Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Forrest City Grocery Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Mississippi Northern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-00166
District Judge Michael P. Mills, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Equal Employment Opportunity Commission"

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Malley & Madden, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ylda Marisol Kopka +1 312 697 1382 ykopka@ompclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curley Emanuel Smith +1 205 212 2131 +1 205 212 2041 emanuel.smith@eeoc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maricia Woodham +1 205 212 2054 maricia.woodham@eeoc.gov
v.
No Logo Forrest City Grocery Company, Defendant

Represented by WILKINS STEPHENS & TIPTON, PA

Toggle Switch Represented by WILKINS TIPTON, PA - Jackson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob O. Malatesta +1 662 335 5555 jmalatesta@wilkins-law.com
No Logo Amanda McMillan, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Ivan Hetzel +1 601 949 3388 +1 601 949 3399 mhetzel@forthepeople.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Omar Lamont Nelson +1 601 949 3388 onelson@forthepeople.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions by Jacob O. Malatesta on behalf of Forrest City Grocery Company to All Counsel. (Malatesta, Jacob)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Defendant Forest City Grocery Company (Second Amended Notice) by Ylda Marisol Kopka on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Kopka, Ylda)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None
      AMENDED DOCUMENT Notice of Service of Discovery. (Malatesta, Jacob)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff EEOC's First Set of Interrogatories by Jacob O. Malatesta on behalf of Forrest City Grocery Company to All Counsel. (Malatesta, Jacob)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Responses to EEOC's First Requests for Production of Documents by Jacob O. Malatesta on behalf of Forrest City Grocery Company to All Counsel. (Malatesta, Jacob)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions by Jacob O. Malatesta on behalf of Forrest City Grocery Company to All Counsel. (Malatesta, Jacob)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Set of Interrogatories Propounded to Plaintiff, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, by Defendant, Forrest City Grocery Company by Jacob O. Malatesta on behalf of Forrest City Grocery Company to Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Malatesta, Jacob)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                MOTION to Compel Defendant's Answers to Written Discovery and find Defendant Waived Objections, and for Deposition of Barnet Chiz by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Kopka, Ylda)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to EEOC's First Set of Interrogatories and Responses to EEOC's First Requests for Production of Documents by Jacob O. Malatesta on behalf of Forrest City Grocery Company to All Counsel. (Malatesta, Jacob)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Set of Interrogatories and Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Jacob O. Malatesta on behalf of Forrest City Grocery Company to Amanda McMillan. (Malatesta, Jacob)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions by Jacob O. Malatesta on behalf of Forrest City Grocery Company to All Counsel. (Malatesta, Jacob)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories and Requests for Production Propounded to EEOC and Amanda McMillan by Jacob O. Malatesta on behalf of Forrest City Grocery Company to All Counsel. (Malatesta, Jacob)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                          ORDER granting 34 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 3/22/2011. (ths)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Amanda McMillan by Jacob O. Malatesta on behalf of Forrest City Grocery Company (Malatesta, Jacob)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                              AMENDED ORDER. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 3/14/2011. (kbt)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                ORDER granting 35 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 3/14/2011. (kbt)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Forrest City Grocery Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Good Faith Certificate, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - proposed Agreed Scheduling Order) (Malatesta, Jacob)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to Seal Document by Forrest City Grocery Company. (Malatesta, Jacob)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Laches filed by Forrest City Grocery Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition of FCGC, # 2 Exhibit Notice to Take Deposition of David Cohn) (Malatesta, Jacob)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Requests for Admissions by Ylda Marisol Kopka on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to Defendant. (Kopka, Ylda)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Requests for Production of Documents by Ylda Marisol Kopka on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to Defendant. (Kopka, Ylda)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories by Ylda Marisol Kopka on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to Defendant. (Kopka, Ylda)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Laches filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Kopka, Ylda)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Settlement Conference / Mediation set for 2/24/11 at 10:00 a.m. is CANCELLED: (wsm)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE by Ylda Marisol