PLAINTIFF v. DEFENDANT
Federal Court Proceeding New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:33-av-00001

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 26, 2017 at 11:30 PM ST (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Plaintiff, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Plaintiff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Defendant, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Defendant

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DEFENDANT
Citation Section 99 U.S.C. § 9999
Nature of Suit 999 - Miscellaneous Cases
  Entries (4918) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8132 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
COMPLAINT - Brian Judge v. Diversified Consultants, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7671645.) (n). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (GINSBURG, AMY) Modified on 2/24/2017 (dd).17-1302JBS/AMD (Entered: 02/24/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8131 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Susan Chiacco and Joseph Chiacco v Target Corporation; Court Number/Name: Burlington County Docket L-55-17. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7668832.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (PHILLIPPI, POLLY) Modified on 2/23/2017 (dd).17-1267NLH/KMW (Entered: 02/23/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8130 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      COMPLAINT - Smith v. Mercuri et al Complaint ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7668743.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (STEENSON, DEREK) Modified on 2/23/2017 (dd).17-1278JBS/KMW (Entered: 02/23/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8129 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: James Clay v. Department of Law & Public Safety, et al.; Court Number/Name: CUM-L-292-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7665396.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Certificate of Service) (GIBBONS, ADAM) Modified on 2/22/2017 (dd).17-1241RMB/AMD (Entered: 02/22/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8128 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Millie Otto v. Walmart, Walmart Stores, Inc., John A. Doe, John B. Doe, Inc., John C. Doe, John D. Doe, Inc., John E. Doe, John F. Doe, John Doe Maintenance and/or John Doe Insurance Company; Court Number/Name: CAM-L-2020-16; Superior Court of New Jersey Camden County. (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 4 Exhibit R) (WILLIAMS, GWYNETH)Filing and Admin fee $ 400 Rec. #0312-7665107 Modified on 2/22/2017 (dd).17-1223JBS/AMD (Entered: 02/22/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8127 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            COMPLAINT - Angelicia L. Jones v. The United States of America, et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7664955.). (RENZI, NICHOLAS) 17-1217 RMB/KMW No Arb. Modified on 2/22/2017 (mmb). (Entered: 02/22/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8126 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              COMPLAINT - Stanley Mecholasky v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7662267.). (QUINN, SEAN) Modified on 2/21/2017 (dd).17-1197RMB/KMW (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8125 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                COMPLAINT - Kathleen Steinberg and Paul Steinberg v. CVS Pharmacy Inc. and CVS Margate Ventnor LLC and New Jersey CVS Pharmacy LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7661783.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet designation form, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet case management) (MILLER, ROBERT) Modified on 2/21/2017 (dd).17-1195JHR/JS (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8124 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  COMPLAINT - HENDERSON AQUATICS, INC. v. DWIGHT STEINHAUSER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7661367.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Track Designation Form) (MCEWING, BRIAN) Modified on 2/21/2017 (dd).Trenton Case Modified on 2/21/2017 (jjc, ). 17-1192(PGS/TJB) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8123 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: ESTATE OF DOMENIC J. CARUSO V. MIDLAND CREDIT MGMT., INC.; Court Number/Name: CPM-DC-000066-17 Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Special Civil Part in Cape May County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7659003.). (LAVELLE, ELLEN) Modified on 2/21/2017 (dd). 17-1146RMB/JS (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8122 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Arlyn Adasczik and Nicole Taylor-Worthington v. PHH Mortgage Corporation; Court Number/Name: NJSuper.Ct. BURL-L-00046-17. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7658428.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Certification, # 5 Corp Disclosure Statement) (BECICA, IVO) Modified on 2/21/2017 (dd).17-1064JHR/JS (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8121 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        COMPLAINT - Steven J. Frizzie v Commissioner of Social Security (y). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Application IFP) (WLADYKA, AGNES) Modified on 2/21/2017 (dd).17-1067RBK Modified on 2/21/2017 (dd).17-1067 JBS (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8120 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Sabrina Guidicipietro Varona and Eric Varona v. Hershal Thompson, Spitale Company, John Does; Court Number/Name: CAM-L-29-17 (Camden Superior Court. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7655793.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Certificate of Service) (BALLARD, ZACHARY) Modified on 2/17/2017 (dd). 17-1086JBS/JS (Entered: 02/16/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8119 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEFENDANT identifying Inspira Health Network as Corporate Parent.. (WIETRZYCHOWSKI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8118 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Terry Zanni-Schaffer v. Inspira Health Network and Inspira Medical Center Vineland; Court Number/Name: L-93-17 Superior Court of New Jersey, Gloucester County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7655535.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal) (WIETRZYCHOWSKI, MICHAEL) Modified on 2/16/2017 (dd).17-1078RMB/KMW (Entered: 02/16/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8117 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Rachel Vezeriannis v. Central Credit Services, LLC; Court Number/Name: Dkt. No. SC167-17; Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division Special Civil Part, Atlantic County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7655398.) (N). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (EASLEY, AARON) Modified on 2/16/2017 (dd).17-1077NLH/KMEW (Entered: 02/16/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8116 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Niblack v. Thompson, et al.; Court Number/Name: CAM-L-4537-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7651821.). (Attachments: # 1 Statement, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Exhibit A) (GAGNON, ASHLEY) Modified on 2/16/2017 (dd).17-1046NLH/JS (Entered: 02/15/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8115 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Carneys Point Township v. The Chemours Company and The Chemours Company FC, LLC; Court Number/Name: SLM-L-7-17 Superior Court of New Jersey-Salem County-Law Division. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7650537.). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Certificate of Service) (DONOVAN, MARTHA) 17-1025 NLH/JS No Arb. Set Initial Conf. Modified on 2/15/2017 (mmb). (Entered: 02/15/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8114 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Mendoza, et al. v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.; ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7649344.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint) (COTTRELL, FLOYD) NEWARK CASE Modified on 2/15/2017 (mmb). 2:17cv1087 (MCA/LDW)(arb) (Passaic) Modified on 2/17/2017 (eu). (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8113 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        COMPLAINT - Colburn v. Adelphia Three Corp. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7648488.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons) (MAINS, DEBORAH) Modified on 2/14/2017 (dd).17-984KMW/JS (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8112 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          COMPLAINT - Debra Fusco v. Philomena Amendt a/k/a Phyllis Amendt ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7647456.). (WEITZ, DANA) Modified on 2/14/2017 (dd).17-980RBK/KMW (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8111 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7646237.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Letter, # 6 Notice of Motion, # 7 Statement no brief is necessary, # 8 Text of Proposed Order, # 9 Certificate of Service) (GIBLIN, VINCENT) Modified on 2/14/2017 (dd).17-971RMB/AMD (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8110 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS, et al. v. EXCEL SERVICE & CONSTRUCTION, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7646078.). (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, # 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 4 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 5 STATEMENT, # 6 ORDER, # 7 JUDGMENT, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (PARSONS, BRADLEY) Modified on 2/14/2017 (dd).17-969RBK/KMW (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8109 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 825 Employee Benefit Funds v. JRC Consulting Group LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7645576.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Letter, # 6 Notice of Motion, # 7 Statement, # 8 Text of Proposed Order, # 9 Certificate of Service) (GIBLIN, VINCENT) Modified on 2/14/2017 (dd).17-968JBS/KMW (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8108 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  COMPLAINT - Tom Johnson v. South Jersey Port Corporation ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7645533.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A) (BAIRD, GRAHAM) Modified on 2/14/2017 (dd).17-967RBK/KMW (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8107 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 825 Employee Benefit Funds v. GFI Sitework LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7640566.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Letter) (GIBLIN, VINCENT) Modified on 2/9/2017 (dd).17-869NLH/KMW (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8106 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      COMPLAINT - United States of America v. WVM Construction, Inc. (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Indebtedness, # 2 COI, # 3 COI, # 4 COI, # 5 COI, # 6 COI, # 7 COI, # 8 COI, # 9 COI, # 10 COI, # 11 COI, # 12 COI, # 13 COI, # 14 COI, # 15 COI, # 16 COI, # 17 COI, # 18 COI) (AMORE, CHRISTOPHER) 17-844 RBK/JS No Arb Modified on 2/8/2017 (mmb). (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8105 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        COMPLAINT - Baumgardner Construction Company, Inc. v. DCK Worldwide, LLC, and John Jones, James Doe, Jane Jones and Susan Doe ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7639131.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (PERILLO, SALVATORE) 17-842 RMB/AMD Arb Modified on 2/8/2017 (mmb). (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8104 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Harry Tornetta, et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.; ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7632041.). (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (TOLLIVER, TAISHA) Modified on 2/6/2017 (dd).17-765NLH/JS (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8103 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT, filed by PLAINTIFF. (Attachments: # 1 Application IFP Signed IFP)(RADIN, ELLEN) Modified on 2/6/2017 (dd).Newark case 2:17-cv-00576(JMV) UNION Modified on 2/6/2017 (jr). (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8102 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              COMPLAINT - Vadnais v. Morgan and Morgan, PC d/b/a Morgan, Bornstein and Morgan ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7630728.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HERSH, LAWRENCE) Modified on 2/3/2017 (dd).17-748RBK/KMW (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8101 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Evan O'Brien, M.D., on assignment of Annette N. v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas and Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey; Court Number/Name: NJSuper.Ct. GLO-L-1570-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7630387.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Papers, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Statement Rule 7.1 Statement, # 5 Certification Local Rule 11.2 Certification) (SEKEL, ANNE) Modified on 2/3/2017 (dd).17-746JHR/JS (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8100 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Pro Cap III v. Township of Willingboro v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs; Court Number/Name: Bur-L-1929-16. (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A-D, # 3 Certificate of Service) (O'NEILL, JESSICA) Modified on 2/3/2017 (dd).17-731JHR/AMD (Entered: 02/02/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8099 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: JOYCE HUGHLEY v. ROADRUNNER TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INC. AND DENNIS NORWOOD; Court Number/Name: SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, BURLINGTON COUNTY LAW DIVISION, DOCKET BUR-L-2684-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7628230.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (SCHIPSKE, TIMOTHY) Modified on 2/3/2017 (dd).17-730NLH/AMD (Entered: 02/02/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8098 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: McGough Bus Company, Inc. v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company; Court Number/Name: Superior Court of New Jersey, Gloucester County, Docket No. GLO-L-1552-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7628114.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (WILSON, WILLIAM) Modified on 2/3/2017 (dd).17-729JBS/KMW (Entered: 02/02/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8097 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF FIRE FIGHTERS, AFL-CIO, LOCAL 198, and WILLIAM DiLORENZO, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated V. CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY, NEW JERSEY, CHARLES RICHMAN, COMMISSIONER OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY SERVICES, sued in his official capacity, TIMOTHY CUNNINGHAM, DIRECTOR OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY SERVICES, DIVISION OF LOCAL GOVERNMENT SERVICES, sued in his official capacity, and JEFFREY CHIESA, DESIGNEE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY SERVICES, DIVISION OF LOCAL GOVERNMENT SERVICES, sued in his official capacity; Court Number/Name: Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Atlantic County, ATL-L-222-17. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7627386.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (part 1), # 3 Exhibit B (part 2), # 4 Exhibit B (part 3), # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Certification (Rule 11.2 Certification), # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Certificate of Service) (ISRAEL, RONALD) Modified on 2/2/2017 (dd).Chambers Review Modified on 2/3/2017 (dd).17-725RMB/JS (Entered: 02/02/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8096 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Rahul Shah, M.D., o/a/o Sheila H. v. Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey, et al.; Court Number/Name: CUM-L-861-16, Superior Court of New Jersey, Cumberland County, Law Division. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7626068.). (Attachments: # 1 Disclosure Statement, # 2 Certification of Filing and Service) (HOLZAPFEL, MICHAEL) Modified on 2/2/2017 (dd).17-711NLH/AMD (Entered: 02/02/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8095 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            COMPLAINT - Nicole Rando v. Edible Arrangements International, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7625549.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Cover Letter) (CLARK, GERALD) Modified on 2/2/2017 (dd).17-701JBS/AMD (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8094 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Rahul Shah, M.D. a/s/o Christopher H. v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama, et al.; Court Number/Name: Superior Court of New Jersey, Cumberland County, Docket No. CUM-L-859-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7625009.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 and 2 to Notice of Removal, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 4 Rule 6.1 Request for Extension of Time to Respond, # 5 Certificate of Service, # 6 Pay.Gov Payment Confirmation)Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7624237) (MERCED, JOCELYN) Modified on 2/2/2017 (dd). Modified on 2/2/2017 (dd).17-700JBS/KMW (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8093 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Bartee v. Porto; Court Number/Name: CPM-L-18-17. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7623846.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Exhibit "A", Plaintiff's Complaint) (BRYANT, BENJAMIN) Modified on 2/1/2017 (dd).17-685RBK/JS (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8092 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF FIRE FIGHTERS, AFL-CIO, LOCAL 198, and WILLIAM DiLORENZO, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated V. CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY, NEW JERSEY, CHARLES RICHMAN, COMMISSIONER OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY SERVICES, sued in his official capacity, TIMOTHY CUNNINGHAM, DIRECTOR OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY SERVICES, DIVISION OF LOCAL GOVERNMENT SERVICES, sued in his official capacity, and JEFFREY CHIESA, DESIGNEE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY SERVIECS, DIVISION OF LOCAL GOVERNMENT SERVICES, sued in his official capacity; Court Number/Name: ATL-L-208-17 Superior Court Of Atlantic County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7622943.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-1, # 3 Exhibit B-2, # 4 Exhibit B-3, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Local Civil Rule 11.2 Certification, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Certificate of Service) (ISRAEL, RONALD) Modified on 2/1/2017 (dd).170665RMB/JS (Entered: 01/31/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8091 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Donald Russell v. FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.; Court Number/Name: CAM-L-4746-16, Superior Court of New Jersey: Law Division. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7622604.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (GANZ, DAVID) Modified on 2/1/2017 (dd).170664JHR/JS (Entered: 01/31/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8090 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEFENDANT. (WECKERLY, MICHELE) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8089 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Rahul Shah, M.D., o/a/o Mary A. v. Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey; Court Number/Name: CUM-L-860-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7619229.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certification of Filing and Service, # 3 Disclosure Statement) (HOLZAPFEL, MICHAEL) Modified on 1/31/2017 (dd).17-632NLH/AMD (Entered: 01/30/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8088 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Gail Caron v. Graber Supply, LLC individually and dba GRABER BUILDINGS, GRABER BUILDINGS, TRIPLE D TRUSS, LLC, JOHN DOE, LLC AND JOHN DOE, INC.; Court Number/Name: SLM-L-241-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7619151.). (WECKERLY, MICHELE) Modified on 1/31/2017 (dd).17-631NLH/AMD (Entered: 01/30/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8087 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Barbara Sherrill v. Wal-Mart, et al; (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Statement Disclosure Statement, # 2 Statement Letter to Judge, # 3 Statement Removal receipt) (TOLLIVER, TAISHA) Modified on 1/30/2017 (dd).17-598RBK/KMW (Entered: 01/30/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8086 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Holtec International d/b/a Holtec Manufacturing Division, Inc. v. Ameritube, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7615925.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A) (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) Modified on 1/30/2017 (dd).17-594RBK/JS (Entered: 01/27/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8085 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Ira Slovin and Lisa Slovin, H/W v. Generac Power Systems, Inc.; Generac Holdings, Inc.; The Home Depot USA, Inc.; Home Depot, Inc.; Home Depot Product Authority, LLC, f/k/a/ Home Depot Services; Court Number/Name: Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Camden County, Docket No.: CAM-L-4553-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7615799.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Declaration, # 6 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 7 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 8 Certificate of Service, # 9 Answer, Third Party Complaint) (KELLY, PAUL) Modified on 1/30/2017 (dd).17-592RMB/AMD (Entered: 01/27/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8084 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Deborah Muns v. Camden County Board of Social Services ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7615467.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KOLLER, DAVID) Modified on 1/30/2017 (dd). 17-587RBK/KMW (Entered: 01/27/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8083 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - Brian Judge v. Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7615226.) (n). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (GINSBURG, AMY) Modified on 1/27/2017 (dd).17-575NLH/JS (Entered: 01/27/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8082 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - WAYLON UNDERWOOD v. HARVEST MOORESTOWN LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7613152.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Request for Summons) (SANTILLO, R.) Modified on 1/27/2017 (dd).17-550RMB/JS (Entered: 01/26/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8081 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Saroza v. Lyons, Doughty & Veldhuis, P.C/ ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7610818.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HERSH, LAWRENCE) Modified on 1/26/2017 (dd).17-523RBK/AMD (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8080 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          PETITION to quash/compel/enforce Subpoenas - Chou et al. v. Subaru of America, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7610790.). (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Text of Proposed Order, # 20 Certificate of Service) (WATKINS, CASEY) Modified on 1/26/2017 (dd).Chambers Review Modified on 1/26/2017 (dd).17-533JBS/KMW (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8079 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - WESTWOOD SHIPPING LINES, INC. v. RUDOLF SCHEPERS SCHIFFAHRTSGES.mbH & CO. KG ms JOHANNES-S GmbH & COMPANY KG in personam and the M/V JOHANNES-S, her engines, boilers, tackle, etc., in rem ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7610478.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C) (REEVES, MARY) Modified on 1/26/2017 (dd).17-522NLH/AMD (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8078 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - ASA PARIS v. FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION; BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; SETERUS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7609925.). (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons) (MASCIOCCHI, THOMAS) Modified on 1/25/2017 (dd).17-510JHR/AMD (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8077 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Hansen v. Atlantic County Justice Facility, et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7604797.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D) (HEIM, DAVID) Modified on 1/24/2017 (dd).17-466JBS/JS (Entered: 01/23/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8076 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - monica sula v Rowan ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7603481.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (FRIEDMAN, BENJAMIN) Modified on 1/23/2017 (dd).17-453RBK/JS (Entered: 01/23/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8075 Filed: 1/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT, filed by PLAINTIFF. (Attachments: # 1 Application IFP)(RADIN, ELLEN) Modified on 1/23/2017 (dd).Newark Case 2:17cv440 (JLL) (Essex) Modified on 1/23/2017 (eu). (Entered: 01/21/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8074 Filed: 1/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT, filed by PLAINTIFF. (Attachments: # 1 Application IFP)(RADIN, ELLEN) Modified on 1/23/2017 (dd).Newark Case 2:17cv439 (JMV) (Essex) Modified on 1/23/2017 (eu). (Entered: 01/21/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8073 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Holtec International d/b/a Holtec Manufacturing Division, Inc., et al v. Pandjiris, Inc., et al ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7601609.