Puricelli et al v. Genentech, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:10-cv-01793
District Judge Jean C. Hamilton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 15, 2017 at 2:00 AM DT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Laura Puricelli, Plaintiff

Represented by 300 N. Tucker Blvd.

Toggle Switch Represented by HOLLAND LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall Seth Crompton +1 314 241 8111 +1 314 241 5554 scrompton@allfela.com
Space Eric D Holland +1 314 241 8111 +1 314 241 5554 eholland@allfela.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2010

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven L. Groves +1 314 241 8111 +1 314 241 5554 sgroves@grovespowers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE FURNISS LAW FIRM, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan M. Furniss +1 314 914 2522 +1 314 627 5891 rfurniss@furnisslaw.com
No Logo Lisa Clouse, Plaintiff

Represented by 300 N. Tucker Blvd.

Toggle Switch Represented by HOLLAND LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall Seth Crompton +1 314 241 8111 +1 314 241 5554 scrompton@allfela.com
Space Eric D Holland +1 314 241 8111 +1 314 241 5554 eholland@allfela.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2010

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven L. Groves +1 314 241 8111 +1 314 241 5554 sgroves@grovespowers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE FURNISS LAW FIRM, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan M. Furniss +1 314 914 2522 +1 314 627 5891 rfurniss@furnisslaw.com
No Logo Robert Merrick, Plaintiff

Represented by 300 N. Tucker Blvd.

Toggle Switch Represented by HOLLAND LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall Seth Crompton +1 314 241 8111 +1 314 241 5554 scrompton@allfela.com
Space Eric D Holland +1 314 241 8111 +1 314 241 5554 eholland@allfela.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2010

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven L. Groves +1 314 241 8111 +1 314 241 5554 sgroves@grovespowers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE FURNISS LAW FIRM, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan M. Furniss +1 314 914 2522 +1 314 627 5891 rfurniss@furnisslaw.com
v.
Biogen Idec, Inc. Biogen Idec, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Bioverativ Inc.
Officer/Director, Sangamo Biosciences, Inc.
Officer/Director, Biogen Ma Inc.
Officer/Director, Denali Therapeutics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Sage Therapeutics, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by HeplerBroom LLC - Edwardsville

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerard T. Noce +1 314 241 6160 +1 314 241 6116 gtn@heplerbroom.com

Toggle Switch Represented by HOLLAND LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall Seth Crompton +1 314 241 8111 +1 314 241 5554 scrompton@allfela.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph G. Blute +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 jblute@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by One Financial Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yalonda T. Howze +1 617 348 1813 +1 617 542 2241 ythowze@mintz.com
No Logo Dorothy Guccione, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by HOLLAND LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/15/2010 Randall Seth Crompton +1 314 241 8111 +1 314 241 5554 scrompton@allfela.com
Genentech, Inc. Genentech, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Alteon Inc /de

