USA v. Koch Petroleum Group
Criminal Case Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:99-cr-00270
District Judge Ann D. Montgomery, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Koch Petroleum Group, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/01/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY, Designation: Retained Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: None
SATISFACTION OF MONETARY IMPOSITION as to Koch Petroleum Group 1 pg (copy to CFU) (LEG) (Entered: 08/21/2001)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
    JUDGMENT/STATEMENT OF REASONS as to deft Koch Petroleum Group by Judge Ann D. Montgomery (dated 3/2/00) (Copies dist'd). 4 pg(s) ( (Entered: 03/07/2000)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
      MINUTES: before Judge Ann D. Montgomery SENTENCING Koch Petroleum Group (1) counts 1 & 2 - Probation for 3 yrs, with condition deft pay $2,000,000.00 to Dakota county, MN for remediation of the Spring Lake Park Reserve, fine of $6,000,000.00, spec assmt of $250.00. (All monies paid in full 3/1/00, receipt 233678) . Court Reporter: Tim Willette. 1 pg ( (Entered: 03/07/2000)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER (Judge Ann D. Montgomery / date signed 1/10/00) for extension of time to file position papers to 1/13/00 and 1/20/00 as to Koch Petroleum Group. (cc: all counsel & PO) 1 pg ( (Entered: 01/12/2000)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: None
          CONSENT IN WRITING BY DIRECTORS OF Koch Petroleum Group. 2 pgs ( (Entered: 10/27/1999)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
            MINUTES: before Judge Ann D. Montgomery Koch Petroleum Group enters guilty plea to counts 1 & 2. Appearance by James Mahoney, Sr (VP) of Koch. Consent signed by Board of Directors appointing James Mahone, Sr as on one to represent the company. PSI ordered. Court Reporter: Tim Willette. 1 pg ( (Entered: 10/27/1999)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
              MINUTES: before Judge Ann D. Montgomery first appearance of Koch Petroleum Group . Bond moot. Court Reporter: Tim Willette. 1 pg ( (Entered: 10/27/1999)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                MINUTES before Judge Ann D. Montgomery for STATUS CONFERENCE as to Koch Petroleum Group. Court Reporter: Timothy Willette. (1 page) (PJS) (Entered: 10/25/1999)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/15/1999, Entered: None
                  SUMMONS executed upon Koch Petroleum Group on 10/6/99. 2 pgs ( (Entered: 10/18/1999)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/28/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                    LETTER to court from defendant Koch Petroleum Group requesting the case be assigned to a U.S. District Court Judge. 1 pg ( (Entered: 09/30/1999)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/28/1999, Entered: None
                      PLEA AGREEMENT AND SENTENCING STIPULATIONS as to Koch Petroleum Group. 11 pgs ( (Entered: 09/30/1999)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/28/1999, Entered: None
                        INFORMATION by USA Rabea Jamal Zayed against Koch Petroleum Group (1) count 1 & 2. 2 pgs ( (Entered: 09/30/1999)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 113 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?