Borgwarner, Inc. et al v. Honeywell International, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Western District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00184
District Judge Martin Reidinger, presiding

Tags
Last Updated August 2, 2017 at 8:54 PM EDT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Honeywell International, Inc. Honeywell International, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G. Krupka +1 312 861 2000 +1 312 861 2200 bob_krupka@chicago.kirkland.com
Borg-Warner Turbo Systems Inc. Borg-Warner Turbo Systems Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Borg-Warner, Inc. Borg-Warner, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (270) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
Miscellaneous Filing - CLERK'S RETURN OF ELECTRONIC EXHIBITS (pdf) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 270 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      TRANSCRIPT of PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 5/4/11 before Judge Martin Reidinger. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Policy at www.ncwd.uscourts.gov Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2011. (Reporter: Karen Miller, 828-771-7217) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 268 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        SEALED ORDER (Sealed - Attorney): (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/13/2011. (pdf) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER that this matter is hereby stayed pending further Order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/13/2011. (pdf) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
            Exhibit List (Corrected) by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kalay, Leeron) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 265 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
              Witness List (Sealed - Participants) by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.(Kalay, Leeron) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
                Exhibit List by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kalay, Leeron) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
                  Exhibit List by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 262 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
                    Witness List (Sealed - Participants) by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.(Kalay, Leeron) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 261 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
                      Witness List (Sealed - Participants) by Honeywell International, Inc.(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. re 259 Proposed Voir Dire RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS TO HONEYWELL'S PROPOSED VOIR DIRE (McDevitt, Larry) Modified TYPE OF EVENT on 5/11/2011 (jhg). (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                          Proposed Voir Dire by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM/BRIEF Regarding Defendant's Ongoing Willful Infringement (HW's MIL No. 4) by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix -Index of Appendices, # 2 Appendix 1, # 3 Appendix 2, # 4 Appendix 3, # 5 Appendix 4, # 6 Appendix 5, # 7 Appendix 6, # 8 Appendix 7, # 9 Appendix 8, # 10 Appendix 9, # 11 Appendix 10, # 12 Appendix 11)(Barkan, David) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                              Attachment by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. -Authorities Cited in 251 BorgWarner's Memo of Law re Issues Raised During Pre-trial Conf. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1, # 2 Appendix 2, # 3 Appendix 3, # 4 Appendix 4, # 5 Appendix 5, # 6 Appendix 6, # 7 Appendix 7, # 8 Appendix 8, # 9 Appendix 9, # 10 Appendix 10, # 11 Appendix 11, # 12 Appendix 12, # 13 Appendix 13, # 14 Appendix 14, # 15 Appendix 15, # 16 Appendix 16, # 17 Appendix 17, # 18 Appendix 18, # 19 Appendix 19, # 20 Appendix 20, # 21 Appendix 21, # 22 Appendix 22, # 23 Appendix 23, # 24 Appendix 24, # 25 Appendix 25, # 26 Appendix 26)(Barkan, David) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Seal Document 251 Trial Brief & 254 Sealed Exhibits to Kaiser Decl by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc..Responses due by 5/27/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(Barkan, David) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 255 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                  Proposed JURY VERDICT by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.(Kaiser, Erin) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                    LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 254 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                    Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Exhibits A-C and G re: 252 Declaration, by BorgWarner, Inc. and BorgWarner Turbo Systems, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit G)(Kaiser, Erin) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                      Miscellaneous Filing by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. BORGWARNERS DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS AND OBJECTIONS TO HONEYWELLS COUNTER DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Kaiser, Erin) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                        DECLARATION of Erin Kaiser re 251 Trial Brief filed by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit F, # 5 Exhibit G Filed Under Seal)(Kaiser, Erin) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 251 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                          ****SEALED*** TRIAL BRIEF -PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.(Kalay, Leeron) Modified on 5/10/2011 sealed document pursuant to Attorney, Leeron Kalya (available to case participants and court users) (jhg). nef regenerated (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                            Miscellaneous Filing by Honeywell International, Inc.. of Deposition Designation, Objections, Counter-Designations and Objections to Counterdesignations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                              Attachment by Honeywell International, Inc.. Attachment to 248 Sealed Document, (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Sealed Exhibits, # 2 Case: Abbott, # 3 Case: Amgen, # 4 Case: Blumenthal, # 5 Case: Carver, # 6 Case: Kowalski, # 7 Case: Mars, # 8 Case: Novozymes, # 9 Case: Ortho Pharm., # 10 Case: Poly-America, # 11 Case: Polyform, # 12 Case: Rite-Hite, # 13 Case: Sanofi-Aventis, # 14 Case: Spine Solutions, # 15 Case: Textile Prods., # 16 Case: Visioneer)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 248 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Honeywell International, Inc.'s Bench Memorandum Supporting Preclusion of Lost Profits by Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Seal by Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 5/26/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                    MEMORANDUM/BRIEF Regarding Exclusion of Post-Filing Willfulness Claims by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Case: Anascape, # 2 Case: Baxter Healthcare, # 3 Case: DePuy, # 4 Case: In re Seagate, # 5 Case: Investment Tech., # 6 Case: Krippelz, # 7 Case: Saffran, # 8 Case: Safoco, # 9 Case: St. Claire Intellectual Prop., # 10 Case: Tesco, # 11 Case: The GSI Group, # 12 Case: Webmap)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                      MEMORANDUM/BRIEF Supporting the Admissibility of Inequitable Conduct Evidence Relevant to Willfulness and Inducement by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Case: Bendix, # 2 Case: Black & Decker, # 3 Case: Broadcom, # 4 Case: DePuy, # 5 Case: DSU Med., # 6 Case: Henrob, # 7 Case: Honeywell, # 8 Case: In re Seagate, # 9 Case: Kellogg, # 10 Case: Lucent Techs., # 11 Case: National Oilwell, # 12 Case: OPTi, # 13 Case: Ortho Pharms., # 14 Case: Riddell, # 15 Case: Spine Solutions, # 16 Case: Tesco Corp., # 17 Case: Uniloc, # 18 Case: VNUS Med.)