Shemper v. BP p.l.c. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Mississippi Southern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-00138
District Judge Keith Starrett, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 25, 2017 at 11:23 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alco Indust Inc, Plaintiff

Represented by Bolognese & Associates

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen M. Konopka +1 202 408 4692 +1 202 408 4699 kkonopka@cohenmilstein.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Schaefer +1 203 772 2600 +1 203 562 2098 dschaefer@bswlaw.com
No Logo Carlisle Co Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlisle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Ford +1 315 477 9108 +1 315 474 2008 sford@carlisle.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

No Logo Carlisle Corp, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlisle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Ford +1 315 477 9108 +1 315 474 2008 sford@carlisle.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristin A. Suga +1 781 466 0700 +1 781 466 0701 ksuga@zelle.com
No Logo Carlisle Engineered Products, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlisle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Ford +1 315 477 9108 +1 315 474 2008 sford@carlisle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen M. Konopka +1 202 408 4692 +1 202 408 4699 kkonopka@cohenmilstein.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristin A. Suga +1 781 466 0700 +1 781 466 0701 ksuga@zelle.com
No Logo Carlisle Power Transmission Prod Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlisle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Ford +1 315 477 9108 +1 315 474 2008 sford@carlisle.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristin A. Suga +1 781 466 0700 +1 781 466 0701 ksuga@zelle.com
No Logo Carlisle Syntec Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlisle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Ford +1 315 477 9108 +1 315 474 2008 sford@carlisle.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristin A. Suga +1 781 466 0700 +1 781 466 0701 ksuga@zelle.com
No Logo Diamond Holding Corp, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen M. Konopka +1 202 408 4692 +1 202 408 4699 kkonopka@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by IZARD NOBEL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S. Nobel +1 860 493 6292 +1 860 493 6290 firm@snlaw.net

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Schaefer +1 203 772 2600 +1 203 562 2098 dschaefer@bswlaw.com
No Logo Duraplas Corp, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacqueline E. Bryks +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen M. Konopka +1 202 408 4692 +1 202 408 4699 kkonopka@cohenmilstein.com
TERMINATED: 09/01/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda Phyllis Nussbaum +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 848 7745

Represented by Gold Bennett Cera & Sidener LLP

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Schaefer +1 203 772 2600 +1 203 562 2098 dschaefer@bswlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weltman Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/01/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stewart M. Weltman +1 312 606 8755 +1 312 444 1028 sweltman@weltmanlawfirm.com
No Logo Freudenberg-nok, Plaintiff

Represented by Gold Bennett Cera & Sidener LLP

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

No Logo Industrial Rubber Products, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Jane Fait +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 fait@whafh.com
No Logo Jacob R. Shemper, Plaintiff
No Logo Parker-hannifin Coropration, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Parker Hannifin Corp"

Toggle Switch Represented by McDonald, Hopkins, Burke & Haber Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edmund W. Searby +1 216 348 5400 +1 216 348 5474 esearby@mcdonaldhopkins.com
No Logo Polymerics, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julio Ramos +1 415 948 3015 +1 415 469 9787 ramosfortrustee@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen M. Konopka +1 202 408 4692 +1 202 408 4699 kkonopka@cohenmilstein.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Paul Lehmann +1 415 229 2080 +1 415 986 3643 mlehmann@cmht.com

Represented by Freed Kanner London & Millen LLC

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Meredith Cohen Greenfogel & Skirnick, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Greenfogel +1 215 564 5182 +1 215 569 0958 sgreenfogel@mcgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Much Shelist, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven A. Kanner +1 312 346 3100 +1 312 521 2100 skanner@muchshelist.com
TERMINATED: 02/09/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louis A. Kessler +1 312 521 2000 +1 312 521 2100
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Millen +1 312 346 3100

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Schaefer +1 203 772 2600 +1 203 562 2098 dschaefer@bswlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Edwards Law Firm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Edwards, III +1 361 698 7600 +1 361 698 7614 bedwards@edwardsfirm.com