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2) (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) Modified on 2/1/2017 (dd).17-666RMB/JS (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8072 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - John Knauss v Commissioner of Social Security (y). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Application IFP, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service) (TOVINSKY, LAUREN) Modified on 2/1/2017 (dd).17-437RMB (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8071 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Irene Dallis vs. NJ Transit Corporation and Amtrak; Court Number/Name: Superior Court of New Jersey Camden County Docket No L- 4510-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7600042.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Declaration of Service) (MARCUS, ALEXANDER) Modified on 1/20/2017 (dd).17-407JHR/KMW (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8070 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD v. MYLAN N.V et al ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7599268.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Certification L.Civ.R.11.2, # 4 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (CHUDEREWICZ, MELISSA) Modified on 1/20/2017 (dd).17-392JBS/KMW (Entered: 01/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8069 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - United States of America v. Nobel Learning Communities d/b/a Chesterbrook Academy (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ANGER, JORDAN) Modified on 1/19/2017 (dd). 17-366NLH/JS (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8068 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - TRUSTEES OF THE IBEW LOCAL 351 PENSION FUND; IBEW LOCAL 351 SURETY FUND; IBEW LOCAL 351 WELFARE FUND; IBEW LOCAL 351 JOINT APPRENTICESHIP AND TRAINING COMMITTEE; SOUTH JERSEY ELECTRICAL WORKERS TEMPORARY DISABILITY FUND for and on behalf of themselves and said FUNDS; and IBEW LOCAL UNION NO. 351, Plaintiffs, v. OLIVER COMMUNICATIONS GROUP, Defendant ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312 7594811.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (BUSHINSKY, STEVEN) Modified on 1/18/2017 (dd).17-357NLH/KMW (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8067 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS, et al. v. EXCEL SERVICE & CONSTRUCTION, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7593382.). (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, # 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 4 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 5 STATEMENT, # 6 ORDER, # 7 JUDGMENT, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (PARSONS, BRADLEY) Modified on 1/18/2017 (dd).17-339RMB/KMW (Entered: 01/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8066 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Reckitt Benckiser LLC v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7589699.). (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only) of Reckitt Benckiser LLC, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (LIZZA, CHARLES) Modified on 1/17/2017 (dd).Chambers Review Modified on 1/17/2017 (dd).17-304RMB/JS (Entered: 01/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8065 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - JOSE GALICIA V. AMOROSOS BAKING COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7589554.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KOLLER, DAVID) Modified on 1/17/2017 (dd).17-303RMB/AMD (Entered: 01/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8064 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - Jacqueline Akrigg v Commissioner of Social Security (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Application IFP, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service) (TOVINSKY, LAUREN) Modified on 1/12/2017 (dd).17-237RBK (Entered: 01/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8063 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Rahul Shah, M.D., o/a/o Audrey A. v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois and Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey; Court Number/Name: NJSuper.Ct. CUM-L-787-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7585229.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Papers, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Statement Rule 7.1 Statement, # 5 Certification Local Rule 11.2 Certification) (SEKEL, ANNE) Modified on 1/12/2017 (dd).17-235JHR/JS (Entered: 01/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8062 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Amy Sipps v. Brooke Radzik ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7580858.). (QUINN, SEAN) Modified on 1/10/2017 (dd).17-165RBK/JS (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8061 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Richard Randall v. Balford Farms, Inc. and Milk Industry Management Corporation d/b/a Balford Farms with Civil Cover Sheet and Jury Demand ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7579162.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MURPHY, MICHAEL) Modified on 1/10/2017 (dd).17-158RMB/KMW (Entered: 01/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8060 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Plasterers Local 8 Pension Fund, et al. v. Jersey Panel Corporation ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7578906.). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3) (SZNYTER, JUDITH) Modified on 1/10/2017 (dd).17-157JHR/KMW (Entered: 01/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8059 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - Ali Case v. Twin Oaks Community Services, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7576242.). (WEINBERG, MARC) Modified on 1/9/2017 (dd).17-138RMB/KMW (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8058 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Brenda Schultz v. Lowe's Companies, Inc., et al ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7573707.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (MENDELSOHN, MATTHEW) Modified on 1/6/2017 (dd).17-87JHR/KMW (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8057 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Henry Ruffin v. Dawn Catania ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7573262.). (QUINN, SEAN) Modified on 1/6/2017 (dd).17-86JHR/JS (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8056 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - Shaina Dorsey v. TD Bank, N.A. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7572769.). (DENITTIS, STEPHEN) Modified on 1/5/2017 (dd).17-74RMB/JS (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8055 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Aspen Hills Healthcare Center v. Abner F. Bye, et al.; Court Number/Name: BUR-L-1744-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7570660.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A thru C to Notice of Removal, # 2 Notice to Adverse Parties, # 3 Notice to State Court, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (LEVY, ROBERT) Modified on 1/5/2017 (dd).17-68JBS/KMW (Entered: 01/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8054 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Boettcher v Block; Court Number/Name: Gloucester Superior Court, GLO-L-1272-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7570084.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service) (RICHARDSON, ALLAN) Modified on 1/4/2017 (dd).17-38NLH/KMW (Entered: 01/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8053 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Lebra v. Wang, MD, et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7566496.). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Merit) (STARR, ADAM) Modified on 1/3/2017 (dd).17-13NLH/AMD (Entered: 01/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8052 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Addison v. Rancocas Valley Regional Board of Education, et als.; Court Number/Name: BUR-L-2455-16 NJ Sup. Ct.. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7566330.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (CARRIGG, PATRICK) Modified on 1/3/2017 (dd).17-12JHR/AMD (Entered: 01/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8051 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit to 8050 Notice of Removal (33-1), by DEFENDANT. (DANKANICH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8050 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Showboat Renaissance LLC v. Mindgrub Technologies, LLC; Court Number/Name: Atlantic Co Superior Ct - No. L-2546-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7563514.). (DANKANICH, MICHAEL) Modified on 12/29/2016 (dd).16-9582RBK/AMD (Entered: 12/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8049 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Thomas Kenney v. IEH Auto Parts, LLC, Scott Sangrey and Joseph Cassarella; Court Number/Name: BUR-L-1964-16 Superior Court of NJ. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7563051.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 3 Application for Extension of Time) (SATINSKY, RACHEL) Modified on 12/29/2016 (dd).16-9581RBK/AMD (Entered: 12/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8048 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - Laborers' Local Union No. 472 & 172, et al. v. Unique Concrete, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7562503.). (Attachments: # 1 Verified Petition, # 2 Affidavit Affidavit of EOH, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certification Certification of Service, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'HARE, EDWARD) Modified on 12/29/2016 (dd).16-9561RMB/AMD (Entered: 12/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8047 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - St. Victor v Public Service Electric and Gas ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7561819.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KOLLER, DAVID) Modified on 12/29/2016 (dd).16-9548RBK/KMW (Entered: 12/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8046 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Ricky Leonard v. Family Dollar Stores of New Jersey, LLC, i/p/a Family Dollar; Court Number/Name: Mercer County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7561352.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HARRIS, MATTHEW) Modified on 12/29/2016 (dd).Trenton Case 16-9549 (FLW/LHG) Modified on 12/29/2016 (jjc, ). (Entered: 12/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8045 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - CESAR CASTILLO, INC., individually and on behalf of all those similarly situated v. TELIGENT, INC., PERRIGO COMPANY PLC, TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., and TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7559028.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RODRIGUEZ, LISA) Modified on 12/27/2016 (dd). Chambers Review Modified on 12/30/2016 (dd).16-9592RMB/KMW (Entered: 12/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8044 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Larry J. Lockwood v. Lewis Tree Service, Inc. and John Doe Parties and/or Business Entities (Plural 1-10) ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7558015.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KURKOWSKI, DANIEL) Modified on 12/27/2016 (dd).16-9501RMB/AMD (Entered: 12/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8043 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP V. AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7555954.). (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (LABE, MARK)16cv9471 NLH/AMD Arb Modified on 12/23/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 12/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8042 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Salif Coulibaly v. Ramata Traore v. Quality Carriers, et al; Court Number/Name: Superior Court of New Jersey - Gloucester County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7555321.). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit a, # 4 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only) 7.1) (SEGAL, JEFFREY) 16-9470 JBS/KMW Arb. Set initial conf. Modified on 12/23/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 12/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8041 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEFENDANT identifying State Farm Automobile Insurance Company as Corporate Parent.. (PINDULIC, ROBERT) Attachment to 8040 Modified on 12/23/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 12/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8040 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Cynthia Gowdy v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company; Court Number/Name: CAM-L-4228-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7554931.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Application for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead, # 4 Certification, # 5 Certificate of Service, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet) (PINDULIC, ROBERT) 16-9459 JHR/KMW Arb. Set initial conf. Modified on 12/23/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 12/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8039 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - JENNIFER SENICK v. LANZI, BURKE AND ASSOCIATES, LLC, GUY LANZI, NATHAN SPENCER, JONATHAN BURKE, AND BARBARA DUNLEAVY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7554031.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MILLER, CAROLINE) Modified on 12/22/2016 (bf). (Civil #16-9447 JHR/KMW) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8038 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Douglas Littlejohn v. Vivint Solar ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7553235.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (MILZ, ANDREW) Modified on 12/22/2016 (bf).(Civil #16-9446 NLH/JS) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8037 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - Northeast Regional Council of Carpenters, UBCJA v. GT Millwork, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7550695.). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Disclosure Statement, # 4 Judgment, # 5 Letter to Clerk, # 6 Notice of Motion, # 7 Order, # 8 Statement) (TREMER, BRIAN) 16-9424 NLH/JS No Arb Modified on 12/21/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8036 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Kathleen M Fairhurst v Commissioner of SSA (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Application IFP, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (MAZUR, SHERYL) 16-9423 JBS No Arb/No Mag Modified on 12/21/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8035 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: RAHUL SHAH, M.D., on assignment of Jason W., v. HORIZON BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY and ANTHEM BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF VIRGINIA; Court Number/Name: CUM-L-721-16, Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7548831.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Notice of filing the Notice of Removal, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (GENOVESE, AMANDA) 16-9405 RBK/JS No Arb. Set initial conf. Modified on 12/21/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8034 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - URSULA LEWIS and RANIER HOLLAND, Individually and as Co-Administrators of the Estate of Madison Dee Holland v. DR. GBOLAGADE BABALOLA, D.O., ALAFIA OB/GYN, INC., f/k/a TRI-COUNTY OBGYN & WOMENS HEALTHCARE, LLC, SOUTHERN JERSEY FAMILY MEDICAL CENTERS, INC., INSPIRA HEATH NETWORK, INC., d/b/a INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTER VINELAND, JOHN DOES 1-50, and ABC CORPORATIONS 1-50 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7547005.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit "A", # 3 Exhibit "B") (FOLKMAN, BENJAMIN) 16-9404 NLH/JS No Arb. Modified on 12/21/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8033 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Lourdes Specialty Hospital of Southern New Jersey, on assignment of Jacquelyn J. v. Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company i/p/a Cigna Healthcare; Court Number/Name: Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Burlington County, Docket No. BUR-L-2294-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7546972.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (WEISSLITZ, EMILY) 16-9363 JBS/AMD No Arb. Set initial conf. Modified on 12/21/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8032 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Steven Galkowski v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America; Court Number/Name: Case No. L-2446-16, Superior Court of New Jersey Law Division: Burlington County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7545303.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, # 6 Certificate of Service) (BELL, ALNISA) 16-9362 JHR/AMD No Arb. Set initial conf. Modified on 12/19/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8031 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Jupin, et al v. Asplundh Tree Expert Company, et al; Court Number/Name: CUM-L-741-16 Superior Court of New Jersey Cumberland County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7544785.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Disclosure Statement) (GREY, FRANCIS) 16-9361 NLH/AMD No Arb. Set Initial Conf. Modified on 12/19/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8030 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Barry v. Pennsauken Board of Education; Court Number/Name: CAM-L-3998-16 Camden Sup. Ct.. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7536003.). (BIEG, TIMOTHY) Modified on 12/14/2016 (dd).16-9230RMB/AMD (Entered: 12/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8029 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS, et al. v. IMPACT CONTRACTING LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7534821.). (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, # 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 4 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 5 STATEMENT, # 6 ORDER, # 7 JUDGMENT, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (PARSONS, BRADLEY) Modified on 12/13/2016 (dd).16-9187JBS/KMW (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8028 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS, et al. v. JOHN D. LAWRENCE, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7534762.). (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, # 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 4 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 5 STATEMENT, # 6 ORDER, # 7 JUDGMENT, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (PARSONS, BRADLEY) Modified on 12/13/2016 (dd).16-9186JHR/JS (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8027 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Johannie Rivera v. Sheraton Atlantic City Hotel/Starwood Hotels & Resorts; Court Number/Name: NJ Sup. Ct. ATL-L-893-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7533522.). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 4 Exhibit State Pleadings) (LEE, JEANNIE) Modified on 12/13/2016 (dd).16-9173JHR/AMD (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8026 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Scottsdale Insurance Co. a/s/o Mansion v. LSB Industries, Inc.; Court Number/Name: CPM L-407-16. (Y), COMPLAINT - Scottsdale Insurance Co. a/s/o Mansion v. LSB Industries, Inc. (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Summons Summons and Complaint Served on Climate Master, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit Payment Receipt) (WHITE, MICHAEL) Modified on 12/12/2016 (dd).16-9126JHR/JS (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8025 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Canopius US Insurance, Inc. v Babes Bar & Grill, Inc. & R&T Management, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7522564.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 4 cover letter) (STARK, ADAM) Modified on 12/7/2016 (bf). (16-9052 JBS/AMD) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8024 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEFENDANT identifying State FArm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as Corporate Parent.. (PINDULIC, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8023 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: William Williams and Mary Williams v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company; Court Number/Name: GLO-L-1408-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7520377.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Application for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead, # 5 Certification, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Certificate of Service) (PINDULIC, ROBERT) Modified on 12/6/2016 (dd).16-9028JHR/JS (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8022 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Joy Evans v Commissioner of Social Security (y). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Application IFP, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service) (TOVINSKY, LAUREN) Modified on 12/5/2016 (dd).16-9012RBK (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8021 Filed: 12/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Rahul Shah, MD o/a/o William D v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Western New York and Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey; ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7515365.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, # 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (HOLZAPFEL, MICHAEL) Modified on 12/5/2016 (dd).16-9011RBK/AMD (Entered: 12/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8020 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Evan O'Brien, M.D., o/a/o Mary C. v. Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey et al.; Court Number/Name: NJSuper.Ct. GLO-L-1289-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7515255.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Certificate of Service) (MINNIGAN, DANITA) Modified on 12/5/2016 (dd).16-9010RMB/AMD (Entered: 12/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8019 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - Lisa Almeida-Fortunato (y). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Application IFP, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service) (TOVINSKY, LAUREN) Modified on 12/5/2016 (dd).16-9006RMB (Entered: 12/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8018 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Carrie Ruberti v Commissioner of Social Security (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Application IFP, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service) (TOVINSKY, LAUREN) Modified on 12/2/2016 (dd).16-8977JBS (Entered: 12/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8017 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Southeast Restoration, Inc. d/b/a Afterdisaster v. After Disaster Restoration Services, LLC and Clevester Blackstone ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7514594.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JOHNSON, DOUGLAS) Modified on 12/2/2016 (dd).Trenton case 16-8975 (BRM/DEA) Modified on 12/2/2016 (jjc, ). (Entered: 12/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8016 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEFENDANT identifying Holman Enterprises, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (WIETRZYCHOWSKI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8015 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Michael Sabatino v. Auto Truck Group, LLC, et al; Court Number/Name: L-2360-16, Superior Court of New Jersey, Burlington County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7513949.). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (WIETRZYCHOWSKI, MICHAEL) Modified on 12/2/2016 (dd).16-8976RMB/JS (Entered: 12/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8014 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Rahul Shah, M.D., on assignment of Gabrielle G. v. Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey and Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois; Court Number/Name: NJSuper.Ct. CUM-L-740-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7508621.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Papers, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Statement Rule 7.1 Statement, # 5 Certification Local Rule 11.2 Certification) (SEKEL, ANNE) Modified on 11/30/2016 (dd).16-8892RBK/AMD (Entered: 11/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8013 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEFENDANT. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(STRAND, DAVID) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8012 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Kunal Shah v. Meditab Software, Inc., Medical Supply Corp. d/b/a Elmhurst Pharmacy, Inc., Midesh "Mike" Patel, and John Does 1-5 and 6-10; Court Number/Name: Docket No. BUR-L-2174-16, Superior Court of New Jersey, Burlington County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7507112.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certificate of Service) (STRAND, DAVID) Modified on 11/30/2016 (dd).16-8864JBS/JS (Entered: 11/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8011 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - TRUSTEES OF THE IBEW LOCAL 351 PENSION FUND; IBEW LOCAL 351 SURETY FUND; IBEW LOCAL 351 WELFARE FUND v. DUNBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, LLC, Defendant. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7505636.