USA v. Roscoe et al
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:07-cr-00373-RMW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 4, 2017 at 10:10 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eumi L. Choi +1 408 535 5079 +1 408 535 5066 Eumi.Choi@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Ned Roscoe, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Donald Eibert +1 650 712 8380 +1 650 712 8377 markeibert@comcast.net

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Jose
Filed 6/13/2007
County Santa Clara
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
18371 Conspiracy to Commit Bank Fraud
Count 2-6
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344(2) and 2 Bank Fraud and Aiding and Abetting
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
18371 Conspiracy to Commit Bank Fraud, and to Make False Statements to a Bank
Count 2s-6s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344 and 2 Bank Fraud and Aiding and Abetting
Count 7s-11s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 and 2 False Statements to Bank and Aiding and Abetting
Def Custody Status Released
Flag E-Filing
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None PRB12
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Appear
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Modify Conditions of Release
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Appeal Record Returned
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document 64 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                      ORDER [62] to Exclude Time to 10/20/2008 as to Ned Roscoe, John Roscoe. Status Conference set for 10/20/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 9/8/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 62 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Stipulation
                        STIPULATION And [Proposed] Order To Continue Status Hearing And To Exclude Time From September 2, 2008 Through October 20, 2008 From The Speedy Trial Act Calculation (18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(8)(A),(B)) by USA as to Ned Roscoe, John Roscoe (Choi, Eumi) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 63 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte:Status Conference as to Ned Roscoe, John Roscoe held on 9/2/2008. Status Conference set for 10/20/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 61 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Clerks Notice
                            CLERK'S NOTICE Continuance of Status Hearing : Status Conference set for 9/2/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 60 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER [57] to Exclude Time to 8/25/2008 as to Ned Roscoe, John Roscoe. Signed by Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 7/24/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2008)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                Summons Returned Executed on 6/23/08 as to Ned Roscoe (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 7/2/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 57 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Stipulation
                                  STIPULATION and Proposed Orde to Continue Status Hearing and Exclude Time from June 30, 2008 Through August 25, 2008 from the Speedy Trial Act Calculation (18 U.S.C. §3161(h)(8)(A)(B)) by USA as to Ned Roscoe, John Roscoe (Choi, Eumi) (Filed on 7/2/2008) Modified on 7/2/2008 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 56 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte:Arraigned NOT GUILTY as to Ned Roscoe (1) Count 1s,2s-6s,7s-11s and John Roscoe (2) Count 1s,2s-6s,7s-11s held on 6/30/2008. Defense needs to obtain discovery. Time is excluded to 8/25/08. Status Conference set for 8/25/2008 09:00 AM before Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 7/1/2008)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 53 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Indictment
                                      SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Ned Roscoe (1) count(s) 1s, 2s-6s, 7s-11s, John Roscoe (2) count(s) 1s, 2s-6s, 7s-11s. (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 6/18/2008)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 52 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER [51] Resetting Status Hearing as to Ned Roscoe and John Roscoe. Status Conference set for 6/30/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 5/14/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2008)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 51 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Stipulation
                                          STIPULATION and Proposed Order Continuing Status Hearing by John Roscoe as to Ned Roscoe, John Roscoe (Leeming, Peter) (Filed on 5/1/2008) Modified on 5/2/2008 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 50 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER [48] to Exclude Time to 5/5/08 as to Ned Roscoe and John Roscoe. Signed by Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 4/17/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2008)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 49 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                              CJA 20 as to Ned Roscoe: Appointment of Attorney Mark Donald Eibert for Ned Roscoe. Signed by Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 4/8/08. (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 4/16/2008)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 48 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Stipulation