Represented by The Furth Firm LLP

Represented by Trump, Alioto, Trump & Prescott, LLP

No Logo PolyOne Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McDonald, Hopkins, Burke & Haber Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edmund W. Searby +1 216 348 5400 +1 216 348 5474 esearby@mcdonaldhopkins.com
No Logo Precision Assoc Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen M. Konopka +1 202 408 4692 +1 202 408 4699 kkonopka@cohenmilstein.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Schaefer +1 203 772 2600 +1 203 562 2098 dschaefer@bswlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf, Popper, Ross, Wolf & Jones, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Kornreich +1 212 759 4600 +1 212 486 2093 rkornreich@wolfpopper.com
No Logo RBX Indus Inc, Plaintiff

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Rodanast, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dianne M. Nast +1 717 892 3000 +1 717 892 1200 dnast@rodanast.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MICHAEL G. NAST +1 717 892 3000 +1 717 892 1200 mnast@rodanast.com
No Logo Reeves Brothers, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Gold Bennett Cera & Sidener LLP

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Dixon & Bell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason S. Hartley +1 619 235 4040 jhartley@rdblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merril Hirsh +1 202 662 2000 +1 202 662 2190 mhirsh@rdblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P. Daniels +1 203 772 2600 +1 203 562 2098 bpdaniels@bswlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Schaefer +1 203 772 2600 +1 203 562 2098 dschaefer@bswlaw.com
No Logo Richard Immerman, Plaintiff

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Westrup Klick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Kitchenoff kitchenoff@wkalaw.com
No Logo Robbins LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Saveri & Saveri, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Guido Saveri +1 415 217 6810 +1 415 217 6813 guido@saveri.com
No Logo Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Plaintiff

Represented by Gold Bennett Cera & Sidener LLP

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

No Logo Schlegel Corp, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen M. Konopka +1 202 408 4692 +1 202 408 4699 kkonopka@cohenmilstein.com

Represented by Gold Bennett Cera & Sidener LLP

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Schaefer +1 203 772 2600 +1 203 562 2098 dschaefer@bswlaw.com
No Logo Synaflex Rubber Prod, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen M. Konopka +1 202 408 4692 +1 202 408 4699 kkonopka@cohenmilstein.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by Levin, Fishbein, Sedran & Berman

Represented by MEHRI & SKALET, PLLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Schaefer +1 203 772 2600 +1 203 562 2098 dschaefer@bswlaw.com
v.
No Logo Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Wayne Drinkwater, Jr. +1 601 948 8000 +1 601 948 3000 wdrinkwater@babc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack L. Wilson +1 601 592 9910 jwilson@babc.com
Bayer Corporation Bayer Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bayer Corp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Vincent O'Reilly +1 202 879 3939 woreilly@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A. Read +1 202 879 5465 +1 202 626 1700 jaread@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiggin & Dana LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Langer +1 860 297 3700 rlanger@wiggin.com
TERMINATED: 11/28/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Bruce Malech +1 860 297 3700 smalech@wiggin.com
BP Corporation North America, Inc. BP Corporation North America, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "BP America Production Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Forman, Perry, Watkins, Krutz & Tardy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W. Tardy, III +1 601 960 8600 +1 601 960 8613 mseservice@fpwk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason D. Watkins +1 601 353 3234 watkinsjd@fpwk.com
BP America, Inc. BP America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Forman, Perry, Watkins, Krutz & Tardy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W. Tardy, III +1 601 960 8600 +1 601 960 8613 mseservice@fpwk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason D. Watkins +1 601 353 3234 watkinsjd@fpwk.com
BP Products North America Inc. BP Products North America Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Forman, Perry, Watkins, Krutz & Tardy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W. Tardy, III +1 601 960 8600 +1 601 960 8613 mseservice@fpwk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason D. Watkins +1 601 353 3234 watkinsjd@fpwk.com
No Logo CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Butler Snow O'Mara Stevens & Cannada, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT C. GALLOWAY +1 228 575 3019 +1 228 868 1531 bob.galloway@butlersnow.com
No Logo CROMPTON CORP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw , +1 202 383 5163 +1 202 383 5414 bbradshaw@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS J. MCGARRIGLE +1 215 851 8220 +1 215 851 1420 tmcgarrigle@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradford S. Babbitt +1 860 275 8209 +1 860 275 8299 bbabbitt@rc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig A. Raabe +1 860 275 8200 craabe@rc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Scarinci & Hollenbeck