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                        MEMORANDUM/BRIEF Supporting the Admissibility of Reexamination Evidence by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Case: Broadcom, # 2 Case: DePuy Spine, # 3 Case: DSU Medical, # 4 Case: Ebanks, # 5 Case: In re Seagate, # 6 Case: Integrated Tech., # 7 Case: Lucent Techs., # 8 Case: Mendelsohn, # 9 Case: Pivonka, # 10 Case: Plumley, # 11 Case: Saffran, # 12 Case: Safoco, # 13 Case: Tesco, # 14 Case: TGIP, # 15 Case: Aramony, # 16 Case: Wells, # 17 Case: VNUS Med.)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 240 Motion for juror information. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on May 9, 2011. (jhg) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 239 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Michael Eugene Florey for BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on May 9, 2011. (jhg) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Verdict Form by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 5/23/2011. (Barkan, David) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                Unopposed MOTION Requesting Juror Information Pursuant to LCvR 47.1 (A) by Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 5/23/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Eugene Florey Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 0419-1353925. by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by David Matthew Wilkerson on behalf of BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. (Wilkerson, David) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      AMENDED DOCUMENT by Honeywell International, Inc.. Amendment to 236 Proposed Issue, Stipulated Facts, Status of Settlement Discussions (Revised Exhibits B & C) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Proposed Issue by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc. /Joint Statement of 1) Agreed-Upon Issues for Trial, 2) Stipulated Facts, & 3) Status of Settlement Discussions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Barkan, David) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Proposed Jury Instructions by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C)(Barkan, David) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 234 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Exhibits A-E re: 233 Declaration, by Plaintiffs BorgWarner Inc. & BorgWarner Turbo Systems, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Kalay, Leeron) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              DECLARATION of Leeron G. Kalay re 232 Sealed Document , Trial Brief, filed by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H, # 5 Exhibit I, # 6 Exhibit J)(Kalay, Leeron) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 232 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Trial Brief by Plaintiffs BorgWarner Inc. & BorgWarner Turbo Systems, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Barkan, David) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 231 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Honeywell's Trial Brief by Honeywell International Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Seal Documents by Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 5/19/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Document by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc..Responses due by 5/19/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(Barkan, David) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 228 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Honeywell International Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine Nos. 1-5 re: 226 Sealed Document,,, by Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          Exhibit by Honeywell International, Inc.. Exhibit to 226 Sealed Document,,, Non-Confidential Exhibits to the Declaration of Lov Goel (Attachments: # 1 Index, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit 9, # 7 Exhibit 11, # 8 Exhibit 12, # 9 Exhibit 13, # 10 Exhibit 14, # 11 Exhibit 15, # 12 Exhibit 17, # 13 Exhibit 28)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 226 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Declaration of Lov Goel in Support of Honeywell International, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions In Limine Nos. 1-5 re: 210 Sealed Document, by Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Index, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              Exhibit by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. -Exhibits 4, 7-8, & 13-16 to 224 Sealed Declaration of Leeron Kalay ISO Plaintiffs' Opp to Def's MILs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 7, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 13, # 5 Exhibit 14, # 6 Exhibit 15, # 7 Exhibit 16)(Kalay, Leeron) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 224 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Declaration of Leeron Kalay ISO Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Mtns in Limine re: 222 Sealed Response to Motion, by Plaintiffs BorgWarner Inc. & BorgWarner Turbo Systems Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, Part 1, # 6 Exhibit 6, Part 2, # 7 Exhibit 6, Part 3, # 8 Exhibit 6, Part 4, # 9 Exhibit 6, Part 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, Part 6, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 17, # 15 Exhibit 18, # 16 Exhibit 19, # 17 Exhibit 22, # 18 Exhibit 23, # 19 Exhibit 24, # 20 Exhibit 25, # 21 Exhibit 26, # 22 Exhibit 27, # 23 Exhibit 28, # 24 Exhibit 29, # 25 Exhibit 30, # 26 Exhibit 31, # 27 Exhibit 32, # 28 Exhibit 33, # 29 Exhibit 34, # 30 Exhibit 35, # 31 Exhibit 36, # 32 Exhibit 37, # 33 Exhibit 38, # 34 Exhibit 39)(Kalay, Leeron) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Documents by Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 5/16/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 222 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE (Sealed - Attorney) to Motion re: 214 Motion in Limine by Plaintiffs BorgWarner Inc. & BorgWarner Turbo Systems Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) Replies due by 5/9/2011. (Barkan, David) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Document by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc..Responses due by 5/16/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(Barkan, David) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 220 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Errata to Honeywell International Inc's Motions in Limine Nos 1-11 re: 214 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1-11 (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Seal by Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 5/13/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            STIPULATION re Use & Admissibility of Depo Testimony & Preclusion of Evidence re Post-Suit Settlement Negotiations by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc. (Barkan, David) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Exhibit by Honeywell International, Inc.. Exhibit to 214 Motion in Limine (Non-Confidential Exhibits to Declaration of Erin C. Kolter (Attachments: # 1 Index to Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 11, # 5 Exhibit 13, # 6 Exhibit 16, # 7 Exhibit 19)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 216 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Declaration of Erin C. Kolter in support of Honeywell International, Inc.'s Motions in Limine Nos. 1-11 re: 214 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1-11 by Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 215 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Brief In Support of Honeywell's Motions In Limine Nos. 1-11 re: 214 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1-11 (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine Nos. 1-11 by Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 5/9/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 213 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Sealed Exhibits to the Declaration of Erin E. Kaiser in Support of Plaintiffs' Mtns in Limine re: 211 Declaration, by BorgWarner Inc. & BorgWarner Turbo Systems Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit G, # 5 Exhibit H, # 6 Exhibit I, # 7 Exhibit L)(Barkan, David) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Documents by Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 5/9/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Erin