Kopka on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission re 17 Order Plaintiff's Status Report Regarding Mediation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A. Kopka Ltr to Malatesta 2.11.11, # 2 Exhibit Exh. B. Malatesta Email 2.1.11, # 3 Exhibit C. Kopka Ltr to Malatesta 2.4.11) (Kopka, Ylda)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                    MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Laches. (Malatesta, Jacob)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment for Laches by Forrest City Grocery Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Charge and Request for Information, # 2 Exhibit Correspondence 7/17/07, # 3 Exhibit Response to Charge and Request for Information, # 4 Exhibit Correspondence 12/18/2007, # 5 Exhibit Correspondence 7/28/08, # 6 Exhibit Determination, # 7 Exhibit Response to Determination, # 8 Exhibit Determination of Failure of Conciliation, # 9 Exhibit Notice of Intent to Reconsider, # 10 Exhibit Request for Information, # 11 Exhibit Correspondence 7/28/09, # 12 Exhibit Response to Request for Information, # 13 Exhibit Second Determination of EEOC, # 14 Exhibit Request for Right to Sue Letter, # 15 Exhibit Initial Disclosures of EEOC, # 16 Exhibit P00018 and P00019 of EEOC's initial disclosures, # 17 Exhibit Correspondence Regarding Missing Pages, # 18 Exhibit Response to Request for Additional Pages) (Malatesta, Jacob)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Omar Lamont Nelson on behalf of Amanda McMillan (Nelson, Omar)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                          ORDER granting 21 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 1/24/2011. (kbt, USDC)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                            AMENDED ANSWER to 13 Intervenor Complaint by Forrest City Grocery Company. (Malatesta, Jacob)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct 5 Answer to Complaint by Forrest City Grocery Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - proposed Amended Answer and Defenses) (Malatesta, Jacob)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 1/5/11. (wsm, USDC)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2011 09:00 AM in Judge Alexander Chambers before S. Allan Alexander. (wsm, USDC)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    NOTICE of Trial: MVD/Jury Trial set for 12/5/2011 9:40 AM in Oxford Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Michael P. Mills. (spw)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER scheduling non-binding mediation for 2/24/11 at 10:00 a.m. in Oxford, MS before Magistrate Judge Alexander. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 1/3/11. (wsm, USDC)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2011 09:00 AM in Greenville Visiting Judge Chambers before S. Allan Alexander. Discovery due by 7/22/2011. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 1/6/2011. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 4/22/2010. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 5/22/2010. Motions due by 8/5/2011. Settlement Conference set for 2/24/2011 10:00 AM in Judge Alexander Chambers before S. Allan Alexander.. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 1/3/11. (wsm, USDC)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before S. Allan Alexander: Case Management Conference held on 12/6/2010. (wsm, USDC) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            ANSWER to 13 Intervenor Complaint by Forrest City Grocery Company. (Malatesta, Jacob)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              Intervenor COMPLAINT, filed by Amanda McMillan. (Hetzel, Matthew)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                ORDER granting 10 Motion to Intervene. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 12/15/2010. (kbt, USDC)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 10 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Position of No Objection to Motion to Intervene filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Kopka, Ylda)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION to Intervene by Amanda McMillan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Complaint) (Hetzel, Matthew)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Core Information by Ylda Marisol Kopka on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to Defendant. (Kopka, Ylda)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures of Core Information by Jacob O. Malatesta on behalf of Forrest City Grocery Company to Plaintiff. (Malatesta, Jacob)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2010 01:30 PM in Judge Alexander Chambers before S. Allan Alexander.. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 10/25/10. (wsm, USDC)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob O. Malatesta on behalf of Forrest City Grocery Company (Malatesta, Jacob)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Forrest City Grocery Company. (Hagwood, L.)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to C. T. Corporation Systems, Registered Agent for Forrest City Grocery Company on 10/05/2010 by Julie Steptoe Bean on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waiver of Service due by 11/4/2010. (Bean, Julie)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Maricia Woodham on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Woodham, Maricia)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ylda Marisol Kopka on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Kopka, Ylda)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Forrest City Grocery Company, Jury Demand,, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab, USDC)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 415 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?