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/21/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PATRICK J. SWEENEY +1 201 392 8900
The Dow Chemical Company The Dow Chemical Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Dow Chemical Co"

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Bliss +1 203 961 7400 +1 212 230 7845 jamesbliss@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G. Hamilton Loeb +1 202 508 9500 +1 202 508 9700 hamiltonloeb@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin C. McCann +1 415 856 7000 +1 415 856 7100 kevinmccann@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John S. McGeeney +1 203 961 7400 stevemcgeeney@paulhastings.com
No Logo Dsm Copolymer, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew S. Marovitz +1 312 782 0600 +7017 701 701 7711

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Joseph Favretto +1 202 263 3250 +1 202 263 5250 rfavretto@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Owen, Wickersham & Erickson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Britt M. Miller - NOT SWORN +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 706 8763 bmiller@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary A. Winters +1 202 263 3000 +1 202 263 3300 gwinters@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shelley R. Sadin +1 203 333 9441 +1 203 333 1489 ssadin@znclaw.com
No Logo DSM Elastomers BV, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew S. Marovitz +1 312 782 0600 +7017 701 701 7711

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Joseph Favretto +1 202 263 3250 +1 202 263 5250 rfavretto@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Owen, Wickersham & Erickson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Britt M. Miller - NOT SWORN +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 706 8763 bmiller@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shelley R. Sadin +1 203 333 9441 +1 203 333 1489 ssadin@znclaw.com
No Logo DSM Elastomers Europe BV, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MOTION to Compel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space
No Logo Dupont Dow Elastomers, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Pullman & Comley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/23/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James T. Shearin +1 203 330 2000 +1 203 576 8888 jshearin@pullcom.com
TERMINATED: 03/23/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Wenzel +1 203 330 2207 +1 203 576 8888 wwenzel@pullcom.com
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Inc. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "EI Dupont De Nemours & Co"

Represented by Murtha Cullina LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Pullman & Comley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/23/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Wenzel +1 203 330 2207 +1 203 576 8888 wwenzel@pullcom.com
ExxonMobil Corporation ExxonMobil Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Exxon Mobil Chemical Co"
Officer/Director, MOBIL CORP

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Alan Reiss +1 212 310 8000 +1 212 310 8007

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/14/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joy K. Fuyuno +1 415 393 2000 joy.fuyuno@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 07/02/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher B. Hockett +1 415 393 2000 +1 415 393 2286 chris.hockett@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/11/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles F. Rule +1 202 862 2420 +1 202 862 2400 rrule@paulweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/11/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony V. Nanni +1 202 639 7000 +1 202 639 7003

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connell, Flaherty & Attmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane C. Mokriski +1 860 548 1300 +1 860 548 0023 dmokriski@oamlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. O'Connell +1 860 548 1300 +1 860 548 0023 moconnell@ofalaw.com
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stewart and Stewart