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (BUSHINSKY, STEVEN) Modified on 11/30/2016 (dd).11-8837NLH/KMW (Entered: 11/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8010 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Thomas Turner IV v. Perna Finnigan, Inc., et al ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7504183.). (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (DEMICHELE, GREGORY) Modified on 11/29/2016 (dd).16-8811JHR/AMD (Entered: 11/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8009 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Rahul Shah, M.D. o/a/o Dennis C. v. Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey and Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas; Court Number/Name: NJSuper.Ct. CUM-L-699-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7503610.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Papers, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Statement Rule 7.1 Statement, # 5 Certification Local Rule 11.2 Certification) (SEKEL, ANNE) Modified on 11/29/2016 (dd).16-8803RMB/AMD (Entered: 11/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8008 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - LEE FINTEL v. MARINA DISTRICT DEVELOPMENT, LLC, MARINA DISTRICT DEVELOPMENT HOLDING COMPANY, LLC, BOYD GAMING CORPORATION, MGM INTERNATIONAL, LLC, SUSANA MAIESE, CHARLEEN RIPLEY, DAVID ENG, VINCENT ALFIERI, & RICHARD HENDERSON ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7503098.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MILLER, CAROLINE) Modified on 11/28/2016 (dd).16-8798NLH/KMW (Entered: 11/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8007 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - Feliciano Maldonado v. PHH Mortgage Corporation ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7500362.). (BAIRD, GRAHAM) Modified on 11/28/2016 (dd).16-8773RMB/AMD (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8006 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Qu Wang on behalf of himself and others similarly situated v. FU LEEN MENG RESTAURANT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY d/b/a FU LEEN MENG, JIAN SHAO, LEWEN SHAO,YAN YING SHAO ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7500016.). (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (LIU, KELI) Modified on 11/28/2016 (dd).16-8772NLH/AMD (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8005 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Trustees of the Refrigeration & Air Conditioning Service Division (UA-NJ) Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund and Education Fund for and on behalf of themselves and said Funds and the New Jersey Committee Representing the United Association of Plumbers and Pipefitters of the United States and Canada, an unincorporated labor organization v. Marlee Contractors ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7499851.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (POIST, MARK) Modified on 11/28/2016 (dd).16-8771NLH/AMD (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8004 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Powerhouse Equipment & Engineering Co., Inc. v. Kau, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7499695.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit Ex. A, # 4 Exhibit Ex. B, # 5 Exhibit Ex. C, # 6 Exhibit Ex. D, # 7 Exhibit Ex. E, # 8 Exhibit Ex. F, # 9 Exhibit Ex. G, # 10 Exhibit Ex. H) (FRANK, ALAN) Modified on 11/28/2016 (dd).16-8770RMB/KMW (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8003 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Ready Pac. Attorney AMANDA KIRSTEN CALDWELL for DEFENDANT,ROBERT L. SEXTON for PLAINTIFF added. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(CALDWELL, AMANDA) Attacment to #8000 Modified on 11/23/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8002 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Lourdes Specialty Hospital of Southern New Jersey on assignment of Eric B. v. Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield, et al.; Court Number/Name: BUR-L-1800-16, Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Burlington County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7498954.). (Attachments: # 1 Disclosure Statement, # 2 Certification of Filing and Service) (NEADEL, EVAN) 16-8744 JHR/JS No Arb. Set Initial conf. Modified on 11/23/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8001 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEFENDANT identifying Bayside Capital Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(CALDWELL, AMANDA) Attachment to #8000 Modified on 11/23/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8000 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Vinod Patel v. Ready Pac; Court Number/Name: Superior Court of New Jersey, County of Burlington, Docket No. BUR-L-1455-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7498920.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certificate of Service) (CALDWELL, AMANDA) 16-8743 JBS/AMD No Arb. Set initial conf. Modified on 11/23/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7999 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - Karen Chattin v. United States of America ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7498279.). (DEPAMPHILIS, DOMINIC) 16-8742 RMB/AMD Arb Modified on 11/23/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7998 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: John Sharra, III and May Sharra, h/w v. HMSHost Tollroads, Inc.; Court Number/Name: Superior Court -Middlesex County; Docket No.: MID-L-03698-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7497606.) (N). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (SEXTON, RICHARD) Modified on 11/22/2016 (dd). TRENTON CASE 16-8723 (FLW/TJB) Modified on 11/22/2016 (jjc, ). (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7997 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Broadcast Music, Inc., et al. v. NPH Florence, LLC d/b/a Nook's Pourhouse, et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7495009.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 L. Civ. R. 11.2 Certification, # 3 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (LOWER, J.) Modified on 11/22/2016 (dd).16-8682RBK/AMD (Entered: 11/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7996 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - MARTIN PUENTE AND JOSHUA JENNINGS On Behalf of Themselves and All Other Persons Similarly Situated v. General Motors, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7494858.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NAGEL, BRUCE) Modified on 11/22/2016 (dd).Chambers Review Modified on 11/22/2016 (dd).16-8688RMB/AMD (Entered: 11/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7995 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEFENDANT identifying State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as Corporate Parent.. (PINDULIC, ROBERT) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7994 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: John E. Kurz and Michelle M. Kurz (husband and wife) v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company; Court Number/Name: GLO-L-1232-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7494384.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Application for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead, # 4 Certification, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Certificate of Service) (PINDULIC, ROBERT) Modified on 11/22/2016 (dd). 16-8681RMV/AMD (Entered: 11/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7993 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Selective Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, as subrogee of Diamond Blueberry, Inc. v. J.R.L., Inc., Sun Belle, Inc., T.Q.L. Total Quality Logistics, NJ Dun Group, LLC t/a Dun Transport, John Does 1-10, ABC Companies 1-10 (fictitious entities); Court Number/Name: Docket No. ATL-2276-16, Atlantic County Superior Court. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7494154.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to TQL Notice of Removal) (SMITH, GERARD) Modified on 11/22/2016 (dd).16-8680JHR/KMW (Entered: 11/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7992 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - International Union of Operating Engineers Local 825 Employee Benefit Funds and the Trustees Thereof v. Structural Building Supply LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7491720.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 cover letter, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 notice of petition, # 7 Certificate of Service, # 8 No Brief is Necessary, # 9 Text of Proposed Order, # 10 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (GIBLIN, VINCENT)TRENTON CASE 16-8666 (PGS/DEA) Modified on 11/21/2016 (mmb). Modified on 11/29/2016 (jjc, ). (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7991 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: City of Burlington v. State of New Jersey, Dept of Env. Protection, and United States Army Corps of Engineers; Court Number/Name: BUR-L-2188-16. (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A: State Court Docket; Exhibit B: State Court Order to Show Cause, Complaint, and Brief in Support; Exhibit C: New Jersey Brief in Response; Exhibit D: Letter to New Jersey Superior Court, # 3 Certificate of Service) (O'NEILL, JESSICA) 16-8654 RMB/JS No Arb Set Initial Conf. Modified on 11/21/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7990 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - Northeast Regional Council of Carpenters, UBCJA v. GKW Associates a/k/a Mod Tech LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7491308.). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Cover Letter to Clerk, # 4 Disclosure Statement, # 5 Notice of Motion, # 6 Proposed Judgment, # 7 Proposed Order, # 8 Statement) (TREMER, BRIAN) NEWARK CASE Modified on 11/21/2016 (mmb). 16-cv-08663 (ES/JAD) (Middlesex) Modified on 11/21/2016 (ak). (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7989 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - Northeast Regional Council of Carpenters, UBCJA v. JPM Carpentry & General Contracting, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7491132.). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Cover Letter to Clerk, # 4 Disclosure Statement, # 5 Notice of Motion, # 6 Proposed Judgment, # 7 Proposed Order, # 8 Statement) (TREMER, BRIAN) 16-8653 RBK/AMD No Arb Modified on 11/21/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7988 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - Northeast Regional Council of Carpenters, UBCJA v. Jayden Construction, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7491082.). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Cover Letter to Clerk, # 4 Disclosure Statement, # 5 Notice of Motion, # 6 Proposed Judgment, # 7 Proposed Order, # 8 Statement) (TREMER, BRIAN) 16-8652 RMB/AMD No Arb Modified on 11/21/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7987 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - Beth Gussman v. Government Employees Insurance Company ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7484840.). (TABAKIN, BRAD) Modified on 11/16/2016 (dd). 16-8563JHR/AMD (Entered: 11/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7986 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Assad v. Atlantic Oncology Associates, LLC, et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7483265.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Borai, # 3 Summons Ajay, # 4 Summons Ajay and Borai MD Cancer Center, # 5 Summons Atlantic Oncology Associates, LLC) (MAINS, DEBORAH) Modified on 11/16/2016 (dd).16-8544NLH/JS (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7985 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - ZERVAS V. ASSURED FIRE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7483051.). (JENKINS, PAUL) Modified on 11/16/2016 (dd).16-8543RBK/AMD (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7984 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: MARY JERALDS V. TRUMP TAJ MAHAL ASSOCIATES LLC D/B/A TRUMP TAJ MAHAL CASINO RESORT; Court Number/Name: SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, LAW DIVISION, ATLANTIC COUNTY, DOCKET NO. ATL-L-2137-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7479587.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A") (LICHTENSTEIN, RUSSELL) Modified on 11/15/2016 (dd).16-8501RMB/KMW (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7983 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DEFENDANT J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., and Granite State Insurance Company from Passaic County Superior Court, case number PAS-L-3277-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7476136), filed by DEFENDANT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Certificate of Service)(PASCHOS, THOMAS) Modified on 11/14/2016 (dd). NEWARK CASE 16-cv-08456 (SDW/LDW) (Passaic) ARB Modified on 11/14/2016 (ak). (Entered: 11/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7982 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7474890) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PLAINTIFF. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DION, SAMUEL) Modified on 11/10/2016 (dd).16-8407JHR/KMW (Entered: 11/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7981 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to KUBOTA TRACTOR CORPORATION.. (CRAWFORD, PHILIP) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7980 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: NICOLE GIBSON V. COMPACT POWER EQUIPMENT CENTER, LLC, ET AL.; Court Number/Name: NJSuper CT CAM-L-3188-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7473984.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure, # 4 Certification Loc. R. 11.2, # 5 Certification of Service) (CRAWFORD, PHILIP) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7979 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - Vanessa Wong v. Premier Urgent Care and Edward M. Silverman ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7473766.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KOLLER, DAVID) Modified on 11/9/2016 (dd).16-8388RBK/KMW (Entered: 11/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7978 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Nitterhouse Concrete Products, Inc. v. Dobco Group, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7473495.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 3 Certification, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit) (MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO) Modified on 11/9/2016 (dd).Newark Case 2:16-cv-08397(WHW/CLW) PASSAIC Modified on 11/10/2016 (jr). (Entered: 11/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7977 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Kikimen v. AtlantiCare Regional Medical Center; Court Number/Name: Superior Court of New Jersey, ATL-L-2199-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7472294.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JOHNSON, SARAH) Modified on 11/9/2016 (dd).16-8382JBS/AMD (Entered: 11/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7976 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - Darren M. Gruner v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC and Trans Union, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7470326.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (FRISCHBERG, DANIEL) Modified on 11/8/2016 (dd).16-8356NLH/JS (Entered: 11/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7975 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Favors v. Aughtry; Court Number/Name: L-3432-15 (NJ Superior Court, Law Division, Camden County). (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, # 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, # 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, # 4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Certificate of Service) (TAYLOR, ANNE) Modified on 11/8/2016 (dd).16-8347RBK/KMW (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7974 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Giovanni Attanasio v. Timothy Briggs ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7468527.) (Keith J. Gentes). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons) (GENTES, KEITH) Modified on 11/7/2016 (dd).16-8338JHR/KMW (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7973 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS vs. EXCEL SERVICE & CONSTRUCTION, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7468422.). (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, # 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 4 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 5 STATEMENT, # 6 ORDER, # 7 JUDGMENT, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (TREMER, BRIAN) Modified on 11/7/2016 (dd).1608336RMB/JS (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7972 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS vs. JOHN D. LAWRENCE, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7468321.). (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, # 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 4 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 5 STATEMENT, # 6 ORDER, # 7 JUDGMENT, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (TREMER, BRIAN) Modified on 11/7/2016 (dd).16-8328RMB/KMW (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7971 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS vs. AMERICAN MASONRY CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7467846.). (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, # 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 4 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 5 STATEMENT, # 6 ORDER, # 7 JUDGMENT, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (TREMER, BRIAN) Modified on 11/7/2016 (dd).16-8327NLH/KMW (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7970 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Pamela White v. City of Vineland ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7466863.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KING, SHARON) Modified on 11/7/2016 (dd).16-8308NLH/KMW (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7969 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Scarcella v. Town of Clinton ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7465606.). (GRIECO, NICHOLAS) Modified on 11/7/2016 (dd).Trenton case 16-8286 (PGS/DEA) Modified on 11/7/2016 (jjc, ). (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7968 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - Ross v. Spectrum Energy, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7465418.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Eubank, # 3 Summons Murtaugh, # 4 Summons Spectrum) (MAINS, DEBORAH) Modified on 12/1/2016 (dd).16-8205RBK/JS (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7967 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., v. ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. et al ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7464803.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Certification L.Civ.R.11.2, # 5 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (CHUDEREWICZ, MELISSA) Modified on 11/7/2016 (dd).16-8284JBS/KMW Modified on 11/7/2016 (dd).16-8285RBK/JS (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7966 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Scottsdale Indemnity Company v. Jamie Collazos, EC Cranes, Inc., and Ronald Torres ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7462907.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 8 Certification) (QUINN, THOMAS) Modified on 11/4/2016 (dd).16-8239RBK/KMW (Entered: 11/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7965 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Bettis v. Wal-Mart; ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7461969.). (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (TOLLIVER, TAISHA) Modified on 11/3/2016 (dd).16-8223RBK/AMD (Entered: 11/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7964 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Erlbaum, et al. v. New Jersey Dep't of Env. Protection, et al.; Court Number/Name: ATL-C-75-16, New Jersey Superior Court, Atlantic County, Chancery Division. (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: State Court Docket, # 2 Exhibit B: State Court Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C: Proposed Order to Show Cause, # 4 Exhibit D: Cover Letter to State Court, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Certificate of Service) (TAYLOR, ANNE) Modified on 11/3/2016 (dd).Chambers Review Modified on 12/1/2016 (dd).16-8198RMB/JS (Entered: 11/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7963 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - Trustees of the IBEW Local 351 Pension Fund; IBEW Local 351 Surety Fund; IBEW Local 351 Welfare Fund; IBEW Local 351 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee; South Jersey Electrical Workers Temporary Disability Fund for and on behalf of themselves and said Funds; and IBEW Local Union No. 351 v. Huen Electric NJ, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7458734.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (BUSHINSKY, STEVEN) Modified on 11/2/2016 (dd).16-8163RMB/AMD (Entered: 11/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7962 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DEFENDANT Cigna Health & Life Insurance Company i/p/a Cigna Healthcare from Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Burlington County, case number BUR-L-1972-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7458255), filed by DEFENDANT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only))(WEISSLITZ, EMILY) Modified on 11/2/2016 (dd).16-8143RMB/AMD (Entered: 11/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7961 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Trustees of the IBEW Local 351 Pension Fund; IBEW Local 351 Surety Fund; IBEW Local 351 Welfare Fund; IBEW Local 351 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee; South Jersey Electrical Workers Temporary Disability Fund for and on behalf of themselves and said Funds; and IBEW Local Union No. 351 v. Shelby Mechanical, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7457806.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (BUSHINSKY, STEVEN) Modified on 11/2/2016 (dd).16-8144JBS/JS (Entered: 11/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7960 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., v. INDOCO REMEDIES LIMITED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7454346.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Certification L.Civ.R.11.2, # 5 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (CHUDEREWICZ, MELISSA) Modified on 11/1/2016 (dd).16-8085JBS/KMW (Entered: 10/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7959 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Gurjeet Singh v. Amanda Bonavenia; ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7449596.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Affidavit, # 7 Certificate of Service) (MCCONNELL, JOHN) Modified on 10/28/2016 (dd).16-8003JBS/AMD (Entered: 10/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7958 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - TRUSTEES OF THE IBEW LOCAL 351 PENSION FUND; IBEW LOCAL 351 SURETY FUND; IBEW LOCAL 351 WELFARE FUND; IBEW LOCAL 351 JOINT APPRENTICESHIP AND TRAINING COMMITTEE; SOUTH JERSEY ELECTRICAL WORKERS TEMPORARY DISABILITY FUND for and on behalf of themselves and said FUNDS; and IBEW LOCAL UNION NO. 351, Plaintiffs, v. QUALITY ELECTRIC SERVICE, LLC, Defendant ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7446819.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (BUSHINSKY, STEVEN) Modified on 10/27/2016 (dd).16-7945RMB/JS (Entered: 10/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7957 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Erco Ceilings, Inc. v. Viewpoint, Inc. t/a Viewpoint Construction Software; Court Number/Name: ATL-L-2161-16, Atlantic County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7445543.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Declaration of Jennifer Allison, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B) (GILLER, RONALD) Modified on 10/27/2016 (dd).16-7914RBK/JS (Entered: 10/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7956 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Kadeem Norris v. National DCP LLC and John Does 1-5 and 6-10; Court Number/Name: Superior Court of New JErsey, Burlington County,, Docket No. L-1915-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7444188.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (WEIMER, SARANNE) Modified on 10/27/2016 (dd).16-7899RMB/KMW (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7955 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Alta Cotsmire v. SRA Associates, Inc.; Court Number/Name: CAM-DC-008828-16 Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Special Civil Part, Camden County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7443888.). (LAVELLE, ELLEN) Modified on 10/27/2016 (dd).16-7896NLH/KMW (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7954 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. AnnieMac Home Mortgage, et al ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7443355.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (FONTANA, MATTHEW) Modified on 10/27/2016 (dd).16-7897JBS/KMW (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7953 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Rahul Shah, M.D., o/a/o Beverly S. v. Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey, et al.; Court Number/Name: CUM-L-657-16, Superior Court of New Jersey, Cumberland County, Law Division. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7442898.). (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Removal, # 2 Disclosure Statement, # 3 Certification of Filing and Service) (HOLZAPFEL, MICHAEL) Modified on 10/26/2016 (dd).16-7876RBK/JS (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7952 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - Ashley Levinson-Sells v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7442306.). (BAIRD, GRAHAM) Modified on 10/26/2016 (dd).16-7875RBK/JS (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7951 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7442066), filed by PLAINTIFF. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARNOLD, JOSEPH) Modified on 10/26/2016 (dd).16-7874JHR/JS (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7950 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: In the Matter of the Estate of Mitchell Sage Gallenthin; Court Number/Name: 16-1370, New Jersey Superior Court Chancery Division Probate Part Gloucester County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7440775.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Relevant State Court Documents, # 3 Certificate of Service Notice to NJ State Court and Opposing Counsel, # 4 Statement Consent to Removal by Co-Defendant) (CURLEY, ROBERT) Modified on 10/25/2016 (dd).16-7828RMB/KMW (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7949 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - U.A. Local 322 Pension Fund, et al. v. Kisby Shore Plumbing and Heating Co. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7440236.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit 1) (TOKARSKY, MATTHEW) Modified on 10/25/2016 (dd).16-7827RMB/KMW (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7948 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Patricia Crawford, Jessica Howley, Danielle Lawrence, and Colleen Monaghan-Girardo v. FHG Realty Urban Renewal, LLC d/b/a The Riverwinds Restaurant, 17.JNB Riverwinds, Inc., Fotios Farmakis, Helena Balis, and George Drakos ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7439448.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Farmakis, # 4 Summons Balis, # 5 Summons Drakos, # 6 Summons JNB, # 7 Summons FHG) (LUBER, MATTHEW) Modified on 10/25/2016 (dd).16-7797RBK/JS (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7947 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - TRUSTEES OF THE SHEET METAL WORKERS INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION LOCAL 27 ANNUITY, HEALTH & WELFARE, EDUCATION AND UNEMPLOYMENT FUNDS for and on behalf of themselves and said FUNDS, and the BOARD OF TRUSTEES; SHEET METAL WORKERS INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION LOCAL UNION 27, v. BURRIS CONSTRUCTION OF NEW JERSEY LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7433992.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 3 Summons) (POIST, MARK) Modified on 10/24/2016 (dd).16-7725RMB/JS (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7946 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., v Zydus Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7433001.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Certification L.Civ.R.11.2, # 4 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (CHUDEREWICZ, MELISSA) Modified on 10/21/2016 (dd).16-7705JBS/KMW (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7945 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Lourdes Specialty Hospital of Southern New Jersey on assignment of Charles C. vs. Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey, Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas; Court Number/Name: NJSuper.Ct. BUR-L-1945-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7430672.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Papers, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Statement Rule 7.1 Statement, # 5 Certification Local Rule 11.2 Certification) (MCCARTHY, ALISHA) Modified on 10/21/2016 (dd).16-7590JBS/KMW (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7944 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Lourdes Specialty Hospital of Southern New Jersey on assignment of Thomas M. vs. Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey and Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois; Court Number/Name: NJSuper.Ct. BUR-L-1944-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7430497.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Papers, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Statement Rule 7.1 Statement, # 5 Certification Local Rule 11.2 Certification) (MCCARTHY, ALISHA) Modified on 10/21/2016 (dd).16-7654JHR/JS (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7943 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Lourdes Specialty Hospital of Southern New Jersey, on assignment of Micah V., v. Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersery and Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield; Court Number/Name: BUR-L-1832-16, Superior Court of New Jersey Law Division Burlington County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7429259.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (GENOVESE, AMANDA) Modified on 10/20/2016 (dd).16-7631NLH/AMD (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7942 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Alexis Vega v. CVS; and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.; and CVS Caremark Corp.; Court Number/Name: CAM-L-3129-16; Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Camden County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7428773.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (DEAGAZIO, RICHARD) Modified on 10/20/2016 (dd).Chambers Review Modified on 10/24/2016 (dd).16-7594RBK/AMD (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7941 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Latara Spencer v. CVS; and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.; and CVS Caremark Corp.; Court Number/Name: CAM-L-3002-16; Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Camden County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7428423.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (DEAGAZIO, RICHARD) Modified on 10/20/2016 (dd).16-7593RBK/AMD (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7940 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Birney v. Lane ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7426720.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (LEVIN, GABRIEL) Modified on 10/19/2016 (dd)16-7557RMB/KMW (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7939 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - Universal Synergetics, Inc. d/b/a Technical Help In Engineering and Marketing v. Snapsil Australia Pty. Ltd. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7424008.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (HELLER, JAMES) Modified on 10/19/2016 (dd).16-7498JHR/KMW (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7938 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Plaintiffs Ashley Gladney by her Administrators Ad Prosequendum Scott Gladney and Leah Bottone and Scott Gladney and Leah Bottone individually v. Defendants Atlantic County; Warden Geraldine Cohen; CFG Health Systems; ABC Corporations 1-5, and John Does 1-30 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7419856.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Request to Issue Summons) (MALLON, THOMAS) Modified on 10/18/2016 (dd).16-7421NLH/AMD (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7937 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Joseph Romano v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, John Doe 1-10 (fictitious names), and ABC Maintenance Company 1-10 (fictitious names); Court Number/Name: ATL-L-356-16; Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Atlantic County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7419514.). (WILLIAMS, GWYNETH) Modified on 10/18/2016 (dd).16-7420RBK/AMD (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7936 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., v STASON INDUSTRIAL CORP ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7418096.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Certification L.Civ.R.11.2, # 4 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (CHUDEREWICZ, MELISSA) 16-7346 JBS/KMW Related cases. ANDA Modified on 10/17/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7935 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - David Thompson v. Westlake Financial Services ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7417947.) (n). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (GINSBURG, AMY) 16-cv-7344 JBS/JS No Arb Modified on 10/17/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7934 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - SAMUEL THURSTON v. HARTFORD LIFE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7417545.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HAGNER, THOMAS) Modified on 10/14/2016 (dd).16-7322RBK/AMD (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7933 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Joel A. Mott, III v. CNA American Casualty Company of Reading, PA, Inc., CNA Financial; Court Number/Name: NJSuper.Ct. CPM-L-000346-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7416710.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Certificate of Service) (CORNIBE, MELISSA) Modified on 10/14/2016 (dd).16-7319JHR/KMW (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7932 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Aldonna Ambler v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.; Court Number/Name: Superior Court of New Jersey, Special Civil Part, Atlantic County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7413933.). (LAVELLE, ELLEN) Modified on 10/14/2016 (dd).16-7223RMB/AMD (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7931 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - CAROL DIMEO V COMMUNITY HEALTH SYSTEMS,INC d/b/a SALEM MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7411793.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A-J) (LENTZ, BRYAN) Modified on 10/13/2016 (dd).16-7146RBK/JS (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7930 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE FUNDS, et al. v. AMERICAN MASONRY CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7410575.). (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, # 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 4 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 5 STATEMENT, # 6 ORDER, # 7 JUDGMENT, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (TREMER, BRIAN) Modified on 10/13/2016 (dd).16-7106RBK/JS (Entered: 10/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7929 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE FUNDS, et al. v. EXCEL SERVICE & CONSTRUCTION, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7410344.). (Attachments: # 1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, # 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 3 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 4 STATEMENT, # 5 ORDER, # 6 JUDGMENT, # 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (TREMER, BRIAN) Modified on 10/13/2016 (dd).16-7107JBS/KMW (Entered: 10/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7928 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Parrilla v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., et al; ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7406826.). (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (TOLLIVER, TAISHA) Modified on 10/12/2016 (dd).16-6969RBK/KMW (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7927 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - Franco v. Cutts ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7406509.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (LEVIN, GABRIEL) Modified on 10/12/2016 (dd).16-6968RBK/KMW (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7926 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Patrick Craven v. Applied Informatics Group, Drexel University College of Computing and Informatics, Drexel University, John Does, et al.; Court Number/Name: BUR-L-01660-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7404861.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Supplement Request for Clerk's Extension) (DAMBREVILLE, TELEICIA) Modified on 10/11/2016 (dd).16-6912RMB/AMD (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7925 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Justine Speer v. Acme Markets, Inc., et. al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7403315.). (GREENFIELD, MARC) Modified on 10/11/2016 (dd).16-6791JHR/AMD (Entered: 10/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7924 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Franklin Mutual Insurance Company as Subrogee of Frederick Smith, Plaintiff v. Fluidmaster, Inc., John Doe 1-5, and ABC Corp. 1-5, Defendants; Court Number/Name: CPM-L-358-16, Superior Court of NJ, Civil Law Div., Cape May County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7401506.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Notice to Superior Court of Removal, # 3 Notice to Adversary of Removal, # 4 Statement of Filing and Service of Removal, # 5 Certificate of Service, # 6 Letter to the Clerk, # 7 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (THOMEN, JEFFREY) Modified on 10/7/2016 (dd).16-6754JHR/JS (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7923 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - Wilma Evans v. Megan J. Brennan, et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7400407.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MARK, JAMISON) Modified on 10/7/2016 (dd).Newark Case 2:16-cv-06782(JLL/JAD) BERGEN Modified on 10/7/2016 (jr). (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7922 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Renee Gooden v. Wal-Mart Store; John Does #1-5 (fictitious names) as agents, servants, and/or employees of Wal-Mart Store; ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7398991.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Exhibit A-C, # 4 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 5 Notice of Appearance) (RONG, MATTHEW) Modified on 11/1/2016 (dd).16-6682RBK/AMD (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7921 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - Robert T. Winzinger, Inc. 7-28-16 Motion to Confirm ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7397613.). (Attachments: # 1 Verified Petition, # 2 Affidavit Edward H. O'Hare, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'HARE, EDWARD) Modified on 10/6/2016 (dd).16-6628NLH/KMW (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7920 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - Longwood Construction, Ind. LLC. Motion to Confirm ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7397601.). (Attachments: # 1 Verified Petition, # 2 Affidavit Edward H. O'Hare, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'HARE, EDWARD) Modified on 10/6/2016 (dd).16-6627RBK/KMW (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7919 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - Robert T. Winzinger Motion to Confirm ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7396578.). (Attachments: # 1 Verified Petition, # 2 Affidavit Edward H. O'Hare, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'HARE, EDWARD) Modified on 10/6/2016 (dd).16-6578JHR/KMW Modified on 10/6/2016 (dd).16-6607RBK/KMW (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7918 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - The Estate of Jon Leon Watson,by and through its administrator Ad Prosequendum, Helen Ray Lloyd et al v. Cumberland County ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7395442.). (BENEDETTO, CONRAD) Modified on 10/18/2016 (dd).16-5878JHR/KMW (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7917 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Daman Stephens v Service Tire Truck Centers, Inc.; ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7387676.). (SALGADO, TANYA) Modified on 10/3/2016 (dd).16-6295RMB/JS (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7916 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Aron Marshall v. Penn Credit Corporation ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7387561.) (n). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (GINSBURG, AMY) Modified on 10/3/2016 (dd).16-6294NLH/JS (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7915 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - ERICA SAUER -VS- ELITE EXPRESS -AND-TRANSPORT LEASING/TRUCKING INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7385938.). (BURRITT, VALERIE) Modified on 10/3/2016 (dd).16-6293NLH/AMD (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7914 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Margie Slade v. National Revenue Agency ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7385484.) (n). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (GINSBURG, AMY) Modified on 10/3/2016 (dd).16-6292RMB/AMD (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7913 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Lourdes Specialty Hospital of Southern New Jersey on assignment of Linda B. v. Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey and Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois; Court Number/Name: NJSuper.Ct. BUR-L-1739-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7384795.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Statement Rule 7.1 Statement, # 5 Certification Local Rule 11.2 Certification) (MCCARTHY, ALISHA) Modified on 10/3/2016 (dd).16-6260 JHR/AMD (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7912 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - The Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 825 Employee Benefit Funds v. Glendale Excavating Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7381257.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 cover letter, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 notice of petition, # 7 Certificate of Service, # 8 No Brief is Necessary, # 9 Text of Proposed Order, # 10 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (GIBLIN, VINCENT) Modified on 9/30/2016 (dd).16-6136JBS/JS (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7911 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - Arsenio Torres v. Borough of Barrington, et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7380468.). (CATALANO, RANDY) Modified on 9/30/2016 (dd).16-6134NLH/JS (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7910 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - The Independence Project, Inc. and Dennis Maurer v. Evergreen I Associates LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7380423.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (SIDDIQI, ASAAD) Modified on 9/30/2016 (dd).16-6133JBS/AMD (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7909 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - The Independence Project, Inc. and Dennis Maurer v. Saul Holdings Limited Partnership ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7379991.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SIDDIQI, ASAAD) Modified on 9/29/2016 (dd).16-6112JHR/AMD (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7908 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Dennis Maurer v. Route 38 Center Associates, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7377294.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SIDDIQI, ASAAD) Modified on 9/28/2016 (dd).16-6048RMB/KMW (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7907 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: DEBORAH FAY and MICHAEL BRUSKIN v. TD BANK, N.A.; Court Number/Name: Docket No.: ESX-L-5805-16 - Superior Court of New Jersey, Essex Vicinage. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7376980.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Declaration of Susan M. Leming, # 3 Notice to Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Removal, # 4 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 5 Certificate of Service) (LEMING, SUSAN) Modified on 9/28/2016 (dd) Chambers Review Modified on 9/29/2016 (dd).16-6068JBS/JS (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7906 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Lourdes Specialty Hospital of Southern New Jersey on assignment of Richard C. v. Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey and Independence Blue Cross; Court Number/Name: Docket No. BUR-L-1737-16, Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Burlington County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7373978.). (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Filing and Service, # 2 Disclosure Statement, # 3 Notice of Removal) (HOLZAPFEL, MICHAEL) Modified on 9/27/2016 (dd).16-5971RBK/AMD (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/27/2016) (dd). (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7905 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD v. ALKEM LABORATORIES LIMITED ET AL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7372505.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Certification L.Civ.R.11.2, # 4 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (CHUDEREWICZ, MELISSA) Modified on 9/29/2016 (dd).16-6067JBS/KMW (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7904 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Rahul Shah, M.D. o/a/o Monica M. v. Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey and Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts; ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7372395.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, # 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, # 3 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 4 Certificate of Service) (HOLZAPFEL, MICHAEL) Modified on 9/27/2016 (dd).16-5946NLH/JS (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2016: # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jr). (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7903 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - Evelyn Gonzalez and Yvonne Gonzalez v. Tibor Toth, Sprinting America, Inc., John Does 1-10, and ABC Corporations 1-10 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7372353.). (MCDONALD, KEITH) Modified on 9/27/2016 (dd).16-5945JBS/JS (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7902 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Kimberly Williams v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, John Doe Property Lessee 1-3, and John Doe Property Owner 1-3; Court Number/Name: CAM-L-2136-16; Superior Court of New Jersey Camden County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7372294.). (WILLIAMS, GWYNETH) Modified on 9/27/2016 (dd).16-5944RBK/JS (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7901 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - LISA WISE v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7371007.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HAGNER, THOMAS) Modified on 9/26/2016 (dd).16-5917JBS/KMW (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7900 Filed: 9/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT, filed by PLAINTIFF.(RADIN, ELLEN) Modified on 9/26/2016 (dd).Newark Case 2:16-cv-05897(KM) UNION (**No filing fee or IFP letter**) Modified on 9/26/2016 (jr). (Entered: 09/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7899 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD v. MACLEODS PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., et al ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7369101.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Certification L.Civ.R.11.2, # 4 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (CHUDEREWICZ, MELISSA) Modified on 9/27/2016 (dd).16-5949JBS/KMW (Entered: 09/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7898 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS, et al. v. JOHN D. LAWRENCE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7366191.). (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 DISCLOSURE STATMENT, # 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 4 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 5 STATEMENT, # 6 ORDER, # 7 JUDGMENT, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (TREMER, BRIAN) Modified on 9/23/2016 (dd).16-5814JHR/JS (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7897 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS, et al. v. JOHN D. LAWRENCE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7366183.). (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, # 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 4 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 5 STATEMENT, # 6 ORDER, # 7 JUDGMENT, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (TREMER, BRIAN) Modified on 9/23/2016 (dd).16-5813NLH/AMD (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7896 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - Valvonis v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7366178.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JARVIS, ADRIENNE) Modified on 9/23/2016 (dd).16-5812RBK (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7895 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS, et al. v. AMERICAN MASONRY CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7365995.). (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, # 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 4 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 5 STATEMENT, # 6 ORDER, # 7 JUDGMENT, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (TREMER, BRIAN) Modified on 9/23/2016 (dd).16-5811NLH/AMD (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7894 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Bonamassa v. Errigo et al ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7363581.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KOBER, PETER) Modified on 9/22/2016 (dd).15-5777RMB/KMW (Entered: 09/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7893 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Patricia Richards v. Samantha Ludwig, et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7363486.). (RODDEN, PATRICK) Modified on 9/22/2016 (dd).16-5776RMB/JS (Entered: 09/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7892 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Irene Kendrell, Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Kendrell v. Defense Logistics Agency d/b/a U.S. Department of Defense d/b/a United States of America, et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7362550.