AMES v. CORPORATION OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:06-cv-03441

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 12:54 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAVID V. AMES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Susan Kellman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM J. MARTIN +1 856 858 0900 wjm983@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross & Rubino

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/21/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEPHEN C. RUBINO +1 609 487 9864 scr@rossandrubino.com
v.
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED REBECCA KRAMER BROWN +1 973 639 1234 rebecca.brown@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan E. Kraus +1 973 639 1234 +1 973 639 7298 alan.kraus@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Andrew Rosenthal +1 212 849 7000 paulrosenthal@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo WILLIAM SCOTT HANSON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by (1-W) 571800C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM SCOTT HANSON
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 56 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE - reported settled. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 1/20/09. (gh, ) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
    LREF
    Blank 55 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William J. Martini: Settlement Conference held on 1/13/2009. (Court Reporter/Recorder Walter Perelli.) (gh, ) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 35 Motion seeking to bar Plaintiff's punitive damage claim; and decision reserved on remaining for Summary Judgment issues. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 9/16/08. (gh, ) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William J. Martini: Motion Hearing held on 9/16/2008 re 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Striking Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages filed by CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS; In chambers conference held on 9/16/2008. (Court Reporter/Recorder Molly Giordano.) (gh, ) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
          Court's Letter to Michael T. Pfau, counsel to plaintiff, denying request to appear at the mediation of this matter telephonically. (gh, ) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
            Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael Pfau to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 03120000000002136363.) (MARTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
              Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Timothy D. Kosnoff to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 03120000000002136330.) (MARTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Chad A. Bowers to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (MARTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William J. Martini: Status/Settlement Conference held on 8/6/2008. (gh, ) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                    NOTICE of Settlement Conference before Judge William J. Martini on 8/6/08 at 10:30 a.m. (gh, ) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Striking Plaintiff's Claim for Punative Damages (Sur-reply brief) filed by DAVID V. AMES. (MARTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                        Letter from defendant in opposition to plaintiff's application for leave to file a sur-reply re 44 Letter. (KRAUS, ALAN) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                          Letter from plaintiff seeking leave to file sur-reply. (MARTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Striking Plaintiff's Claim for Punative Damages filed by CORPORATION OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Paul A. Rosenthal, Esq., # 2 Exhibit A of the Rosenthal Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit B of the Rosenthal Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit C of the Rosenthal Affidavit, # 5 Exhibit D of the Rosenthal Affidavit, # 6 Exhibit E of the Rosenthal Affidavit, # 7 Exhibit F of the Rosenthal Affidavit, # 8 Exhibit G of the Rosenthal Affidavit, # 9 Exhibit H of the Rosenthal Affidavit, # 10 Exhibit I of the Rosenthal Affidavit, # 11 Exhibit J of the Rosenthal Affidavit, # 12 Exhibit K of the Rosenthal Affidavit, # 13 Exhibit L of the Rosenthal Affidavit, # 14 Exhibit M of the Rosenthal Affidavit, # 15 Certificate of Service, # 16 Cover letter from Alan E. Kraus, Esq.)(KRAUS, ALAN) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                              BRIEF in Opposition re 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Striking Plaintiff's Claim for Punative Damages filed by DAVID V. AMES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit)(MARTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/19/2008, Entered: None
                                Letter from plaintiff for leave to file over-length brief re 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Striking Plaintiff's Claim for Punative Damages. (MARTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/19/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None
                                  Exhibit to DAVID V. AMES Re 39 Letter. (MARTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
                                    Letter from William J. Martin, Esq.. (Attachments: # 1 Report/Exhibit)(MARTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
                                      Letter from Alan E. Kraus. (KRAUS, ALAN) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None
                                        Rule 7.1 Letter for extension of return date re 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Striking Plaintiff's Claim for Punative Damages filed by DAVID V. AMES. (BRYAN, RICHARD) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Letter from Alan E. Kraus to Magistrate Judge Falk Re: Discovery Dispute. (KRAUS, ALAN) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Striking Plaintiff's Claim for Punative Damages by CORPORATION OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS. Responses due by 4/7/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 L.Civ.R. 