Milavetz, Gallop & Milavetz, P.A. et al v. United States of America
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:05-cv-02626
District Judge James M. Rosenbaum, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Barbara N. Nevin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Alan J Albrecht

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan S Milavetz +1 952 920 7777 +1 952 920 6869 lawpage@usinternet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milavetz Gallop & Milavetz, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad William Schulze +1 952 920 7777 +1 952 920 6869 attorneyschulze@netscape.net
No Logo John Doe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Alan J Albrecht

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan S Milavetz +1 952 920 7777 +1 952 920 6869 lawpage@usinternet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milavetz Gallop & Milavetz, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad William Schulze +1 952 920 7777 +1 952 920 6869 attorneyschulze@netscape.net
No Logo Mary Doe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Alan J Albrecht

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan S Milavetz +1 952 920 7777 +1 952 920 6869 lawpage@usinternet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milavetz Gallop & Milavetz, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad William Schulze +1 952 920 7777 +1 952 920 6869 attorneyschulze@netscape.net
No Logo Milavetz Gallop & Milavetz, PA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Alan J Albrecht

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan S Milavetz +1 952 920 7777 +1 952 920 6869 lawpage@usinternet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milavetz Gallop & Milavetz, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad William Schulze +1 952 920 7777 +1 952 920 6869 attorneyschulze@netscape.net
No Logo Robert J Milavetz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Alan J Albrecht

