Mid-Am Building Supply, Inc. v. East Side Lumberyard Supply Co., Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:10-cv-01026
District Judge Carol E. Jackson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mid-Am Building Supply, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew G. Colombo +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 acolombo@hoveywilliams.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew B. Walters +1 913 647 9050 mbw@hoveywilliams.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1051
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew G. Colombo (Filing fee $100) by Plaintiff Mid-Am Building Supply, Inc.. (KKS) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew B. Walters (Filing fee $100) by Plaintiff Mid-Am Building Supply, Inc.. (KKS) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
      REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding TRADEMARK (SAJ) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Mid-Am Building Supply, Inc. Process Server: Hatfield Process Service (SAJ) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael M. Elbein (Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-2282996)Yes or No - No, by Plaintiff Mid-Am Building Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Elbein, Michael) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
            COMPLAINT against defendant East Side Lumberyard Supply Co., Inc. with receipt number 0865-2282962, in the amount of $350 Jury Demand,, filed by Mid-Am Building Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Original Filing Form, # 5 Notice of Intent to Use Process Server, # 6 Summons - East Side Lumberyard Supply Co., Inc.)(Elbein, Michael) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 114 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?