E. Kaiser re 210 Sealed Document, Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine filed by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B & C, Ntc of Filing Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, G, H, & I, Ntc of Filing Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit J, # 7 Exhibit K, # 8 Exhibit L, Ntc of Filing Under Seal, # 9 Exhibit M)(Barkan, David) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 210 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine by BorgWarner, Inc. & BorgWarner Turbo Systems Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Frank W. Bullock, Jr, Jonathan R. Harkavy, Honeywell International, Inc.) (Barkan, David) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Document by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc..Responses due by 5/9/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to File Under Seal)(Barkan, David) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER granting joint motion to modify case management order re 47 Scheduling Order, 207 Stipulation. Signed by direction of District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/18/2011. (pdf) Modified on 4/18/2011 to modify text (pdf). (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION re 47 Scheduling Order, (Jt Stipulation & Mtn to Modify Case Mgmt Order) by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc. (Barkan, David) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Honeywell International, Inc. Notice Regarding ECF Registration as Required by Local Rule 83.1 (Middleton, Matthew) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 192 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Christopher Nalevanko for Honeywell International, Inc. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on March 29, 2011. (jhg) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 195 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Gregg LoCascio for Honeywell International, Inc. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on March 29, 2011. (jhg) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 193 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Erin Kolter for Honeywell International, Inc. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on March 29, 2011. (jhg) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 197 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Zhuanjia Gu for Honeywell International, Inc. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on March 29, 2011. (jhg) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 194 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Lov Kumar Goel for Honeywell International, Inc. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on March 29, 2011. (jhg) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 196 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Harper Siems Batts for Honeywell International, Inc. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on March 29, 2011. (jhg) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Honeywell International, Inc. re 195 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gregg LoCascio Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 0419-1309211., 193 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Erin Kolter Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 0419-1309195., 196 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Harper Siems Batts Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 0419-1309220., 194 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Lov Kumar Goel Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 0419-1309203., 197 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Zhuanjia Gu Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 0419-1309221., 192 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Nalevanko Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 0419-1309182. (Ferrell, Forrest) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 191 Motion to reschedule the pretrial conference. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on March 23, 2011. (jhg) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Zhuanjia Gu Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 0419-1309221. by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Ferrell, Forrest) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Harper Siems Batts Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 0419-1309220. by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Ferrell, Forrest) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gregg LoCascio Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 0419-1309211. by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Ferrell, Forrest) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Lov Kumar Goel Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 0419-1309203. by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Ferrell, Forrest) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Erin Kolter Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 0419-1309195. by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Ferrell, Forrest) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Nalevanko Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 0419-1309182. by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Ferrell, Forrest) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION Re-set Pretrial Conference by Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 4/7/2011. (Ferrell, Forrest) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of MOTIONS HEARING held on 9/1/10 before Judge Martin K. Reidinger. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Policy at www.ncwd.uscourts.gov Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/10/2011. (Reporter: Karen Miller, 828-771-7217) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 189 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 100 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 109 Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the Patents-In-Suit. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/25/2010. (pdf) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part 104 and 118 . Motion to Exclude from Evidence Expert Testimony of Christopher Reed, John T. Goolkasian, and Brent Robinson [Doc. 104] is GRANTED with respect to the expert testimony of Brent Robinson; GRANTED with respect to any opinion testimony from Christopher Reed regarding the automation of the tool used to manufacture the Holset Wheel;and GRANTED with respect to the opinion testimony of John T. Goolkasian regarding the issues of validity and intent. In all other respects, the Plaintiffs Motion [Doc. 104] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant's Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions of Dr. J.C. Poindexter, Paul Novak, and Dr. John Thorne [Doc. 118] is GRANTED with respect to any opinion testimony from Paul Novak and Dr. John Thorne regarding the ultimate issues of infringement and invalidity and GRANTED with respect to any opinion testimony from Paul Novak regarding the inventorship of the patents-insuit. In all other respects, the Defendants Motion [Doc. 118] is DENIED Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/25/2010. (pdf) Modified on 9/27/2010 to correct docket entry text(pdf). NEF regenerated. (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 163 Notice (Other), denying Notice (Other) that the Defendant Honeywell seeks to assert in its Notice additional grounds in support of its motion for summary judgment and/or seeks to renew its request for a stay of these proceedings. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/25/2010. (pdf) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Honeywell International, Inc. re 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the Patents-in-Suit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Ferrell, Forrest) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew James Middleton on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Middleton, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 183 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Leeron G. Kalay for BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on July 15, 2010. (jhg) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Leeron G. Kalay Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 0419-1109943. by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 182 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE (Sealed - Attorney) to Motion re: 118 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (available to Honeywell International, Inc., BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.) (Ferrell, Forrest) Modified on 4/16/2010 to restrict access also to BorgWarner, Inc. & Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. (ejb). NEF Regenerated. (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal by Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 5/3/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferrell, Forrest) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 176 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/13/2010. (pdf) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 179 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Exhibit A through L re: 178 Declaration by BorgWarner; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C-1, # 3 Exhibit C-2, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K-1, # 12 Exhibit K-2, # 13 Exhibit L)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Erin E. Kaiser re 177 Sealed Response to Motion Opposition to Honeywell's Supplemental Brief filed by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 177 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE (Sealed - Attorney) to Motion re: 118 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by BorgWarner; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Document by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc..Responses due by 4/26/2010. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 172 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/1/2010. (pdf) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 174 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Declaration of Philip T. Chen ISO Honeywell's Supplemental Brief ISO Its Motion To Exclude Certain Expert Opinions (Dkt. 118) re: 173 Sealed Document, 118 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions by Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D-Part 1, # 5 Exhibit D-Part 2, # 6 Exhibit D-Part 3, # 7 Exhibit D-Part 4, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 173 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Honeywell's Supplemental Brief In Support Of Its Motion To Exclude Certain Expert Opinions (Dkt. 118) re: 118 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions by Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Chen, Philip) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal by Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 4/12/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Katherine D. Prescott and Stuart Mattison Rosenberg terminated. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 170 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER (Sealed - Attorney) granting 167 Sealed Motion; granting 169 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/13/1020. (pdf) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct /Modify Motions Deadline & Stipulation re Briefing Schedule & Docket No. 197 by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 3/29/2010. (Barkan, David) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 166 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/25/10. (emw) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 167 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Attorney) Motion for Leave to File Revised Expert Reports of Dr. Poindexter by BorgWarner; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.)Responses due by 3/11/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Document by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc..Responses due by 3/11/2010. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re 163 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Reply in Support of Honeywell's Notice by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Ferrell, Forrest) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Miscellaneous Filing by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. re: 163 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) BorgWarner's Response to Honeywell's Notice of Office Actions from the USPTO Rejecting All Claims of the Three Patents-in-Suit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Honeywell International, Inc. of Office Actions from the USPTO Rejecting All Claims of the Three Patents-In-Suit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 158 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on December 22, 2009. (pdf) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 152 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on December 21, 2009. (pdf) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 160 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED REPLY (Sealed - Attorney) to Response to Motion re: 118 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Chen, Philip) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 159 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED REPLY (Sealed - Attorney) to Response to Motion re: 109 Motion for Summary Judgment by Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Chen, Philip) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal by Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 1/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 157 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED REPLY (Sealed - Attorney) to Response to Motion re: 100 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 156 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Exhibit A to Declaration re: 155 Declaration by Plaintiffs; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Corrin Drakulich re 154 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion filed by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 154 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED REPLY (Sealed - Attorney) to Response to Motion re: 104 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Plaintiffs; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 152 MOTION to Seal Document by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Document by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc..Responses due by 1/7/2010. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert G. Krupka (Krupka, Robert) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Marc H. Cohen (Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Philip Chen (Chen, Philip) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit (Exhibit 11 DVD disc) by Honeywell International, Inc. Exhibit to 141 Declaration,,, (pdf) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit (Exhibit L - DVD disc) by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. Exhibit to 130 Sealed Document,, (pdf) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 127 Motion to Seal; granting 127 Motion to Seal Document ; granting 139 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on December 11, 2009. (pdf) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 145 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Confidential Exhibits to the Declaration of Philip T. Chen ISO Honeywell's Opposition to BorgWarner's Motion for Summary Judgment re: 144 Declaration,, 143 Sealed Document, by Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit K - Part 1 of 2, # 10 Exhibit K - Part 2 of 2, # 11 Exhibit L, # 12 Exhibit M, # 13 Exhibit N, # 14 Exhibit O, # 15 Exhibit Q, # 16 Exhibit R, # 17 Exhibit T)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Philip T. Chen re 143 Sealed Document, ISO Honeywell's Opposition to BorgWarner's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A-G [Notice of Sealed Exhibits], # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit J, # 6 Exhibit K-O [Notice of Sealed Exhibits], # 7 Exhibit P, # 8 Exhibit Q-R [Notice of Sealed Exhibits], # 9 Exhibit S, # 10 Exhibit T [Notice of Sealed Exhibit])(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 143 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Honeywell's Opposition to BorgWarner's Motion for Summary Judgment re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 142 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Confidential Exhibits to the Declaration of Erin