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Affidavit of Paul A. Rosenthal, Esq. - Part 1, # 4 Affidavit of Paul A. Rosenthal, Esq. - Part 2, # 5 Affidavit of Paul A. Rosenthal, Esq. - Part 3, # 6 Affidavit of Paul A. Rosenthal, Esq. - Part 4, # 7 Affidavit of Paul A. Rosenthal, Esq. - Part 5, # 8 Affidavit of Paul A. Rosenthal, Esq. - Part 6, # 9 Affidavit of Paul A. Rosenthal, Esq. - Part 7, # 10 Certificate of Service, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(KRAUS, ALAN) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                              Letter from Alan E. Kraus re 33 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - K)(KRAUS, ALAN) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                Letter from William J. Martin, Esq.. (BRYAN, RICHARD) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re: Timothy D. Kosnoff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 1/28/08. (sr, ) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re: Michael T. Pfau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 1/28/08. (sr, ) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Michael T. Pfau) by DAVID V. AMES. (MARTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                        Letter re 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (MARTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DAVID V. AMES. (MARTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER:Fact Discovery due by 3/7/2008, Expert Discovery to be completed by 5/1/08, dispositive motions must be filed by 3/24/08; etc.. Signed by Judge Mark Falk on 1/9/08. (sr, ) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL ANDREW ROSENTHAL on behalf of CORPORATION OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ROSENTHAL, PAUL) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                Letter from plaintiff requesting discovery extension by consent. (MARTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  Substitution of Attorney - Attorney WILLIAM J. MARTIN and WILLIAM J. MARTIN for DAVID V. AMES added. Attorney STEPHEN C. RUBINO terminated.. (MARTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark Falk on 10/18/07. (dc, ) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007
                                                                      Letter from Alan E. Kraus re 21 Monthly MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Chad A. Bowers, Esquire. (KRAUS, ALAN)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                        Monthly MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Chad A. Bowers, Esquire by DAVID V. AMES. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(RUBINO, STEPHEN)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER denying 15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 9/21/07. (gh, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Court Filing
                                                                            AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER fact Discovery shall remain open through 12/31/2007.. Signed by Judge Mark Falk on 6/26/07. (sr, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER for release of DYFS records to deft COP & pltf. Signed by Judge Mark Falk on 6/19/07. (sr, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007
                                                                                CERTIFICATION in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DAVID V. AMES. (RUBINO, STEPHEN)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007
                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by DAVID V. AMES. (RUBINO, STEPHEN)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss complaint by WILLIAM SCOTT HANSON. (Attachments: # 1 certification# 2 cert. of mailing# 3 p/o# 4 cover letter)(sr, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                      CONSENT ORDER for the deposition of William Scott Hanson. Signed by Judge Mark Falk on 5/5/07. (sr, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                        CONSENT ORDER for release of records and in camera review. Signed by Judge Mark Falk on 5/4/07. (sr, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                          STIPULATION/ORDER governing confidential information. Signed by Judge Mark Falk on 5/2/07. (sr, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT/Certification in support of discovery confidentiality order of Alan E. Kraus by CORPORATION OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(KRAUS, ALAN)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007
                                                                                              Letter from Alan E. Kraus. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(KRAUS, ALAN)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007
                                                                                                Letter from Alan E. Kraus. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(KRAUS, ALAN)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by REBECCA KRAMER BROWN on behalf of CORPORATION OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, REBECCA)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                    PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/29/2007, indicating this matter is administratively terminated as to deft Hanson, who is in bankruptcy, however, shall be subject to opposition; etc. Signed by Judge Ronald J. Hedges on 11/29/06. (sr, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006
                                                                                                      Letter submitted by deft William Scott Hanson addressed to Stephen Rubino, Esq. w/bankruptcy court papers attached thereto. (sr, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER Initial Conference set for 11/22/2006 10:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Ronald J. Hedges.. Signed by Judge Ronald J. Hedges on 9/25/06. (nm, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006
                                                                                                          STATEMENT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 7.1 by CORPORATION OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS. (KRAUS, ALAN)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006
                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by CORPORATION OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(KRAUS, ALAN)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006
                                                                                                              Letter from Alan E. Kraus re 1 Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order CONSENT ORDER extending Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint)(KRAUS, ALAN)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006
                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against CORPORATION OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS, WILLIAM SCOTT HANSON (Filing fee $ 350.) JURY DEMAND, filed by DAVID V. AMES.(lm2, )
                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?