Kahalehoe et al v. WMC Mortgage Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:09-cv-02368
District Judge Kent J. Dawson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Albert Kahalehoe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of THOMAS STAFFORD, II

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Stafford +1 702 647 2510 +1 702 647 0012 tstaflaws@aol.com
No Logo Jessica Kahalehoe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of THOMAS STAFFORD, II

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Stafford +1 702 647 2510 +1 702 647 0012 tstaflaws@aol.com
v.
No Logo AMERICA'S SERVICING COMPANY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Alexander , +1 702 784 5200 +1 702 784 5252 clalexander@swlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cassie R Stratford +1 702 784 5200 cstratford@swlaw.com
No Logo Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick G. Byrne +1 702 784 5201 +1 702 784 5252 pbyrne@swlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ERICA J. STUTMAN +1 702 784 5200 +1 702 784 5252 estutman@swlaw.com
No Logo Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jolley Urga Wirth Woodbury & Standish

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mindy Fisher +1 702 699 7500 +1 702 699 7555 mcf@juww.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin A Little +1 702 699 7500 +1 702 699 7555 mal@juww.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1444
Nature of Suit 220 - Foreclosure (Diversity)
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Defendant America's Servicing Company. (Stratford, Cassie) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Defendant America's Servicing Company Notice OF Non Opposition Filed To Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint And Release Lis Pendens (Alexander, Cynthia) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 17 Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice of the Remanded Claims as to Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/15/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
        STIPULATION of Dismissal and Order Without Prejudice of the Remanded Claims by Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems. (Byrne, Patrick) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER. Responses to 6 and 8 Motions to Dismiss due by 6/8/10. Replies due 7 days after responses are filed. Proof of service of the summons and complaint due within 14 days of the entry of this order. Any Defendant that has been served with the summons and complaint answer or otherwise respond within twenty (20) days of the entry of this order if it has not already done so. Motion to Stay (Doc. # 6 in 2:09-cv-02414-KJD-RJJ) is Denied as Moot. The Parties shall file all documents in teh base case no. 2:09-cv-02368-KJD-RJJ. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/24/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
            Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant WMC Mortgage Corporation. (Fisher, Mindy) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER to Consolidate Granting 13 Stipulation to Consolidate Cases. It is ORDERED that 2:09-cv-02414-JCM-LRL is consolidated under 2:09-cv-02368-KJD-RJJ. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/26/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                STIPULATION and Order to Consolidate Matters by Defendant America's Servicing Company. (Stratford, Cassie) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The complaint in this action was filed on* 07/31/09.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*National Default Servicing Corporation.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 2/20/2010. (SRK) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
                    JOINDER to 1 Petition for Removal, ; filed by Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems. (Stutman, Erica) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None
                      STATEMENT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendant WMC Mortgage Corporation. (Fisher, Mindy) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:09-cv-02414 by Defendant America's Servicing Company. (Stratford, Cassie) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                          MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Release of Lis Pendens by Defendant America's Servicing Company. Responses due by 1/24/2010. (Stratford, Cassie) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None
                            JOINDER to 1 Petition for Removal, ; filed by Defendant America's Servicing Company. (Stratford, Cassie) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                              MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant WMC Mortgage Corporation. Responses due by 1/15/2010. (Fisher, Mindy) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by America's Servicing Company Identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Other Affiliate Wells Fargo Home Mortgage dba America's Servcing Company,, Other Affiliate Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. dba Wells Fargo Home Equity for America's Servicing Company. (Stratford, Cassie) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                  CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by WMC Mortgage Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Fisher, Mindy) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 12/15/2009. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/2/2010. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/17/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (ASB) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None
                                        PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-09-596474, (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-1467169), filed by WMC Mortgage Corporation. Proof of service due by 11/28/2009. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/25/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, Mindy) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 170 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?