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David W Stewart +1 317 846 8999 +1 317 843 1991 dave@getstewart.com
No Logo M-i, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of G. Todd Burwell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G. Todd Burwell +1 601 427 4470 +1 601 427 0189 tburwell@gtbpa.com
No Logo MOEX Offshore 2007, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Wayne Drinkwater, Jr. +1 601 948 8000 +1 601 948 3000 wdrinkwater@babc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack L. Wilson +1 601 592 9910 jwilson@babc.com
No Logo Polimeri Europa Amer Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leah Brannon +1 202 974 1500 +1 202 974 1999 lbrannon@cgsh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Shea +1 860 275 0146 +1 860 275 0343 mpshea@DayPitney.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason S. Weathers +1 860 275 0356 +1 860 275 0343 jsweathers@daypitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thorp Reed & Armstrong, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry L. Cohen +1 215 563 6711 +1 215 563 6816 bcohen@thorpreed.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shelley R. Sadin +1 203 333 9441 +1 203 333 1489 ssadin@znclaw.com
Transocean, Ltd. Transocean, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Transocean Holdings, LLC."

Toggle Switch Represented by Franke & Salloum, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Richard P. Salloum +1 228 868 7070 + 228 868 7090 rps@frslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard P. Salloum +1 228 868 7070 + 228 868 7090 rps@frslaw.com
Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Franke & Salloum, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Richard P. Salloum +1 228 868 7070 + 228 868 7090 rps@frslaw.com
No Logo Triton Asset Leasing, GmbH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Franke & Salloum, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard P. Salloum +1 228 868 7070 + 228 868 7090 rps@frslaw.com
No Logo Uniroyal Chemical Co Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw , +1 202 383 5163 +1 202 383 5414 bbradshaw@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS J. MCGARRIGLE +1 215 851 8220 +1 215 851 1420 tmcgarrigle@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradford S. Babbitt +1 860 275 8209 +1 860 275 8299 bbabbitt@rc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig A. Raabe +1 860 275 8200 craabe@rc.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
  Entries (71) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: 8/6/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION Extension of Page Limitation by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Stewart, David)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: 8/6/2010 Joinder
    Joinder by BP America Production Company, BP America, Inc., BP Exploration & Production, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc. to [69] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by MOEX Offshore 2007, LLC, Anadarko Petroleum Corporation (Watkins, Jason)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: 8/5/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT by Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, MOEX Offshore 2007, LLC (Wilson, Jack)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: 8/5/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
        MOTION for Gavin E. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Bar Memberships, # (2) Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Stewart, David)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: 8/5/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
          MOTION for Floyd Hartley, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Federal Court Admissions, # (2) Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Stewart, David)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 66 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Memorandum in Opposition
            MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re [49] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, [50] Memorandum in Support of Motion Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Cameron International Corporation's Motion to Dismiss filed by Jacob R. Shemper (Dean - PHV, Kevin)
              LREF
              Blank 65 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Memorandum in Opposition
              MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re [54] Memorandum in Support,, [53] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to The BP Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Jacob R. Shemper (Dean - PHV, Kevin)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Memorandum in Opposition
                MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re [48] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [47] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Halliburton Energy Service's Motion to Dismiss filed by Jacob R. Shemper (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Dean - PHV, Kevin)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Response to Motion
                  RESPONSE to Motion re [51] MOTION to Dismiss, [52] Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Jacob R. Shemper (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Dean - PHV, Kevin)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Response to Motion
                    RESPONSE to Motion re [56] MOTION to Stay Case filed by Jacob R. Shemper (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Dean - PHV, Kevin)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Memorandum in Opposition
                      MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re [58] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [57] MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for More Definite Statement MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Jacob R. Shemper (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Dean - PHV, Kevin)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Amended Complaint
                        AMENDED COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants, filed by Jacob R. Shemper.(Dean - PHV, Kevin)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER Setting Deadlines and Dates for Response/Rebuttal to Defendants' Motions [47], [49], [51], [53], and [57]. Plaintiffs' Responses are due on or before August 3, 2010. Defendants' Rebuttal, if desired, are due on or before August 10, 2010. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on July 21, 2010 (dsl)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 58 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [57] MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for More Definite Statement filed by M-I, LLC (Burwell, G.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 57 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                              MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for More Definite Statement by M-I, LLC (Burwell, G.). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 7/21/2010 (AKL).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Motion to Stay Case
