Toole v. Obama et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Mississippi Southern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-00418
Magistrate Judge Louis Guirola, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Cathy L. Toole, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Toole, Cathy L.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cathy L. Toole +1 228 273 1312
v.
No Logo Benedict Swartz, II, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/08/2010 Michael J. Bentley +1 601 592 9935 +1 601 948 3000 mbentley@babc.com
TERMINATED: 11/08/2010 W. Wayne Drinkwater, Jr. +1 601 948 8000 +1 601 948 3000 wdrinkwater@babc.com
No Logo Cass R. Buscher, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/08/2010 Michael J. Bentley +1 601 592 9935 +1 601 948 3000 mbentley@babc.com
TERMINATED: 11/08/2010 W. Wayne Drinkwater, Jr. +1 601 948 8000 +1 601 948 3000 wdrinkwater@babc.com
No Logo Dr. Eva Magiros, Defendant
No Logo Eric Shinseki, Defendant
No Logo Joan Myers Eagle, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/08/2010 Michael J. Bentley +1 601 592 9935 +1 601 948 3000 mbentley@babc.com
TERMINATED: 11/08/2010 W. Wayne Drinkwater, Jr. +1 601 948 8000 +1 601 948 3000 wdrinkwater@babc.com
No Logo John McHugh, Defendant
No Logo President Barack Obama, Defendant
No Logo R. Edward Bates, Defendant
No Logo Rachel Lynne Toole, Defendant
No Logo Timothy Geithner, Defendant
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 7703
Nature of Suit 900 - Appeal of Fee Determination
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Equal Justice by Cathy L. Toole (Attachments: # 1 Copy of NEF and Newspaper Articles)(PKS) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
    MOTION Case Management Order and MOTION for Jury Trial by Cathy L. Toole (PKS) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None
      Letter from Cathy L. Toole concerning U.S. Government Documents. (Attachments: # 1 U.S. Government Documents) (JCH) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
        Letter from Cathy Toole about medical records. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Medical Records and Letter from Dept. of Veteran Affairs) (JCH) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
          Letter requesting court date by Cathy Toole (Attachments: # 1 Rachel Toole Letter, # 2 November 20, 2010 News Article) (PKS) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
            Response to Order re TEXT ONLY ORDER denying as premature 15 Motion for a court date filed by Cathy L. Toole (PKS) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
              Response to Order, re: re 16 Memorandum Opinion and Order filed by Cathy L. Toole (PKS) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                Letter from Cathy L. Toole (Attachments: # 1 Printout from VA) (RLW) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 3 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Dr. Eva Magiros are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 11/15/2010 (wld) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Memorandum Opinion and Order granting 5 MOTION to Dismiss defendants Benedict Schwartz, II, Joan Myers Eagle and Cass R. Buscher. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 11/8/10 (PKS) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Federal Court Date by Cathy L. Toole (Attachments: # 1 Coast Neurology Letter, # 2 Redacted Medical Arts Pharmacy List, # 3 Unredacted Medical Arts Pharmacy List)(PKS) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                        Copy of Letter from Rachel Toole. (JCH) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cathy L. Toole. Barack Obama served on 9/10/2010, answer due 10/1/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt (Green Card) and Track/Confirm)(PKS) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cathy L. Toole. Benedict Swartz, II served on 9/8/2010, answer due 9/29/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt (Green Card) and Track/Confirm)(PKS) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Bentley on behalf of Cass R. Buscher, Joan Myers Eagle, Benedict Swartz, II (Bentley, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cathy L. Toole: Timothy Geithner served on 10/1/2010, answer due 11/30/2010. (JCH) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cathy L. Toole: R. Edward Bates served on 9/7/2010, answer due 9/28/2010; Rachel Lynne Toole served on 9/8/2010, answer due 9/29/2010. (JCH) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cathy L. Toole: John McHugh served on 9/8/2010, answer due 11/8/2010; Eric Shinseki served on 9/8/2010, answer due 11/8/2010. (JCH) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cathy L. Toole: Cass R. Buscher served on 9/8/2010; Joan Myers Eagle served on 9/8/2010; Eva Magiros served on 9/7/2010. (JCH) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cass R. Buscher, Joan Myers Eagle, Benedict Swartz, II (Drinkwater, W.) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                          MOTION to Dismiss by Cass R. Buscher, Joan Myers Eagle, Benedict Swartz, II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Envelope)(Drinkwater, W.) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
                                            MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eva Magiros (Guice, William) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                              MOTION to Dismiss by Eva Magiros (Guice, William) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                Summons Issued as to R. Edward Bates, Cass R. Buscher, Joan Myers Eagle, Timothy Geithner, Eva Magiros, John McHugh, Barack Obama, Eric Shinseki, Benedict Swartz, II, Rachel Lynne Toole. (wld) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                  COMPLAINT against R. Edward Bates, Cass R. Buscher, Joan Myers Eagle, Timothy Geithner, Eva Magiros, John McHugh, Barack Obama, Eric Shinseki, Benedict Swartz, II, Rachel Lynne Toole (Filing fee $350.00, receipt number 14643001200) filed by Cathy L. Toole. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Various Unlabeled Exhibits)(PKS) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 339 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?