Singh v. Mueller et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:07-cv-03380-JF
District Judge Jeremy D. Fogel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Tejindar P. Singh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ahluwalia Law PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Madan Mohan Singh Ahluwalia +1 408 416 3149 +1 650 249 6813 madan.ahluwalia@ahluwalia-law.com
v.
No Logo David Still, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Emilio Gonzales, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Francis D. Siciliano, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
Chertoff, Michael Chertoff, Michael, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Chertoff"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Robert Mueller, III, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
Office San Jose
Filed 6/27/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 900 - Appeal of Fee Determination
Cause Section 8 U.S.C. § 1446 Petition for Naturalization Hearing
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Santa Clara
Terminated 8/29/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, CLOSED, E-Filing
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/27/07. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2007)
    LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Stipulation
    STIPULATION to Dismiss and [Proposed] Order by Robert Mueller, III, Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzales, David Still, Francis D. Siciliano. (Olsen, Edward) (Filed on 8/23/2007)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 USCA Order
      ORDER of USCA: the district court docket shows that the petition for hearing is currently under consideration in the district court. Accordingly, we dismiss the duplicative petition for hearing in this court. DISMISSED. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2007)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 Certificate Of Service.
        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tejindar P. Singh of ADR Dispute Resolution Procedures (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2007)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 7/1/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tejindar P. Singh. Robert Mueller, III served on 6/27/2007, answer due 8/27/2007; Michael Chertoff served on 6/27/2007, answer due 8/27/2007; Emilio Gonzales served on 6/27/2007, answer due 8/27/2007; David Still served on 6/27/2007, answer due 8/27/2007; Francis D. Siciliano served on 6/27/2007, answer due 8/27/2007. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2007)
            LREF
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 ADR Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
            ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2007. Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2007 10:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/27/07. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2007)
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Petition
            PETITION for Hearing in on Naturalization Application (summons Issued) against Robert Mueller, III, Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzales, David Still, Francis D. Siciliano (Filing fee $350 receipt number 5546110012). Filed byTejindar P. Singh. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2007)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Case Referred to ECF
              CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2007)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Summons Issued as to USA
                Summons Issued as to Robert Mueller, III, Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzales, David Still, Francis D. Siciliano, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2007)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 183 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?