                                MOTION to Stay Case by M-I, LLC (Burwell, G.)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Answer
                                  ANSWER to [1] Complaint,, by Transocean Deepwater, Inc., Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc..(Salloum, Richard)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Memorandum in Support
                                    MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re [53] MOTION to Dismiss filed by BP America Production Company, BP America, Inc., BP Exploration & Production, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit How to Make a Claim (BP website), # (2) Exhibit US Coast Guard Oil Spill Claims Home Page, # (3) Exhibit Deepwater Horizon Unified Command Home Page, # (4) Exhibit The White House Deepwater BP Oil Spill Home Page, # (5) Exhibit Disaster Assistance Home Page, # (6) Exhibit BP Home Page, # (7) Exhibit BP Home Page, # (8) Exhibit Potential Interested Pary's Respose in Opposition to Motions for Transfer, Coordination and Consolidation Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, # (9) Exhibit Deepwater Horizon Situation Map)(Tardy, Thomas)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 53 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                      MOTION to Dismiss by BP America Production Company, BP America, Inc., BP Exploration & Production, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc. (Tardy, Thomas)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 52 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [51] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, MOEX Offshore 2007, LLC (Wilson, Jack)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 51 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                          MOTION to Dismiss by Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, MOEX Offshore 2007, LLC (Wilson, Jack)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 50 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [49] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cameron International Corporation (Galloway, Robert)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 49 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Cameron International Corporation (Galloway, Robert)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 48 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [47] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Stewart, David)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                  MOTION to Dismiss by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Stewart, David)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: 7/19/2010 order on motion to stay caseCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER denying [14] Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on July 19, 2010. (KM)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 Joinder
                                                      Joinder by BP America Production Company, BP America, Inc., BP Exploration & Production, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc. to [15] Memorandum in Support of Motion,, filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., [14] MOTION to Stay Case Pending Transfer by the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Watkins, Jason)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Response to Motion
                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re [8] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Jacob R. Shemper (Dean - PHV, Kevin)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 Joinder
                                                          Joinder by M-I, LLC to [15] Memorandum in Support of Motion,, filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., [14] MOTION to Stay Case Pending Transfer by the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Burwell, G.)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint,, and Special Appearance by M-I, LLC (Burwell, G.)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by W. Wayne Drinkwater, Jr on behalf of Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, MOEX Offshore 2007, LLC (Drinkwater, W.)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [15] Memorandum in Support of Motion,, [14] MOTION to Stay Case Pending Transfer by the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation, [34] Response to Motion, filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Stewart, David)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part [25] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; [32] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; [33] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; [8] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; [19] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answers due by 7/20/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 21, 2010. (KM)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [32] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint,, by Halliburton Energy Services filed by Jacob R. Shemper (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Dean - PHV, Kevin)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [19] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [1] Complaint,, by Cameron International Corporation filed by Jacob R. Shemper (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Dean - PHV, Kevin)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re [8] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer TO THE COMPLAINT by BP P.L.C. filed by Jacob R. Shemper (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Dean - PHV, Kevin)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re [25] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Jacob R. Shemper (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Dean - PHV, Kevin)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [15] Memorandum in Support of Motion,, [14] MOTION to Stay Case Pending Transfer by the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation filed by Jacob R. Shemper (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Dean - PHV, Kevin)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint,, by Transocean Deepwater, Inc., Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. (Salloum, Richard)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint,, by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Stewart, David)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by Triton Asset Leasing, GmbH (Castille, Traci)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. (Castille, Traci)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transocean Holdings, LLC. (Castille, Traci)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transocean