                                                STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS HEARING AND TO EXCLUDE TIME by USA as to Ned Roscoe, John Roscoe (Choi, Eumi) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 47 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte:Motion Hearing as to Ned Roscoe, John Roscoe held on 4/7/2008 re [46] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Ned Roscoe, Added attorney Mark Donald Eibert for Ned Roscoe. Attorney Cynthia Chin Young Lie terminated in case as to Ned Roscoe. Status Conference set for 5/5/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2008)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 46 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008, Terminated: 4/8/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Federal Public Defender. by Ned Roscoe. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Lie, Cynthia) (Filed on 4/2/2008)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 45 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Notice of Substitution of Attorney
                                                      NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney as to Ned Roscoe, John Roscoe (Choi, Eumi) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 44 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER [43] Excluding Time from 1/28/2008 to 4/7/2008 as to Ned Roscoe and John Roscoe. Signed by Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 2/26/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 43 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Stipulation
                                                          STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS HEARING AND EXCLUDE TIME by USA as to Ned Roscoe, John Roscoe (Choi, Eumi) (Filed on 2/21/2008)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 42 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER [40] Excusing Defendants From Appearance at Hearing as to Ned Roscoe and John Roscoe. Signed by Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 2/6/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 41 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte:Status Conference as to Ned Roscoe and John Roscoe held on 1/28/2008. Status Conference set for 2/25/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2008)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 40 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Stipulation
                                                                STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXCUSING DEFENDANTS FROM APPEARANCE AT HEARING by Ned Roscoe as to Ned Roscoe, John Roscoe (Lie, Cynthia) (Filed on 1/25/2008)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 39 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER [34] to Exclude Time to 1/28/08 as to Ned Roscoe & John Roscoe. Signed by Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 1/17/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2008)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Order on Motion for Ex Parte ApplicationCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER Modifying Travel Restriction granting [35] Ex Parte Application for Modification of Travel Restriction as to Ned Roscoe (1). Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 1/9/08. (cm, COURT STAFF) Modified on 1/10/2008 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Proposed Order
                                                                      Proposed Order re [35] Ex Parte Application for Modification of Travel Restriction by Ned Roscoe (Lie, Cynthia) (Filed on 1/8/2008) Modified on 1/9/2008 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 36 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Declaration in Support
                                                                        Declaration in Support of [35] Ex Parte Application for Modification of Travel Restriction by Ned Roscoe (Lie, Cynthia) (Filed on 1/8/2008) Modified on 1/9/2008 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 35 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008, Terminated: 1/9/2008 Motion for Ex Parte Application
                                                                          Ex Parte Application for Modification of Travel Restriction by Ned Roscoe. (Lie, Cynthia) (Filed on 1/8/2008) Modified on 1/9/2008 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 34 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Proposed Order
                                                                            Proposed Order Reflecting Continuance of Status Hearing to January 28, 2008 and Finding of Exclusion of Time by USA as to Ned Roscoe, John Roscoe (Singh, Carlos) (Filed on 1/4/2008) Modified on 1/7/2008 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 31 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte:Status Conference as to Ned Roscoe & John Roscoe held on 12/10/2007. Status Conference set for 1/28/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2007)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER Modifying Travel Restriction granting [27] as to Ned Roscoe.Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 12/4/07. (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2007) Modified on 12/5/2007 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                  Proposed Order re [27] Ex Parte Application for Modification of Travel Restriction by Ned Roscoe (Lie, Cynthia) (Filed on 12/4/2007) Modified on 12/5/2007 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                    Declaration of Counsel in Support of [27] Ex Parte Application for Modification of Travel Restriction by Ned Roscoe (Lie, Cynthia) (Filed on 12/4/2007) Modified on 12/5/2007 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007, Terminated: 12/4/2007 Motion for Ex Parte Application