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) Modified on 9/21/2016 (dd).16-5760RBK/JS (Entered: 09/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7891 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - PATRICIA WICKHAM -V- ATLANTIC COMMUNITY COLLEGE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7359950.). (BURRITT, VALERIE) Modified on 9/20/2016 (dd).16-5730NLH/AMD (Entered: 09/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7890 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Theodus Davis v. Colonial Freight Systems, Inc., et al ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7359894.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons) (BOYETTE, JOSHUA) Modified on 9/20/2016 (dd).Trenton Case 16-5739(MAS/LHG) Modified on 9/20/2016 (jjc, ). (Entered: 09/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7889 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., v. INTAS PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7358098.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 5 Certification L.Civ.R.11.2) (CHUDEREWICZ, MELISSA) Modified on 9/20/2016 (dd).Chambers Review Modified on 9/21/2016 (dd).16-5743JBS/KMW (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7888 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - James Carr v. Hi-Tech Auto Truck Service, et al ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7357472.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (PUMPHREY, JOHN) Modified on 9/20/2016 (dd).16-5713RBK/AMD (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7887 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., v. ORCHID PHARMA LTD., ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7354765.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Certification L.Civ.R.11.2, # 4 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (CHUDEREWICZ, MELISSA) Modified on 9/19/2016 (dd). Chambers Review Modified on 9/19/2016 (dd).16-5688JBS/KMW (Entered: 09/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7886 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Carolann Zukowski v. Joseph Ciccotelli, et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7352481.). (RODDEN, PATRICK) Modified on 9/16/2016 (dd).16-5644RBK/JS (Entered: 09/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7885 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Ryan Veneziale v. Geico ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7352190.). (RODDEN, PATRICK) Modified on 9/16/2016 (dd).16-5643JBS/KMW (Entered: 09/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7884 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEFENDANT identifying Automotive Rentals, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (WIETRZYCHOWSKI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7883 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Jennifer Kaminski v. Automotive Rentals, Inc.; Court Number/Name: L-2980-16 Superior Court of New Jersey, Camden County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7351513.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice Removal, # 2 Certificate of Service) (WIETRZYCHOWSKI, MICHAEL) Modified on 9/15/2016 (dd).16-5625JBS/JS (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7882 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Jack McGlown v. Retrieval Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7350530.) (n). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (GINSBURG, AMY) Modified on 9/15/2016 (dd).16-5622RMB/AMD (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7881 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Timothy A. Horne v. Cherry Hill Office of the Federal Bureau of Investigation: Custodian of Records; Court Number/Name: CUM-L-552-16; Supeior Court of NJ, Cumberland County, Law Division. (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Summons and Complaint) (DHARIA, KRUTI) Modified on 9/15/2016 (dd).16-5620NLH/AMD (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7880 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Sandra Winsor v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC d/b/a Morgan Stanley Wealth Management, Edward G. Janansky and John Does 1-10; Court Number/Name: ATL-L-1826-16, Superior Court of New Jersey, Atlantic County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7345875.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Certificate of Service) (GROSSMAN, KIRSTEN) Modified on 9/14/2016 (dd).16-5556RBK/JS (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7879 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - KIMBERLY KOKSER -V- BURLINGTON COUNTY BRIDGE COMMISSION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7344523.). (FARRELL, BRIAN) Modified on 9/13/2016 (dd).16-5539RMB/KMW (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7878 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Dugan, et al. v. Best Buy Co. Inc.; Court Number/Name: Docket No.: BUR-L-1670-16, Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Burlington County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7343662.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (WEXLER, HOWARD) Modified on 9/13/2016 (dd).16-5530NLH/AMD (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7877 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Pellerin v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7342553.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JARVIS, ADRIENNE) Modified on 9/12/2016 (dd).16-5514NLH (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7876 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - International Union of Operating Engineers Local 825 Employee Benefit Funds and the Trustees Thereof v. Lewandowski Companies Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7340715.). (Attachments: # 1 Statement cover letter, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Statement of notice, # 4 Statement that no brief is necessary, # 5 Certificate of Service, # 6 Text of Proposed Order, # 7 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 8 Exhibit A, # 9 Exhibit B, # 10 Exhibit C) (GIBLIN, VINCENT) Modified on 9/12/2016 (dd).16-5494JBS/JS (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7875 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - Roy A Bolton o/b/o J.B., a minor, v. Carolyn W. Colvin (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 IFP) (THOMPSON, JASON) Modified on 9/12/2016 (dd).16-5493RBK (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7874 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - Robert T. Winzinger Motion to Confirm ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7339709.). (Attachments: # 1 Verified Petition, # 2 Affidavit Edward H. O'Hare, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'HARE, EDWARD) Modified on 9/12/2016 (dd).16-5458RMB/KMW (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7873 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest v. Frame, et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7337545.). (MALONEY, JOHN) Modified on 9/9/2016 (dd). 16-5469JHR/KMW (Entered: 09/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7872 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - DELORES JACKSON v. RAND SPEAR, ET AL. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7337448.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet with attachment) (SCHAFKOPF, GARY) Modified on 9/9/2016 (dd).16-5423RMB/AMD (Entered: 09/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7871 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - Dana Lynn Cole v. Carolyn W. Colvin, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Application IFP, # 3 Proposed Summons on Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region III, # 4 Proposed Summons on Attorney General of USA, # 5 Proposed Summons on the United States Attorney's Office) (FISHMAN, SAMUEL) Modified on 9/8/2016 (dd).16-5444NLH (Entered: 09/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7870 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - Work Zone Contractors, LLC. Motion to Confirm ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7333963.). (Attachments: # 1 Verified Petition, # 2 Affidavit Edward H. O'Hare, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'HARE, EDWARD) Modified on 9/8/2016 (dd).16-5443RBK/AMD (Entered: 09/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7869 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Karen Gassaway v. Mary S. Crocker ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7333292.). (WOLFE, RICHARD) Modified on 9/7/2016 (dd).16-5426JBS/JS (Entered: 09/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7868 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Brownstone Specialty Finance Inc. v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7331535.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (CASTRONOVO, PAUL) Modified on 9/7/2016 (dd).16-5412NLH/AMD (Entered: 09/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7867 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: KEVIN HART v. MEDTRONIC, INC., MEDTRONIC INTERNATIONAL, MEDTRONIC MINIMED, INC., JOHN DOES #1-10 (fictitious persons or entities unknown at this time), and ABC CORPS. #1-10 (fictitious persons or entities unknown at this time); Court Number/Name: L-1498-16, Camden Superior Court of New Jersey. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7330001.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (VAN NOSTRAND, AARON) Modified on 9/6/2016 (dd).16-5403JBS/AMD (Entered: 09/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7866 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD v. MACLEODS PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. AND MACLEODS PHARMA USA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7328727.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Certification L.Civ.R.11.2, # 4 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (CHUDEREWICZ, MELISSA) Modified on 9/6/2016 (dd).Chambers Review Modified on 9/6/2016 (dd).16-5400JBS/KMW (Entered: 09/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7865 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Shawn Kelly and John Ognibene v. MRS Restaurant Supply, LLC a/k/a or d/b/a Myers Restaurant Supply, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7328324.). (MONTGOMERY, CHARLES) Modified on 9/2/2016 (dd).16-5396RBK/JS (Entered: 09/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7864 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7327786), filed by PLAINTIFF. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Notice of Motion, # 5 Brief, # 6 Text of Proposed Order, # 7 Certificate of Service, # 8 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only))(DIAZ, DOUGLAS) Modified on 9/2/2016 (dd).16-5377RMB/KMW (Entered: 09/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7863 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Joseph Jacob v. Borough of lindenwold, et al; Court Number/Name: Cam-L-2631-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7327687.). (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Clerk, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (GALELLA, LINDA) Modified on 9/2/2016 (dd).16-5376RBK/JS (Entered: 09/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7862 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against PLAINTIFF, filed by PLAINTIFF. (Attachments: # 1 Application IFP)(RADIN, ELLEN) Modified on 9/1/2016 (dd).Newark Case 2:16-cv-05364(MCA) Modified on 9/1/2016 (jr). (Entered: 09/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7861 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against PLAINTIFF, filed by PLAINTIFF. (Attachments: # 1 Application IFP)(RADIN, ELLEN) Modified on 9/1/2016 (dd).16-5361RBK (Entered: 09/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7860 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against PLAINTIFF, filed by PLAINTIFF.(RADIN, ELLEN) Modified on 9/1/2016 (dd).Newark Case 2:16-cv-05360 (KM) PASSAIC Modified on 9/1/2016 (jr). (Entered: 09/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7859 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - DOLORES BUSH-SEWELL vs. CAMCARE HEALTH CORP ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7325953.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Affidavit) (TUMOLO, ALFRED) Modified on 9/1/2016 (dd).16-5358RBK/KMW (Entered: 09/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7858 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: DEBRA FRANIC, Plaintiff V. WAL-MART STORES, INC.; JOHN DOE I-X and ABC CORP. I-X, Defendants.; Court Number/Name: MID-L-4022-16, Superior County of New Jersey. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7325705.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only) 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (GANZ, DAVID) Modified on 9/1/2016 (dd).Newark Case 2:16-cv-05359(JMV/MF) MIDDLESEX ARB Modified on 9/1/2016 (jr). (Entered: 09/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7857 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Dawn M. Renn v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and John Doe #1-10 (a fictitious name) and ABC Corporation #1-10 (a fictitious name); ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7325693.). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit A-E, # 4 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 5 Notice of Appearance) (RONG, MATTHEW) Modified on 9/1/2016 (dd).16-5353RBK/AMD (Entered: 09/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7856 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Arlene Martinez and Carlos Martinez, Jr., her husband v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and John Does, 1 through 100, inclusive, fictitious named Defendants, jointly, severally and/or in the alternative; ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7325260.). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit A-D, # 4 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 5 Notice of Appearance) (RONG, MATTHEW) Modified on 9/1/2016 (dd).16-5351JBS/AMD (Entered: 09/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7855 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - Aguilar v. SHS Voorhees Hospitality, LLC d/b/a SpringHill Suites Voorhees Mt. Laurel/Cherry Hill, et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7325125.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons SSH Voorhees Hospitality, LLC, # 3 Summons 44 Voorhees Associates, LLC, # 4 Summons SSN Hotel Management, LLC, # 5 Summons Marriott International, Inc.) (QUINN, SEAN) Modified on 9/1/2016 (dd).16-5350NLH/JS (Entered: 09/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7854 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Ka-Msiyara Corbett v. Rizzieri Institute, Inc., t/a Rizzieri School for the Healing Arts ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7324024.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DAILY, F.) Modified on 9/1/2016 (dd).16-5337JBS/KMW (Entered: 08/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7853 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS vs. THURSTON F. RHOADES. INC. t/a J&M CONCRETE CO. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7323614.). (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, # 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 4 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 5 STATEMENT, # 6 ORDER, # 7 JUDGMENT, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (TREMER, BRIAN) Modified on 8/31/2016 (dd).16-5331JBS.AMD (Entered: 08/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7852 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - MARK W. KLAMO v. THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7322034.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HAGNER, THOMAS) Modified on 8/31/2016 (dd).16-5280RBK/KMW (Entered: 08/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7851 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - Monique Barrett v. Sara Culhane, et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7319113.). (RODDEN, PATRICK) TRENTON CASE 16-5286(BRM/DEA) Modified on 8/30/2016 (mmb). Modified on 8/30/2016 (jjc, ). (Entered: 08/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7850 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. v. Ajanta Pharma Limited, et. al ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7318553.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit to Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 7.1 Disclosure Statement, # 5 11.2 Certification) (CHUDEREWICZ, MELISSA) 16-5288 JBS/KMW ANDA No Arb. Related Cases Modified on 8/30/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7849 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe Subscriber assigned IP address 96.248.109.213 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7317992.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C to Complaint, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 6 Certification of Interested Parties) (CERILLO, PATRICK) 16-5287 RMB/JS No Arb Modified on 8/30/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7848 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe Subscriber assigned IP address 73.248.16.132 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7317861.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 6 Certification of Interested Parties) (CERILLO, PATRICK) 16-5285 RBK/JS No Arb Modified on 8/30/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7847 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe Subscriber assigned IP address 73.226.179.155 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7317825.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C to Complaint, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 6 Certification of Interested Parties) (CERILLO, PATRICK) 16-5284 JBS/JS No Arb Modified on 8/30/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7846 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe Subscriber assigned IP address 73.197.61.249 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7317765.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C to Complaint, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 6 Certification of Interested Parties) (CERILLO, PATRICK) 16-5283 RBK/AMD No Arb Modified on 8/30/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7845 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe Subscriber assigned IP address 50.182.186.161 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7317488.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C to Complaint, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 6 Certification of Interested Parties) (CERILLO, PATRICK) 16-5282 RMB/AMD No Arb Modified on 8/30/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7844 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Michael Rivera v. City of Newark, et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7317391.). (BARNETT, BROOKE) NEWARK CASE Modified on 8/30/2016 (mmb). 2:16-cv-05308(SDW/LDW) ESSEX Modified on 8/31/2016 (jr). (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7843 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe Subscriber assigned IP address 173.61.35.90 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7317002.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C to Complaint, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 6 Certification of Interested Parties) (CERILLO, PATRICK) 16-5228 NLH/KMW No Arb Modified on 8/29/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7842 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe Subscriber assigned IP address 173.61.34.244 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7316985.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C to Complaint, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 6 Certification of Interested Parties) (CERILLO, PATRICK) 16-5227 RMB/KMW No Arb Modified on 8/29/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7841 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - KEVIN BELFORT v. MORGAN PROPERTIES, LLC and JERRY PEEK, individually ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7315127.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MILLER, CAROLINE) 16-5207 RMB/KMW No Arb Modified on 8/26/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7840 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE, INC. a/s/o DEREK ZUROMSKI v. MINNWHALE d/b/a PETRO OIL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7314523.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (WALLACE, MICHAEL) TRENTON CASE 16-5211(PGS/TJB) Modified on 8/26/2016 (mmb). Modified on 8/26/2016 (jjc, ). (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7839 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEFENDANT. (COSGROVE, ROBERT) Attachment to 7838 Modified on 8/25/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7838 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Atlantic Employers Insurance Company v. Sub-Zero Group, Inc., et al.; Court Number/Name: L-2746-16 Camden County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7311806.). (COSGROVE, ROBERT) 16-5193 RBK/AMD No Arb. Set intial conf. Modified on 8/25/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7837 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Rachel O'Donnell v. BH Media Group, Inc. d/b/a Press of Atlantic City; Court Number/Name: Atlantic County Superior Court, Docket No. L-1504-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7310916.). (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Compliance, # 2 Application for the Extension of Defendant's Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Rule 7.1 Statement, # 5 Certificate of Service) (BENNETT, JOHN) 16-5192 RMB/AMD No Arb. Set initial conf. Modified on 8/25/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7836 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Justin Lark, Francine Terry, J.L. v. New Jersey Division of Child Protection & Permanency, New Jersey Division of Children and Families, New Jersey Department of Human Services, Ihara Paulino, Angela Coit, Melanie Turso, John Does ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7310702.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (SHAPIRO, LOUIS) 16-5191 RBK/AMD No Arb Modified on 8/25/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7835 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Joanne Redd v. Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC; Court Number/Name: CAM-L-2665-16-Superior Court of NJ, Camden County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7310482.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (CHERNAK, FRANK) 16-5189 RBK/KMW No Arb. Set initial conf. Modified on 8/25/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7834 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Katz v. Rooney ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7309719.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NEWMAN, JAMES) 16-5188 RBK/KMW Arb Modified on 8/25/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7833 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Alpha Painting & Construction Company, Inc. v. Delaware River Port Authority of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania and the State of New Jersey ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7307192.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Verified Complaint, # 2 Exhibits B - L to Verified Complaint, # 3 Exhibits M - W to Verified Complaint, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Alpha Painting & Construction Company, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 Certification, # 6 Statement Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 10.1(a), # 7 Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 11.2, # 8 Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraints, # 9 Memorandum of Law in Support of Application for an Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraints, # 10 Certificate of Service) (TORCICOLLO, PETER) Modified on 8/23/2016 (ds). 1:16cv5141 (NLH/AMD). No ARB (Entered: 08/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7832 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Tiffany Guerrero and Charles Silva v. Crab Addison, Inc., d/b/a Joe's Crab Shack,, John Doe 1-10, and ABC Corp 1-10.; Court Number/Name: Superior Court of NJ, Essex County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7305604.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2) (PARKER, KEISHA) Modified on 8/23/2016 (ds). NEWARK CASE - Notified on 8/23/16. 2:16-cv-05126-CCC-JBC (Entered: 08/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7831 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Nancy Pelikoski v ACME Markets, Inc.; Court Number/Name: ATL-L-1341-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7304651.). (HAGAN, TRACEY) Modified on 8/23/2016 (ds). 1:16cv5130(RMB-AMD)ARB (Entered: 08/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7830 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Reckitt Benckiser LLC v. Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Sun Pharma Global Inc., Sun Pharma Global FZE, and Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7304617.). (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only) of Reckitt Benckiser LLC, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (LIZZA, CHARLES) Modified on 8/23/2016 (ds). 1:16cv5133 (RMB-JS) No ARB (Entered: 08/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7829 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Jason D. Slimm and Elizabeth A. Hansen-Obringer v. Ally Financial Inc.; Ally Bank; Ally Capital; Security Collection Agency; Giannone Services Inc. and John Does Yet Discovered; Court Number/Name: Docket No. L-2431-16; Superior Court of New Jersey - Camden County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7304404.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only) Ally Financial Inc., # 4 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only) Ally Bank, # 5 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only) Ally Capital, # 6 Certificate of Service) (COHEN, REGINA) Modified on 8/23/2016 (ds). 1:16cv5131 (NLH-AMD) No ARB (Entered: 08/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7828 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: C.S. KOIDA, LLC, SMART LED CORP., JIN CHOI V. LED ONE DISTRIBUTION, INC.; Court Number/Name: NJ Super. Ct. UNN-C-099-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7302239.