WAYNE M CAMERON
Bankruptcy Case Nevada Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 09-52606
District Judge GREGG W ZIVE, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANGELA MEADOW CAMERON, Joint Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by DARBY LAW PRACTICE, LTD.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space KEVIN A. DARBY +1 775 322 1237 +1 775 996 7290 kevin@darbylawpractice.com
No Logo U.S. TRUSTEE - RN - 7, U.S. Trustee
No Logo W. DONALD GIESEKE, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of W. DONALD GIESEKE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. DONALD GIESEKE +1 775 742 9107 +1 775 562 8181 wdg@renotrustee.com
No Logo WAYNE M CAMERON, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by DARBY LAW PRACTICE, LTD.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space KEVIN A. DARBY +1 775 322 1237 +1 775 996 7290 kevin@darbylawpractice.com
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (glw) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None
    Initial Asset Report (GIESEKE, W.) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None
        Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled.Hearing scheduled 2/2/2010 at 10:00 AM at GWZ-Courtroom 1,Young Bldg. (Related document(s) 33 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.) (glw) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/2/2010, Entered: None
            Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief from Stay(09-52606-gwz) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 150.00). Receipt number 7862924, fee amount $ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 01/02/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 33
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
                Adversary case 09-05081. Complaint Filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. vs. WAYNE M CAMERON Fee Amount $250. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 AP Cover Sheet# 3 Corporate Ownership Statement) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)(RALSTON, RICHARD) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                  Stipulated Order Extending Time for Trustee and U.S. Trustee to File an Objection to the Discharge of Debtor(s) until 1/31/2010. (glw) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                    Notice of Entry of Order with Certificate of Service Filed by GREGORY L. WILDE on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK (Related document(s) 29 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay) (WILDE, GREGORY) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 29 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                      Order Vacating Automatic Stay (Related document(s) 18 ) (glw) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/4/2009, Entered: None
                        BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s) 27 Notice of Requirement to File Certification of Completion of Instructional Course Concerning Financial Management (BNC)) No. of Notices: 2. Service Date 10/04/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/04/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                          Notice of Requirement to File Certificate of Completion of Instructional Course Concerning Financial Management. (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - pdf (Related document(s) 25 Trustee's Notice of Assets & Notice to File Claims (BNC)) No. of Notices: 9. Service Date 10/01/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
                              Trustee's Notice of Assets & Notice to File Claims Proof of Claim due by 1/2/2010.(GIESEKE, W.) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                Notice of Entry of Order with Certificate of Service Filed by GREGORY L. WILDE on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK (Related document(s) 23 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay) (WILDE, GREGORY) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 23 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                  Order Vacating Automatic Stay (Related document(s) 14 ) (cly) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None
                                    341 Meeting Continued on 09/18/09 at 03:00 PM at Young Bldg,Rm 2110 (GIESEKE, W.) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                      Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief from Stay(09-52606-gwz) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 150.00). Receipt number 7224489, fee amount $ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                        Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled.Hearing scheduled 9/29/2009 at 10:00 AM at GWZ-Courtroom 1,Young Bldg. (Related document(s) 18 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK) (glw) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                          Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 9/29/09 Hearing Time: 10:00am with Certificate of Service Filed by KEVIN S. SODERSTROM on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK (SODERSTROM, KEVIN) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                            Motion for Relief from Stay Property: 14180 Wild Quail Court, Reno, NV 89511 . Fee Amount $150. Filed by KEVIN S. SODERSTROM on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK (SODERSTROM, KEVIN) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                                              Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled.Hearing scheduled 9/8/2009 at 10:00 AM at GWZ-Courtroom 1,Young Bldg. (Related document(s) 14 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK) (glw) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief from Stay(09-52606-gwz) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 150.00). Receipt number 7093827, fee amount $ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 9/8/2009 Hearing Time: 10:00 AM with Certificate of Service Filed by GREGORY L. WILDE on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK (Related document(s) 14 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK) (WILDE, GREGORY) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Motion for Relief from Stay Property: 4460 GREAT FALLS LOOP, RENO, NV 89511 . Fee Amount $150. Filed by GREGORY L. WILDE on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DEED OF TRUST# 2 Exhibit NOTE)(WILDE, GREGORY) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s) 9 Order Determining Debtor's Compliance with Filing Requirements of 11 U.S.C. Section 521(a)(1) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 9. Service Date 08/06/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to File Certification of Completion of Instructional Course Concerning Financial Management. (BNC)) No. of Notices: 2. Service Date 08/06/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing (Related document(s) 2 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (BNC)) No. of Notices: 10. Service Date 08/06/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                            Notice of Requirement to File Certification of Completion of Instructional Course Concerning Financial Management. (edw) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                              Order Determining Debtor's Compliance with Filing Requirements of 11 U.S.C. Section 521(a)(1) (edw) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                Receipt of Filing Fee for Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - case upload(09-52606) [misc,1027u] ( 299.00). Receipt number 7028874, fee amount $ 299.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of ANGELA MEADOW CAMERON (DARBY, KEVIN) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of WAYNE M CAMERON (DARBY, KEVIN) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Calculation - Form 22A . Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of ANGELA MEADOW CAMERON, WAYNE M CAMERON (DARBY, KEVIN) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of ANGELA MEADOW CAMERON, WAYNE M CAMERON (DARBY, KEVIN) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          Statement of Social Security Number(s). This document contains sensitive information and cannot be viewed by the public. Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of ANGELA MEADOW CAMERON, WAYNE M CAMERON (DARBY, KEVIN) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            Meeting of Creditors and Notice of Appointment of Trustee W. DONALD GIESEKE. 341 meeting to be held on 09/04/2009 at 03:00 PM at Young Bldg,Rm 2110. Objections to Discharge due by 11/03/2009. (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $299. filed by KEVIN A. DARBY of DARBY LAW PRACTICE, LTD. on behalf of WAYNE M CAMERON, ANGELA MEADOW CAMERON. (DARBY, KEVIN) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 1,431 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?