that no publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of FleetMatics or SageQuests stock. (LeDonne, Eugene) Modified text on 10/25/2011 (lmb). (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against PJC Logistics LLC by SageQuest I LLC, Fleetmatics USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) U.S. Patent No. 5,223,844) (LeDonne, Eugene) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Xata Corporation. (Florey, Michael) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    Defendant Teletrac, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against PJC Logistics LLC by TeleTrac Inc. (Bradley, William) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Navtrak Inc. (Hill, Steven) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for TeleTrac Inc. (Bradley, William) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Procon Fleet Services LLC re 64 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, Defendants' Unopposed Motion To Extend Time To Answer The Complaint (Bradford, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, Defendants' Unopposed Motion To Extend Time To Answer The Complaint by Procon Fleet Services LLC. (Bradford, Michael) Modified on 10/19/2011 (jam). (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Bradford on behalf of Procon Fleet Services LLC. (Bradford, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by William Eugene Bradley on behalf of TeleTrac Inc. (Bradley, William) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:11-cv-00815. Original file with documents, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank and referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau per MDL List for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1): Case transferred to St. Paul Division of District of Minnesota. (Ordered by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 10/7/2011) (skt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL of Qualcomm Incorporated by PJC Logistics LLC. (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF AGREEMENT CONCERNING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Qualcomm Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A) (Albright, Alan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Transfer of Tag-Along Case filed by PJC Logistics LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s)) (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF DISMISSAL of IndusTrack, LLC filed by PJC Logistics LLC (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice for Networkfleet filed by PJC Logistics LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Order) (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice for GE Capital Fleet filed by PJC Logistics LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Order) (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Summons Reissued as to IndusTrack LLC. (twd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Procon Fleet Services LLC. Waiver sent on 7/14/2011. (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by PJC Logistics LLC. (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Fleetronix International LLC ; served on 7/19/2011. (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF DISMISSAL of Fleetronix International, LLC filed by PJC Logistics LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Firm Name filed by Telogis Inc (Platt, Sean) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint. Qualcomm Inc answer due 9/12/2011. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/19/2011) (tln) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 42 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sam V. Desai. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/15/2011) (dnc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 41 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eugene LeDonne. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/15/2011) (dnc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    First Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Qualcomm Inc (Albright, Alan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF STIPULATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PROCESS filed by PJC Logistics LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A) (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Sam V. Desai (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-3993353) filed by Fleetmatics USA Inc, SageQuest I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (LeDonne, Eugene) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Eugene LeDonne (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-3993583) filed by Fleetmatics USA Inc, SageQuest I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (LeDonne, Eugene) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Xata Corporation. Waiver sent on 7/8/2011. (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 07/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Fleetronix International LLC, GPS Logic LLC, IndusTrack LLC. (twd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by PJC Logistics LLC. (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by PJC Logistics LLC. (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by PJC Logistics LLC. (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed (Mayer, Zach) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to TeleTrac Inc. Waiver sent on 4/26/2011. (Mayer, Zach) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Fleetmatics USA Inc answer due 9/12/2011; SageQuest I LLC answer due 9/12/2011. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/5/2011) (mfw) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Fleetmatics USA Inc, SageQuest I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Miller, Terrell) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to SageQuest I LLC. Waiver sent on 6/29/2011. (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Fleetmatics USA Inc. Waiver sent on 6/29/2011. (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to GPS Technologies of North America Inc. Waiver sent on 4/26/2011. (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Wireless Matrix USA Inc. Waiver sent on 4/26/2011. (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 18 , 25 Motions to Extend Time to File Answer. The deadline for Wireless Matrix and GE to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to the earlier of (1) forty-five days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a decision; or (2) 9/12/2011. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/29/2011) (dnc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GE Capital Fleet Services. (Graumlich, Betty) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by GE Capital Fleet Services (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Party GE Capital Fleet Services added. (Graumlich, Betty) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Telogis Inc. Waiver sent on 4/26/2011. (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Navtrak Inc. Waiver sent on 4/26/2011. (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to GPS Insight LLC. Waiver sent on 4/26/2011. (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven G. Hill. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/23/2011) (tln) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Martha L. Decker. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/23/2011) (tln) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER GRANTING 17 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/23/2011) (Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Extend Time Motion filed by PJC Logistics LLC, Wireless Matrix USA Inc. (Daniels, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to proceed without local counsel filed by PJC Logistics LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Dietz, R) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Dismissal of Defendant Fleet Management Solutions filed by PJC Logistics LLC (Daniels, Steven) Modified text on 6/23/2011 (drh). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of S. Christian Platt. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/21/2011) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Martha L. Decker (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-3948771) filed by Navtrak Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Cleveland, Joseph) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Steven G. Hill (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-3948677) filed by Navtrak Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certficiate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Cleveland, Joseph) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/17/2011) (dnc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Move filed by Telogis Inc (Drake, Kirby) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney S. Christian Platt (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-3944064) filed by Telogis Inc (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Platt, Sean) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/31/2011) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Move filed by Fleet Management Solutions Inc, TeleTrac Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Mayer, Zach) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by PJC Logistics LLC (Dietz, R) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 05/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by PJC Logistics LLC (Dietz, R) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 05/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS Exhibit A to 1 Complaint by Plaintiff PJC Logistics LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 844 Patent) (Dietz, R) Modified on 4/25/2011 (jrb). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Magistrate Judge Ramirez preliminarily assigned. File to Judge Lynn. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION filed by PJC Logistics, LLC (Dietz, R) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PJC Logistics, LLC. (Dietz, R) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/31/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by PJC Logistics, LLC. Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (Filing fee $350; Receipt number 0539-3840166) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) (Dietz, R) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/14/2011.] (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 182 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?