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons C.S. Koida, # 7 Summons Smart LED Corp., # 8 Summons Jin Choi) (RUTKOWSKI, CHAD) NEWARK CASE Modified on 8/19/2016 (mmb). 2:16-cv-05095(JMV/MF) UNION Modified on 8/22/2016 (jr). (Entered: 08/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7827 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Richard Lipford vs. J.B. Hunt Transportation, Inc. and John Does 1-5 and 6-10,; Court Number/Name: CAM-L-2552-16 Camden County Superior Court. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7300154.). (Attachments: # 1 Notice to Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Removal, # 2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Lauren Marcus Notice of Appearance, # 5 Stacey Adams Notice of Appearance, # 6 Certificate of Service) (MARCUS, LAUREN) 16-5075 RMB/JS No Arb Set Initial Conf Modified on 8/19/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 08/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7826 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - NICOLE CARUSO V. BALLYS ATLANTIC CITY a/k/a CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT CORP ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7297676.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KOLLER, DAVID)16-5021 JBS/AMD No Arb Modified on 8/18/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7825 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against PLAINTIFF, filed by PLAINTIFF.(RADIN, ELLEN) NEWARK CASE Modified on 8/18/2016 (mmb). 2:16-cv-05065(CCC) UNION Modified on 8/18/2016 (jr). (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7824 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - 1:33-av-00001 P.B., et al. v. Washington Twp. Sch. Dist. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7293614.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A to the Complaint) (CAROLLA, AMELIA) Modified on 8/16/2016 (dd).16-5011NLH/KMW (Entered: 08/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7823 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Carmen Nieves and Santos Nieves v. Target Corporation, et al.; Court Number/Name: NJSuper.Ct. ATL-L-1516-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7292462.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Removal - Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (PETRYCKI, JOHN) Modified on 8/16/2016 (dd).16-4997JBS/KMW (Entered: 08/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7822 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - GJJM Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Stiletto v. City of Atlantic City ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7291834.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (LAFFERTY, RANDOLPH) Modified on 8/16/2016 (dd).16-4996NLH/JS (Entered: 08/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7821 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DEFENDANT Nike Inc. from Bergen County, case number L-4301-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7291820), filed by DEFENDANT.(MCDONNELL, MICHAEL) Modified on 8/16/2016 (dd).Newark Case 2:16-cv-05009(SDW/LDW) BERGEN ARB Modified on 8/16/2016 (jr). (Entered: 08/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7820 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Family Dollar Stores of New Jersey, LLC; defendant ads. Dawn Fussel ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7289782.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (HARRIS, MATTHEW) Modified on 8/15/2016 (dd).16-4898RMB/KMW (Entered: 08/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7819 Filed: 8/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - BRIAN AARON JACOME, Deceased, by HELEN JACOME, TYLER JACOME and HELEN JACOME, Individually v. SP NEW YORK AVENUE URBAN RENEWAL LP et al BRIAN AARON JACOME, Deceased, by Proposed Administratrix of Estate, HELEN JACOME, TYLER JACOME, and HELEN JACOME, Individually, v. SP NEW YORK AVENUE URBAN RENEWAL LP, COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT INC., and UNITED STATES ELEVATOR, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7289228.). (KIM, DANIEL) Modified on 8/15/2016 (dd). Modified on 8/16/2016 (dd).16-4994JBS/JS (Entered: 08/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7818 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Progressive Health Supply & Source Corp. v. Biosense Medical Devices, LLC, Gregory Santulli, and Scott Climes, jointly, severally, and in the alternative ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7289015.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (KRAUSE, JONATHAN) Modified on 8/15/2016 (dd).Trenton Case 16-4965 (AET/DEA) Modified on 8/15/2016 (jjc, ). (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7817 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Emory University v. Hetero Drugs Ltd., Hetero Labs Ltd., and Hetero USA Inc. with Exhibits A - D ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7286647.). (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 AO120 Patent Form) (WALSH, LIZA) Modified on 8/12/2016 (dd).Chambers Review Modified on 8/12/2016 (dd).16-4938RMB/AMD (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7816 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS, et al. v. AMERICAN MASONRY CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7286572.). (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, # 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 4 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 5 STATEMENT, # 6 ORDER, # 7 JUDGMENT, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (STEPHENS, JEFFREY) Modified on 8/12/2016 (dd).16-4934NLH/JS (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7815 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS, et al. v. JOHN D. LAWRENCE, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7286557.). (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, # 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 4 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 5 STATEMENT, # 6 ORDER, # 7 JUDGMENT, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (STEPHENS, JEFFREY) Modified on 8/12/2016 (dd).16-4933JHR/AMD (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7814 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS, et al. v. LANE CONSTRUCTION CO. INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7286483.). (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, # 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 4 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 5 STATEMENT, # 6 ORDER, # 7 JUDGMENT, # 8 CERTIFICAE OF SERVICE) (STEPHENS, JEFFREY) 2:16-cv-04935(ES/JAD) - MORRIS - Modified on 8/12/2016 (dd).Newark Case Modified on 8/12/2016 (mfr). (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7813 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Charles Shannon On Behalf of Himself and All Other Persons Similarly Situated v. General Motors, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7286479.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NAGEL, BRUCE) Modified on 8/12/2016 (dd).16-4932RMB/AMD (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7812 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Alisha Bishop v. Harvard Collection Services Inc ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7285836.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (METRICK, IRA) Modified on 8/11/2016 (dd).16-4905NLH/JS (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7811 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: GARBER, BRENDA ET AL V. BLOOMIN BRANDS, INC., ET AL; Court Number/Name: CAM-L-2526-16, Superior Court of NJ, Camden County, Law Division. on behalf of Defendants, Bloomin Brands, Inc., d/b/a Outback Steakhouse, Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC, Outback Steakhouse of Florida, Inc., Outback Steakhouse, Inc., and OSI Restaurant Partners, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7285763.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (BRIGGS, NORMAN) Modified on 8/11/2016 (dd).16-4900RMB/KMW (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7810 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEFENDANT identifying Unum Group as Corporate Parent.. (PINDULIC, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7809 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Deborah Conn v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America and Corporate Synergies Group, LLC; Court Number/Name: GLO-L-781-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7283614.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Application for Extention of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead, # 7 Certification, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Certificate of Service) (PINDULIC, ROBERT) Modified on 8/10/2016 (dd).16-4875NLH/JS (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7808 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - Shi v. Elementar Americas, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7283315.). (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (MAINS, DEBORAH) Modified on 8/10/2016 (dd).16-4869JBS/KMW (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7807 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - Joyce M. Jackson v. CPL (MEADOWVIEW) LLC, d/b/a Meadow View Nursing and Respiratory Care Center, John Does (Plural 1-10) ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7281406.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KURKOWSKI, DANIEL) Modified on 8/10/2016 (dd).16-4856JHR/JS (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7806 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - Discover Construction, LLC. Motion to Confirm ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7275631.). (Attachments: # 1 Verified Petition, # 2 Affidavit Edward H. O'Hare, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'HARE, EDWARD) Modified on 8/8/2016 (dd).Trenton case 16-4811 (MAS/TJB) Modified on 8/8/2016 (dm). (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7805 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - JH Reid General Contractors Motion to Confirm ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7275584.). (Attachments: # 1 Verified Petition, # 2 Affidavit Edward H. O'Hare, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'HARE, EDWARD)2:16-cv-4820(KM/MAH) - MIDDLESEX Modified on 8/8/2016 (mfr). (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7804 Filed: 8/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - NANCY IDA COWLEY V. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7275155.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BROWN, MICHAEL) Modified on 8/8/2016 (dd).16-4800JBS (Entered: 08/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7803 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - International Union of Operating Engineers Local 825 Employee Benefit Funds and the Trustees Thereof v. Structural Building Supply LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7274993.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 cover letter, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 notice of petition, # 7 Certificate of Service, # 8 No Brief is Necessary, # 9 Text of Proposed Order, # 10 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (GIBLIN, VINCENT) Modified on 8/8/2016 (dd).Trenton Case 16-4806 (FLW/DEA) Modified on 8/8/2016 (dm). (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7802 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against PLAINTIFF ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7272663) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PLAINTIFF. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(STRATIS, DEMETRIOS) Modified on 8/5/2016 (dd).Newark Case 16-cv-04762 (ES/MAH) (Bergen) Modified on 8/5/2016 (ak). (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7801 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Gonzalez v. Cumberland County ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7272526.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (LOCKMAN, RYAN) Modified on 8/5/2016 (dd).16-4757NLH/KMW (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7800 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Qutana Toney v. Walmart and ABC Corp.(S) 1-5 (Fictitious Corp(s), i/j/s/a); ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7271751.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A-E, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (RONG, MATTHEW) Modified on 8/5/2016 (dd).16-4738NLH/KMW (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7799 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Cheeseman v. Target Corportion; Court Number/Name: GLO-L-636-16 Gloucester County. Target Corporation ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7271411.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (PETRYCKI, JOHN) Modified on 8/4/2016 (dd).16-4728RBK/KMW (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7798 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Frank Minor v. Delaware River & Bay Authority ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7268348.). (PESCATORE, RICHARD) Modified on 8/3/2016 (dd).16-4686JHR/JS (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7797 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Chase Collins v. ARP Renovations and Maintenance, LLC and Adrew Pollock ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7267448.) (N). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DION, SAMUEL) Modified on 8/3/2016 (dd).16-4684RBK/JS (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7796 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Newark Cab Assoc., et al v. City of Newark ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7266979.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (WEDINGER, RICHARD) Modified on 8/3/2016 (dd).16-cv-04681 (WHW/CLW) (Essex)Newark Case Modified on 8/3/2016 (ak). (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7795 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - Vicente V. Torres v. Teresa Diane Hogan ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7264788.). (AGRAPIDIS, EVANS) Modified on 8/2/2016 (dd).Newark Case 16-cv-04659 (WHW/CLW) (Hudson) ARB Modified on 8/2/2016 (ak). (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7794 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Albert Talone, D.O., et al. v. The American Osteopathic Association ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7262697.). (GREENBERG, JAMES) Modified on 8/2/2016 (dd).16-4644NLH/JS (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7793 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Kelishia Braxton v. Anthony Costa ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7261333.). (RODDEN, PATRICK) Modified on 8/2/2016 (dd).16-4643JHR/AMD (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7792 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: George Gillman and Florence Berke Gillman v. Michael Rakouskas and Elaine Rakouskas; ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7259978.). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Notice of Appearance, # 3 Exhibit A - Complaint, # 4 Exhibit B - Courts Public Access, # 5 Exhibit C - Letter) (MCCONNELL, JOHN) Modified on 8/1/2016 (dd).16-4619JBS/KMW (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7791 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - JESSE BROWN, JR. v. RAILROAD GROUP LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, RAILROAD CONSTRUCTORS, INC., RAILROAD CONSTRUCTION CO. OF SOUTH JERSEY INC., 3D RAILWAY SERVICES, LLC, DENNIS RIGGS SR., BRIAN SHEEHY, STEVEN RIGGS, CHRIS DALOISIO, and JAMES DALOISIO SR. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7259249.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MILLER, CAROLINE) Modified on 7/29/2016 (dd).16-4602NLH/AMD (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7790 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Kelvin Bellamy v. J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7249994.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (SACUNAS, ABBY) TRENTON CASE Modified on 7/26/2016 (mmb). 16-4519 (MAS/LHG) Modified on 7/26/2016 (dm). (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7789 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - James Pointer v. Professional Bureau of Collections of Maryland, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7246199.) (n). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (GINSBURG, AMY) Modified on 7/25/2016 (dd).16-4467RMB/KMW (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7788 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Edward Scanlon IV v. Valeria Lawson, et al.; Court Number/Name: CUM-L-232-16, Edward Scanlon IV v. Valeria Lawson, et al.. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7244890.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service) (BUENO, GREGORY) Modified on 7/22/2016 (dd).16-4465RMB/JS (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7787 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Fiori-Lacivita v. Franco-Palacios et al; Court Number/Name: Cumberland County Superior Court, L-86-16. filed by the United States, substituting for Ylbe Franco-Palacios (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A: State Court Docket, # 3 Exhibit B: Complaint, # 4 Exhibit C: Torres Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D: Certification of Scope of Employment, # 6 Exhibit E: Answer, # 7 Exhibit F: Answer, # 8 Exhibit G: Answer, # 9 Exhibit H: Answer, # 10 Exhibit I: Answer, # 11 Exhibit J: Letter to Superior Court, # 12 Certificate of Service) (O'NEILL, JESSICA) Modified on 7/22/2016 (dd).16-4445RBK/JS (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7786 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Bryan Fox and Leslie Fox v. Narragansett Bay Insurance Company; Court Number/Name: CUM-L-414-16/Cumberland County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7240947.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, # 4 Certificate of Service) (KONECKE, ERIC) Modified on 7/21/2016 (dd).16-4425NLH/JS (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7785 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - KELLY CRONIN v. HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INS. CO. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7239694.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HAGNER, THOMAS) Modified on 7/21/2016 (dd).16-4417JHR/KMW (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7784 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - SAMANTHA BRODERICK v. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7239636.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HAGNER, THOMAS) Modified on 7/21/2016 (dd).16-4416JHR/JS (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7783 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - Adam Richard Sanborn v. Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7239314.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BROWN, MICHAEL) Modified on 7/20/2016 (dd).16-4408JBS (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7782 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND; TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND; TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE; INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND; INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND; PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 Plaintiffs, v. IRIS INDUSTRIAL COATINGS, LLC, Defendants. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7239154.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (BUSHINSKY, STEVEN) Modified on 7/20/2016 (dd).Newark Case 2:16cv4410 (WJM/MF) (Passaic) Modified on 7/20/2016 (eu). (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7781 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - ACTEON, INC. D/B/A ACTEON N.A. v TANIA MARTIN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7238283.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Summons, # 5 Statement) (SHULICK, DAVID) Modified on 7/20/2016 (dd).16-4399NLH/KMW (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7780 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Joshua Slater v. Rent-A-Center, Inc.; Court Number/Name: CUM-L-427-16 Cumberland County Superior Court. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7236659.). (Attachments: # 1 Notice to Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Removal, # 2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Notice of Appearance for Lauren J. Marcus, Esq., # 5 Certificate of Service) (MARCUS, LAUREN) Modified on 7/19/2016 (dd).16--4383RBK/AMD (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7779 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Britt v. Experian; Court Number/Name: DC-2361-16 Superior Court of New Jersey Gloucester County Special Civil Part. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7234405.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (KOWAL, DOROTHY) Modified on 7/19/2016 (dd).16-4365JBS/JS (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7778 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Lawrence Patterson v. Aluminum Shapes, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7234129.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MURPHY, MICHAEL) Modified on 7/19/2016 (dd).16-4364RBK/JS (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7777 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT, filed by PLAINTIFF. (Attachments: # 1 Application IFP)(RADIN, ELLEN) Modified on 7/18/2016 (dd).Newark Case 16-cv-04367 (KM) (Union) Modified on 7/19/2016 (ak). (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7776 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - Kimberly Shibles v. Bank of America, N.A.; Service One, Inc. a/k/a BSI Financial Servies, Inc.; John Does I-X ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7233668.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DEUTSCH, ADAM) Modified on 7/18/2016 (dd).16-4357RMB/KMW (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7775 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - Angelicia L. Jones v. The United States of America, et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7233145.). (RENZI, NICHOLAS) Modified on 7/18/2016 (dd).16-4356NLH/JS (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7774 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - FOUR SEASONS PRODUCE, INC., Plaintiff v. JORAJA, INC. t/a CRYSTAL LAKE THRIFTWAY and RAYMOND E. McFALL, JR., Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7233104.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (FASSETT, DAVID) Modified on 7/18/2016 (dd).16-4355JHR/JS (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7773 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Amato v. Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7231075.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JARVIS, ADRIENNE) Modified on 7/18/2016 (dd).16-4329NLH (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7772 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Velez v. Home Depot, et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7230358.). (ZEFF, GREGG) Modified on 7/15/2016 (dd).16-4314RBK/AMD (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7771 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS, et al. v. AMERICAN MASONRY CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7227648.). (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, # 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 4 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 5 STATEMENT, # 6 ORDER, # 7 JUDGMENT, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (STEPHENS, JEFFREY) Modified on 7/14/2016 (dd).16-4275JBS/JS (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7770 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Northeast Carpenters Pension Fund and Trustees Thereof v. Smith, et ano. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7225861.). (Attachments: # 1 cover letter, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only) Disclosure statement, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (PTASIEWICZ, SETH) Modified on 7/14/2016 (dd).16-4262JBS/AMD (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7769 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Nicole Frost v. Railroad Construction Co. of South Jersey, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7225514.) (N). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DION, SAMUEL) Modified on 7/14/2016 (dd). 16-4261RBK/AMD (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7768 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - Bud Concrete Motion to Confirm ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7225507.). (Attachments: # 1 Verified Petition, # 2 Affidavit Edward H. O'Hare, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'HARE, EDWARD) Modified on 7/14/2016 (dd).16-4260JHR/JS (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7767 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - GINA CIRRINCIONE v. TACO BELL et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7224722.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ROZYNSKI, ANDREW) Modified on 7/13/2016 (dd).16-4248JBS/KMW (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7766 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT, filed by PLAINTIFF. (Attachments: # 1 Application IFP)(RADIN, ELLEN) Modified on 7/13/2016 (dd).Newark Case 16-cv-04268 (SRC) (Hudson) Modified on 7/14/2016 (ak). (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7765 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT, filed by PLAINTIFF.(RADIN, ELLEN) Modified on 7/12/2016 (dd). 16-cv-04208 (MCA) (Hudson) Newark Case Modified on 7/12/2016 (ak). (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7764 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7219380.). (Attachments: # 1 Statement Cover Letter, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Certification of Counsel, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Statement Cover Letter to State Court, # 9 Statement Notice to State Court of Removal) (REYNOLDS, THOMAS) Modified on 7/12/2016 (dd).16-4179JHR/KMW (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7763 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DEFENDANT International House of Pancakes from Superior Court of New Jersey Atlantic County, case number L-1116-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7219119), filed by DEFENDANT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(MARESCA, CARLA) Modified on 7/11/2016 (dd).16-4173JBS/AMD (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7762 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7217773.