Deepwater, Inc. (Castille, Traci)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Greg Copeland on behalf of Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Copeland, Charles)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, MOEX Offshore 2007, LLC (Wilson, Jack)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010, Terminated: 6/21/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, MOEX Offshore 2007, LLC (Wilson, Jack)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                MOTION for Jenny L. Martinez to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of Texas, # (2) Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - USDC of Texas)(Stewart, David)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                  MOTION for R. Alan York to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Additional Memberships, # (2) Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of Texas, # (3) Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing - USDC of Texas)(Stewart, David)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                    MOTION for Bruce W. Bowman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Additional Memberships, # (2) Exhibit B- Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of Texas, # (3) Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing - USDC of Texas)(Stewart, David)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                      MOTION for Donald E. Godwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Additional Memberships, # (2) Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of Texas, # (3) Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing - USDC of Texas)(Stewart, David)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 MDL Letter
                                                                                                        Letter sent to MDL Clerk with docket entries and complaint. (AKL)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [1] Complaint,, by Cameron International Corporation (Galloway, Robert)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cameron International Corporation (Galloway, Robert)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing by Triton Asset Leasing, GmbH (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Notice of Complaint, etc., # (2) Exhibit Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation, # (3) Exhibit Order Directing Claimants to File, etc., # (4) Exhibit Monition, # (5) Exhibit Amended Order Directing Claimants to File, etc., # (6) Exhibit Second Amended Order Directing Claimants to File)(Salloum, Richard)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Richard P. Salloum on behalf of Triton Asset Leasing, GmbH (Salloum, Richard)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [14] MOTION to Stay Case Pending Transfer by the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - 2:10-cv-01229 Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer, # (2) Exhibit B - 2:10-cv-01229 Defendant BP's Motion to Transfer, # (3) Exhibit C - MDL Panel's Briefing Schedule in MDL-2179, # (4) Exhibit D - MDL Panel's revised Briefing Schedule in MDL-2179, # (5) Exhibit E - Chart of Stays Granted)(Stewart, David)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010, Terminated: 7/19/2010 Motion to Stay Case
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Stay Case Pending Transfer by the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Stewart, David)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Halliburton Company for Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Stewart, David)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Watkins, Jason)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Products North America, Inc. (Watkins, Jason)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America, Inc. (Watkins, Jason)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company (Watkins, Jason)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer TO THE COMPLAINT by BP America Production Company, BP America, Inc., BP Exploration & Production, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc. (Watkins, Jason)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Kevin R. Dean to Appear Pro Hac Vice Application by Jacob R. Shemper (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Shemper, Michael)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Joseph F. Rice to Appear Pro Hac Vice Application by Jacob R. Shemper (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Shemper, Michael)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Ronald L. Motley to Appear Pro Hac Vice Application by Jacob R. Shemper (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Shemper, Michael)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing by Transocean Deepwater, Inc., Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., Transocean Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Notice of Complaint and Petition for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Order Directing Claimants to File and Make Proof of Claims, etc., # (4) Exhibit 4 - Monition, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Amended Order Directing Claimants to File and Make Proof of Claims, etc.)(Salloum, Richard)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Richard P. Salloum on behalf of Transocean Deepwater, Inc., Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., Transocean Holdings, LLC. (Salloum, Richard)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Transocean, Ltd, Transocean Deepwater, Inc., Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., Transocean Holdings, LLC., Triton Asset Leasing, GmbH, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Cameron International Corporation, M-I, LLC, Weatherford International, Ltd, BP p.l.c., BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc., Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, MOEX Offshore 2007, LLC. (DM)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010 Complaint
                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Transocean, Ltd, Transocean Deepwater, Inc., Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., Transocean Holdings, LLC., Triton Asset Leasing, GmbH, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Cameron International Corporation, M-I, LLC, Weatherford International, Ltd, John and Jane Does A-Z, Corporations A-Z, BP p.l.c., BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc., Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, MOEX Offshore 2007, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 24643000537), filed by Jacob R. Shemper. Jury Trial requested by plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet). (DM)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                Space Space

                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 329 times.

                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?