                                                                                      Ex Parte Application for Modification of Travel Restriction by Ned Roscoe. (Lie, Cynthia) (Filed on 12/4/2007) Modified on 12/5/2007 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Status Hearing to 12/10/07 and Excluding Time from 10/22/07 to 12/10/07 as to Ned Roscoe, John Roscoe [23] Stipulation filed by Ned Roscoe Status Hearing set for 12/10/2007 09:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/6/07. (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                          STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING by Ned Roscoe as to Ned Roscoe, John Roscoe (Lie, Cynthia) (Filed on 10/19/2007)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER [21]to Continue Status Hearing as to Ned Roscoe and John Roscoe. Status Conference set for 10/22/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/13/07. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2007)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                              Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Continuing Status Hearing & Excluding Time Under the Speedy Trial by John Roscoe as to Ned Roscoe, John Roscoe (Leeming, Peter) (Filed on 9/5/2007) Modified on 9/6/2007 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: 8/13/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER Modifying Travel Restriction as to Ned Roscoe re [18] Stipulation filed by Ned Roscoe. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 8/10/07. (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2007) Modified on 8/14/2007 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                  Proposed Order re [18] Stipulation by Ned Roscoe RE MODIFICATION OF TRAVEL RESTRICTION (Lie, Cynthia) (Filed on 8/9/2007)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                                    STIPULATION RE MODIFICATION OF TRAVEL RESTRICTION by Ned Roscoe (Lie, Cynthia) (Filed on 8/9/2007)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Order on Motion for Ex Parte ApplicationCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [14] Ex Parte Application for Travel Authorization as to Ned Roscoe (1). Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on July 13, 2007. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/16/2007 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                        Proposed Order re [14] Ex Parte Application for Travel Authorization by Ned Roscoe (Lie, Cynthia) (Filed on 7/13/2007) Modified on 7/16/2007 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                          Declaration of Counsel in Support of [14] Ex Parte Application for Travel Authorization by Ned Roscoe (Lie, Cynthia) (Filed on 7/13/2007) Modified on 7/16/2007 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007, Terminated: 7/13/2007 Motion for Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                            Ex Parte Application for Travel Authorization by Ned Roscoe. (Lie, Cynthia) (Filed on 7/13/2007) Modified on 7/16/2007 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER Granting Request for Travel re [9] Ex Parte Application for Travel Authorization as to Ned Roscoe.Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 7/11/07. (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2007) Modified on 7/12/2007 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Travel Authorization re [9] by Ned Roscoe (Lie, Cynthia) (Filed on 7/11/2007) Modified on 7/11/2007 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                  Declaration of Counsel in Support Ex Parte Application for Travel Authorization re [9] by Ned Roscoe (Lie, Cynthia) (Filed on 7/11/2007) Modified on 7/11/2007 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007, Terminated: 7/11/2007 Motion for Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                                    Ex Parte Application for Travel Authorization by Ned Roscoe. (Lie, Cynthia) (Filed on 7/11/2007) Modified on 7/11/2007 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald M. Whyte :Status Conference as to Ned Roscoe & John Roscoe held on 7/9/2007. Status Conference set for 9/10/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2007)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Bond HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patricia V. Trumbull :Surety Signing as to Ned Roscoe held on 7/9/2007 (Court Reporter FTR.) (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2007)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Receipt for Passport
                                                                                                                          Receipt#54611001214 for US Passport, receipted on 6/22/07 as to Ned Roscoe (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Ned Roscoe (1) $150,000 PR BOND. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 6/21/07. (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patricia V. Trumbull :Initial Appearance; attorney Cynthia Chin Young Lie present as to Ned Roscoe held on 6/21/2007. Arraigned NOT GUILTY as to Ned Roscoe (1) Count 1,2-6 held on 6/21/2007. Bond $150,000.00 PR BOND Hearing as to Ned Roscoe held on 6/21/2007. CJA23 Submitted as to Ned Roscoe. Passport SURRENDER date 6/21/07. Bond Signing Hearing set for 7/9/2007 11:00 AM before Judge Patricia V. Trumbull. Status Conference set for 7/9/2007 09:00 AM before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. (Court Reporter FTR.) (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Indictment
                                                                                                                                INDICTMENT as to Ned Roscoe (1) count(s) 1, 2-6, John Roscoe (2) count(s) 1, 2-6. (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 6/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Case Referred to ECF
                                                                                                                                  CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing.
                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 82 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?