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C-E, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (PETERSON, ROCKY) Modified on 7/11/2016 (dd).16-4160RBK/JS (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7761 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Kenneth Borrelli v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.; Court Number/Name: GLO-L-667-16, Superior Court of New Jersey, Gloucester County, Law Division. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7216798.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, # 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, # 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, # 4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, # 5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal, # 6 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal, # 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Rule 7.1 Certification, # 8 Statement Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 10.1(a), # 9 Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 11.2, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Certificate of Service) (MCDONALD, MICHAEL) Modified on 7/11/2016 (dd).16-4147JBS/KMW (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7760 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Emory University v. Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7216546.). (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 AO120 Form) (WALSH, LIZA) Modified on 7/11/2016 (dd).Chambers Review Modified on 7/12/2016 (dd).16-4178RMB/AMD (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7759 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - Anthony Rafter v. Concord Resolution, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7216415.) (n). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (GINSBURG, AMY) Modified on 7/11/2016 (dd).16-4146RMB/JS (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7758 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Duffy v. Agbasi, et al.; Court Number/Name: ATL-L-0597-16, New Jersey Superior Court, Law Division, Atlantic County. (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Notice: State Court Docket, # 2 Exhibit B to Notice: Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C to Notice: Am. Compl., # 4 Exhibit D to Notice: Decl. of Meredith Torres with attached exhibit, # 5 Exhibit E to Notice: Certification of Scope of Federal Employment, # 6 Exhibit F to Notice: Cover Letter to Sup. Ct. of Atl. Cnty., # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Certificate of Service) (TAYLOR, ANNE) Modified on 7/8/2016 (dd).(Main Document 7758 replaced on 7/11/2016) (dd). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/11/2016) (dd). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/11/2016) (dd). (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/11/2016) (dd). (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/11/2016) (dd). (Attachment 5 replaced on 7/11/2016) (dd). (Attachment 6 replaced on 7/11/2016) (dd). (Attachment 7 replaced on 7/11/2016) (dd). (Attachment 8 replaced on 7/11/2016) (dd). 16-4134RBK/JS (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7757 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: BRIAN MCMULLEN & DEMETRIOUS ZERIS vs. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC; Court Number/Name: Superior Court of NJ, Camden County, Case No. L-2105-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7215334.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (FIALKOFF, KASSIA) Modified on 7/8/2016 (dd).16-4120NLH/AMD (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7756 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Robert G. Jillard v. Bayside State Prison, et al ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7214413.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KING, STANLEY) Modified on 8/1/2016 (dd).16-4118JHR/KMW (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7755 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - Robin Reath v. AtlantiCare Regional Medical Center, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7214115.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MURPHY, MICHAEL) Modified on 8/1/2016 (dd).16-4117 RBK/KMW (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7754 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Interstate Realty Management Company v. PF Holdings, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7213736.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (AZOTEA, DAVID) Modified on 7/7/2016 (dd).16-4095JBS/JS (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7753 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - think Pavers Motion to Confirm ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7213532.). (Attachments: # 1 Verified Petition, # 2 Affidavit Edward H. O'Hare, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'HARE, EDWARD) Modified on 7/7/2016 (dd).16-4089RMB/KMW (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7752 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Housing Authority of City of Hoboken v. Carmelo Garcia; Court Number/Name: NJSuper CT HUD-L-1722-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7210948.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B) (ZAYAS, LOUIS) Modified on 7/7/2016 (dd).Newark 2:16-cv-04069(KM/JBC) HUDSON ARB Case Modified on 7/7/2016 (jr). (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7751 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DEFENDANT Target Corporation from Burlington Superior Court, case number L-1049-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7209850), filed by DEFENDANT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only))(PETRYCKI, JOHN) Modified on 7/6/2016 (dd).16-4054NLH/JS (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7750 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Richard Schwartz v. Planalytics, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7206264.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (RESNICK, JEFFREY) Modified on 7/5/2016 (dd).16-3933NLH/AMD (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7749 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: JEFFREY NISNICK v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE; Court Number/Name: BUR-SC-773-16. (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Notice of Removal - Ex. A - State Court Complaint and Ex. B - Letter to Clerk of NJ Super. Court, Burl. Cnty., Special Civil/Small Claims, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Certificate of Service) (PASCAL, ELIZABETH)16-4002 JBS/AMD Arb. Set Initial Conf. Modified on 7/1/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7748 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - KENNETH M. VAN DEVENTER V. RALPH T. IANNELLI, ESSEX CAPITAL CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7202646.). (VANDEVENTER, PETER) Modified on 7/1/2016 (jr). 2:16-cv-3970 - attorney opening (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7747 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - Bud Concrete Motion to Confirm ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7202545.). (Attachments: # 1 Verified Petition, # 2 Affidavit Edward H. O'Hare, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'HARE, EDWARD) 16-4000 RBK/JS No Arb Modified on 7/1/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7746 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Jerrylinn Kirkland-Rodriguez and David Archoro Valentin v. Cooper University Health Care; Cooper University Hospital; Dr. Eytan R. Barnea, M.D.; Dr. Raymond H. Green, D.O.; Dr. Joseph V. Lombardi, M.D.; Dr. Dhruv Rathod, M.D., Dr. Anthony Colacino, M.D.; Dr. Kiavash Koko, M.D.; John/Jane Does 1-10; ABC Corp 1-10; Court Number/Name: CAM-L-4192-15. (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A - State Court Docket, # 2 Exhibit Ex B - Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Ex C - Declaration of Meredith Torres, # 4 Exhibit Ex D - Certification of Scope of Employment, # 5 Exhibit Ex E - State Court Pleadings, # 6 Exhibit Ex F - State Court Pleadings, # 7 Exhibit Ex G - Letter to Clerk of New Jersey Superior Court, # 8 Exhibit Ex H - Certificate of Service, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'NEILL, JESSICA) 16-3999 NLH/KMW No Arb Set Initial Conf. Modified on 7/1/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7745 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DEFENDANT Associated Pipe Line, Inc., Associated Pipe Line Contractors, Inc., Charles Beddingfield and Brad Sundling ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7202225), filed by DEFENDANT.(BUCHTER, NATHAN)16-3998 JBS/KMW No Arb Set Initial Conf. Modified on 7/1/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7744 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - Bud Concrete Motion to Confirm ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7202110.). (Attachments: # 1 Verified Petition, # 2 Affidavit Edward H. O'Hare, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'HARE, EDWARD) 16-3997 JHR/KMW No Arb Modified on 7/1/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7743 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: James Durham and Patrick Pacitto v. State Farm Insurance Company and John Does 1-10; Court Number/Name: NJSuper.Ct. CUM-L-262-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7201737.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certificate of Service) (SWERDLOW, DAVID) 16-3996 RMB/JS No Arb Set Initial Conf Modified on 7/1/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7742 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Goode v. Camden City School District ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7201125.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KOBER, PETER) 16-3936 RBK/JS No Arb Modified on 7/1/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7741 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: S.R. and A.R., individually, and as parents and natural guardians of L.R., a minor, v. Lumberton Township Board of Education; Lumberton Township School District; Ashbrook Elementary School; Terrance Healey; Scott Dailey; Tracy Houck; Donnamarie Wojtko; Allison Bunting; F.S.; Stephanie Sezawich; John Jane Does 2-50, fictitious parties; Court Number/Name: BUR-L-1075-15, Superior Court of New Jersey, Burlington County, Law Division. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7200088.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit) (DONIO, WILLIAM) Modified on 6/30/2016 (dd).16-3926RBK/JS (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7740 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Paul Brown and Celeste Brown v. HireRight, Inc.; Court Number/Name: L-1812-16, Superior Court of New Jersey Law Division. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7199104.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (SIMMONS, WILLIAM) Modified on 6/30/2016 (dd).16-3912JHR/AMD (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7739 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - John Horton v. United States Postal Service ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7198606.) (N). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DION, SAMUEL) Modified on 6/30/2016 (dd).16-3911JBS/AMD (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7738 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Norman Jablow v. Bank of America, N.A., BNF Contractors, Inc., LCJ & Associates, LLC, ABC Corp. 1-10 (fictitious entities), John Doe 1-10 (fictitious entities); Court Number/Name: same as above, Superior Court of New Jersey, Burlington County. (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service for Notice of Removal, # 2 Exhibit "A" for Notice of Removal, # 3 Exhibit "B" for Notice of Removal - pay.gov receipt for filing of Notice of Removal on 6-24-16) (BERG, LAWRENCE) 16-3890 NLH/KMW No Arb. Set Initial Conf. Modified on 6/29/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7737 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Jose A. Echevarria v Commissioner of Social Security (y). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Application IFP) (WLADYKA, AGNES) 16-3859 RBK Modified on 6/29/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7736 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - Patricia K. Hennis o/b/o Estate of David Hennis v. Cumberland County Jail ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7192926.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons) (STARR, ADAM) 16-3858 JHR/KMW No Arb. Modified on 6/29/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7735 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - AMS CONSTRUCTION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7191911.). (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, # 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 4 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 5 STATEMENT, # 6 ORDER, # 7 JUDGMENT, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (STEPHENS, JEFFREY) 16-3837 RMB/KMW No Arb Modified on 6/28/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7734 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - David Graham v. Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., et als. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7188962.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 6/27/2016 (lm). 16-3784RBK/JS (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7733 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Earl Mack and Susie Mack v. Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., et als. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7188947.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 6/27/2016 (lm). 16-3783RBK/JS (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7732 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Bobbie Moore v. Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., et als. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7188927.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 6/27/2016 (lm). 16-3782RBK/JS (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7731 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - Oscar Plater as Anticipated Representative of the Estate of Mary Plater v. Daiichi Sankyo Inc., et als. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7188892.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 6/27/2016 (lm). 16-3781RBK/JS (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7730 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Mary Rowlett v. Daiichi Sankyo Inc., et als. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7188848.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 6/27/2016 (lm). 16-3780RBK/JS (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7729 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Charles Westbrooks v. Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., et als. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7188761.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 6/27/2016 (lm). 16-3779RBK/JS (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7728 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - Kimberly Thompson v. Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., et als. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7188729.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 6/27/2016 (lm). 16-3778RBK/JS (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7727 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - Michael Wells v. Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., et als. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7188655.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 6/27/2016 (lm). 16-3777RBK/JS (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7726 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Anthony Woodall v. Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., et als. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7188604.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 6/27/2016 (lm). 16-3776RBK/JS (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7725 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Anthony Harris as the Anticipated Representative of the Estate of Bettie A. Bradley v. Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., et als. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7188549.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 6/27/2016 (lm). 16-3775RBK/JS (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7724 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Teresa Bowen and Tracy Bowen v. Daiichi Sankyo, Inc.,et als. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7188521.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 6/27/2016 (lm). 16-3774RBK/JS (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7723 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - Joe Goode and Marshall Goode v. Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., et als. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7188501.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 6/27/2016 (lm). 16-3773RBK/JS (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7722 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Phillip Dixon and Carolyn Dixon v. Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., et als. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7188394.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 6/27/2016 (lm). 16-3772RBK/JS (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7721 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - James Branch and Amanda Branch v. Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., et als. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7188376.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 6/27/2016 (lm). 16-3764RBK/JS (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7720 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - Ruth Russo v. Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., et als. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7188356.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 6/27/2016 (lm). 16-3763RBK/JS (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7719 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - M.L. Rhymes v. Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., et als. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7188324.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 6/27/2016 (lm). 16-3762RBK/JS (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7718 Filed: 6/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Dyan D'Aversa v. Playtex prodcuts, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care Comapny, and Sun Pharmaceutical, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7187540.) (DENITTIS, STEPHEN) 16cv3813 JHR/AMD No Arb. Modified on 6/27/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 06/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7717 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - ED and JD on behalf of I.D. v. Camden City School District ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7187252.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (SANG, JENNIFER) 16cv3812 RMB/AMD No Arb Modified on 6/27/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7716 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION v. THOMAS HUMRICH and JOSEPH PURSCHKE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7187240.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (STIO, ANGELO)16cv3811 JHR/AMD No Arb. Modified on 6/27/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7715 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7187230.). (Attachments: # 1 Statement Cover Letter, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Certification of Counsel, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Statement Cover Letter to State Court, # 8 Statement Notice to State Court of Filing of Removal) (REYNOLDS, THOMAS) 16cv3809 NLH/KMW No Arb. Set Initial Conf. Pro Se Flag Modified on 6/27/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7714 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - Longwood Construction, Ind. LLC. Motion to Confirm ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7186343.). (Attachments: # 1 Verified Petition, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Affidavit Edward H. O'Hare) (O'HARE, EDWARD) Modified on 6/24/2016 (dd).16-3732RBK/AMD (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7713 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - Longwood Construction, Ind. LLC. Motion to Confirm ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7185604.). (Attachments: # 1 Verified Petition, # 2 Affidavit Edward H. O'Hare, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'HARE, EDWARD) Modified on 6/24/2016 (dd).16-3724JHR/JS (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7712 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - Gary and Katherine Monaco v. Keystone Insurance Company, a division of AAA Insurance ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7184257.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (RESNICK, JEFFREY) Modified on 6/24/2016 (dd).16-3707JHR/KMW (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7711 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - L.M. & M.M. o/b/o G.M. v. Willingboro Township School District ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7180745.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A to the Complaint, # 3 Exhibit B to the Complaint) (CAROLLA, AMELIA) Modified on 6/22/2016 (dd).16-3672JHR/AMD (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7710 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Ryan Russell, et al. v. Clawfoot Supply, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7174235.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Cover Letter) (CLARK, GERALD) Modified on 6/20/2016 (dd).Trenton Case 16-3568(MAS/LHG) Modified on 6/20/2016 (jjc, ). (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7709 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Tatyana Tikhomirova v. Trump Entertainment Resorts,Inc., et al ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7172705.). (O'BRIEN, DANIEL) Modified on 6/17/2016 (dd).16-3544RMB/AMD (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7708 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Juanita Campbell v. David S. Matyas ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7171737.). (Attachments: # 1 Summons) (KRESMAN, MARSHALL) Modified on 6/17/2016 (dd).16-3543RMB/AMD (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7707 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: THOMAS J. HAMILL, ADVOCATES FOR DISABLED AMERICANS V. JPF1, LLC DBA FRIENDLY'S ICE CREAM; Court Number/Name: NJSuper CT CAM-L-1660-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7171862.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (SAPUTELLI, GREGORY) Modified on 6/17/2016 (dd).16-3542RMB/AMD (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7706 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, et al. vs. AMS CONSTRUCTION, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7170196.). (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, # 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 4 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 5 STATEMENT, # 6 ORDER, # 7 JUDGMENT, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (PARSONS, BRADLEY) Modified on 6/16/2016 (jjc, ). 16-3510(JBS/AMD) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7705 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS, et al. v. AMERICAN MASONRY CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7169913.). (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, # 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 4 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 5 STATEMENT, # 6 ORDER, # 7 JUDGMENT, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (STEPHENS, JEFFREY) Modified on 6/16/2016 (jjc, ). 16-3509(RMB/KMW) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7704 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against PLAINTIFF, filed by PLAINTIFF. (Attachments: # 1 Application IFP)(RADIN, ELLEN) Modified on 6/16/2016 (jjc, ). NEWARK CASE 2:16-cv-03514(MCA) ESSEX Modified on 6/16/2016 (jr). (Entered: 06/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7703 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - ELIZABETH FRANKLIN v. ONSITE NEONATAL PARTNERS, INC., TERRI VATHIS, and PAULINE GRANT ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7167535.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MILLER, CAROLINE)16-3480 JHR/KMW No Arb Modified on 6/16/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7702 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - MARYAN RIVERA v. ADVANCED MEDICAL CARE CENTER P.C. and ALFRED TAWADROUS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7167529.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MILLER, CAROLINE)16-3479 RBK/KMW No Arb Modified on 6/16/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7701 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Tina M. Washington vs. Anthony DiPietro and United States of America ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7165909.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (GREENBERG, ROBERT) 16-3466 NLH/JS No Arb Modified on 6/15/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7700 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: BARBARA GIHON v. THE JEWISH FEDERATION OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY D/B/A THE BETTY AND MILTON KATZ JCC; Court Number/Name: NJSuper CT CAM-L-1018-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7161435.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (ASH, JONATHAN) 16cv3419 JHR/KMW No Arb. Set Initial conf. Modified on 6/14/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7699 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - JAMES LASSITER V. USA (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KOCH, LORI) Modified on 6/13/2016 (dd).16-3372JBS (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7698 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - USAA Casualty Insurance Company as subrogee of Marc B. Leibowitz and Andrea B. Leibowitz v. Basements R Us, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7158315.