C. Kolter ISO Honeywell's Opposition to BorgWarner's Motions to Exclude From Evidence Expert Testimony of Christopher Reed, John T. Goolkasian, and Brent Robinson re: 141 Declaration,,, 140 Sealed Document, by Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 9, # 8 Exhibit 11, # 9 Exhibit 12, # 10 Exhibit 13, # 11 Exhibit 16, # 12 Exhibit 17, # 13 Exhibit 19, # 14 Exhibit 20)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Erin C. Kolter re 140 Sealed Document, in Support of Honeywell's Opposition to BorgWarner's Motions to Exclude From Evidence Expert Testimony of Christopher Reed, John T. Goolkasian, and Brent Robinson filed by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1-4 [Notice of Sealed Exhibits], # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 6 [Notice of Sealed Exhibit], # 5 Exhibit 7, # 6 Exhibit 8, # 7 Exhibit 9 [Notice of Sealed Exhibit], # 8 Exhibit 10, # 9 Exhibit 11-13 [Notice of Sealed Exhibits], # 10 Exhibit 14, # 11 Exhibit 15, # 12 Exhibit 16-17 [Notice of Sealed Exhibits], # 13 Exhibit 18, # 14 Exhibit 19-20 [Notice of Sealed Exhibits], # 15 Exhibit 21)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 140 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Honeywell's Opposition to BorgWarner's Motions to Exclude From Evidence Expert Testimony of Christopher Reed, John T. Goolkasian, and Brent Robinson re: 104 MOTION TO EXCLUDE FROM EVIDENCE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF CHRISTOPHER REED, JOHN T. GOOLKASIAN, AND BRENT ROBINSON by Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Chen, Philip) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal by Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 12/28/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 138 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Exhibits A-G to Drakulich Declaration re: 137 Declaration by BorgWarner; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Corrin Drakulich re 136 Sealed Document, in Support of BorgWarner's Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions filed by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 136 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Opposition to Honeywell's Motion to Exclude re: 118 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 135 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Declaration of Dr. JC Poindexter re: 129 Sealed Response to Motion by BorgWarner; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 134 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Declaration of Paul Novakl re: 129 Sealed Response to Motion by BorgWarner; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 133 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Declaration of John Thorne re: 129 Sealed Response to Motion by BorgWarner; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 132 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Declaration of Dr. Nicholas Baines re: 129 Sealed Response to Motion by BorgWarner; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Stuart Rosenburg re 130 Sealed Document,, filed by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit K, # 3 Exhibit M, # 4 Exhibit Q)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 130 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Declaration of Stuart Rosenberg re: 129 Sealed Response to Motion by BorgWarner; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 129 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE (Sealed - Attorney) to Motion re: 109 Motion for Summary Judgment by BorgWarner; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 127 MOTION to Seal OPPOSITION PAPERS MOTION to Seal Document by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal OPPOSITION PAPERS, MOTION to Seal Document by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc..Responses due by 12/28/2009. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 108 Motion to FILE UNDER Seal certain pleadings. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on November 24, 2009. (jhg) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 98 Motion to FILE UNDER Seal Documents. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on November 24, 2009. (jhg) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 124 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Confidential Exhibits to Declaration of Erin C. Kolter ISO Honeywell's Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions re: 120 Declaration, 118 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions by Defendant, Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Index, # 2 Exhibit 28, # 3 Exhibit 29, # 4 Exhibit 30 - Part 1 of 2, # 5 Exhibit 30 - Part 2 of 2, # 6 Exhibit 31, # 7 Exhibit 32, # 8 Exhibit 33, # 9 Exhibit 34, # 10 Exhibit 35, # 11 Exhibit 36, # 12 Exhibit 37, # 13 Exhibit 38)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 123 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Confidential Exhibits to Declaration of Erin C. Kolter ISO Honeywell's Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions re: 120 Declaration, 118 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions by Defendant, Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 27 - Part 1 of 5, # 3 Exhibit 27 - Part 2 of 5, # 4 Exhibit 27 - Part 3 of 5, # 5 Exhibit 27 - Part 4 of 5, # 6 Exhibit 27 - Part 5 of 5)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 122 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Confidential Exhibits to Declaration of Erin C. Kolter ISO Honeywell's Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions re: 120 Declaration, 118 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions by Defendant, Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 17, # 3 Exhibit 18, # 4 Exhibit 19, # 5 Exhibit 20, # 6 Exhibit 21, # 7 Exhibit 22, # 8 Exhibit 23, # 9 Exhibit 24, # 10 Exhibit 26)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 121 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Confidential Exhibits to Declaration of Erin C. Kolter ISO Honeywell's Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions re: 120 Declaration, 118 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions by Defendant, Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8, # 8 Exhibit 9, # 9 Exhibit 10, # 10 Exhibit 11, # 11 Exhibit 12, # 12 Exhibit 13, # 13 Exhibit 14, # 14 Exhibit 15, # 15 Exhibit 16)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Erin C. Kolter re 118 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions filed by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3-24 [Notice of Sealed Exhibits], # 5 Exhibit 25, # 6 Exhibit 26-38 [Notice of Sealed Exhibits])(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 119 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Brief in Support of Honeywell's Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions re: 118 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions by Defendant, Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Chen, Philip) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions by Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 12/10/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 117 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Declaration of Brent Robinson ISO Honeywell's Motion for Summary Judgment re: 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the Patents-in-Suit by Defendant, Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit by Honeywell International, Inc.. Exhibit to 115 Sealed Document,, 109 Motion for Summary Judgment Non-Confidential Exhibits to Declaration of Jacqueline Kearey ISO Honeywell's Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 [Notice of Sealed Exhibit], # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3-4 [Notice of Sealed Exhibits], # 5 Exhibit 7, # 6 Exhibit 8-9 [Notice of Sealed Exhibits], # 7 Exhibit 10, # 8 Exhibit 11, # 9 Exhibit 12, # 10 Exhibit 14 [Notice of Sealed Exhibit], # 11 Exhibit 16-18 [Notice of Sealed Exhibits, # 12 Exhibit 20 [Notice of Sealed Exhibit])(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 115 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Declaration of Jacqueline Kearey ISO of Honeywell's Motion for Summary Judgment re: 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the Patents-in-Suit by Defendant, Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit 9, # 7 Exhibit 14, # 8 Exhibit 16, # 9 Exhibit 17, # 10 Exhibit 18, # 11 Exhibit 20)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit by Honeywell International, Inc.. Exhibit to 113 Sealed Document,, 109 Motion for Summary Judgment Non-Confidential Exhibits to Declaration of Sid Dyche ISO Honeywell's Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Part 1 of 2, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Part 2 of 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 [Notice of Sealed Exhibit], # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5-8 [Notice of Sealed Exhibits], # 8 Exhibit 9, # 9 Exhibit 11, # 10 Exhibit 12, # 11 Exhibit 13-17 {Notice of Sealed Exhibits])(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 113 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Declaration of Sid Dyche ISO of Honeywell's Motion for Summary Judgment re: 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the Patents-in-Suit by Defendant, Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 6, # 5 Exhibit 7, # 6 Exhibit 8, # 7 Exhibit 13, # 8 Exhibit 14, # 9 Exhibit 15, # 10 Exhibit 16, # 11 Exhibit 17)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 112 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Confidential Exhibits to Declaration of Philip T. Chen ISO Honeywell's Motion for Summary Judgment re: 111 Declaration, 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the Patents-in-Suit by Defendant, Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit M)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Philip T. Chen re 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the Patents-in-Suit filed by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A-F [Notice of Sealed Exhibits], # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H, # 5 Exhibit I, # 6 Exhibit J, # 7 Exhibit K, # 8 Exhibit L, # 9 Exhibit M [Notice of Sealed Exhibit}, # 10 Exhibit N, # 11 Exhibit O, # 12 Exhibit P)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 110 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Brief In Support of Honeywell's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the Patents-In-Suit re: 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the Patents-in-Suit by Defendant, Honeywell International, Inc.; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cohen, Marc) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the Patents-in-Suit by Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 12/10/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Documents by Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 12/10/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 107 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): DECLARATION OF KATHERINE PRESCOTT IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE FROM EVIDENCE re: 104 MOTION TO EXCLUDE FROM EVIDENCE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF CHRISTOPHER REED, JOHN T. GOOLKASIAN, AND BRENT ROBINSON by BorgWarner; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, Part 1 of 2, # 6 Exhibit E, Part 2 of 2, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Katherine Prescott re 104 MOTION TO EXCLUDE FROM EVIDENCE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF CHRISTOPHER REED, JOHN T. GOOLKASIAN, AND BRENT ROBINSON filed by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Exhibit J, # 4 Exhibit K, # 5 Exhibit O)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 105 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF EXPERT TESTIMONY re: 104 MOTION TO EXCLUDE FROM EVIDENCE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF CHRISTOPHER REED, JOHN T. GOOLKASIAN, AND BRENT ROBINSON by BorgWarner; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION TO EXCLUDE FROM EVIDENCE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF CHRISTOPHER REED, JOHN T. GOOLKASIAN, AND BRENT ROBINSON by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc..Responses due by 12/10/2009. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 103 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): DECLARATION OF ERIN KAISER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment by BorgWarner; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Erin Kaiser re 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit O, # 2 Exhibit P)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 101 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment by BorgWarner; (available to BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.) (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc..Responses due by 12/10/2009. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 98 MOTION to Seal Document by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Document by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc..Responses due by 12/10/2009. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT of Mediation by Frank W. Bullock, Jr. Outcome of Mediation: impasse. (Bullock, Frank) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 95 Motion to Amend pretrial order and case management deadlines.. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on September 16, 2009. (pdf) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 47 Scheduling Order, MOTION TO EXTEND MOTIONS DEADLINE AND STIPULATION REGARDING DISCOVERY SCHEDULE by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 10/2/2009. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 93 Motion to extend motions deadline and stipulation regarding Discovery Schedule and the Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan as follows: Discovery extended to 10/12/09; and motions filing deadline extended to 11/2/2009.. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/11/09. (pdf) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 90 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, by Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 6/22/2009. (Chen, Philip) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DESIGNATION of Frank W. Bullock, Jr. as Mediator by all the parties. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED REPLY OF BORGWARNER, INC. AND BORGWARNER TURBO SYSTEMS, INC. TO HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT; COUNTERCLAIM FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF ANSWER to 65 Amended Complaint by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc..(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 88 Motion to Amend/Correct Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan. The DDL for the exchange of opening expert reports is extended to 5/19/09; DDL for the exchange of rebuttal expert reports is extended to 6/25/09; DDL for the completion of discovery is extended to 8/6/09 and DDL for the filing of motions other than motions in limine or motions to continue, is extended to 9/3/09.. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/14/09. (pdf) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY OF BORGWARNER, INC. AND BORGWARNER TURBO SYSTEMS INC. TO HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT; COUNTERCLAIM FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF ANSWER to 87 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc..(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 47 Scheduling Order, by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 4/27/2009. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Second 65 Amended Complaint, Jury Demanded: Y, COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Relief against all plaintiffs by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Chen, Philip) on (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DESIGNATION of Jonathan Harkavy as Mediator by all the parties. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 03/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 80 Motion to Amend/Correct Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on March 20, 2009. (pdf) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 81 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Stuart M. Rosenberg for BorgWarner, Inc. and Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Corrin N. Drakulich for BorgWarner, Inc. and Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.; granting 82 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Stuart M. Rosenberg for BorgWarner, Inc. and Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Corrin N. Drakulich for BorgWarner, Inc. and Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on March 13, 2009. (pdf) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of MARKMAN HEARING held on 9/15/08 before Judge Martin K. Reidinger. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Policy at www.ncwd.uscourts.gov Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2009. (Reporter: Karen Miller, 828-771-7217) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stuart M. Rosenberg Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 04190000000000737488. by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Stuart Rosenberg)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Corrin N. Drakulich Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 04190000000000737470. by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Corrin D. Drakulich)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 44 Protective Order FOR ADDENDUM TO PROTECTIVE ORDER by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 3/20/2009. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 57 Motion for Claim Construction ; granting 58 Motion for Claim Construction. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/20/09. (pdf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2009: # 1 Main Document added correct PDF and deleted incorrect PDF) (pdf). Modified on 2/20/2009 (pdf). Regenerated NEF (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 77 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Erin E. Kaiser for BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on December 29, 2008. (jhg) (Entered: 12/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Erin E. Kaiser Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 04190000000000691929. by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Erin E. Kaiser)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 75 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Katherine D. Prescott for BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/25/08. (ejb) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Katherine D. Prescott Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 04190000000000673924. by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Katherine D. Prescott)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on August 21, 2008. (jhg) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY OF BORGWARNER, INC. AND BORGWARNER TURBO SYSTEMS, INC TO AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF ANSWER to 70 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc..(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 59 Motion to Stay and rescheduling the Markman hearing for Monday, September 15, 2008. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on July 7, 2008. (jhg) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 59 MOTION to Stay [Renewed] Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Chen, Philip) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 65 Amended Complaint Second, Amended COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Relief against BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. by Honeywell International, Inc..(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. Exhibit to 68 Response in Opposition to Motion TO STAY PROCEEDINGS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, Part 1 of 3, # 7 Exhibit F, Part 2 of 3, # 8 Exhibit F, Part 3 of 3)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 59 MOTION to Stay [Renewed] Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. Replies due by 6/27/2008. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 58 MOTION For Construction Of The Claims by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew Hollander, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 57 MOTION FOR CONSTRUCTION OF THE CLAIMS by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND against all defendants, filed by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, '556 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B, '347 Patent, # 3 Exhibit C, '949 Patent)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Memorandum by Honeywell International, Inc. as to 59 MOTION to Stay [Renewed] Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Philip T. Chen, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 57 MOTION FOR CONSTRUCTION OF THE CLAIMS by Honeywell International, Inc.. Replies due by 6/9/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew H. Hollander, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 58 MOTION For Construction Of The Claims by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. Replies due by 6/9/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit One, # 3 Exhibit Two, # 4 Exhibit Three, # 5 Exhibit Four, # 6 Exhibit Five, # 7 Exhibit Six)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Philip P. Chen re 59 MOTION to Stay [Renewed] Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit filed by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H - Part 1, # 9 Exhibit H - Part 2, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N - Part 1, # 16 Exhibit N - Part 2, # 17 Exhibit O - Part 1, # 18 Exhibit O - Part 2, # 19 Exhibit P - Part 1, # 20 Exhibit P - Part 2, # 21 Exhibit Q, # 22 Exhibit R, # 23 Exhibit S, # 24 Exhibit T, # 25 Exhibit U)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 59 MOTION to Stay [Renewed] Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay [Renewed] Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 6/13/2008. (Chen, Philip) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION For Construction Of The Claims by Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 5/27/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Honeywell's Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Declaration of Matthew A. Hollander, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION FOR CONSTRUCTION OF THE CLAIMS by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc..Responses due by 5/27/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Declaration of Ralph A. Phillips, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, Part 1 of 2, # 12 Exhibit 9, Part 2 of 2, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc. re 55 Amended Document (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED DOCUMENT by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. Amendment to 54 Exhibit, Rescanned Declaration to correct clerical error; Original Attachments, Exhibits 1 to 11, remain unchanged (McDevitt, Larry) *** Amended Document attached to entry 54 on 3/27/2008 (ejb). (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.. Exhibit to 52 Notice (Other) Exhibit B, Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One, # 2 Exhibit Two, # 3 Exhibit Three, # 4 Exhibit Four, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Seven, # 8 Exhibit Eight, # 9 Exhibit Nine, # 10 Exhibit Ten, # 11 Exhibit Eleven)(McDevitt, Larry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2008: # 12 Main Document) (ejb). (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.. Exhibit to 52 Notice (Other) Exhibit A - Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One, # 2 Exhibit Two, # 3 Exhibit Three, # 4 Exhibit Four, # 5 Exhibit Five, # 6 Exhibit Six, # 7 Exhibit Seven, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc. re 47 Scheduling Order, JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 48 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/24/08. (jhg) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Philip T. Chen re 48 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit filed by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, part 1, # 8 Exhibit G, part 2, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, part 1, # 14 Exhibit L, part 2, # 15 Exhibit M, part 1, # 16 Exhibit M, part 2, # 17 Exhibit N, part 1, # 18 Exhibit N, part 2, # 19 Exhibit O, # 20 Exhibit P, # 21 Exhibit Q, # 22 Exhibit R)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 48 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by Honeywell International, Inc..Responses due by 4/7/2008. (Chen, Philip) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: MARKMAN HEARING tentative set for 7/1/2008 10:00 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before District Judge Martin Reidinger. All other dates to be set following such hearing. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/11/08. (jhg) Modified on 3/3/2008 (jhg). (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/21/08. (jhg) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 26 Motion to Change Venue; terminating 38 Memorandum and Recommendations.. Signed by District Judge Martin Karl Reidinger on 2/11/08. (jhg) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Martin Karl Reidinger on 2/8/08. (jhg) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 42 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nancy Lewis Huegerich terminated. Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 12/14/07. (jhg) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of Nancy Huegerich by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Huegerich, Nancy). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 12/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re: 26 Motion to Change Venue by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Declaration of Brent Robinson)(Chen, Philip) (Entered: 11/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 39 Miscellaneous Filing TO HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S LIMITED OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOWELL'S MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Miscellaneous Filing by Honeywell International, Inc.. re: 38 Memorandum and Recommendations [Honeywell's Limited Objection to the Magistrate Judge's October 16, 2007 Memorandum and Recommendation] (Huegerich, Nancy) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 26 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Honeywell International, Inc. Objections to M&R due by 11/2/2007. Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 10/16/07. (ejb) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Support re 26 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Huegerich, Nancy) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Miscellaneous Filing by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.. PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc..(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 32 Motion to file under Seal. Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 8/30/07. (jhg) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document re: re 32 MOTION to Seal Document (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I)(jhg) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to file under Seal by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1# 2 Exhibit A part 2# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Errata D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Errata F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I)(jhg). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 28 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 8/20/07. (jhg) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Counterclaim by BorgWarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc..(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document re: (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I)(jhg) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to file under Seal by Borgwarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jhg). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 26 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Huegerich, Nancy) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Change Venue by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Declaration of Brent Robinson)(Huegerich, Nancy). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International, Inc. (Huegerich, Nancy) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement, COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Relief against all plaintiffs by Honeywell International, Inc..(Huegerich, Nancy) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Honeywell International, Inc., filed by Borgwarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc..(McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Phillip Chen for Honeywell International, Inc., Marc H. Cohen for Honeywell International, Inc., Robert G. Krupka for Honeywell International, Inc.; granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Phillip Chen for Honeywell International, Inc., Marc H. Cohen for Honeywell International, Inc., Robert G. Krupka for Honeywell International, Inc.; granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Phillip Chen for Honeywell International, Inc., Marc H. Cohen for Honeywell International, Inc., Robert G. Krupka for Honeywell International, Inc.. Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 6/26/07. (jhg) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Honeywell International, Inc. answer due 7/25/2007.. Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 6/25/07. (jhg) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Huegerich, Nancy). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Ferrell, Forrest). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Krupka Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 365334. by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Ferrell, Forrest). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Marc Cohen Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 365330. by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Ferrell, Forrest). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Philip Chen Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 365320. by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Ferrell, Forrest). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Ralph A. Phillips for Borgwarner, Inc. and Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 6/21/07. (jhg) (Entered: 06/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added David M. Barkan for Borgwarner, Inc. and Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 6/21/07. (jhg) (Entered: 06/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Joshua A. Griswold for Borgwarner, Inc. and Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 6/21/07. (jhg) Modified on 6/22/2007 (Gosnell, Joan). (Entered: 06/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ralph A.Phillips Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 363871. by Borgwarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. (McDevitt, Larry). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 06/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joshua A. Griswold Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 363865. by Borgwarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. (McDevitt, Larry). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 06/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David M. Barkan Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 363838. by Borgwarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. (McDevitt, Larry). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 06/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint Honeywell International, Inc. answer due 7/5/2007. Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 6/13/07. (ejb) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Huegerich, Nancy). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT on the filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers. See Complaint. (jhg) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ERROR: Docketed without the form. SEE NO. 6 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers. See Complaint. (jhg) Modified on 6/1/2007 (Gosnell, Joan). (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Borgwarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. Honeywell International, Inc. served on 5/25/2007, answer due 6/14/2007. (McDevitt, Larry) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc..(jhg) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Borgwarner, Inc..(jhg) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Honeywell International, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 22146.), filed by Borgwarner, Inc., Borgwarner Turbo Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued# 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jhg) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 99 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?