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan S Milavetz +1 952 920 7777 +1 952 920 6869 lawpage@usinternet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milavetz Gallop & Milavetz, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad William Schulze +1 952 920 7777 +1 952 920 6869 attorneyschulze@netscape.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None
JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Civil-8th Circuit Pre-Hearing Conference Notice, # 2 Civil Notice - appeal)(jam) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Rosenbaum on 8/2/2010. (SLD) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James M. Rosenbaum: Telephone Conference held on 7/29/2010. (Court Reporter Lorilee Fink) (HLW) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
        Appeal Record Returned: 1 vol. transcript. (jam) QC'd jam (Entered: 07/02/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
          MANDATE of USCA the formal mandate is hereby issued in the above-styled matter, as to 50 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by United States of America (received electronically from COA). (jam) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
            USCA JUDGMENT re: We now reverse the judgment of the district court and remand for further proceedings consistent with the Supreme Court's decision in Milavetz, as to 50 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by United States of America (received electronically from COA). (jam) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
              ORDER of USCA re: Pursuant to the judgment of the United States Supreme Court dated March 8, 2010, this courts judgment of September 4, 2008, is hereby vacated, this courts mandate is recalled and the case is reopened, as to 50 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by United States of America (received electronically from COA). (jam) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 02-26-2007 before Judge James M. Rosenbaum. (17 pages). Court Reporter: Dawn Hansen (E-mail: Dawn_Hansen@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5107). Redaction Request due 7/29/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2009. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (dmh) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (dmh) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                    LETTER from US Supreme Court re: petition for a writ of certiorari is granted. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(jam) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                      LETTER from Supreme Court of the United States re: The petition for a writ of certiorari in the above entitled case was filed on March 5, 2009 and placed on the docket March 9, 2009 as No. 08-1119(received electronically from COA). (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(jam) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                        MANDATE of USCA as to 50 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by United States of America (received electronically from COA) (akl) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Corrected Opinion of USCA as to 50 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit(Judge Bye, Judge Smith, Judge Colloton): In sum, attorneys who provide bankruptcy assistance to assisted persons are debt relief agencies under the Bankruptcy Code, and § 526(a)(4) is unconstitutional as applied to these attorneys, but §§ 528(a)(4) and (b)(2) are constitutional. Accordingly, we affirm in part and reverse in part. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(akl) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None
                            USCA JUDGMENT as to 50 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit: After consideration, it is hereby ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the district court in this cause is affirmed in part and reversed in part in accordance with the opinion of this Court. (received electronically from COA) (akl) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Opinion of USCA as to 50 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit(Judge Bye, Judge Smith, Judge Colloton): In sum, attorneys who provide bankruptcy assistance to assisted persons are debt relief agencies under the Bankruptcy Code, and § 526(a)(4) is unconstitutional as applied to these attorneys, but §§ 528(a)(4) and (b)(2) are constitutional. Accordingly, we affirm in part and reverse in part. (akl) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None
                                LETTER - 1 volume of transcript received at USCA8 St. Paul on 7/3/07. (GJS) QC'd by MMC. (Entered: 07/06/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                  Appeal Remark re 50 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit: Transmittal of 53 TRANSCRIPT to the US Court of Appeals, 8th Circuit. (kt) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/4/06 before Judge James M Rosenbaum. Court Reporter: Dawn M H Hansen. (43pgs) FILED CONVENTIONALLY (kt) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
                                      USCA Case Number 07-2405 for 50 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by United States of America. (akl) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None
                                        LETTER from Clerk's Office transmitting Appeal to US Court of Appeals, 8th Circuit. CC: Alan Milavetz, Thomas Miller, Chad Schulze, and Marcia Sowles. (Attachments: # 1 COA - Form A # 2 COA - Form B # 3 Notice of Appeal)(kt) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 8TH CIRCUIT as to 49 Judgment, 48 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 32 Order on Motion to Dismiss by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None
                                            JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Civil Notice - appeal # 2 Civil-8th Circuit Pre-Hearing Conference Notice)(kt) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 37 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Rosenbaum on 04/19/07. (kl) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF FILING by United States of America re 44 Reply to Response to Motion, 43 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, 37 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sowles, Marcia) Modified title on 3/5/2007 (gjs). (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas F Miller on behalf of Mary Doe, John Doe (Miller, Thomas) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Milavetz, Gallop & Milavetz, P.A., Robert J Milavetz, Barbara N. Nevin re 44 Reply to Response to Motion (Schulze, Chad) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 37 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Milavetz, Gallop & Milavetz, P.A., Robert J Milavetz, Barbara N. Nevin. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Schulze, Chad) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 37 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A# 2 Exhibit(s) B# 3 Exhibit(s) C# 4 Exhibit(s) D# 5 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate # 6 Certificate of Service)(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel : Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/9/2007. The parties agree that this case will be decided on summary judgment. The Court has already analyzed the legal issues in context of Defendant's motion to dismiss. Plaintiffs will apply for an award of attorneys? fees following the Court's ruling on summary judgment. (GJS) Additional attachment added on 1/9/06 (gjs)). Modified on 2/13/2007 (mkc). (Entered: 01/09/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Service by Milavetz, Gallop & Milavetz, P.A., Robert J Milavetz, Barbara N. Nevin re 38 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 39 Declaration in Support, 37 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 40 Exhibit,, (Schulze, Chad) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                              EXHIBIT A re 38 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 39 Declaration in Support, 37 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Milavetz, Gallop & Milavetz, P.A., Robert J Milavetz, Barbara N. Nevin filed by Milavetz, Gallop & Milavetz, P.A., Robert J Milavetz, Barbara N. Nevin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B# 2 Exhibit C Part 1# 3 Exhibit C Part 2# 4 Exhibit C Part 3# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit D Part 1# 7 Exhibit D Part 2# 8 Exhibit D Part 3# 9 Exhibit D Part 4)(Schulze, Chad) Modified text on 1/9/2007 (gjs). (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                Declaration of Chad Wm. Schulze in Support of 37 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 38 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Milavetz, Gallop & Milavetz, P.A., Robert J Milavetz, Barbara N. Nevin. (Schulze, Chad) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 37 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Milavetz, Gallop & Milavetz, P.A., Robert J Milavetz, Barbara N. Nevin. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Schulze, Chad) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Milavetz, Gallop & Milavetz, P.A., Robert J Milavetz, Barbara N. Nevin. (Schulze, Chad) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                      REPORT Joint Rule 26F Report by Milavetz, Gallop & Milavetz, P.A.. (Schulze, Chad) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                        ANSWER to Secon d Amended Complaint by United States of America.(Sowles, Marcia) Modified on 12/20/2006 (gjs). (Entered: 12/19/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                          SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against all defendants, filed by Plaintiffs.(Schulze, Chad) Modified on 12/18/2006 (gjs). (Entered: 12/15/2006)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            NOTICE: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2007 09:45 AM in Minneapolis - Courtroom 9W before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 12/8/06. (jam) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER denying 13 Motion to Dismiss (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge James M. Rosenbaum on 12/7/06. (jjn) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Mary Doe, Milavetz, Gallop & Milavetz, P.A., Robert J Milavetz, Barbara N. Nevin, John Doe with attached order and memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum and Order)(Schulze, Chad) Modified on 7/28/2006 (gjs). (Entered: 07/27/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER denying 22 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Chief Judge James M Rosenbaum on 3/28/2006. (HLL) (Entered: 03/28/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re 28 Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 03/23/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                      REPLY re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 03/23/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re 26 Notice (Other) (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE REGARDING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF LIMIT ON WORD COUNT by United States of America re 22 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Sowles, Marcia) Modified title on 3/20/2006 (gjs). (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re 22 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, 24 Declaration in Support, 23 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                              Declaration of Marcia K. Sowles in Support of 22 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by United States of America. (Sowles, Marcia) Modified on 3/21/2006 (GJS). (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 22 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sowles, Marcia) Modified on 3/21/2006 (GJS). (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by United States of America. (Sowles, Marcia) Modified title on 3/21/2006 (gjs). (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America, by all plaintiffs filed by all plaintiffs. (Schulze, Chad) Modified title on 3/15/2006 (gjs). (Entered: 03/14/2006)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Barbara N. Nevin in OPPOSITION TO 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C Part 1# 4 Exhibit C Part 2# 5 Exhibit D Part 1# 6 Exhibit D Part 2)(Schulze, Chad) (Entered: 03/14/2006)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Schulze, Chad) (Entered: 03/14/2006)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 13 MOTION to Dismiss: Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2006 11:00 AM in Minneapolis - Courtroom 15E before Chief Judge James M Rosenbaum. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 01/27/2006)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 13 MOTION to Dismiss, 14 Notice (Other), 15 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 16 Exhibit by Marcia K Sowles on behalf of United States of America. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 01/27/2006)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                              EXHIBIT re 15 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by United States of America filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 01/27/2006)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 01/27/2006)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  **DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - see doc. 18** #NOTICE by United States of America re 13 MOTION to Dismiss (Sowles, Marcia) Modified on 1/30/2006 (gjs). (Entered: 01/27/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss by United States of America. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 01/27/2006)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer United States of America answer due 2/27/2006 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L Noel on 1/11/06. (GJS) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 3 Amended Complaint, 9 Declaration in Support, 10 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Marcia K Sowles on behalf of United States of America. (Sowles, Marcia) Modified title on 1/12/2006 (gjs). (Entered: 01/11/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 3 Amended Complaint filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sowles, Marcia) Modified on 1/11/2006 (mkc). (Entered: 01/11/2006)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Declaration of Marcia K. Sowles in Support of 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 3 Amended Complaint filed by United States of America. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 3 Amended Complaint by United States of America. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Marcia K. Sowles by United States of America. (MMC) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Milavetz, Gallop & Milavetz, P.A., Robert J Milavetz, Barbara N. Nevin. United States of America served on 11/14/2005, answer due 1/13/2006. (Schulze, Chad) (Entered: 12/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER for Disqualification and for Reassignment. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 11/15/05. (rhks) (Entered: 11/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Mary Doe, Milavetz, Gallop & Milavetz, P.A., Robert J Milavetz, Barbara N. Nevin, John Doe.(Schulze, Chad) (Entered: 11/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mary Doe, Milavetz, Gallop & Milavetz, P.A., Robert J Milavetz, Barbara N. Nevin, John Doe that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report. (LPH) (Entered: 11/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 289302.) assigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle per Master referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan (4:05AD1570), filed by Mary Doe, Milavetz, Gallop & Milavetz, P.A., Robert J Milavetz, Barbara N. Nevin, John Doe.(LPH) Modified on 11/17/2005 (LJG). (Entered: 11/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 61 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?