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreement, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (O'DONNELL, SEAN) Modified on 6/13/2016 (dd).16-3371RBK/AMD (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7697 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Tri Coast, LLC v The Sherman- Williams Company ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7157265.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F) (DENOIA, THOMAS) Modified on 6/10/2016 (dd).16-3366RMB/JS (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7696 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange as subrogee of Susan Chapman v. Leviton Manufacturing Co., Inc.; ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7157175.). (REMICK, BRADLEY) Modified on 6/10/2016 (dd).16-3364JHR/JS (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7695 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - Robin P. Eble v. American Neighborhood Mortgage Acceptance Company, LLC d/b/a AnnieMac Home Mortgage ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7156772.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Summons) (JACKO, JOHN) Modified on 6/10/2016 (dd).16-3365JHR/JS (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7694 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Karen V. Kapochus v. Tractor Supply Company; Court Number/Name: ATL-L-418-16 Atlantic Court. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7156111.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (SIACHOS, PETER) Modified on 6/10/2016 (dd).16-3350JHR/JS (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7693 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Sabinsa Corporation v. Chemill Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7153146.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (KELLY, SEAN) Modified on 6/9/2016 (dd).Trenton Case 16-3324 (FLW/TJB) Modified on 6/9/2016 (mem). (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7692 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Sabinsa Corporation v. Nachurel Ingredients LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7153141.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (KELLY, SEAN) Modified on 6/9/2016 (dd).Trenton Case 16-3323 (FLW/TJB) Modified on 6/9/2016 (mem). (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7691 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - Sabinsa Corporation v. Aegle Bios Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7153136.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (KELLY, SEAN) Modified on 6/9/2016 (dd).Trenton Case 16-3322 (FLW/TJB) Modified on 6/9/2016 (mem). (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7690 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Sabinsa Corporation v. Olive Lifesciences Pvt. Ltd. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7153132.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (KELLY, SEAN) Modified on 6/9/2016 (dd).Trenton Case Modified on 6/9/2016 (dd).Trenton 16-3321 (FLW/TJB) Case Modified on 6/9/2016 (mem). (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7689 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: MARIONI, JR. v. PRITCHARD INDUSTRIES, INC., et als.; Court Number/Name: CAM-L-1777-16; Superior Court of N.J. Camden County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7145394.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (CAPONE, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 6/6/2016 (dd).16-3235JBS/JS (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7688 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - EASTERN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. and CANCER TREATMENT CENTERS OF AMERICA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION OF PENNSYLVANIA, P.C. v. MARIE BROWN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7144958.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (SASSO, ADAM) Modified on 6/6/2016 (dd).16-3237RBK/KMW (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7687 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - Dwight D. Conover v. Marina District Development Company, LLC d/b/a Borgata Hotel, Casino and Spa and John Doe Parties (Plural 1-10) ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7144989.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KURKOWSKI, DANIEL) Modified on 6/6/2016 (dd).16-3236RMB/JS (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7686 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Evelyn Green-Frierson v. Camden City School District, Andrea Aumaitre, Herbert Simons, Paymond Rouhanifard; Court Number/Name: CAM-L-1790-16 Evelyn Green-Frierson v. Camden City School District, Andrea Aumaitre, Herbert Simons, Paymond Rouhanifard. 1:33-av-1 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7144641.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (ANTINORI, JOSEPH) Modified on 6/6/2016 (dd).16-3238RBK/KMW (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7685 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Frank Maloney v. Delaware River and Bay Authority ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7144382.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (HOFMANN, PAUL) Modified on 6/6/2016 (dd).16-3234JHR/JS (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7684 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Elmas v. Grand Lux Cafe ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7142998.). (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (MAINS, DEBORAH) Modified on 6/6/2016 (dd).16-3224RBK/JS (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7683 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - NANCY SHARON REDDICK-VEST v. EQUIFAX MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS, LLC, ET AL. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7142906.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (MAILMAN, MARK) Modified on 6/6/2016 (dd).16-3223RBK/AMD (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7682 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Dennis Maurer, Individually v. Port-O-Call Associates, L.P., a New Jersey Limited Partnership ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7142502.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SIDDIQI, ASAAD) Modified on 6/6/2016 (dd).16-3222RMB/AMD (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7681 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - MACTIERNAN v. PROFESSIONAL RECEIVABLES NETWORK, LLC, d/b/a PRN, et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7141709.). (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (KARPF, ARI) Modified on 6/6/2016 (dd).16-3221JBS/AMD (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7680 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - Michael George v Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7141539.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certificate of Service) (TOVINSKY, LAUREN) Modified on 6/6/2016 (dd).16-3154RBK/JS (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7679 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - Eric A. Shore, P.C. v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, et al. (y). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (BAIRD, GRAHAM) 16-3186 RMB/JS Arb. (See payment information attached) Modified on 6/3/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7678 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Suzanne Drake and Robert Greenwald v. MRS BPO, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7140191.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons) (PIRILLO, MELISSA) 16cv3184 JBS/JS No Arb Modified on 6/3/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7677 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Orthonix, Inc. v. Arthrosurface, Inc.; Court Number/Name: CAM-L-1584-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7140137.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Certificate of Service) (CARR, JEFFREY) 16-3183 RMB/AMD No Arb. Set initial conf. Modified on 6/3/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7676 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Corcoran v. Manente ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7138409.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (GORDON, HARRISON) Modified on 6/2/2016 (dd).Newark Case 16-cv-03155 (JMV/MF) (Bergen) Modified on 6/2/2016 (ak). (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7675 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - Leski v. Lanigan ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7135717.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 3 Summons) (LADERMAN, MARK) Modified on 6/1/2016 (dd).chambers Review Modified on 6/1/2016 (dd).16-3125RMB/JS (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7674 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Estate of Salvatore Grungo, Deceased v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, formerly d/b/a Scottsdale Insurance Company, John Doe 1-10 (Fictitious Names) Jane Doe 1-10 (Fictitious Names) and Corporations A-Z, Jointly, Severally, and in the Alternative; Court Number/Name: BUR-L-971-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7135337.). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (KOSOVICH, MEGAN) Modified on 6/1/2016 (dd).16-3106NLH/JS (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7673 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Catherine Oelsner v. Walmart Stores, Inc.; John Does 1-10; Court Number/Name: MID-L-02406-16; Middlesex County Superior Court of New Jersey. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7134723.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (GANZ, DAVID) Modified on 6/1/2016 (dd).Trenton Case Modified on 6/1/2016 (jjc, ). 16-3116 (AET/DEA) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7672 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7134749.). (LEONARD, ANTHONY) Modified on 6/1/2016 (dd).16-3105JBS/JS (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7671 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - Michael Bernert and Heather Bernert husband and wife v. Channel Marine Construction Inc, P.J. Ward and Sons and Patrick Ward ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7134364.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (FRIEDMAN, BENJAMIN) Modified on 6/1/2016 (dd).16-3104JHR/JS (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7670 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - EILEEN GOODRICH -V- AUTOMOTIVE RENTALS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7133786.). (FARRELL, BRIAN) Modified on 5/31/2016 (dd).16-3088NLH/KMW (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7669 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Remphrey v Township of Cherry Hill, et al (Y). REC #03127122042 (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit) (HARTMAN, FRANCES) Modified on 5/31/2016 (dd).16-3084JBS/JS (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7668 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. William J. Meagher, Jr. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7132025.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (LEWIS, THOMAS) Modified on 5/31/2016 (dd).16-3072RMB/JS (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7667 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Estate of Norman Abel v. Nationwide Credit, Inc.; Court Number/Name: Superior Court of New Jersey, Burlington County, DC-002321-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7131206.). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (BOGUE, KELLY) 16cv3054 No Arb Set Initial conf Modified on 5/27/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7666 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Yvonne D'Amelio v. Indeprendence Healthcom Strategies Group, Inc., et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7131199.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (RESNICK, JEFFREY) Modified on 5/27/2016 (ds). 1:Cv 16-3055 (JBS/JS). (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7665 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Timothy Broderick v. Evesham Township; Court Number/Name: Bur-L-1000-16; Burlington Superior Court. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7130325.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certificate of Service) (JOSEPHSON, CHRISTOPHER) 16cv3053 NLH/AMD No Arb. Set initial conf. Modified on 5/27/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7664 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - Dennis Maurer, Individually v. KFC U.S. PROPERTIES, INC., a Delaware Corporation ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7129633.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SIDDIQI, ASAAD) 16cv3035 RBK/JS No Arb Modified on 5/27/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7663 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - Dennis Maurer, Individually v. DELSEA 205 LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, a New Jersey Limited Liability Company ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7129609.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SIDDIQI, ASAAD) 16cv3034 RBK/JS No Arb. Modified on 5/27/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7662 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Keenan v. McEvoy, et al; ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7129440.). (Attachments: # 1 State complaint, # 2 State summons) (RICHARDSON, ALLAN) 16cv3033 RBK/AMD No Arb. Set Initial Conf. Modified on 5/27/2016 (mmb). (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7661 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Diane Callahan v. Jackson National Life Insurance Company ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7128463.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (SWARTZ, RICHARD) Modified on 5/26/2016 (dd).16-3028JBS/KMW (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7660 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7128354.). (Attachments: # 1 Statement Cover Letter to Federal Court, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Certification of Counsel, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Statement Cover Letter to State Court, # 8 Statement Notice to State Court, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet) (REYNOLDS, THOMAS) Modified on 5/26/2016 (dd).16-3025JBS/JS (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7659 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - United States of America v. Hector Daniel Sanchez, Tara Geisel, and Infinite Mortgage Services, LLC (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (WAGNER, NELSON) Modified on 5/26/2016 (dd).16-3024RBK/JS (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7658 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - A&R Fence and Guiderail, LLC. Motion to Confirm ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7127045.). (Attachments: # 1 Verified Petition, # 2 Affidavit Edward H. O'Hare, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'HARE, EDWARD) Modified on 5/26/2016 (dd).16-3010RMB/AMD (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7657 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Prasad Rao Medavarapu v. Raghu Ram Inc. d/b/a Camden Discount Pharmacy, Purnachandra Rao Akkineni, Bhavanam Raghu Reddy, Prakash Rao Janagama, ABC Corps. 1-10 and John and Jane Does 1-10 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7126390.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (VALENTI, ANTHONY) Modified on 5/26/2016 (dd).16-3027NLH/JS (Entered: 05/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7656 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: MICHAEL CARROW and MIchael FENNELL, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated; v. FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEMS, INC.; Court Number/Name: L-1023-16, Superior Court of New Jersey, Camden County. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7126284.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, # 2 Declaration of Benjamin J. Ferron, # 3 Attachments to Ferron Declaration, # 4 Declaration of Joe Fisher, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (KOHN, JEFFREY) Modified on 5/26/2016 (dd).16-3026RBK/JS (Entered: 05/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7655 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Michael Thomas v. Township of Gloucester, et al.; Court Number/Name: Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Camden County, Docket No. CAM-L-1439-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7123181.). (Attachments: # 1 Certification Notice of Filing, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Exhibit A) (GOLDSTEIN, RICHARD) Modified on 5/25/2016 (dd).16-2964RBK/JS (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7654 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Thomas Hamill and Advocates For Disabled Americans v. Aversa,s Italian Bakery and The Aversa Family Partnership (y). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (BRADY, ANTHONY) Modified on 5/24/2016 (dd).16-2952JBS/AMD (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7653 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Mercedes Lopez and Edwin Lopez v. Rose DiDonato, et al.; ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7122958.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Exhibit A) (WALSH, TRACY) Modified on 5/24/2016 (dd).Trenton Case 16-2956(PGS/DEA) Modified on 5/24/2016 (jjc, ). (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7652 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Keith Roman and Jennifer Roman, h/w v. Chanoa Santiago and Antonio Santiago ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7122810.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons) (SACCHETTA, THOMAS) Modified on 5/24/2016 (dd).16-2951RMB/AMD (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7651 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DEFENDANT Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. from Superior Court of NJ Gloucester County, case number GLO-L-492-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7122761), filed by DEFENDANT.(MULLIN, TIMOTHY) Modified on 5/24/2016 (dd).16-2950RMB/JS (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7650 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Joann Jackson v. Apex Asset Management, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7122412.) (N). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (GINSBURG, AMY) Modified on 5/24/2016 (dd).16-2949NLH/KMW (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7649 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Mercedez Lopez and Edwin Lopez v. Rose DiDonato, et al.; ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7121331.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Exhibit A) (WALSH, TRACY) Modified on 5/24/2016 (dd).Trenton Case 16-2939(MAS/LHG) Modified on 5/24/2016 (jjc, ). (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7648 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - The United States of America v. Matthew Schwartz (Y). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DAUENHEIMER, DAVID) Modified on 5/24/2016 (dd).16-2930RBK/AMD (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7647 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT - George Pappas and Maria Pappas V. The City of Atlantic City,Earth Tech Demolition,, Kay-Vil womans minority Inc, RC Construction Inc, Lioyds of London,Heist Insurance Company, United Fire Group ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7120266.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Supplement continuation of complaint, # 3 Supplement continuation of complaint) (FRIEDMAN, BENJAMIN) Modified on 5/24/2016 (dd).16-2928RMB/AMD (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7646 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Brandywine Promenade, LLC v. The Promenade Homes and Main Street Condominium Association, Inc., et al.; Court Number/Name: CAM-L-1786-15, Camden County Superior Court of New Jersey. on behalf of Defendant Federal National Mortgage Association ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7119947.). (Attachments: # 1 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, # 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, # 3 Notice of Appearance, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit A_Complaint, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit B_Stipulation of Dismissal w_Prejudice, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit C_Principal Place of Business in PA, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit D_Principal Place of Business in NJ, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit E_Email to confirm consent to remove to Fed Ct) (MCCONNELL, JOHN) Modified on 5/24/2016 (dd).16-2927RMB/KMW (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7645 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Christine Krulan, individually and on behalf of all persons similarly situated v. TD Bank, N.A. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7119664.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NAGEL, BRUCE) Modified on 5/24/2016 (dd).16-2919JBS/JS (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7644 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - David McEnerney and all others similarly situated v. TD Bank N.A. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7118673.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (RADICE, JOHN) Modified on 5/24/2016 (dd).16-2918JBS/JS (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7643 Filed: 5/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - Creel et al v. Rowan University ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7117385.). (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (BRADY, ANTHONY) Modified on 5/23/2016 (dd).16-2883JBS/AMD (Entered: 05/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7642 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - CHRISTINA PEREZ (CALABRESE) v. PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7117159.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 3 Certification, # 4 Summons) (USHER, MIKHAIL) Modified on 5/23/2016 (dd).16-2882RBK/AMD (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7641 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award - NJ REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, ET AL. V. R. MESMER LLC dba ROBERT MICHAELS GROUP LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7117145.). (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, # 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 4 NOTICE OF MOTION, # 5 STATEMENT, # 6 ORDER, # 7 JUDGMENT, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (PARSONS, BRADLEY) Modified on 5/23/2016 (dd).16-2881RBK/AMD (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7640 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - Capstone Pharmacy of Delaware LLC d/b/a Pharmerica v. Friends Home at Woodstown, Inc. d/b/a Friends Village at Woodstown ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7117087.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)) (FLEMING, DANIEL) Modified on 5/23/2016 (dd).16-2878JHR/KMW (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7639 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL Case Title: Marcia Collins v. James W. Turner Construction, Inc., et al.; Court Number/Name: Superior Court of NJ, Ocean County, No. OCN-L-867-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7116891.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B (part 1), # 4 Exhibit B (part 2)) (DUBLER, JANICE) Modified on 5/23/2016 (dd).Trenton case 16-2877(FLW/LHG) Modified on 5/23/2016 (jjc, ). (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7638 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - Jamel Williams v. AMERICAN FLUX & METAL COMPANY, STUART RUDOLER, Individually, and JOACHIM RUDOLER, Individually, ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7114452.). (Attachments: # 1 Summons Individual Defendant, # 2 Summons Individual Defendant, # 3 Summons Corporate Defendant, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (JAFFE, JODI) Modified on 5/20/2016 (dd).16-2833JHR/AMD (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7637 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - CHRISTINA PEREZ (CALABRESE) v. MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7114361.). (USHER, MIKHAIL) Modified on 5/20/2016 (dd).16-2832RBK/AMD (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7636 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Charles M. Fabian, et al. v. Sabree J. Claitt, et al. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7114233.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ROWLAND, LYNDSAY) Modified on 5/20/2016 (dd).16-2831NLH/AMD (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7635 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - Murray, et al. v. Genesco, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7112773.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Cover Letter) (CLARK, GERALD) Modified on 5/19/2016 (dd).16-2815RBK/JS (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7634 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Rando v. Hat World, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7112580.). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Cover Letter) (CLARK, GERALD) Modified on 5/19/2016 (dd).16-2814JHR/JS (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7633 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - TD Bank, N.A. v. FacilitySource, LLC Complaint Against FacilitySource, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7110894.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 photo, # 4 Exhibit 3 photo, # 5 Exhibit 3 photo, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 14 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only) Statement) (ZULLO, MICHAEL) Modified on 5/18/2016 (dd).16-2801JHR/AMD (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 7,499 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?