USA v. Hoffman et al.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:08-cv-01316
District Judge David S. Doty, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory G Brooker +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 greg.brooker@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Accredited Financial Services, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Bessord Partnership, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Chad Wegscheider, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brink & Gerdts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C Brink +1 612 371 0722 +1 612 371 0840 brink@blackhole.com
No Logo Encore Acquisitions, LLC, Defendant
No Logo GRD Management, Defendant
No Logo Heartland Consulting, Defendant
No Logo James Warren Hoffman, Defendant
No Logo KMC Properties, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Minnesota One Mortgage, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Patrick Dols, Defendant
No Logo Teresa Gay Hoffman, Defendant
No Logo Wegs Enterprise, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Wegs Properties, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Wissota Property Management, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Andrew Luger, Receiver

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1391
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau, this case is reassigned to him. Magistrate Judge X is no longer assigned to the case. Please contact Melissa Erstad at 651-848-1620, for scheduling or other matters related to Magistrate Judge Rau. (DDB) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the elevation of Judge Susan R. Nelson, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge X. Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 08-cv-01316 DSD-MJX. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. If you have questions regarding this assignment, please direct your inquiries to Kathy Thobe at 651-848-1210 in Chief Magistrate Judge Boylan's chambers. (MGV) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 8/16/2010. (PJM) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 6/1/2010. (PJM) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 4/4/2010. (PJM) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 3/29/2010. (PJM) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 02/17/2010. (PJM) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 1/14/2010. (PJM) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT TO HIS PROPERTY GROUP, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 1/14/2010. (PJM) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 12/9/2009. (PJM) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER A. That the Affidavit of Receiver Regarding Sale of Property, of Greene Espel P.L.L.P., Receiver, is approved; B. That the form of deed accompanying this Order is approved; and C. That Andy Luger, of Green Espel P.L.L.P., Receiver is hereby authorized and directed to execute and deliver the said deed conveying the said property to George Courrier, free of the claims of the United States of America and of Andy Luger, of Greene Espel P.L.L.P., Receiver. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 12/07/2009. (jz) Document QC'd on 12/10/2009 (nes). (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 11/5/2009. (PJM) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 35 Motion for Order of Sale of Property. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 10/13/2009. (PJM) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew Luger re 36 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 35 MOTION for Order of Sale (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                              AFFIDAVIT of Receiver Andrew M. Luger in SUPPORT OF 35 MOTION for Order of Sale filed by Andrew Luger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B)(Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Order of Sale by Andrew Luger. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 9/30/2009. (PJM) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 33 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 08/28/2009. (PJM) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 7/28/2009. (PJM) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAY PAYMENT TO PLATINUM GROUP. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 6/22/2009. (PJM) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT TO ANNE WEGSCHEIDER. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 06/01/2009. (PJM) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 06/01/2009. (PJM) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 04/27/2009. (PJM) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 03/27/2009. (PJM) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 02/18/2009. (PJM) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 01/23/2009. (PJM) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 12/08/2008. (PJM) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 11/14/2008. (PJM) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 10/14/2008. (PJM) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER Unfreezing Certain Assets re 20 Stipulation filed by Chad Wegscheider, United States of America. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 9/24/2008. (PJM) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                              STIPULATION by Chad Wegscheider, United States of America. (Brooker, Gregory) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 9/15/2008. (PJM) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENT. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 7/31/2008. (PJM) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    Receivers BOND in the amount of $ 1000.00 posted 7/1/08. (RJL) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 6/12/2008. (PJM) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        TEXT ONLY ENTRY - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge David S. Doty: Motion Hearing held on 6/2/2008 re 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And For The Appointment of a Receiver filed by United States of America -argued and taken under advisement. Defendants responses due 6/4/2008. (Court Reporter Lorilee Fink) (CLB) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          Chad Wegscheiders ANSWER to Complaint and Motion for Injunction, ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Chad Wegscheider. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Brink, John) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT re 12 Memorandum in Support of Motion by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Brooker, Gregory) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And For The Appointment of a Receiver filed by United States of America. (Brooker, Gregory) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And For The Appointment of a Receiver : Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2008 01:30 PM in Minneapolis - Courtroom 14W before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Brooker, Gregory) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And For The Appointment of a Receiver by United States of America. (Brooker, Gregory) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF against Bessord Partnership, LLC, Heartland Consulting, GRD Management, Chad Wegscheider, Patrick Dols, Minnesota One Mortgage, Inc, Wegs Enterprise, LLC, Wegs Properties, LLC, Wissota Property Management, LLC, James Warren Hoffman, Teresa Gay Hoffman, Accredited Financial Services, Inc, Encore Acquisitions, LLC, filed by United States of America. (Brooker, Gregory) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER re 6 Temporary Restraining order is hereby extended to 6/13/08. Defendants are to provide to the US on or before 5/29/08 a list of all financial institutions at which Defendants currently maintain accounts, have maintained accounts, or have depositied money in the previous four years. Defendants shall appear before this court on 6/2/08 at 1:30 in Courtroom 14W US Courthouse in Mpls., MN to show cause why this court shaould not enter a Preliminary Injunction, pending final ruling on the Complaint against Defendants enjoining them from further violations of federal law, continuing the freeze of assets and imposing such additional relief as may be appropriate. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 5/20/08. (MKC) (JME) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        Declaration of Gregory G. Brooker in Support of 6 MOTION to Extend filed by United States of America. (MKC) (JME) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order by United States of America. (MKC) (JME) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and that Defendants shall appear before the Court on 5/23/08 at 9:00 a.m. at the United States Courthouse located at 300 S. Fourth Street, Minneapolis, MN to show cause why the Court should not enter a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 5/13/08. (JME) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Eileen M. Rice in SUPPORT OF 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by United States of America. (JME) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by United States of America. (JME) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Permanent Injunction by United States of America. (JME) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee waived) assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Master deck referred to Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: Civil Cover Sheet and Copy of order from 08sm25 DSD/SRN granting the complaint and all other pleadings to be filed under seal. (JME) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2008: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-Order signed by Judge Doty on 5/13/08, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JME) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 173 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?