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Xavier Imbroscio +1 202 662 5694 +1 202 778 5694 mimbroscio@cov.com
Space Skye Lynn Perryman +1 202 662 5675 +1 202 778 5675 sperryman@cov.com
Space Paul W. Schmidt +1 202 662 5272 +1 202 778 5272 pschmidt@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Galvin, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bart C. Sullivan +1 314 588 7000 bsullivan@foxgalvin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by HOLLAND LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall Seth Crompton +1 314 241 8111 +1 314 241 5554 scrompton@allfela.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rushton, Stakely, Johnston & Garrett, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert C. Brock +1 202 662 5985 +1 202 778 5983 rcg@rsjg.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT enteredin favor of Laura Puricelli, Lisa Clouse, Robert Merrick against Biogen Idec, Inc., Genentech, Inc., Dorothy Guccione by Robert Merrick, Laura Puricelli. (Crompton, Randall) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Docket Text ORDER: Re: 67 Joint MOTION for Extension to Finalize Settlement of: 10 days by Defendants Biogen Idec, Inc., Genentech, Inc., Dorothy Guccione, Plaintiffs Lisa Clouse, Robert Merrick, Laura Puricelli. (Crompton, Randall) filed by Genentech, Inc., Lisa Clouse, Dorothy Guccione, Biogen Idec, Inc., Laura Puricelli, Robert Merrick ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable John A. Ross on 2/13/2012. (RAK) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Joint MOTION for Extension to Finalize Settlement of: 10 days by Defendants Biogen Idec, Inc., Genentech, Inc., Dorothy Guccione, Plaintiffs Lisa Clouse, Robert Merrick, Laura Puricelli. (Crompton, Randall) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ORDER APPROVING WRONGFUL DEATH SETTLEMENT ORDER granting 65 Motion for Settlement Signed by Honorable John A. Ross on 1/6/12. (LAH) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Wrongful Death Settlement by Defendant Biogen Idec, Inc.. (Noce, Gerard) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the March 6, 2012 Trial and the December 16, 2011 Status Conference settings are vacated and all pending motions are denied without prejudice. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that counsel shall file, within sixty (60) days of the date of this order, a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. Dismissal Paper(s) due by 2/13/2012. Signed by Honorable John A. Ross on 12/13/11. (LAH) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 63 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Settlement by All Parties (Crompton, Randall) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is set for a status conference on Friday, December 16, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. in the chambers of the undersigned.. Signed by Honorable John A. Ross on 12/5/11. (LGK) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable John A. Ross for all further proceedings. Honorable Jean C. Hamilton no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 11/7/11. (CLA) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER granting 59 MOTION for Leave to Enter Unopposed Motion for Entry of Modified Joint Scheduling Plan with Respect to Expert Witness Discovery filed by Plaintiff Lisa Clouse, Plaintiff Laura Puricelli, Plaintiff Robert Merrick (see order for additional details) ( Discovery Completion due by 11/1/2011., Non-Dispositive Motions due by 11/12/2011., Dispositive Motions due by 11/18/2011., Jury Trial set for 3/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16N before Honorable Jean C. Hamilton., Pretrial Compliance due by 2/15/2012). Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 8/16/11. (TRC) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION for Leave to Enter Unopposed Motion for Entry of Modified Joint Scheduling Plan with Respect to Expert Witness Discovery by Plaintiffs Lisa Clouse, Robert Merrick, Laura Puricelli. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order pdf of proposed Order)(Crompton, Randall) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Docket Text ORDER: Re: 57 Verified MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael X. Imbroscio (Filing fee $100) by Defendant Genentech, Inc. (TRC) filed by Genentech, Inc. ; ORDERED SO ORDERED, Attorney Michael X. Imbroscio for Genentech, Inc. added. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 7/20/11. (TRC) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Verified MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael X. Imbroscio (Filing fee $100) by Defendant Genentech, Inc. (TRC) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ENTRY of Appearance by Randall S. Crompton for Plaintiffs Lisa Clouse, Robert Merrick, Laura Puricelli. (Crompton, Randall) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ADR COMPLIANCE REPORT by Neutral: Michael Geigerman. Date of Conference: 6/3/11. The parties participated in good faith. The parties did not achieve a settlement. (CLA) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                PROTECTIVE ORDER re: 53 (see order for details) ( Seal to be lifted 12/31/2014.). Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 6/9/11. (CEL) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Biogen Idec, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Protective Order)(Noce, Gerard) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ORDER: EXPERT WITNESS DISCOVERY re 51 - MOTION GRANTED (see order for dates). Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 5/27/11. (CEL) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION for Issuance /Entry of Modified Joint Scheduling Plan with Respect to Expert Witness Discovery by Defendants Biogen Idec, Inc., Genentech, Inc., Dorothy Guccione, Plaintiffs Lisa Clouse, Robert Merrick, Laura Puricelli. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Bart) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral Neutral name: Michael Geigerman Neutral selected by Parties (enotification to neutral)(LSD) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiffs Lisa Clouse, Robert Merrick, Laura Puricelli Neutral: Michael S. Geigerman Date of Conference: June 30, 2011 Location: USA&M(Furniss, Ryan) Modified on 5/24/2011 to correct conference date. (CBL). (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            ANSWER to 45 Amended Complaint by Biogen Idec, Inc..(Noce, Gerard) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              ANSWER to 45 Amended Complaint by Genentech, Inc..(Sullivan, Bart) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Docket Text ORDER: Re: 41 MOTION TO MODIFY JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendants Biogen Idec, Inc., Genentech, Inc., Plaintiffs Lisa Clouse, Robert Merrick, Laura Puricelli. (Sullivan, Bart) Modified on 5/2/2011 - redocketed as a motion per chambers' request (TRC) filed by Genentech, Inc., Lisa Clouse, Biogen Idec, Inc., Laura Puricelli, Robert Merrick ; ORDERED: DENIED. Case Management Order dated 11/17/2010 (docket entry #27) still in effect. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 5/9/2011. (CBL) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Biogen Idec, Inc., Genentech, Inc. Jury demand, , filed by Lisa Clouse, Laura Puricelli, Robert Merrick.(Furniss, Ryan) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    ORDER OF ADR TIMELINESS: ORDERED the deadlines set forth are to be met timely with the appropriate forms filed with the Clerk of the District Court as indicated in the Order Referring Case to Alternative Dispute Resolution. If a deadline cannot be met, the designated lead counsel shall file a motion requesting an extension of the deadline prior to the expiration of that deadline. FURTHER ORDERED that if compliance with a deadline set forth in the Order Referring Case to Alternative Dispute Resolution has not occurred, such noncompliance may result in the imposition of sanctions to the appropriate party or parties. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 5/2/11. (TRC) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Ryan Furniss (see order for details). ADR Completion Deadline due by 7/1/2011. Designation of Neutral due by 5/22/2011. ADR Conference Schedule due by 5/22/2011. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 5/2/11. (TRC) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(c) (Doc. No. 36 ) is DENIED, in part, and GRANTED, in part. Plaintiffs are granted seven (7) days to file an amended complaint in accordance with this Order. (Response to Court due by 5/3/2011). Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 4/26/11. (TRC) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MOTION TO MODIFY JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendants Biogen Idec, Inc., Genentech, Inc., Plaintiffs Lisa Clouse, Robert Merrick, Laura Puricelli. (Sullivan, Bart) Modified on 5/2/2011 - redocketed as a motion per chambers' request (TRC). (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(C) filed by Defendants Biogen Idec, Inc., Genentech, Inc.. (Sullivan, Bart) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              SUBPOENA of Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Executed as to Dr. Deborah Parks. (Furniss, Ryan) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(C) filed by Plaintiffs Lisa Clouse, Robert Merrick, Laura Puricelli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Furniss, Ryan) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(C) filed by Defendants Biogen Idec, Inc., Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Bart C. Sullivan in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, # 2 Exhibit A - Rituxan Full Prescribing Information, # 3 Exhibit B - Rituxan Full Prescribing Information as reprinted in PDR)(Sullivan, Bart) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(C) by Defendants Biogen Idec, Inc., Genentech, Inc.. (Sullivan, Bart) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Docket Text ORDER: Re: 34 Verified MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul W. Schmidt (Filing fee $100) by Defendant Genentech, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(TRC) filed by Genentech, Inc. ; ORDERED SO ORDERED, Attorney Paul W. Schmidt for Genentech, Inc. added. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 3/2/11. (TRC) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Verified MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul W. Schmidt (Filing fee $100) by Defendant Genentech, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(TRC) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Docket Text ORDER: Re: 31 Verified MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert C. Brock (Filing fee $100) by Defendant Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(TRC) filed by Genentech, Inc., 32 Verified MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Skye L. Perryman (Filing fee $100) by Defendant Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(TRC) filed by Genentech, Inc. ; ORDERED SO ORDERED, Attorney Robert C. Brock,Skye L. Perryman for Genentech, Inc. added. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 2/10/11. (TRC) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Verified MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Skye L. Perryman (Filing fee $100) by Defendant Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(TRC) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Verified MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert C. Brock (Filing fee $100) by Defendant Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(TRC) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Docket Text ORDER: Re: 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Yalonda Howze (Filing fee $100) by Defendant Biogen Idec, Inc.. (CEL) filed by Biogen Idec, Inc., 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Joseph Blute (Filing fee $100) by Defendant Biogen Idec, Inc.. (CEL) filed by Biogen Idec, Inc.; GRANTED JCH. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 12/7/10. (CLA) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Yalonda Howze (Filing fee $100) by Defendant Biogen Idec, Inc.. (CEL) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Joseph Blute (Filing fee $100) by Defendant Biogen Idec, Inc.. (CEL) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard). Motion to Join Parties due by 2/15/2011. Discovery Completion due by 11/1/2011. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 11/12/2011. ADR Future Reference 5/2/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 11/18/2011. Jury Trial set for 3/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16N before Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. Pretrial Compliance due by 2/15/2012. See Order for further details. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 11/17/2010. (CBL) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Jean C. Hamilton: Rule 16 Conference held on 11/17/2010. Conference held by phone. CMO to issue. (Court Reporter or FTR Gold Operator initials:none.) (FTR Gold yes or no: No.) (CEL) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 9 24 In accordance with the Memorandum and Order entered this day and incorporated herein, ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Dorothy Guccione are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 11/16/10. (CEL) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Remand (Doc. No. 16) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Guccione are DISMISSED with prejudice. An appropriate Order of Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Dorothy Gucciones Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 9) is DENIED as moot. 9 16 (See Order for further details. Defendant Guccione terminated.) Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 11/15/2010. (CBL) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendants Biogen Idec, Inc., Genentech, Inc., Dorothy Guccione, Plaintiffs Lisa Clouse, Robert Merrick, Laura Puricelli.. (Groves, Steven) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                NOTICE by Defendant Genentech, Inc. - letter to Judge Jean Hamilton (Sullivan, Bart) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 16 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, State of Missouri filed by Plaintiffs Lisa Clouse, Robert Merrick, Laura Puricelli. (Furniss, Ryan) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss Party Dorothy Guccione filed by Defendant Dorothy Guccione. (Sullivan, Bart) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, State of Missouri filed by Defendant Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Sullivan, Bart) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Docket Text ORDER: ORDERED THE RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IN THIS MATTER IS CONTINUED TO WEDNESDAY, NOVEMBER 17, 2010, AT 10:30 AM, (Rule 16 Conference set for 11/17/2010 10:30 AM in Telephone before Honorable Jean C. Hamilton). Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 10/29/10. (TRC) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Dismiss Party Dorothy Guccione filed by Plaintiffs Lisa Clouse, Robert Merrick, Laura Puricelli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Rituxan Website, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt from Genetech Website)(Furniss, Ryan) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, State of Missouri by Plaintiffs Lisa Clouse, Robert Merrick, Laura Puricelli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Rituxan Website, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt from Genetech Website)(Furniss, Ryan) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Docket Text ORDER: Re: 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Lisa Clouse, Robert Merrick, Laura Puricelli. ; ORDERED : SO ORDERED - response due 10/25/10. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 10/7/10. (CEL) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ENTRY of Appearance by Steven L. Groves for Plaintiffs Lisa Clouse, Robert Merrick, Laura Puricelli. (Groves, Steven) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Lisa Clouse, Robert Merrick, Laura Puricelli. (Furniss, Ryan) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    RULE 16 ORDER Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/1/2010. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/10/2010 10:30 AM in Telephone before Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 10/5/10. (CLA) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan M. Furniss for Plaintiffs Lisa Clouse, Robert Merrick, Laura Puricelli. (Furniss, Ryan) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss Party Dorothy Guccione filed by Defendant Dorothy Guccione. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Sullivan, Bart) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Party Dorothy Guccione by Defendant Dorothy Guccione. (Sullivan, Bart) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Biogen Idec, Inc.. Parent companies: Biogen Idec, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Noce, Gerard) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Biogen Idec, Inc..(Noce, Gerard) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Complaint (Removal) State case petition, filed by Lisa Clouse, Laura Puricelli, Robert Merrick.(DLT) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Genentech, Inc..(Sullivan, Bart) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Genentech, Inc., Dorothy Guccione Sent To: St. Louis City Circuit Clerk Executed by State Court Clerk (Sullivan, Bart) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Genentech, Inc.. Parent companies: Roche Holdings, Inc.; Roche Holding Ltd., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Genentech, Inc.; Roche Holdings, Inc.; Roche Holding Ltd.,. (Sullivan, Bart) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Defendants Genentech, Inc., Dorothy Guccione re 1 Notice of Removal Petition, to Plaintiffs (Sullivan, Bart) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 1022-CC10527, with receipt number 0865-2420530, in the amount of $350 Jury Demand,, filed by Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet, # 12 Original Filing Form)(Sullivan, Bart) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                            Space Space

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 124 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?